In Re: Prempro Products et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2003-cv-01507 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 534 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
03/04/2003
PLAINTIFFS' Attorney List: (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2003
DEFENDANTS' Attorney List: (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
03/05/2003
TRANSFER ORDER (MDL) that the actions in this litigation involve common questions of fact, and that centralization under Section 1407 in the Eastern District of AR will serve the convenience of the parties and witnesses and promote the just and efficient conduct of the litigation; other than Case No. 4:02cv00529 pending in the Eastern District of AR, Case Nos. 2:02cv5893, 2:02cv7628, 2:02cv7692 from Central District of California, Case No. 1:02cv4970 from the Northern District of Illinois and Case No. 3:02cv852 from the Middle District of Louisiana are transferred to the Eastern District of AR with the consent of that Court and assigned to the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr., for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 06/15/2004
03/19/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Louisiana C.A. No. 3:02-852 Attuso, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00195) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California 2:02-5893 Manuela Favela v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00206) (bsm) Modified on 03/28/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/24/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois C.A. No. 1:02-4970 Gayle Lewers et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00214) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 2:02-7692 Jane Krznaric v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00222) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 2:02-7628 Janice Szabo, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00223) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2003
REMARK: original record from Southern District of Florida C.A. No. 1:02cv22692 Jane Kaufman v. Wyeth (Our Case No. 4:03cv00308) (bsm) Modified on 06/18/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
04/08/2003
INITIAL ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson requesting counsel to review the attached proposed Practice and Procedure Order and to give notions as to what should be included in the Practice and Procedure Order; a Proposed Order would be welcomed; counsel will receive a Practice and Procedure Order within 45 days which will set the initial conference in Little Rock, AR; if answers are due before the initial scheduling conference, a response may be postponed until a time certain after the conference; counsel is to review local rules regarding initial disclosure but initial disclosures are suspended until after the initial conference suggestions as to deadlines would be appreciated; a more definitive suggestion for disc schedule is requested which will be finalized at the initial conference and the requirement for disc responses are suspended; counsel shall submit a pleading entitled "Response to Initial Court Order of 4/8/03" by 5:00 PM on 4/16/03; recusal list for Judge W.R. Wilson, service list and a required reading list attached to this Order (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 04/14/2003
3
04/10/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that this matter and all previously filed individual cases will be transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Young; all subsequently filed "tag-along" cases will be directly assigned to Judge Young; counsel are directed to review the attached copy of Judge Young's Recusal List and contact the Court immediately if any conflicts exist (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 04/14/2003
4
04/16/2003
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Initial Court Order of 4/8/03 [2-1]
5
04/16/2003
RESPONSE by counsel for pltfs to Initial Court Order of 4/8/03 [2-1]
6
04/23/2003
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by counsel for pltfs to Initial Court Order of 4/8/03 [5-1]
7
04/24/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Willson that the Initial Conference is scheduled for 9:30 5/19/03 in Little Rock AR (cc: all counsel)
8
04/29/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:02cv09018 pending in Central CA, 2:03cv81 pending in Middle FL, 1:02cv22692 pending in Southern FL, 1:02cv06080 pending in Northern IL, 2:03cv82 pending in Eastern LA, 2:02cv5606 pending in Eastern NY, 3:02cv2844 pending in Puerto Rico, 5:03cv3 pending in Northern WV are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2003
05/09/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern Louisiana C.A. No. 2:03cv82 Fichter V. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00330) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2003
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Northern District of West Virginia C.A. No. 5:03cv3 Carol Kuhn v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00329) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/12/2003
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Puerto Rico C.A. No. 3:02cv2844 Teresa Rivera-Franceschi v. Wyeth Ayerst Labs, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00335) (bsm) Modified on 12/17/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
05/15/2003
JOINT RESPONSE/JOINT SUBMISSION for Conference of 5/19/03 [2-1]
05/15/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 2:02cv9018 Yoshida v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00346) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
05/16/2003
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Initial Court Order of 4/8/03 [2-1]
05/16/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois C.A. No. 1:02cv6080 Gill v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00351) (bsm) Modified on 05/28/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/19/2003
CLERK'S MINUTES: Initial Conference w/lawyers; Practice and Procedure Orders 1 and 2 discussed; Practice and Procedure Orders to be entered (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Florida C.A. No. 2:03cv81 Bohannon v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00359) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
05/27/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:03cv96 pending in Middle AL, 4:03cv4021 pending in Western AR, 8:03cv331 pending in Middle FL, 1:03cv20471 pending in Southern FL, 2:03cv2034 pending in KS, 2:03cv81 pending in Eastern LA, 1:03cv754 pending in Southern NY, 4:03cv425 pending in Southern TX are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 05/29/2003
12
05/29/2003
NOTICE by Plaintiffs of filing of Proposed Plaintiff's Steering Committee
13
06/02/2003
STATEMENT by Wyeth Inc regarding document preservation, collection and production in response to the Court's inquiry at the 5/19/03 conference (bsm) Modified on 06/04/2003
06/06/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Louisiana C.A. No. 2:03cv81 Ragusa v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00421) (bsm) Modified on 06/12/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
06/09/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to pltfs' Steering Committee nominees; requested information should be provided to Court w/in 11 days from the entry of this letter/order (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 06/11/2003
06/09/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Kansas C.A. No. 2:03cv2034 Gladys Dooley v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00424) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/10/2003
PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 1 by Judge William R. Wilson: pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1407(a), this Order will govern the practice and procedure in actions transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and all related cases originally filed in this Court or transferred or removed to this Court; this Order will also govern the practice and procedure in any tag-along action transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; this Order governs the procedures for filing and service, appearance of counsel, hearings and pending motions and Orders; all disclosure obligations and discovery proceedings in these actions are stayed, except as provided in this Order; Lead Counsel for pltf shall be Jan P. Helder, Jr., Stueve Helder Siegel and Michel F. Mills and they will be responsible for prosecuting the class claims as more specifically defined in this Order, as well as coordinating the pretrial proceedings; Pltf's Liaison Counsel is Russell Marlin and Gary Holt; Pltfs' Steering Committee will be composed of Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and 10 additional members; Lead Counsel for Wyeth shall be John W. Vardaman, Jr., Stephen L. Urbanczyk, and F. Lane Heard III; Liaison Counsel shall be Lyn P. Pruitt; the issue of the schedule for class certification determination is as listed in this Order; Court will hold a disc conference following determination of the class certification issue to establish a schedule for further disc and proceedings; Court will hold telephone status conference at approximately 45 day intervals until class certification issue is submitted (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/03/2003
06/10/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:03cv96 Sarah Lannette White v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00431 (bsm) Modified on 07/03/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original records from Western District of AR 4:03cv4021 Betty Powell v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00437) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Florida C.A. No. 1:03cv20471 Reyes v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00445) (bsm) Modified on 07/03/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Middle District of Florida C.A. 8:03cv331 Sherman v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00455) (bsm) Modified on 06/23/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/13/2003
NOTICE by parties of filing of joint submission of Proposed Practice and Procedure Order No. 3
06/17/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of New York C.A. No. 1:03cv754 Cyrus v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00469) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of New York C.A. No. 2:02cv5606 Johnson et al v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00472) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv425 Janet Rizzo v. Wyeth Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00470) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
06/27/2003
TRANSCRIPT of Initial Conference before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 5/19/03
18
07/03/2003
PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 by Judge William R. Wilson: this Order contains accepted proposals and those imposed by the Court to govern the taking of depositions; depositions shall be governed by the items specified in this Order; in the event Court is unavailable by telephone or fax to resolve disputes arising during the course of a deposition, the deposition shall nevertheless continue to be taken as to matters not in dispute; Court will exercise the authority granted under 28 U.S.C. 1407(b) to act as District Judge in any district in which a deposition is being taken; this Order will be adjusted as necessary to allow for orderly discovery (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/08/2003
19
07/03/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 1:03cv2359 pending in Northern District of Illinois, 5:03cv138 pending in Western District of Louisiana, 4:03cv380 pending in Eastern District of Missouri, 2:03cv4016 pending in Western District of Missouri, 1:03cv238 pending in Southern District of Mississippi, 2:03cv1669 pending in Eastern District of New York, 5:03cv437 in Northern District of New York, 1:03cv2352 in Southern District of New York, 4:03cv1074 in Southern District of Texas, 2:03cv740 pending in Western District of Washington are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/24/2003
07/14/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Missouri C.A. No. 4:03cv380 Kathleen Massimo v. Wyeth Co. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00551) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/15/2003
MOTION by pltfs to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 1
21
07/15/2003
NOTICE by pltfs of filing of submission of Proposed Practice and Procedure Order No. 4
07/16/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Missouri C.A. No. 2:03cv4016 Linda Slater V. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00562) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 1:03cv238 Katie R. Doolittle v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00561) (bsm) Modified on 08/08/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of New York C.A. No. 1:03cv2352 Doris J. Wheeler, et al v. Wyeth Inc et al Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00569) (bsm) Modified on 07/24/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv1074 Leslie Y. Wallace et al v. Wyeth Inc et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00568) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/21/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Louisiana C.A. No. 5:03cv138 Elizabeth Brown, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00573) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois C.A. No. 1:03002359 Nancy Crosby V. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00585) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/28/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Jan Helder, Michel Mills, Russell D. Marlin, Paul Odenwald, Marc Coulter, Gary Green, Hank Wallace, Clint Krislov, Tobias Millrood, Willie Singleton, John Vardaman, Jr., Lyn P. Pruitt in regard to the selection of the Steering Committee members; motion and brief requested as to Judge's recusing across the board w/in 21 days from the date of this letter (by 5:00 PM) (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/30/2003
08/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York C.A. No. 2:03cv1669 Grace Jan, et al v. Wyeth Ayerst Intl, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00620) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2003
REMARK; Receipt of original record from the Northern District of New York C.A. No. 5:03cv437 Phyllis Berger, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00618) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Washington C.A. No. 2:03cv00740 Carol Paul, et al v English, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00619) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2003
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Western District of Washington C.A. No. 2:03cv740 Paul et al v. English, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00619) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/11/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting pltfs' motion to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 1 [20-1]; pltfs' deadline to file their Amended Master Complaint and motion for Class Certification is extended 30 days following the Court's Order appointing the Pltf's Steering Committee members; all other deadlines originally set forth in Practice and Procedure Order No. 1 are extended by the same period, including the Class Certification Hearing; Class Certification hearing scheduled for 9:30 8/16/04 (cc: all counsel)
24
08/19/2003
TRANSFER ORDER (MDL) that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, seven Southern District of Mississippi actions, C.A. No. 2:03-99, C.A. No. 2:03-104, C.A. No. 3:03-237, C.A. No. 3:03-250, C.A. No. 3:03-304, C.A. No. 4:03-105 and C.A. No. 5:03-140 are transferred to the Eastern District of AR and assigned to Judge William R. Wilson, Jr., for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 08/25/2003
08/21/2003
CLERK'S MINUTES: Telephone conference w/lawyers re Steering Committee issue, Gary Green; parties to present Order for Court to sign (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/22/2003
NOTICE by pltfs of Amendment of Proposed Pltfs' Steering Committee
26
09/03/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 1:03cv160 pending in Colorado, 6:03cv701 pending in Middle District of Florida, 9:03-80063 pending in Southern Florida, 2:03cv194 pending in the Northern District of Mississippi and 2:03cv2331 pending in Western District of Tennessee are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further Order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 09/04/2003
