In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-03825 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 11/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2183333] [17-3825] [Entered: 11/30/2017 11:57 AM]

Case 17-3825, Document 29, 11/30/2017, 2183350, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: In Re: Libor-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation _____ Docket No.: 17-3825 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Mark D. Villaverde Firm: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Address: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005 Telephone: 212-530-5230 ___________________________ Fax: 212-822-5230 E-mail: MVillaverde@milbank.com Appearance for: Coöperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (n/k/a Coöperatieve Rabobank U.A.)/Respondent (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: David R. Gelfand/Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on 4/1/2016 OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Mark D. Villaverde Type or Print Name: Mark D. Villaverde

ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 12/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2188896] [17-3825] [Entered: 12/07/2017 10:43 AM]

Case 17-3825, Document 81, 12/07/2017, 2188896, Page1 of 1 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Short Title: In Re: Libor-Based Financial Docket No.: 17-3825 Lead Counsel of Record (name/firm) or Pro se Party (name): David Sapir Lesser, Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP Appearance for (party/designation): The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Respondent DOCKET SSHEET AC DOC ACKNOWLEDGMENT/AMENDMENTS OW DG /A D S Caption as indicated is: ( ✔ ) Correct ( ) Incorrect. See attached caption page with corrections. Appellate Designation is: ( ✔ ) Correct ( ) Incorrect. The following parties do not wish to participate in this appeal: Parties: ( ) Incorrect. Please change the following parties= designations: Party Correct Designation Contact Information for Lead Counsel/Pro Se Party is: ( ✔ ) Correct ( ) Incorrect or Incomplete. As an e-filer, I have updated my contact information in the PACER AManage My Account@ screen. Name: Firm: Address: Telephone: Fax: Email: RELATED CASES ( ) This case has not been before this Court previously. ( ✔ ) This case has been before this Court previously. The short title, docket number, and citation are: In re: Libor- Based Financial Instrumentsm Bis, 13-3565(L); 13-3636(Con), 15-432 (Con) ( ✔ ) Matters related to this appeal or involving the same issue have been or presently are before this Court. The short titles, docket numbers, and citations are: In re: Libor-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation, Nos. 16-1189, 17-1569 CERTIFICATION I certify that ( ✔ ) I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by LR 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on 01/02/2014 OR that ( ) I applied for admission on or renewal on . If the Court has not yet admitted me or approved my renewal, I have completed Addendum A. Signature of Lead Counsel of Record: /s/ David Sapir Lesser Type or Print Name: David Sapir Lesser OR Signature of pro se litigant: Type or Print Name: ( ) I am a pro se litigant who is not an attorney. ( ) I am an incarcerated pro se litigant.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 12/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2191144] [17-3825] [Entered: 12/11/2017 11:21 AM]

Case 17 - 3825, Document 87, 12 / 11 / 2017, 2191144, Pagel of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title. In Re: Libor - Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation Docket No. 17 - 3825 Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel's Contact Information is as follows: Name. Yvonne S. Quinn Firm. Sullivan & Cromwell LLP Address. 125 Broad Street, New York, New York 10004 Telephone: 212 - 558 - 4000 Fax: 212 - 558 - 3588 E - mail: quinny @ sullcrom. com Appearance for: Barclays Bank PLC / Respondent (party / designation) Select One: | Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel: (name / firm) ubstitute counsel (replacing other counsel: (name / firm) Vadditional counsel (co - counsel with: David H. Braff / Sullivan & Cromwell LLP (name / firm) Amicus (in support of: _ (party / designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46. 1 (a) (2), have renewed my admission on 1 / 2 / 2014 OR applied for admission on Signature of Counsel: IS / Yvonne S. Quinn Type or Print Name: Yvonne S. Quinn

LETTER, on behalf of Respondent JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 02/13/2018 by CM/ECF.[2235124] [17-3825] [Entered: 02/13/2018 04:04 PM]

Case 17-3825, Document 113, 02/13/2018, 2235124, Page1 of 1 Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP 425 LEXINGTON AVENUE NEW YORK, NY 10017-3954 TELEPHO N F.: +1-212-455 - 20 00 FACS I M IL E: +1-212-455-2502 Dire ct Dial Numb er E-ma il Address 212-455-3040 trice@stbl aw. com BYECF February 13, 2018 Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe Clerk of the Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, New York 10007 Re: In re Libor-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation. No. 17-3825 Dear Ms. Wolfe: Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP ("Simpson Thacher") represents Respondents JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (collectively "JPMorgan") in the above- captioned mandamus petition. I write to advise the Court that I have retired as a partner from Simpson Thacher. Accordingly, I respectfully request the Court remove my appearance as lead counsel for JPMorgan and designate my former partner Mary Beth Forshaw, who appeared as additional counsel on December 4, 2017, as lead counsel for JPMorgan. Simpson Thacher will continue to represent JPMorgan and therefore my withdrawal will not prejudice this petition or any of the parties involved. cc: Counsel of Record (by ECF) BEIJI NG HO NG KONG HOUSTON LONDO N LOS ANGE LES P ..\l.O ALTO sAo P ..\U L O SEOU L TOKYO \1'..\SH I !\"G TO N, DC

SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2245735] [17-3825] [Entered: 02/28/2018 09:47 AM]

Case 17-3825, Document 117, 02/28/2018, 2245735, Page1 of 1 United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 ROBERT A. KATZMANN CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE CHIEF JUDGE CLERK OF COURT Date: February 28, 2018 DC Docket #: 11-md-2262 Docket #: 17-3825op DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK Short Title: In Re: Libor-Based Financial CITY) DC Judge: Buchwald NOTICE OF MOTION PLACED ON THE CALENDAR A petition for writ of mandamus filed in the above-referenced case has been added as a submitted case to the substantive motions calendar for Tuesday, March 12, 2018. Inquiries regarding this case may be directed to 212-857-8595.

NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2255570] [17-3825] [Entered: 03/13/2018 12:59 PM]

Case 17-3825, Document 120, 03/13/2018, 2255570, Page1 of 1 United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 ROBERT A. KATZMANN CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE CHIEF JUDGE CLERK OF COURT Date: March 13, 2018 DC Docket #: 11-md-2262 Docket #: 17-3825op DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK Short Title: In Re: Libor-Based Financial CITY) DC Judge: Buchwald NOTICE OF CASE MANAGER CHANGE The case manager assigned to this matter has been changed. Inquiries regarding this case may be directed to 212-857-8522.

ORDER, denying petition for writ of mandamus, DJ, RCW, C.JJ., KORMAN, D.J., FILED.[2255572] [17-3825] [Entered: 03/13/2018 01:03 PM]

Case 17-3825, Document 121, 03/13/2018, 2255572, Page1 of 1 S.D.N.Y.–N.Y.C. 11-md-2262 Buchwald, J. United States Court of Appeals FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT _________________ At a stated term of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, held at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City of New York, on the 13th day of March, two thousand eighteen. Present: Dennis Jacobs, Richard C. Wesley, Circuit Judges, Edward Korman,* District Judge. In re Libor-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation. 17-3825 Petitioners seek a writ of mandamus ordering the district court to enter a partial final judgment on some of their claims under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), or, alternatively, to certify issues for interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petition is DENIED because Petitioners have not demonstrated that they have a clear and indisputable right to the writ, or that mandamus relief is appropriate under the circumstances. See Balintulo v. Daimler AG, 727 F.3d 174, 186 (2d Cir. 2013). FOR THE COURT: Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court * Judge Edward Korman, of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, sitting by designation.

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/13/2018, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2271022] [17-3825] [Entered: 04/03/2018 05:23 PM]

Case 17-3825, Document 122, 04/03/2018, 2271022, Page1 of 1 MANDATE S.D.N.Y.–N.Y.C. 11-md-2262 Buchwald, J. United States Court of Appeals FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT _________________ At a stated term of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, held at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City of New York, on the 13th day of March, two thousand eighteen. Present: Dennis Jacobs, Richard C. Wesley, Circuit Judges, Edward Korman,* District Judge. In re Libor-Based Financial Instruments Antitrust Litigation. 17-3825 Petitioners seek a writ of mandamus ordering the district court to enter a partial final judgment on some of their claims under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), or, alternatively, to certify issues for interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petition is DENIED because Petitioners have not demonstrated that they have a clear and indisputable right to the writ, or that mandamus relief is appropriate under the circumstances. See Balintulo v. Daimler AG, 727 F.3d 174, 186 (2d Cir. 2013). FOR THE COURT: Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court * Judge Edward Korman, of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, sitting by designation. MANDATE ISSUED ON 04/03/2018

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
11/30/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 11/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2183324] [17-3825] [Entered: 11/30/2017 11:51 AM]
28
11/30/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 11/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2183333] [17-3825] [Entered: 11/30/2017 11:57 AM]
29
11/30/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 11/30/2017 by CM/ECF. [2183350] [17-3825] [Entered: 11/30/2017 12:02 PM]
12/04/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Respondents JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase & Co., in case 17-3825, [61], ADDED.[2185289] [17-3825] (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
12/07/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 12/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2188896] [17-3825] [Entered: 12/07/2017 10:43 AM]
12/08/2017
ATTORNEY, James Matthew Goodin for Respondents HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-3825, [85], ADDED.[2190471] [17-3825] (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
12/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Barclays Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 12/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2191144] [17-3825] [Entered: 12/11/2017 11:21 AM]
12/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Roger B. Cowie for Respondents HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank PLC, in case 17-3825, [108], ADDED.[2192505] [17-3825] (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
02/13/2018
LETTER, on behalf of Respondent JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> RECEIVED. Service date 02/13/2018 by CM/ECF.[2235124] [17-3825] [Entered: 02/13/2018 04:04 PM]
02/14/2018
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice, for Respondents JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co., TERMINATED.[2235468] [17-3825] (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
02/28/2018
SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2245735] [17-3825] [Entered: 02/28/2018 09:47 AM]
120
03/13/2018
NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2255570] [17-3825] [Entered: 03/13/2018 12:59 PM]
121
03/13/2018
ORDER, denying petition for writ of mandamus, DJ, RCW, C.JJ., KORMAN, D.J., FILED.[2255572] [17-3825] [Entered: 03/13/2018 01:03 PM]
122
04/03/2018
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/13/2018, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2271022] [17-3825] [Entered: 04/03/2018 05:23 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.