09/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 3:03-237BN Barnes, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00710) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Souther District of Mississippi C.A. No. 5:03cv140BrS Connor, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00711) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 4:03-105LN Massey, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00712) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 3:03-3034BN Day, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00713) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 3:03-250BN Bryant, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00714) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Mississippi C.A. 2:03cv194-P-B Elizabeth Kendrick, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00741) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/15/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Tennessee C.A. No. 2:03-2331 Janie M. Womack v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;03CV00744) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/16/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Florida C.A. No. 6:03-701 Lily Enberg, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00755) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Colorado C.A. No. 03-WM-160 Pennie Alexander v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00763) (bsm) Modified on 09/23/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/22/2003
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to expedite the flow of disc material, facilitate the prompt resolution of disputes over confidentiality, protect material entitled to be kept confidential, and ensure that protection is afforded only to material entitled to such treatment, confidential information shall be stamped "Confidential-subject to Confidentiality Order" and treated as such as described in this Order pursuant to Court's authority under FRCP 26(c) (cc: all counsel)
28
09/30/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 7:03cv1711 pending in Northern District of Alabama, 5:03cv140 pending in Western Kentucky, 3:03cv1713 pending in Puerto Rico, 3:03cv519 and 3:03cv539 pending in Southern Texas are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as a part of MDL Docket No. 1507: transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
10/09/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Florida C.A. No. 4:03cv00808 Evelyn Phelps v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00808) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/14/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original records from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. CV-03-CO-1711-W Cornelia D. Hood, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00818) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original records from Western District of Kentucky C.A. No. 5:03cv140J Collins v.Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00825) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
10/20/2003
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE NOVEMBER 20,2003 HEARING SESSION by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-5" filed on 9/8/03, is LIFTED insofar as it relates to the action, and thus the action is transferred to the E/D of Arkansas for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 USC 1407 being conducted by the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr.; it is further ordered that the Hearing Session Order and the attached Schedule filed on 10/15/03 are VACATED insofar as they relate to this action (Laura Harry v. Wyeth, Inc., Louisiana, C.A. No. 2:03-2096) (cc: all counsel) (lej) Modified on 10/22/2003
10/20/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. 3:03cv539 Billie Ruth Watkins v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00832) (bsm) Modified on 11/03/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/20/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 3:03cv519 Lloyd Hicks, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00830) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
10/23/2003
MOTION by Wyeth Inc and Wyeth Pharmaceutical for leave to conduct limited discovery
31
10/23/2003
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc and Wyeth Pharmaceutical in support of motion for leave to conduct limited discovery [30-1]
32
10/23/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson naming the following persons to the original Steering Committee: Marc Coulter, Aaron Rihn, Tobias Millrood, Clint Krislov, Jason Stiehl, Paul Odenwald, Willie Singleton, and Hank Wallace (cc: all counsel)
33
10/27/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:03-2166 pending in the Northern District of Alabama, 2:03-2250 pending in the Eastern District of Louisiana, 3:03-608 pending in the Middle District of Louisiana, 2:03-3511 pending in the Eastern District of New York, 3:03-566 and 4:03-2918 pending in the Southern District of Texas are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507: transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 10/29/2003
34
10/28/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; objections to deft's Wyeth's motion for leave to conduct limited discovery are to be filed w/in five days [30-1] (cc: all counsel)
10/30/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Louisiana C.A. No. 2:03-2096 Laura Harry v. Wyeth Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00867) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
10/31/2003
MOTION by pltf to extend time to file objections to motion for leave to conduct limited discovery (bsm) Modified on 12/11/2003
36
10/31/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting pltf's motion to extend time until 11/7/03 to file objections to Wyeth's motion for leave to conduct limited discovery [30-1] [35-1] (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 12/11/2003
37
11/03/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 1:03-610 pending in the Southern Alabama, 2:03-4612 pending in the Central District of California, 8:03-1359 pending in the Central District of California, 3:03-62 pending in the Eastern District of Kentucky, 2:03-2383 pending in the Eastern District of Louisiana, 3:03-657 pending in the Middle District of Louisiana and 3:03-1917 pending in Northern District of Texas are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
38
11/04/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Proposed Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; a hearing on the digital discovery will be scheduled soon in re of Ms. Lyn Pruitt's letter on 11/3/03 requesting attention to Practice and Procedure Order No. 3 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/06/2003
39
11/06/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson setting a hearing on electronic discovery for 9:00 12/16/03 ; Court will issue a further order prior to the hearing to give parties guidance on issues that will be raised and on preparation for the hearing; Court expects the appearance of Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and the newly appointed Pltfs' Steering Committee; parties are to submit any other issues they would like put on the Hearing Agenda w/in 10 days of the date of this Order (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/07/2003
40
11/07/2003
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by pltfs to deft Wyeth's motion for leave to conduct limited discovery [30-1] (bsm) Modified on 11/07/2003
11/07/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 03-J-2166-S Loewen et al v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00892) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/12/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to the Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; a copy of Mr. Shawn Korrami's letter is enclosed requesting consideration to be on the Steering Committee; comments, pro or con, are requested by 11/14/03 by 5:00 PM(cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/17/2003
42
11/12/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that after reviewing the resume submitted by the proposed steering committee member, and conducting an individual interview, Ms. Eileen L. McGeever is named to the Steering Committee (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/18/2003
11/12/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv2918 Amparo Amador et al v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00908) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Louisiana C.A. No. 03cv608-B-M-I Young et al v. Wyeth Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00910) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
11/13/2003
REPLY by defts Wyeth Inc and Wyeth Pharmaceutical in support of motion to conduct limited discovery [30-1]
44
11/14/2003
ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-6" is vacated insofar as it relates to Jacqueline Caldwell, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al, Southern District Texas, C.A. No. 3:03-566; Panel has now been advised that Caldwell was dismissed in the Southern District of Texas in an Order filed on 9/8/03 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/09/2004
45
11/14/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson after reviewing the resume submitted by the proposed steering committee members, Mr. Shawn Khorrami and Ms. Patricia Mitchell are named to the Steering Committee (cc: all counsel)
46
11/17/2003
ORDER CONCERNING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge William R. Wilson; deft must submit, no later than 12/10/03, information about its basic corporate structure, as listed in this Order, and information about the government approval and monitoring process also mentioned in this Order; deft must also have present for the hearing the individual or individuals most knowledgeable about its computer system; any additional information bearing on the categories named in this Order which the parties could submit prior to the hearing would be welcomed; The Steering Committee should review the proposed Practice and Procedure No. 3 and express any concerns they might have in the form of a motion or other appropriate pleading no later than 12/8/03 with copies to the opposing counsel; all parties and their counsel are reminded of their duty to preserve evidence that may be relevant to this action; the duty extends to documents, data, and tangible things in the possession, custody and control of the parties to this action, and any employees, agents, contractors, carriers, bailees, or other non-parties who possess materials reasonably anticipated to be subject to disc in this action; counsel is under an obligation to exercise reasonable efforts to identify and notify such non-parties, including employees of corporate or institutional parties; if deft's business practices involve the routine destruction, recycling, relocation, or mutation of materials mentioned, deft must, to the extent practicable for the pendency of this order, either (1) halt such business processes; (2) sequester or remove such material from the business process; or (3) arrange for the preservation of complete and accurate duplicates or copies of such material, suitable for later discovery if requested; deft may apply to the Court, before or after the hearing, for further instructions regarding the duty to preserve specific categories of documents, data, or tangible things; deft may seek permission to resume routine business processes relating to the storage or destruction of specific categories of documents, data, or tangible things, upon a showing of undue cost, burden, or overbreadth (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/18/2003
11/17/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of Kentucky C.A. No. 3:03cv00062 Norrita Payne v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:0300924) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of Louisiana C.A. No. 03-2383J Linda R. Dunn, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00917) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
11/18/2003
TRANSFER ORDER (MDL) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, C.A. No. 4:03-141, Elmora B. Wilson, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al is transferred to the Eastern District of AR and assigned to Judge William R. Wilson, Jr., for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (cc: all counsel)
48
11/19/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel in regard to deft's letter dated 11/18/03 in regard to Court appointing Ms. McGeever, Mr. Khorrami and Ms. Mitchell to plaintiffs' Steering Committee; if defts wish to object, they may do so forthwith; if plaintiffs' counsel have any comment regarding the letter, a response is due by 5:00 11/24/03 (cc: all counsel)
49
11/19/2003
NOTICE by Russell Marlin for Pltfs' Liaison Counsel of Agenda Topics for 12/16/03-12/17/03 Prempro MDL Hearing
11/19/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 2:03cv104PG Jeanette Byrd, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;03cv00927) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Alabama C.A. No. 1:03-0610-BH Dola Beritech v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;03cv00925) (bsm) Modified on 11/25/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
11/20/2003
MOTION by Wyeth for reconsideration of Pltfs' Steering Committee appointments
51
11/20/2003
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth in support of motion for reconsideration of Pltfs' Steering Committee appointments [50-1]
11/20/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 3:03cv01917 Reeves v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00932) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 2:03cv99PG Leslie Cooley v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00935) (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
11/21/2003
MOTION by pltfs for extension of time to file amended master class action complt
53
11/24/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting pltfs' unopposed motion for extension of time until 5:00 12/8/03 to file master class action complt [52-1] (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/24/2003
54
11/24/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 8:03-1079 pending in the Central District of California and 1:03-3794 pending in the Eastern District of New York are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further Order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
11/28/2003
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 03-cv-4612 Marcia Merta et al v. Ayerst Laboratories, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;03cv00950) (bsm) Modified on 12/10/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York C.A. No. 2:03cv3511 Helen Pincus v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00951) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Mississippi C.A. 4:03cv141-P-B Elnora B. Wilson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00952) (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
12/02/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson of the Agenda for the December 16-17, 2003 Hearing on the presentation of the evidence and the resolution of other pending motions; Court will allocate time for discussion of other motions or issues that may develop; U.S. Magistrate Jerry Cavaneau will assist on electronic discovery issues; parties are to provide Court with the name of the lawyer who will handle the presentation of each issue(cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 12/11/2003
56
12/08/2003
MOTION by pltfs to extend time to file amended Master Class Action Complt
57
12/08/2003
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc re proposed new lead counsel and new members of Pltfs' Steering Committee [50-1]
58
12/08/2003
MOTION by pltfs to review, and reconsider Proposed Practice and Procedure Order No. 3
59
12/08/2003
NOTICE by pltfs of filing of proposed changes to Practice and Procedure Order No. 3
60
12/10/2003
RESPONSE/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT by Wyeth Inc re Corporate's structure, regulatory approval of prescription drugs and reporting requirements [46-1]
61
12/10/2003
TRANSFER ORDER (MDL) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the cases listed in this Order are transferred to the Eastern District of AR and with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr., for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings; C.A. Nos. 2:03-271 Sheppard v. Wyeth, 3:03-623 Jenkins V. Wyeth, 3:03-676 Brown v. Wyeth and 5:03-333 Hewitt v. Wyeth from the Southern District of Mississippi, C.A. Nos. 1:03-412 Casey v. Wyeth, 1:03-453 Barnum v. Wyeth, 1:03-479 Young v. Wyeth, 1:03-480 Jenny v. Wyeth, 1:03-484 Johnson V. Wyeth, 4:03-287 Harmon v. Wyeth, 9:03-183 Erwin v. Wyeth from the Eastern District of Texas; C.A. Nos. 2:03-226 Walker v. Wyeth and 4:03-845 Rebetti v. Wyeth from the Northern District of Texas; 3:03-534 Templeton v. Wyeth, 3:03-535 Harvey v. Wyeth, 3:03-536 Wolf v. Wyeth, 3:03-537 Allen v. Wyeth, 3:03-538 Petrie v. Wyeth, 3:03-547 Moore v. Wyeth, 3:03-548 Newman v. Wyeth, 3:03-549 Kent v. Wyeth, 4:03-2905 Thibodeaux v. Wyeth, 4:03-2906 Cornelius v. Wyeth, 4:03-2907 Adair v. Wyeth, 4:03-2908 Smith v. Wyeth and 4:03-2909 Henry v. Wyeth from the Southern District of Texas (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 12/16/2003
12/10/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York C.A. No. 1:03-3794 Debrah Bleiberg, et al v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00973) (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
12/12/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting motion to extend time to file amended Master Class Action Complt [56-1]; Pltfs' Master Class Action Complt must be filed by 5:00 PM on 1/7/04 (cc: all counsel)
63
12/12/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel: a brief presentation may be made at the hearing on 12/16/03 on adding Ms. Zoe Littlepage as third counsel for pltfs (cc: all counsel)
64
12/12/2003
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Proposed Changes to the Confidentiality Order and Proposed Practice and Procedure Order No. 4 [59-1]
65
12/12/2003
MOTION by Wyeth for further instructions in regard to preservation of documents (bsm) Modified on 01/26/2004
12/12/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-566 Jacqueline Caldwell, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv00978) (bsm) Modified on 01/05/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
12/15/2003
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to the Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; hearing scheduled for 12/16/03 will commence at 11:00 AM vice 9:00 AM (cc: all counsel)
67
12/15/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Chris Burnham, atty for Manuela Favela in Favela, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 12/17/2003
68
12/15/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Michel F. Mills, co-lead counsel for Favela in Favela, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 12/16/2003
12/15/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 03-07099 DT(MANx) Janet Pickett, et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00989) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2003
CLERK'S MINUTES: Electronic Discovery Hearing held w/parties before Judge Wilson; Order to follow; Status Hearings set before Judge Wilson 2/13/04; 4/02/04; 5/21/04 and 6/25/04; Class Certification Hearing set for 1/10/05 (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
12/17/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson after reviewing the resumes submitted by the proposed Steering Committee members, Kathleen Dailey, Mike Williams, James Morris, Richard Lewis, Robert K. Jenner and Ken Suggs are added to the Steering Committee; Zoe Littlepage is named as pltfs third Lead Counsel; objections to the appointments are overruled and all exceptions are saved (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 12/19/2003
70
12/17/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting Wyeth's motion for leave to conduct limited discovery [30-1]; Wyeth is given leave to serve a subpoena duces tecum on the National Institutes of Health to obtain the data underlying the Women's Health Initiative study of Prempro; each named pltf, in a case presently transferred to the MDL 1507, will provide the information listed in this Order to Wyeth within 30 days of service of this Order (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 12/29/2003
71
12/17/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Patrick W. Pendley, atty for pltfs, in Ester L. Young, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 12/19/2003
72
12/17/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Christopher L. Coffin, atty for pltfs in Ester L. Young, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1]
12/18/2003
UTILITY EVENT: Add attorney(s) Zoe Littlepage, Ken Suggs, Richard Lewis, Robert K. Jenner, Kathleen Dailey, Mike Williams and James Morris (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Louisiana C.A. No. 3:03cv657-D-M3 Trinia Plummer v. Wyeth-Ayerst Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:03cv01000) (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
12/19/2003
NOTICE by parties of filing of Memorandum of Agreement pursuant to parties' Meet and Confer on 12/16/03
74
12/24/2003
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 3:03-754 pending in the Middle District of Louisiana, 2:03-3511 pending in the Eastern District of New York, 2:03-688 pending in the Southern District of New York and 4:03-3914 pending in the Southern District of Texas are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507: transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 01/06/2004
75
12/29/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by John M. McKay, atty for pltfs in Ester L. Young, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 12/30/2003
76
12/29/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Christopher R. Sonnier, atty for pltfs, in Ester L. Young, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 12/30/2003
77
12/29/2003
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by John F. McKay, atty for pltfs in Ester L. Young et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 12/30/2003
78
12/30/2003
LETTER to court from Lyn Pruitt in response to the 12/16-17, 2003 hearing in regard to deft Wyeth's "scanning" and other document processing costs incurred to date - exhibits 1,2, and 3 attached
79
12/30/2003
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that based on review of previous orders, the Memorandum of Agreement of counsel and clarifications made during the hearing on 12/16-17, 2003, pltfs' motion regarding Practice and Procedure Order No. 4 is denied; denying deft's motion for reconsideration of Pltfs' Steering Committee appointments [50-1]; pltfs' oral motion to extend search terms beyond the expansion agreed to by deft is denied; resolution of costs allocation will be determined upon receipt of information which defts will provide no later than 5:00 PM 1/6/04; parties will receive a revised scheduling order from the Courtroom Deputy (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 01/05/2004
12/31/2003
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv845-Y Diane Rebetti, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV01022) (bsm) Modified on 01/08/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
01/07/2004
NOTICE by pltfs Manuela Favela, Janice Szabo and April Krueger of filing of motion for class certification (bsm) Modified on 01/26/2004
01/07/2004
MOTION by pltfs Manuela Favela, Janice Szabo and April Krueger for class certification (bsm) Modified on 01/27/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
01/07/2004
MASTER CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by pltfs Manuela Favela, Janice Szabo and April Krueger (bsm) Modified on 01/26/2004
82
01/07/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to the Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; parties are to submit a list of topics by 1/16/04 to be presented at the hearing scheduled for 2/13/04 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 01/21/2004
01/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. G-03-538 Sandra Petrie, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00012) (bsm) Modified on 01/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 03-cv-535 Genevieve Harvey v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:03CV00014) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX G-03-549 Nancy Newman et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00013) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-547 Janell L. Moore, et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00021) (bsm) Modified on 01/29/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-537 Inez Allen v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00020) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-549 Ruth Opal Kent et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00017) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-534 Doris B. Templeton, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00018) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-536 Judy Wolf, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00019) (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
01/09/2004
SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION DETERMINATION by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; objections to the dates set by Court are due within 5 days of the date of this Letter/Order; Master Class Action Complt due 1/7/04; pltfs disclosure due 1/21/04 collection and production of medical records and other relevant documents for class certification purposes due 1/21/04; depositions re; class certification issues due 7/20/04; pltfs disclose experts due 2/4/04; Wyeth disclosure experts due 4/5/04; pltfs disclose rebuttal experts due 6/7/04; pltfs file memorandum in support of class certification on 7/15/04; Wyeth files opposition to class certification on 8/16/04; pltfs' reply due 9/7/04; Wyeth's sur-reply due 9/21/04; class certification hearing to be held 1/10/05 [80-1]; Status Conference have been set before Court in Little Rock, AR on following dates; 2/13/04 at 8:30 AM, 4/2/04 at 8:30 AM which will be rescheduled at the 2/13/04 Status Conference; 5/21/04 at 8:30 (tentative); 6/25/04 at 8:30 AM; (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 01/13/2004
01/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 9:03cv00183 Beverly Sue Erwin, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00027) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv484 Linda Johnson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00024) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 2;03cv271 Helen M. Sheppard, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00025) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv480 Juliana Jenny et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00026) (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
01/13/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to clarify preservation policies
85
01/13/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to clarify preservation policies [84-1]
86
01/13/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel in regard to to Ms. Littlepage's letter; response to Ms. Littlepage's letter is due 1/20/04 (letter dealing with costs and related matters) (cc: all counsel)
87
01/13/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:03-6276 pending in Central District of California, 6:03-1571 pending in Middle District of Florida, 3:03-1255 pending in Southern Mississippi are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/04/2004
88
01/14/2004
TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 12/16/03 and 12/17/03 (transcript in separate folder)
89
01/16/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Order by filing PROPOSED TOPICS for 2/13/04 Hearing [82-2]
90
01/20/2004
NOTICE of filing by counsel Zoe Littlepage of Letter to Court dated 1/9/04
91
01/20/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth to 1/9/04 Letter re: Document Depository Issues [82-2] (bsm) Modified on 01/21/2004
92
01/21/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that all future responses to inquiries from the Court, whether the response is in the form of a letter or pleading, are to be filed with the Clerk of the Court (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 01/21/2004
93
01/21/2004
ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE REASSIGNMENT (DOC) that all previously filed individual cases in this matter assigned to the docket of Mag Judge H. David Young will be reassigned to Mag Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr.; in addition, all subsequently filed "tag-along" cases will be directly assigned to Judge Jones; the docket sheets for all of the previously filed Prempro Products Liability cases (see attachment to this Order) shall be changed to show this reassignment (cc: all counsel)
94
01/21/2004
MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by pltfs on issues involving the cost of Wyeth's document production [82-1]
01/21/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 3:03-623BN Johnnie Mae Jenkins, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00058) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/21/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 5:03-333BrS Susan Hewitt v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00057) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/21/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 3:03-676LN Susie Brown v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00056) (bsm) Modified on 03/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/21/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TEXAS C.A. No. 1:03cv453 Eddie Mae Barnum v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00054) (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
01/22/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson in regard to filings for Court to consider (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/02/2005
01/26/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 3:03cv1255 Jimmie Edwards et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00070) (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
01/27/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee and Lead and Liaison Counsel in regard to scheduling a ex parte conference on 2/12/03; before Court makes a decision, pltf shall file by 5:00 1/30/04, a motion, with supporting brief, demonstrating that such a conference is copesetic; defts shall file a pleading by 5:00 1/30/04 affirming that there is no defense objection (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 01/29/2004
97
01/27/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth to pltf's memorandum of law on issues involving the costs of Wyeth's document production [94-1]
98
01/27/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that Court is not inclined to hold pltfs to the alleged agreement to pay $.07 per page for all documents they receive in regard to Wyeth's document depository cost issue but Court does feel that some lesser degree of cost shifting would be appropriate; defts must submit its figures incurred for unrecoverable costs in setting up the review hardware w/in 1 week from the date of this Order; pltfs will be allowed to reply w/in 5 days of this submission; Court will hear any additional argument from the parties on this specific cost issue at the hearing on 2/13/04; parties must confer and attempt to agree on a time schedule for adding the remaining categories of documents to the repository and on a protocol and time schedule for the downloads; parties are to inform the Court of particulars of the schedule and protocol by 2/10/04; pltfs must inform Court and deft by 2/6/04 what they feel would be a reasonable time in which to complete their review of repository documents following each download; deft may file a response by 2/10/04; Court expect pltfs' counsel to take all reasonable steps to expedite the review process (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/06/2004
01/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G-03-3914 Sharon R. Whitus v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00074) (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
01/28/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to clarify that Court is giving pltfs the green light to download the entire database through a direct electronic download into 250 gigabyte hard drives (cc: all counsel)
100
01/28/2004
RESPONSE by pltf's to defts' briefing on document production cost issues [94-1]
101
01/28/2004
MOTION by pltfs for schedule of Wyeth's document production
102
01/28/2004
MOTION by pltfs for production of defts' document indexes
103
01/28/2004
BRIEF by pltfs in support of their motion to compel production of the defts' document indexes [102-1]
104
01/29/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to extend time to respond to Master Class Action Complt
105
01/29/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to extend time to respond to Master Class Action Complt [104-1]
106
01/30/2004
MOTION by pltfs for discovery track and Committee Structure for personal injury claimants
107
01/30/2004
MOTION by pltfs for restrictive language to be added to Hipaa medical authorization, and for preliminary review period for highly confidential medical information (bsm) Modified on 02/12/2004
108
01/30/2004
BRIEF by pltfs in support of motion for restrictive language to be added to Hipaa medical authorization [107-1] and motion preliminary review period for highly confidential medical information [107-2] (bsm) Modified on 02/12/2004
109
01/30/2004
STATEMENT by Wyeth re Exparte Conference [96-1] (bsm) Modified on 02/04/2004
01/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 2:03cv06276 Marilyn Alpert v. Ayerst Laboratories et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00083) (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
02/02/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting Wyeth's motion to extend time until 3/1/04 to respond to Master Class Action Complt (cc: all counsel)
111
02/02/2004
LETTER/ORDER (DOC) to Steering Committee and Lead and Liaison Counsel in regard to the ex parte conference; pltfs were to submit a motion regarding their request for a ex parte conference; pltfs are given until 2/3/04 to submit this motion (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/03/2004
112
02/03/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs' Steering Committee's Statement re Ex parte Conference [96-1] (bsm) Modified on 02/06/2004
113
02/03/2004
MOTION by pltfs for ex parte conference with the Court on 2/12/04
114
02/03/2004
BRIEF by pltfs in support of motion for ex parte conference with the Court on 2/12/04 [113-1]
115
02/03/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 4:03-4578, 4:03-4897, 4:03-5229 and 4:03-5352, pending in Southern District of Texas, are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
116
02/03/2004
MOTION by pltfs to extend time to disclose expert witnesses regarding class certification
117
02/03/2004
MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of motion to extend time to disclose expert witnesses regarding class certification [116-1]
118
02/03/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth re costs of the depository [98-1] (bsm) Modified on 02/04/2004
02/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Middle District of Louisiana C.A. 3:03cv754-C-M3 Jacqueline T. Handy, et al v. Wyeth-Ayerst et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;04cv00092) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of New York C.A. No. 2:03-cv-00688-JSR Florence Leone v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00103) (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
02/09/2004
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Ron M. Feder, atty for pltf in Jimmie Edwards, et al v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 02/11/2004
120
02/09/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE filed by pltfs in support of motion for production of defts' document indexes [102-1]
121
02/09/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to order by filing Report on anticipated speed of document review [98-1]
122
02/09/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to defts' statement on unrecoverable costs [118-1]
123
02/09/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson upon request of pltfs, an ex parte communication/conference is scheduled for 1:00 2/12/04, with defts in agreement if limited to the two topics mentioned in this Order; if either party has objection to the rules set out in this Order to govern this conference, it should be filed by 12:00 PM 2/11/04 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/12/2004
124
02/10/2004
SUBMISSION by Wyeth Inc re document production costs & scheduling of merits discovery [98-1]
125
02/10/2004
ISSUES by pltfs concerning Wyeth's document production schedule [98-1]
126
02/11/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that Mr. Ralph M. Cloar, Jr. is appointed to the Steering Committee; objections are overruled and all exceptions are saved (cc: all counsel)
127
02/11/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' issues concerning Wyeth's document production schedule [125-1]
128
02/11/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; the STAY of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-12" is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. Nos. 4:03-4495, 4:03-4696, 4:03-4697, 4:03-4882, 4:03-4898, 4:03-5133, pending in the Southern District of TX; cases are transferred to the Eastern District of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before Judge William R. Wilson, Jr. (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/13/2004
02/12/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Ex-Parte Hearing before Judge Wilson (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Status Hearing w/parties; April conference reset for Wednesday, April 7, 2004 at 8:30 AM (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H-03-4578 Mary Shaw V. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00130) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H-03-5352 Valerie Jackson v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00134) (bsm) Modified on 03/03/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas H-03-5229 Connie Elizabeth Allen, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv000136) (bsm) Modified on 05/07/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H-03-4897 Russanne D. Kelly v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00129) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/17/2004
Docket Modification (Utility Event) finding the motion to review [58-1] moot; finding the motion reconsider Proposed Practice and Procedure Order No. 3 [58-2] moot due to December Status Hearing; granting motion for ex parte conference with the Court on 2/12/04; conference held [113-1] (Text entry; no document attached.)
129
02/19/2004
TRANSFER ORDER (MDL) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the cases listed in this Order are transferred to the Eastern District of AR and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr., for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings; C.A. No. 2:03-1705 G. Fitzpatrick v. Wyeth from the EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, C.A. No. 2:03-272 E. Hooker v. Wyeth from the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI, C.A. No. 1:03-486 M. Linscomb v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-487 D. Watson v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-530 J. Thibodeaux v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-576 B. Barnhart v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-643 D. Gordon v. Wyeth, C.A. No.1:03-790 D. Barrios v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-886 A. Anderson v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-332 P. Hopper v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-345 V. Coppick v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 5:03-213 K. Christensen v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 6:03-381 F. Ray v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 6:03-404 C. Whitaker v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 9:03-199 P. Jackson v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 9:03-207 S. Burnitt v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 9:03-208 J. Wells v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 9:03-233, S. Honeycutt v. Wyeth from the EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS; C.A. No. 1:03-159 K. Spalding v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-160 Kaethe Francis v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 1:03-161 S. Holwick v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 2:03-239 K. Ashlock v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 3:03-1947 S. Mack v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 5:03-201 M. Culp v. Wyeth from the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS; C.A. No. 3:03-611 J. Meldahl v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 3:03-798 M. Davis v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3032 B. Campbell v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3163 S. Woods v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3166 C. Dacus v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3167 D. Vater v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3176 A. Gestiada v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3177 B. Garner v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3178 A. Rich v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3189 C. Grant v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3190 A. Lund v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3197 C Parker-Storoe v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3198 B. Bradley v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3200 G. Hardwick v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3201 G. McGlothen v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3202 B. Porter v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3203 Y. Graves v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3218 M. Tye v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3219 J. Seipel v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3237 B. Hubbard v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3238 J. Hart v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3239 S. Brooks V. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3250 L. Padilla v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3251 M. Guerra v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3259 N. Merritt v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3261 P. Smith v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3264 B. Newton v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3301 B. Orender v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3302 W. Peek v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3303 L. Vogt v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3304 E. Reynolds v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3305 J. Joyvies v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3372 D. Mochman V. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3373 J. Townsend V. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3477 C. Nickerson v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3507 E. Helliksen v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3512 G. Peschka v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3693 A. Irshad v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3722 D. Beal v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3723 B. Bingham v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3864 D. Tobor v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3865 C. Vinton v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3867 L. Enge v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3886 C. Williams v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3887 G. Brimble v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:03-3913 J. Newman v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 6:03-97 W. Kirkwood v. Wyeth from the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS and C.A. No. 6:03-263 S. White v. Wyeth from the WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/23/2004
02/19/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the District of Puerto Rico C.A. No. 03-1713 (JAF) Helen Rivera Adams, et al v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00156) (bsm) Modified on 03/03/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
02/20/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Ex Parte Conference before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 2/12/04 (FILED UNDER SEAL)
131
02/20/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 2/13/04
132
02/20/2004
NOTICE by pltfs of filing of Presentation by co-lead counsel Zoe Littlepage before Judge Wilson on 2/13/04 (bsm) Modified on 02/25/2004
133
02/20/2004
STATEMENT filed by pltfs re Medical Monitoring in Class Certification cases (bsm) Modified on 03/01/2004
134
02/20/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Lead and Liaison Counsel and Steering Committee Members; a Standing Order is attached to this Order for review; objections due by 3/1/04 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/23/2004
135
02/24/2004
FURTHER MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by pltfs on cost-shifting relating to Wyeth's document production [94-1] (bsm) Modified on 02/26/2004
136
02/24/2004
SUBMISSION by Wyeth Inc re why pltfs should pay $0.04 per page [98-1]
137
02/24/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that action C.A. No. 2:03-7425 Fabiana Moradkhani v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Central District of California is transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 02/26/2004
138
02/24/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; the STAY of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-13" is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. Nos. 1:03-1193, 1:03-1339, 1:03-1343, 1:03-1366, 1:03-1367 pending in the Eastern District of Texas, C.A. No. 4:03-4449 pending in the Southern District of Texas and C.A. No. 5:03-1090 pending in the Western District of Texas are transferred to the Eastern District of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before Judge William R. Wilson, Jr. (cc: all counsel)
139
02/24/2004
MOTION by Wyeth for discovery schedule
140
02/24/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion for discovery schedule [139-1]
141
02/25/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to extend time to respond to Master Class Action Complt (bsm) Modified on 02/26/2004
142
02/25/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to extend time to respond to Master Class Action Complt [141-1]
143
02/26/2004
COMMENT by Wyeth Inc on PROPOSED Standing Order [134-1]
144
02/26/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting Wyeth's motion to extend time until 3/8/04 to respond to Master Class Action Complt [141-1] (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/01/2004
145
02/27/2004
COMMENT by pltfs on Court's Proposed Order concerning re-filing motions for remand and other matters [134-1]
146
02/27/2004
STATEMENT filed by Wyeth Inc re Medical Monitoring Judgments(bsm) Modified on 03/01/2004
147
03/01/2004
REPLY BRIEF by pltfs to Wyeth's submission re: why pltfs should pay $0.04 per page [136-1]
148
03/01/2004
REPLY by Wyeth Inc re why pltfs should pay $0.04 per page [135-1]
149
03/01/2004
MOTION by consumer class pltfs to extend time to disclose expert witnesses regarding class certification
150
03/01/2004
MEMORANDUM by consumer class pltfs in support of motion to extend time to disclose expert witnesses regarding class certification [149-1]
151
03/02/2004
ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-10" is vacated insofar as it relates to Helen Pincus v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, Eastern District of New York, C.A. No. 2:03-3511 since this action had already been transferred in the "CTO-6" Conditional Transfer Order
152
03/03/2004
OBJECTIONS by Consumer Fraud Class Pltfs to Proposed 30(B) (6) Deposition Schedule [18-1]
153
03/03/2004
RESPONSE by pltf Cola Beritech pursuant to the Court's Order dated 12/17/03 [70-1] (bsm) Modified on 03/04/2004
154
03/03/2004
RESPONSE by Janet Rizzo's to Wyeth's discovery request [70-1]
155
03/03/2004
NOTICE by pltfs of filing of Proposed Order re discovery
156
03/04/2004
OPPOSITION by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' Proposed Order for "two track" Discovery [155-1]
157
03/04/2004
STANDING ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to expedite the resolution of outstanding motions that appeared on the cases transferred to this Court as part of MDL 1507, it is ordered that all pending motions - including motions to remand- are denied w/out prej; parties may re-file these motions using the docket number assigned by this Court, in accordance with the Practice and Procedure Orders previously entered in this matter; a notice of refiling must be filed with the Clerk for each motion the party wishes the Court to rule upon; liaison counsel for both pltfs and defts will receive orders and notices from the Court on behalf of all parties; Liaison counsel will be responsible for transmitting copies of such orders as required by the Order (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/08/2004
158
03/05/2004
RESPONSE by pltf Trudie Attuso to Court Order of Wyeth's motion for limited discovery [70-1] (bsm) Modified on 03/10/2004
159
03/05/2004
REPLY by pltfs re Medical Monitoring in Class Certification Cases [133-1]
160
03/08/2004
ANSWER by Wyeth to Master Class Action Complaint; jury demand (bsm) Modified on 03/09/2004
03/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. H03-5133 Lillie Ann Schoppe v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00200) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2004
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4898 M.D. Tipton et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00199) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4882 Joyce Meek V. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00198) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4697 Sandra Lee Kneisler v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00197) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4696 Annette Alcantar v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00196) (bsm) Modified on 03/18/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4495 Deloris Wiede v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00195) (Text entry; no document attached.)
161
03/09/2004
ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF DATA CHANGES by Judge William R. Wilson granting deft's motion to clarify preservation policies [84-1]; deft's proposals are adopted as listed in Order (cc: all counsel)
162
03/09/2004
SUPERCEDING PRESERVATION OF DATA DIRECTIVE/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson; all parties and their counsel are reminded of their duty to preserve evidence, as mentioned in this Order, that may be relevant to this action; a party may apply to the Court for further instruction regarding the duty to preserve specific categories of documents, date, or tangible things; deft may seek permission to resume routine business processes relating to the storage or destruction of specific categories of documents, data, or tangible things, upon a showing of undue cost, burden, or overbreadth; this supercedes the relevant section of the 11/17/04 Order concerning the Electric Discovery Hearing (cc: all counsel)
163
03/09/2004
MOTION by Wyeth to dismiss Master Class Action Complaint
164
03/09/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complaint [163-1]
165
03/09/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting pltfs' motion to extend time to disclose expert witnesses regarding class certification [149-1]; accordingly, pltfs' deadline to disclose their experts is continued from 3/1/04 to a date 45 days following Wyeth's production of its initial disclosure documents; Wyeth's deadline to disclosure experts in opposition to class certification is continued from 5/3/04, and pltfs' deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is continued from 7/5/04 by the same period respectively (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/10/2004
166
03/09/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Consumer Class Counsel's objection to Proposed 30 (b)(6) deposition schedule [152-1] (bsm) Modified on 03/10/2004
167
03/09/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 4:03-5339 and 4:03-5813 pending in the Southern District of Texas, 7:03-3240 pending in Northern District of Alabama and 1:03-532 pending in District of New Hampshire are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/11/2004
168
03/09/2004
STANDING ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson: as an exception to General Order No. 39, Clerk shall directly assign all cases originating in the Eastern District of AR that are brought against Wyeth and its subsidiaries to the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr.; Court will review each case and its submissions individually to determine if the case should be (1) made part of the Prempro Products Liability Multidistrict Litigation or randomly reassigned by the Clerk pltf's counsel shall serve a copy of this Standing Order on all parties to the action; parties who oppose making the action, which originates in the Eastern District of AR, part of MDL 1507 shall submit a notice of opposition to the Clerk w/in 15 days from receipt of this Order (bsm) Modified on 03/15/2004
169
03/10/2004
REPLY by Wyeth Inc re why pltfs should pay $0.04 per page [148-1][135-1]
170
03/10/2004
REPLY by Consumer Class Pltfs supporting objection to Proposed 30(B)(6) Deposition Schedule [152-1] [18-1]
03/11/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Telephone conference w/lawyers re pending motions and deadlines; order to be entered (C. Newburg) (maj) Modified on 03/11/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
171
03/11/2004
MOTION by Pltfs Personal Injury Counsel to compel a date certain for informational depositions on Rule 30 (b)(6) topics
172
03/11/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Pltfs' Personal Injury Counsel motion to compel a date certain for informational depositions on Rule 30 (b)(6) topics [171-1]
173
03/12/2004
SURREPLY by Wyeth Inc re medical monitoring [159-1] [133-1]
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3032 Bettye M. Campbell v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00233) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3163 Sandra F. Woods, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv000234) (bsm) Modified on 03/19/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3166 Carolyn A. Dacus, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00235) (bsm) Modified on 03/19/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3167 Doris Vater v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv000236) (bsm) Modified on 03/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3176 Angelina Gestiada, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv000237) (bsm) Modified on 03/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3177 Betty J. Garner et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00238) (bsm) Modified on 03/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3178 Annette Rich v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00240) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3189 Carolyn A. Grant, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00241) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3190 Autumn Lund v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00242) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3197 Cheryl Parker-Storoe v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00243) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3198 Betty Bradley, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00244) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3200 Gail Diane Hardwick, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00245) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3201 Gloria T. McGlothen, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00246) (bsm) Modified on 03/19/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3202 Bennie Porter v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00247) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3203 Yvonne Graves v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00248) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3218 Maxine J. Tye v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00249) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3219 Joanne Seipel v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00250) (bsm) Modified on 03/19/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3237 Barbara L. Hubbard v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00251) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3238 Julia Hart v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00252) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3239 Shelly J. Brooks v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00253) (bsm) Modified on 03/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3250 Lille Padilla v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00254) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3251 Maria I. Guerra, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00255) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3259 Nel Merritt, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00256) (bsm) Modified on 03/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3261 Patricia Smith v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00257) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3264 Beth Newton v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00258) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3301 Betty Orender v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00259) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3302 Wynonia M. Peek v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00260) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3303 Linda L.Vogt v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00261) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3305 Joanna Joyvies, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00263) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3372 Doris J. Mochman, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00264) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3373 Joann Townsend v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00265) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3477 Callie M. Nickerson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00266) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3507 Ester K. Helliksen, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00267) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3512 Gladys O. Peschka v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00268) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3693 Azra Irshad, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00269) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3722 Dollie S. Beal, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00270) (bsm) Modified on 03/30/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3723 Betty J. Bingham v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:00cv00271) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3864 Debbie Tobor, etc. v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00272) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3865 Connie Vinton v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00273) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3867 Louise L. Enge v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00274) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3886 Claire Williams v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00275) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3887 Gwendolyn Brimble v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00276) (bsm) Modified on 03/29/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3913 Joseph Newman etc v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00277) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 3:03cv01947 Sharon Mack v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00213) (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
03/15/2004
ORDER MODIFYING PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 1 by Judge William R. Wilson; Practice and Procedure Order No. 1 is modified to require all counsel to identify the case number and document number associated with each response, objection and/or reply in the body of its filings (cc: all counsel)
175
03/15/2004
RESPONSE by pltf Patricia K. Sherman to Order of 12/17/03 by filing a Notice of Compliance [70-1]
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 6:03cv00381 Francis Ray, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00216) (bsm) Modified on 03/30/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv00404 Cherlyn Whitaker, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00217) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 9:03cv00199 Patsy Lee Jackson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00220) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 9:03cv00207 Shirley Burnitt, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;04cv00221) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 9:03cv00208 Johnnie B. Wells et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00222) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 9:03cv00233 Sandra S. Honeycutt v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00223) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 2:03cv00239 Kathy Ashlock, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00224) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H:03cv04449 Sandra Gail Williams, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00225) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G:03cv00611 Jane Alley Meldahl, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00226) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. G:03cv00798 Mary Davis, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00227) (Text entry; no document attached.)
176
03/16/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting motion for discovery schedule [139-1]; Wyeth will produce 86 custodial files (attached as Exhibit 1) by 10/31/04; Wyeth will alter the distribution schedule in which the files are produced for up to six files, provided that pltfs give 60 days advance notice; pltfs must wait 60 days after Wyeth produces the file to issue a notice of deposition to the employee whose custodial file is more than 100,000 pages; if less than 100,000 pages, pltf must wait 30 days; depositions will cover 12 topics (attached as Exhibit 2); no more than 2 witnesses may be scheduled for depositions in any week and will be limited to 1 day of testimony for each topic; two lawyers may participate on behalf of pltfs - one for class issues and one for personal injury issues; either party may issue third party subpoenas for the collection of documents; the HIPAA medical authorization that pltfs will sign is attached to this Order as Exhibit 3; Records from plaintiff's psychiatrist, psychologists, social worker, mental health counselor or any facility providing drug or alcohol treatment, must be provided to the individual plaintiff's lawyer for a preliminary review of 14 days for all requested material and must inform all document collection services of this agreement; during this preliminary review period, defts may not review inadvertently produced documents; if plaintiff's counsel concludes that the information is highly confidential and unnecessary to this litigation, counsel must motion the Court; if such motion is made, the records will not be provided to defts until the Court has decided on the motion. However, if a motion is not filed within the 14 day period, the records will be released to defts; Ex parte interviews with the treating physicians are not permitted until further notice from the court (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/19/2004
177
03/16/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson pursuant to the hearing held on 2/13/04 and the 3/11/04 telephone conference, pltfs' motion for production of deft's document indexes is granted in its request for objective indexes and denied in its request for subjective indexes [102-1]; pltfs' motion for discovery track and committee structure for personal injury claimants and pltfs' Proposed Order regarding discovery are denied [106-1] [155-1]; pltfs' motion for restrictive language to be added to HIPAA medical authorization and for preliminary review period for highly confidential medical information is denied as moot considering the 3/16/04 Order [107-1] [107-2]; pltf's motion for schedule of Wyeth's document production is denied [101-1]; pltfs' motion to compel a date certain for informational depositions on Rule 30 (b)(6) topics is denied [171-1]; deft's motion for further instructions in regard to preservation of documents is denied as moot [65-1]; pltf's motion to extend time to disclose expert witnesses is denied as moot [116-1]; all previous Orders regarding costs, including the 1/27/04 Order and 1/28/04 Supplemental Order are vacated [98-1][99-1]; a Cost Order will be filed w/in 10 days if practicable (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 03/17/2004
178
03/16/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Court's Four Questions (3/11/04 Hearing)
179
03/16/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; the STAY of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-14" is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. Nos. 8:03-1736 and 8:03-1737 pending in the Southern District of California are transferred to the Eastern District of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before Judge William R. Wilson, Jr. (cc: all counsel)
180
03/17/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to Court's questions (3/11/04 Telephone Hearing)
03/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 5:03cv00213 Kathryn Christensen v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00282) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of California C.A. No. 03-cv-1705 Gayle Fitzpatrick v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00283) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 03-cv-3240 Ginger Wright v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00291) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Florida C.A. No. 6:03cv1571 Kathleen Ault et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00298) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3304 Esther Reynolds v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00262) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from the Northern District of TX Mary Culp v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00301) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of TX Judy Thibodeaox, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00300) (Text entry; no document attached.)
181
03/24/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 3/11/04
182
03/25/2004
RESPONSE by pltf Brenda Reeves' identification pursuant to Wyeth's motion for leave to conduct limited discovery [30-1] [70-1]
03/25/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 03cv05339 Darlene Talford-Atkins v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00307) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 03cv05813 Susan Brockert, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00308) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from New Hampshire C.A. No. 1:03-532 Mary Lou Puls, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00304) (Text entry; no document attached.)
183
03/29/2004
NOTICE of filing by personal injury pltfs of proposed agenda for 4/7/04 status conference hearing
184
03/29/2004
CROSS NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take deposition of Wyeth by Videotape re: promotional/marketing/advertising or information communication to the public on the 30th and 31st days of March, 2004, beginning at 10:00 AM and 9:00 AM respectively, and continuing until completed (bsm) Modified on 04/08/2004
185
03/29/2004
CROSS NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take deposition of Wyeth by videotape re: promotion/marketing of hormone therapy drugs after July of 2002 on 30th and 31st days of March, 2004, beginning at 10:00 AM and 9:00 AM respectively, and continuing until completed (bsm) Modified on 04/08/2004
186
03/29/2004
CROSS NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take deposition of Wyeth by Videotape re: promotional/marketing/advertising of information communication to prescribing physicians on 30th and 31st days of March, 2004, beginning at 10:00 AM and 9:00 AM respectively, and continuing until completed (bsm) Modified on 04/08/2004
187
03/30/2004
MOTION by pltfs to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' first request for production - Part 1
188
03/31/2004
NOTICE of filing by pltfs a proposed agenda for 4/7/04 status conference hrg
189
03/31/2004
JOINT MOTION to approve fact sheet
190
03/31/2004
NOTICE by Wyeth of filing proposed agenda for 4/7/04 status conference
191
03/31/2004
MEMORANDUM in support of joint motion to approve fact sheet [189-1]
04/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. H03-2905 Hilda Thibodeaux v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00327) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. H03-2906 Patricia Cornelius, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00328) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. H03-2907 Gerri Adair, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00329) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. H03-2908 Nancy B. Smith v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00330) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. H03-2909 Fannie Jean Henry v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4: 04cv00331) (Text entry; no document attached.)
192
04/02/2004
MOTION by pltfs to abate the statute of limitations for personal injury cases &/or other alternatives
193
04/02/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to Wyeth's joint motion to approve fact sheet [189-1]
194
04/05/2004
REPLY by Wyeth Inc re joint motion to approve fact sheet [189-1]
195
04/05/2004
OPPOSITION by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' motion to abate the statute of limitations for personal injury cases [192-1]
196
04/05/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:04-1223 pending in the Central District of California, 3:03-2496 pending in the Southern District of California, 1:03-3690 and 1:04-184 pending in Maryland are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)(bsm) Modified on 04/07/2004
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv486 Maxine Linscomb, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00344) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv487 Diana Watson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00345) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv00576 Bobby Barnhart, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00346) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv643 Doris Gordon, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00347) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas. C.A. No. 1:03cv790 Deane Barrios, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00348) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv886 Ava Lee Anderson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00349) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:03cv1193 Carolyn Burnett, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00340) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:03cv1343 Margie Hill, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv000341) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:03cv1366 Deborah Fenner, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00342) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/06/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03cv00159 Kaye Spalding v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00352) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/06/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of TX C.A. No. 1:03cv00161 Sylvia Holwick, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00354) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/06/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of TX C.A. No. 1:03cv160 Kaethe F.E. Francis v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00353) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/06/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of TX C.A. No. 1:03cv161 Sylvia Holwick, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00354) (bsm) Modified on 04/16/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/07/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Status Conference w/lawyers; future conferences set for 9:00 AM 6/24/04; 7/26/04; 8/30/04; 9/27/04; 10/22/04 and 12/10/04; oral arguments set for motion to dismiss master complt at 9:00 AM on 6/23/04; oral arguments set on motion to compel at 9:00 AM on 6/24/04 (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
197
04/07/2004
CROSS NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take deposition of Wyeth by video-tape re Director of Sales Force Automation on 4/14/04 at 9:00 AM (bsm) Modified on 04/08/2004
198
04/07/2004
CROSS NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take deposition of Wyeth by video-tape re: corporate structure re: financing of publication of materials re: promotion/marketing of hormone therapy drugs after July 2002 re: promotional/marketing/advertising or informational communication to the public re: promotional/marketing/advertising or informational communication to prescribing physicians on 4/22/04 and 4/23/04 at 9:00 AM (bsm) Modified on 04/13/2004
199
04/07/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to limit the costs associated with the "core production" of documents by deft Wyeth; core documents are to be reviewed in a document depository; the document depository in Washington D.C. is to remain open and defts will make arrangements to have the depository open for outside normal business hours; deft Wyeth has offered to set up a second depository for review of documents in Little Rock, AR and pltfs have requested the second depository be in Houston, TX; the Pltfs' Steering Committee must approve of the second depository location and if there is no agreement, the Steering Committee must submit to the Court a location believed to better accomplish the disc goals as set out w/in 5 days of entry of this Order; pltfs will be able to acquire either electronic or hard copies of any document in the depository; charge for each document requested, in addition to normal shipping, handling, and CD production charges are as listed in this Order; these charges are subject to change on further order of the Court; in addition to the documents, deft Wyeth must provide pltfs a smaller objective index narrowed to the documents pltfs requested; pltfs will pay 25% of the total cost of the objective index (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 04/13/2004
200
04/08/2004
ORDER/SCHEDULE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE SETTINGS by Judge William R. Wilson; Status Conferences have been set before the Court on the following dates: Friday, June 25,2004 at 9:00 AM, Monday, July 26, 2004 at 9:00 AM, Monday, August 30, 2004 at 9:00 AM, Monday, September 27, 2004 at 9:00 AM, Friday, October 22, 2004 at 9:00 AM, Friday, December 10, 2004 at 9:00 AM; a hearing on the motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complaint [163-1] is scheduled 6/23/04 at 9:00 AM and a hearing on the motion to compel [187-1] at 9:00 on 6/24/04 (cc: all counsel)
201
04/13/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting joint motion to approve fact sheet [189-1]; consistent with the Cost Order of 4/7/04 re: Production of Core Documents, Wyeth will pay the amounts mentioned in this Order for copies of those documents requested from pltfs after inspection; pltfs whose cases have been transferred to this proceeding already will complete the Fact Sheet w/in 60 days; pltfs whose cases are transferred after the date of this Order will complete the Fact Sheet w/in 90 days after the Conditional Transfer Order becomes final; in re of pltf's motion to abate the statute of limitation for personal injury cases and/or other alternatives [192-1], pltfs will submit no later than 4/14/04 additional briefing and legal authority on a state-by-state basis regarding the effect of naming "John Doe" defts and the proposition that the Court has authority to "abate" the statute of limitations; Wyeth may respond by 4/21/04; Wyeth shall advise the Court and Pltfs' Lead Counsel by 4/14/04 of how may days it will take for Wyeth to provide the information described in its response to Request No. 1 of defts' response to pltfs' first request for production, part one, once it receives from Lead Counsel a list of pltfs' prescribing physicians; Wyeth will submit the names of nominees to the proposed Defts' Steering Committee, accompanied by their curriculum vitae, by 4/14/04 (cc: all counsel)
202
04/14/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Hearing before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 4/7/04 (bsm) Modified on 04/16/2004
203
04/14/2004
MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of motion to abate the statute of limitations for personal injury cases &/or other alternatives [192-1] with exhibits A-D attached (bsm) Modified on 04/15/2004
204
04/14/2004
SUBMISSION by Wyeth re: Defts Steering Committee [201-1]
205
04/15/2004
RESPONSE/SUBMISSION by Wyeth Inc re Identification of Sales Representatives [199-1]
206
04/15/2004
TRANSFER ORDER (MDL) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the cases listed in this Order are transferred to the Eastern District of AR and, with the consent of that court, assigned to The Honorable William R. Wilson. Jr. for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings; C.A. No. 1:03-6626 Carolyn Snorek v. Wyeth from the Northern District of IL and C.A. No. 1:03-1340 Jo E. Cook, et al v. Wyeth et al from the Eastern District of TX; the following cases are transferred from the Southern District of TX: C.A. No. 3:03-926 Brenda Caldwell et al v. Wyeth et al, C.A. No. 3:03-935 Sharon Cherry et al v. Wyeth et al, C.A. No. 4:03-3974 Diane Ada Johnson, et al v. Wyeth et al, C.A. No. 4:03-3975 Bettye Glenn, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-3976 Gloria Moore v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-3977 Dorothy M. Walston, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-3981 Gay Nell Clary v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4139 Thelma Fair, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4140 Suzanne Celeste Carpenter v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4372 Claire Ann Anderson, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4448 Thelma Marie Goodwin v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4694 Elizabeth Ann Mobley, et al v Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4871 Shirley Ann Hardy, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-4874 Jean Kelly, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:03-5162 Janita Lo v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 7:03-342 Corinne Mascola, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 04/19/2004
207
04/16/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to enforce cost Order re: location of second document depository
208
04/20/2004
CLASS EXPERT DESIGNATION of George F. Sawaya, M.D. by pltfs Manuela Favela, Janice Szabo and April Krueger
209
04/20/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' motion to abate the statute of limitations [192-1]
210
04/20/2004
MOTION by pltfs to enforce Wyeth's agreement re: Sales Representative Data, and motion/request for emergency telephone hearing with the Court on this issue
04/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of the original record from the Western District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03-345 Virginia Coppick v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00399) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv00345 Virginia Coppick, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00399) (Text entry; no document attached.)
211
04/21/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; the STAY of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-16" is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. No. 0:04-60036 and thus the action is transferred to the E/D of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before Judge Wilson (cc: all counsel) (lej) Modified on 04/23/2004
04/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 2:03cv7425FMC(MANx) Fabiana Moradkhani v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00404) (bsm) Modified on 04/26/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. 2:03cv7747DT(MANx) Patricia Cunningham, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00405) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of California C.A. No. 03-cv-2496R(AJB) April Krueger, v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00406) (Text entry; no document attached.)
212
04/23/2004
RESPONSE by Consumer Class Pltfs' position regarding pltfs' motion to enforce Wyeth's agreement re: Sales Representative Data [210-1]
213
04/27/2004
SECOND AMENDED NOTICE by pltfs of deposition of Wyeth by video-tape on 6/4/04 at 9:00 AM re: Premarin's fight to maintain patent status against the generics
214
04/27/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' motion to enforce Wyeth's agreement re: Sales Representative Data [210-1]
04/28/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Telephone conference w/parties; order to be entered (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
215
04/29/2004
ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF RESPONSES by Judge William R. Wilson that a telephone conference was held 4/28/04 and after hearing the arguments of the parties and reviewing the transcript, Court ruled that to compel the disc sought by pltfs would require an order allowing pre-complt disc and was beyond the agreement that Court understood Wyeth to offer at the hearing; accordingly, pltf's motion to enforce Wyeth's agreement is denied [210-1] [210-2] (cc: all counsel)
216
04/29/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to enforce costs order re: payment for copies of Wyeth documents
217
05/03/2004
PARTIAL RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to pltf's motion to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' first request for production - Part 1 [187-1]
218
05/03/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to extend time to respond to pltfs' motion to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' requests for production Nos. 1-4, and 12
05/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Central District of California C.A. No. 03-1223-DT(MANx) Sung Soo Joo v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00442) (Text entry; no document attached.)
219
05/04/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting deft's motion to extend time until 5/21/04 to respond to pltfs' motion to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' requests for production 1-4, and 12 [218-1] (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 05/07/2004
220
05/04/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions C.A. No. 8:04-304 pending in the District of Maryland, C.A. No. 4:03-4450 pending in the Southern District of Texas, C.A. No. 1:04-101 pending in the Eastern District of Wisconsin are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507 transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 04/27/2005
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3974 Diane Ada Johnson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00445) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK; Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. H03-3975 Bettye Glenn, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00446) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-3976 Gloria Moore v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00447) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No.H03-3977 Dorothy M. Watson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00448) (bsm) Modified on 05/07/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. H03-3981 Gay Nell Clary v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00449) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4139 Thelma Fair, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00450) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4140 Suzanne Celeste Carpenter v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00451) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4372 Claire A. Anderson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00452) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4448 Thelma Marie Goodwin v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00453) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4694 Elizabeth Ann Mobley, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00454) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4871 Shirley Ann Hardy, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00455) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Souther District of Texas C.A. No. H03-4874 Jean Kelly, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00456) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H03-5162 Janita Lo v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00457) (Text entry; no document attached.)
221
05/06/2004
MOTION by defts Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia & Upjohn and Greenstone Ltd to extend time to respond to pltf's first request for production
05/06/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Florida C.A. No. 0:04cv60036 Barbara Monty v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00464) (Text entry; no document attached.)
222
05/07/2004
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants by attys Jay Mayesh, Steven Glickstein, Liza Karsai and Lev Dassin
223
05/10/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to deft's motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complaint [163-1]
224
05/12/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to defts Pfizer, Pharmacia & Upjohn and Greenstone's motion to extend time to respond to pltf's first request for production [221-1]
225
05/14/2004
REPLY by pltfs to Wyeth's partial response to pltfs' motion to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' first request for production - Part 1 [187-1] (as to request number 15, 18, 19, 20 and 21) (bsm) Modified on 06/09/2004
05/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Wisconsin C.A. No. 04-C-101 Juanita Ness, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00501) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. SACV03-1736JVS(MLGx) Karen Erdman V. Wyeth Pharmaceutical, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00503) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. SACV03-1737AHS(ANx) Sally Hamilton v. Wyeth Pharmaceutical, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00504) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:03cv332 Hopper v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00502) (Text entry; no document attached.)
226
05/18/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 5:04-5071 and 6:04-6042 pending in the Western District of AR, 1:04-469 and 1:04-527 pending in Maryland, 5:04-207 pending in Western District of Oklahoma, 4:04-931 and 4:04-1052 pending in the Southern District of Texas are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2004
05/18/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the North District of Illinois C.A. No. 03cv06626 Carolyn Snorek v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00500) (Text entry; no document attached.)
227
05/19/2004
STANDING ORDER REGARDING COST AND PRODUCTION OF CORE DOCUMENTS by Judge William R. Wilson that parties are encourage to produce and exchange data in electronic form for the reasons set out herein; this Standing Order is limited to the costs and procedures associated with the production of "core documents" by defts, as defined herein; guidelines and procedures to facilitate document production are set out herein; the CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER between deft Wyeth and pltf entered on 9/22/03 is now extended to ALL DEFTS; pltf will be able to acquire either electronic or hard copies of any document in the depository and the charge for each document requested, in addition to normal shipping, handling, and CD production charge are as listed in this Order; charges are subject to change on further order of the Court; defts must provide pltfs with a smaller objective index narrowed to the documents pltfs requested; pltfs will pay 25% of the total cost of the objective index; guidelines for relief from this Order are as stated herein [207-1] (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2004
05/19/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. H-03-4450 Zedaker v. Pharmacia & Upjohn (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00509) (Text entry; no document attached.)
228
05/20/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting defts Pfizer, Pharmacia & Upjohn and Greenstone's motion to extend time to respond to pltf's first request for production [221-1]; defts must provide their response to pltf's first request for production of documents by 5:00 6/5/04 (cc: all counsel)(bsm) Modified on 05/27/2004
229
05/20/2004
MEMORANDUM by Consumer Class Pltfs supporting production of Wyeth's Sales representative data [187-1]
230
05/21/2004
WITHDRAWAL by Wyeth Inc of motions to enforce cost order [216-1] [207-1] (bsm) Modified on 05/21/2004
231
05/21/2004
OPPOSITION/ BRIEF by Wyeth Inc to pltf's motion to compel the production of Wyeth's databases [187-1] (bsm) Modified on 05/24/2004
232
05/25/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION filed by Wyeth re Defts' Steering Committee
233
05/26/2004
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia & Upjohn, and Greenstone Ltd; attorney Charles P. Goodell, Jr. and Richard M. Barnes
05/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from USDC of Maryland C.A. No. 8:04cv00304 Elaine Pasqualle et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00500) (Text entry; no document attached.)
234
05/28/2004
REPLY by Wyeth Inc to Consumer Class pltfs' memorandum supporting production of Wyeth's sales representative data [229-1]
235
05/28/2004
MOTION by pltfs to compel Wyeth to present 30(b)(6) witness(es) on regulatory issues
236
05/28/2004
MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of motion to compel Wyeth to present 30(b)(6) witness(es) on regulatory issues [235-1] with exhibits (filed in separate file) (bsm) Modified on 06/02/2004
237
06/01/2004
NOTICE by pltfs of filing of undertaking pursuant to this Court's Confidentiality Order (signed undertakings filed under seal) for incamera inspection only
238
06/01/2004
REPLY by pltfs to Wyeth's opposition to pltfs' motion to compel the production of Wyeth's databases [187-1] (FILED UNDER SEAL)
239
06/04/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson requesting the parties to submit by 5:00 6/15/04 information for the Judge to consider in determining whether any discovery decision could substantially affect a like amount of stock in Pfizer (even though his wife has divested); copy of 6/3/04 letter from Judge Osteen, Chair of the Committee on Codes of Conduct, attached to this Order (cc: all counsel)
240
06/07/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; the STAY of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-18" is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. No. 2:04-1920 Arnold Klein, et al v Wyeth, et al pending in the Central District of CA, and the action is transferred to the Eastern District of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings before Judge William R. Wilson, Jr. (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 06/09/2004
06/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Western District of AR C.A. No. 04-6042 Pamela Kuhn v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00555) (bsm) Modified on 07/27/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
241
06/08/2004
OPPOSITION by Wyeth Inc to motion to compel Wyeth to present 30(b)(6) witness(es) on regulatory issues [235-1] (bsm) Modified on 06/22/2004
242
06/08/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members, Defts Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; members and counsel are to submit a list of topics to be on the agenda for the 6/25/04 hearing by 6/17/04; motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complt and motion to compel will be covered the two days prior to the hearing (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 06/10/2004
06/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 04-931 Ninfa Gutierrez v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00562) (bsm) Modified on 07/27/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 04-1052 Mariana Carerra, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00563) (Text entry; no document attached.)
243
06/09/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:04-1673 and 2:04-2034 pending in the Central District of California and 6:04-331 pending in the Middle District of Florida are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
244
06/10/2004
MOTION by Consumer Class Plaintiffs for continuance of the briefing and hearing schedule regarding class certification (bsm) Modified on 06/14/2004
245
06/10/2004
MEMORANDUM by Consumer Class Plaintiffs in support of motion for continuance of the briefing and hearing schedule regarding class certification [244-1] (bsm) Modified on 06/14/2004
246
06/10/2004
REPLY by pltfs to Wyeth's opposition to motion to compel Wyeth to present 30(b)(6) witness(es) on regulatory issues [235-1]
247
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of deft Wyeth on 8/17/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
248
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of deft Wyeth on 7/29/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
249
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiff's of taking deposition of Wyeth on 7/19/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6)
250
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Wyeth on 8/2/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
251
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Wyeth on 8/4/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
252
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Wyeth on 8/9/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6)
253
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Wyeth on 8/11/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
254
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Wyeth on 7/27/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
255
06/10/2004
NOTICE by Class Plaintiffs of taking deposition of Wyeth on 7/21/04 at 9:00 AM pursuant to FRCP 30 (b)(6)
256
06/10/2004
RESPONSE/SUR-REPLY by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' motion to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' first request for production - Part 1 [187-1]
257
06/10/2004
CONTINGENT MOTION by Wyeth for protective order
258
06/10/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion for protective order [257-1]
259
06/10/2004
MOTION by pltfs to compel production of documents from Pfizer
260
06/10/2004
MEMORANDUM by pltfs in support of motion to compel production of documents from Pfizer [259-1]
261
06/10/2004
REPLY by Wyeth Inc re motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complaint [163-1]
262
06/14/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting pltf's motion for continuance of the briefing and hearing schedule regarding class certification from 7/14/04 to 1/7/05 [244-1] (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 06/15/2004
263
06/14/2004
RESPONSE by Personal Injury Plaintiffs to Letter/Order by filing Proposed Agenda for June 23, 24 and 25, 2004 Hearing [242-1]
06/14/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Oklahoma C.A. No. 5:04-207 Janet K. Fish v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00572) (Text entry; no document attached.)
264
06/15/2004
NOTICE by Consumer Class Pltfs of Erratum in their memorandum supporting motion for continuance of briefing and hearing scheduled for class certification
265
06/15/2004
BRIEF by pltfs opposing recusal [239-1]
266
06/15/2004
SUBMISSION BRIEF filed by Wyeth Inc re Order of 6/4/04 [239-1]
267
06/15/2004
RESPONSE by Pfizer Inc and Pharmacia defts to Court's 6/4/04 Order [239-1]
268
06/16/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to Consumer Class Plaintiffs' motion for continuance of the briefing and hearing schedule regarding class certification
269
06/16/2004
STATEMENT IN RESPONSE by pltfs to the Court's Order re recusal [239-1]
270
06/16/2004
SUR-REPLY by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' motion to compel the production of Wyeth's databases [238-1]
271
06/17/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to order by filing Proposed Agenda for the 6/25/04 Hearing [242-1]
272
06/18/2004
SURREPLY by Consumer Class Plaintiffs opposing Wyeth's motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complt [261-1] [163-1]
06/18/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Western District of Texas C.A. No. SA 03 CA 1090-OG Minerva Hernandez v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00587) (Text entry; no document attached.)
273
06/21/2004
OPPOSITION by pltfs to Wyeth's "Contingent" motion for a protective order [257-1]
274
06/22/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-20) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that C.A. No. 4:03-1473 pending in the North District of Texas is transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
275
06/22/2004
AFFIDAVIT of Keith L. Altman regarding motion to compel production of documents pursuant to pltfs' first request for production - Part 1 [187-1] (bsm) Modified on 06/28/2004
06/23/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Hearing before Judge Wilson re pending motion to dismiss master complt; motion denied; order to follow (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
276
06/23/2004
OPPOSITION by defts Pharmacia & Upjohn, Greenstone Ltd, Pharmacia Corp and Pfizer Inc to pltfs' motion to compel production of documents [259-1] (bsm) Modified on 06/28/2004
277
06/23/2004
SUBMISSION by Barr Laboratories and Duramed Inc regarding Order of 6/4/04 [239-1] (bsm) Modified on 06/28/2004
06/24/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Hearing before Judge Wilson on Motion to Compel; order to be entered (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
278
06/24/2004
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by Kenny Shinyoung Chang, Deng-Kai Chen, Geneviev Salmingo and Laura Coombe and Manuel Perez, paralegals for pltf, in Manuela Favela v. Wyeth, et al [27-1] (bsm) Modified on 06/28/2004
279
06/28/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson denying pltfs' motion to abate the statute of limitations for personal injury cases &/or other alternatives [192-1] (cc: all counsel)
280
06/28/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson denying pltfs' motion to compel Wyeth to present 30(b)(6) witness(es) on regulatory issues [235-1]; parties have informed Court that many of their issues had been resolved in a previous meet and confer and deft Wyeth is ordered to provide what it agreed upon; if pltfs believe that deft Wyeth has failed to comply with this Order, it should file a specific motion for reconsideration (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/01/2004
281
06/28/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson denying pltfs' motion to compel production of documents from Pfizer [259-1]; parties have informed Court that many of their issues have been resolved in a previous meet and confer and deft Pfizer is ordered to provide what it agreed upon; if pltfs believe that deft Pfizer has failed to comply with this Order, it should file a specific motion for reconsideration (cc: all counsel)
07/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. CV04-1673 DT(MAN) Soong Hee Kim v. Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00650) (bsm) Modified on 07/14/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/07/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California C.A. No. CV04-2034 DT (MAN) Nancy Kohls v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00649) (Text entry; no document attached.)
282
07/08/2004
LETTER to court from Wyeth Inc in regard to pltf's motion to compel production of documents [187-1]
283
07/08/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-21) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that action C.A. No. 3:04-363 Deguzman v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Southern District of California, C.A. No. 5:04-156 Hansen, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Middle District of Florida, C.A. No. 3:04-137 Ballard, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Northern District of Florida, C.A. No. 4:04-61 Castsro v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-62 Groover v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-64 Love v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-65 Pfiefer v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-76 Penfield v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Southern District of Georgia, C.A. No. 1:04-2760 Mikulec v. Pfizer, et al pending in the Northern District of Illinois, C.A. No. 1:04-10916 Levine, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in Massachusetts, C.A. No. 1:04-1103 Hettleman, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-1131 Harding, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-1340 Ayers, et al, v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-1418 Nyberg v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 8:04-1193 Wisneski, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in Maryland, C.A. No. 0:04-2072 Prigge v. Wyeth, et al pending in Minnesota, C.A. No. 2:04-156 Andrus, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-188 Wedgeworth v. Wyeth, et al pending in Southern Mississippi, C.A. No. 1:04-941 Mesojedec v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-948 McIntyre v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-952 Cocuzza, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-956 Stevens, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-957 Miller v Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-959 St. John-Goodrich, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-960 Steadman, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-961 Brown, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-965 Marks, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-967 Marsho, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-970 Meadows v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7267 Taulker, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7269 Zimmerman v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7271 Campbell, et al, V. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7299 Lee, et al, v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7300 Clark-Buchs, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-922 Daff, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-937 Maxwell, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-940 Wakeen, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-942 Demetriades, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-947 Spinelli, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-955 MacLam, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-962 Milburn et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-964 Davis v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Northern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 1:04-330 Wheeler, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-341 Wilson v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-369 Warner v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-370 Plesset v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-372 Downing, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-373 Neal v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-374 Desper, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-379 McCracken, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-383 Weidner v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-406 Reese v. Wyeth, et al pending in the Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 3:04-592 Ferguson, et al V. Greenstone, et al pending in Oregon, C.A. 1:04-66 Trujillo-Gray v. Wyeth, el al, C.A. No. 1:04-72 Gibson v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-77 Hart v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-79 Davies v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-80 Okuda v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-82 Thompson v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-420 Wilson v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-466 Turner v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-474 Anderson v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-489 Lund v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-490 Gallegos v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-498 Dillon v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-499 Garduno v. Wyeth, et al pending in Utah, C.A. No. 2:04-435 Michael, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al pending in the Southern District of West Virginia as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (bsm) Modified on 07/13/2004
284
07/09/2004
SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE by pltfs to venue for claims brought by out-of-state pltfs
285
07/12/2004
MOTION by defts Pharmacia & Upjohn, Greenstone Ltd, Pharmacia Corp and Pfizer Inc for relief from the superceding preservation of data directive regarding the preservation of back-up-tapes (bsm) Modified on 07/14/2004
286
07/13/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to amend Order No. 1 - Practice and Procedure
287
07/13/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to extend time to answer HT complts filed in this judicial district
288
07/14/2004
LETTER to court from Wyeth Inc with revised version of the July 8 letter with several estimates re-calculated using the $128 per hour rate to clarify the billing rate
07/14/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Oregon C.A. No. 3:04cv00592 Kerry Ferguson et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00677) (Text entry; no document attached.)
289
07/20/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members, Defts Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel; topics to be submitted by 7/22/04 for the agenda at the 7/26/04 hearing (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/23/2004
290
07/20/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to Order by filing personal injury proposed agenda for 7/26/04 hearing [289-1]
291
07/20/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing (motion to dismiss Master Complt) before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 6/23/04
292
07/20/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing (motions to compel) before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 6/24/04
293
07/20/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing and Status Conference before The Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. on 6/25/04
294
07/21/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members, Defts' Steering Committee, Lead and Liaison Counsel; be prepared to address Court on 7/26/04 with specific authority, as to what authority Court may have to hear cases filed directly in AR by citizens of other states; fax any cases on this and to opposing counsel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/22/2004
295
07/22/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting in part and denying in part, deft's motion to dismiss Master Class Action Complaint [163-1]; motion is granted regarding Counts 4-7, to the extent that they request monetary relief for moneys spent on Prempro and are dismissed as to that requested relief; however, the rest of Counts 4-7 are not dismissed and remain to be litigated; motion to dismiss is granted as to Iowa in Count 2 of the complt; deft's motion to dismiss is denied as to all other sections of pltf's Master Class Action Complt (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 07/26/2004
296
07/22/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth to order by filing Proposed Agenda for 7/26/04 Hearing [289-1]
297
07/22/2004
RESPONSE by Consumer Class Pltfs' to Order by filing Proposed Agenda for 7/26/04 Hearing [289-1]
298
07/22/2004
NOTICE by pltfs of filing joint submission of (Proposed) Order regarding expert disclosure and class certification briefing schedule
299
07/22/2004
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Novartis Corp; attorneys Beth Deere and Clayborne S. Stone
300
07/23/2004
SUBMISSION by Novartis Corp in response to the Court's requests for briefing on issues related to multi-pltf actions involving pltfs who are citizens of non-forum states [294-1] (bsm) Modified on 07/29/2004
301
07/23/2004
SUBMISSION by Wyeth Inc re why the claims of non-AR pltfs are not properly brought in this Court [294-1]
07/26/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Status Hearing before Judge Wilson; order to be entered re dates for discovery / class cert hearing (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
302
07/26/2004
MOTION by pltfs to withdraw attorney Brian J. Madden, and to substitute attorney Patrick J. Stueve and Todd E. Hilton in place of Brian J. Madden
303
07/26/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that joint submission of (Proposed) Order regarding Expert Disclosure and Class Certification Briefing Schedule is granted; accordingly, PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 1 is amended to include the schedule as listed in this Order for expert disclosure and briefs relating to class certification (cc: all counsel)
304
07/26/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION by Wyeth Inc re: estimated costs of database redaction
305
07/27/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson denying defts Pfizer and Pharmacia's motion for relief from Court's Preservation Order [285-1]; Pfizer and Pharmacia have sent a company-wide email communication reminding employees to preserve all documents concerning hormone replacement therapy products and will publish a reminder of the litigation hold as to all hormone replacement therapy products quarterly in an existing publication disseminated to all employees; Pfizer and Pharmacia will preserve all backup tapes existing as of the date of this Order, but may resume normal rotation schedules of backup tapes upon entry of this Order (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 08/02/2004
306
07/27/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting motion for attorney Brian J. Madden to withdraw as co-lead counsel of record for pltfs [302-1]; pltfs assert that a new co-lead counsel is unnecessary and assert that Patrick J. Stueve and Todd E. Hilton be placed, instead, on Pltfs' Steering Committee [302-2] (cc: all counsel)
07/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Utah C.A. No. 2:04cv498 TC, Julie Dillon V. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00716) (bsm) Modified on 03/01/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. No. 2:04cv489 TC, Lund V. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00717) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/28/2004
REMARK; Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. No. 1:04cv77TC Hart v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00718) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas (Fort Worth) C.A. No. 4:03cv01473 Carolyn Johnson, et al, Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00719) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/29/2004
UTILITY EVENT: Add attorney Patrick Stueve for Prempro Products (Text entry; no document attached.)
307
07/29/2004
MOTION by pltfs to withdraw attorney Jan P. Helder, and to substitute attorney Patrick J. Stueve and Todd E. Hilton in place of Jan P. Helder Jr. and appointing to the Pltfs' Steering Committee
07/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. NO. 2:04cv420TS Wilson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00724) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Florida Pensacola Division C.A. No. 3:04cv137MCR/MD Nannie Ballard, et al vs. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00729) (bsm) Modified on 08/27/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi, C.A. No. 2:04cv156BN, Andrus, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00731) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi, C.A. No. 2:04cv188BN, Wedgeworth v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00732) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia, C.A. No. CV404-061 Elfredo Castro v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00748) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District Of Utah, C.A. No. 1:04-cv-80-DAK, Toshiko Okuda v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00749) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah, C.A. No. 1:04-cv-79DAK, Ramona C. Davies v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00750) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia Savannah Division C.A. No. cv404-64 Jan Love v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00744) (bsm) Modified on 08/13/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia Savannah Division C.A. No. 04cv65 Donna Pfiefer v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00743) (bsm) Modified on 08/27/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia Savannah Division C.A. No. 404-76 Lanora Penfield v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00745) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia C.A. No. 404-062 Carole Groover v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00754) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois Eastern Division C.A. No. 04cv2760 Mikulec v. Pfizer, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00755) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-2072JRT/JSM Rochelle Prigge v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00756) (Text entry; no document attached.)
308
08/04/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting pltfs' motion to withdraw attorney Jan P. Helder as co-lead counsel of record [307-1]; pltfs assert that a new co-lead counsel is unnecessary and assert that Mr. Patrick Stueve's and Mr. Todd E. Hilton's placement on Pltfs' Steering Committee will suffice as substitution of Mr. Helder [307-2] (cc: all counsel)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. No. 2:04cv474PGC Anderson v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00760) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. No. 1:04cv66PGC Trujillo-Gray v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00759) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. No. 1:04cv82DB Thompson v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00758) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of West Virginia C.A. No. 2:04-0435 Carolyn Michael, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00761) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 2:04cv00372JLG-TPK Maryann Downing, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00766) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 2:04cv0369 Mary Glenda Warner v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00764) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 2:04cv0383 Roberta Weidner v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00767) (Text entry; no document attached.)
309
08/05/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions C.A. No. 3:04-857 Morin v. Wyeth, et al, pending in DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT, C.A. No. 1:04-797 Tropea, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, C.A. Nos. 4:04-83 Taylor v. Wyeth, et al, 4:04-93 Mead v. Wyeth, et al, 4:04-94 Burton v. Wyeth, et al, pending in the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, C.A. No. 2:04-99 Wells, et al v Wyeth, et al, pending in the EASTERN DISTRICT OF KENTUCKY, C.A. Nos. C.A. 0:04-2962 Nicholas v. Pharmacia & Upjohn, et al, C.A. 0:04-2965 Harrison v. Pharmacia & Upjohn, et al pending in DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA, C.A. No. 1:04-912 Merk, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-936 Dodeja, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-944 Bryant, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-949 Barnett, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-950 Slitor, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-951 Garry, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-953 Damron, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-958 Flannary, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-963 Taulbee, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-971 Minnear, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-973 Norman, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-987 Braden v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-988 Kane, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No 1:04-990 Moncease-Rush, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-997 Garfat, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-998 Pernell, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7270 Dockery, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-939 Livingston, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-946 William v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-968 Booker v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No.4:04-969 Wieland v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-938 Kutz v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-943 Esakov, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-945 Obradovich, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-966 Dunford, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-989 Bruner, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-993 Ciarrochi v. Wyeth, et al pending in the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, C.A. No. 1:04-342 Glier, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-343 Ross, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 04-358 Godfrey, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-359 McCormick, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-392 Boyer, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-400 Yeauger v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-401 Grimes, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-407 Guarrieri, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-426 Dombroski v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-514 Albright, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No.3:04-166 Hoag, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-167 Woods v. Wyeth, et, C.A. No. 3:04-168 Cox v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-169 Bowman, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-170 Gaver, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, C.A. No. 2:04-1300 Chandler, et al v. Greenstone, et al pending in the WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON, C.A. No. 1:04-412 Naumowicz, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in the EASTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN as part of MDL Docket No. 1507: transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
310
08/09/2004
MOTION by Wyeth to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 2
311
08/09/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 2 [310-1]
312
08/10/2004
MOTION by pltfs to compel Wyeth to amend its "privilege log" (FILED IN SEPARATE FOLDER) (bsm) Modified on 08/11/2004
313
08/12/2004
ADDENDUM/SUBMISSION filed by Wyeth Inc re: motion to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 2 (bsm) Modified on 08/13/2004
314
08/13/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth to the Court's request on 7/26/04 of the costs that will be incurred if the Court grants pltfs' motion to compel information from Wyeth's SalesWorks, LeapFrog, Magic, Madira, and VSB databases pursuant to Requests for Production Nos. 1, 3 and 4
315
08/16/2004
NOTICE by PERSONAL INJURY PLTFS' of filing proposed agenda for 8/30/04 hrg
08/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Wisconsin C.A. No. 04-C-412 Evelyn Naumowicz v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv805) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of Illinois C.A. No. 04-1173 Strode v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv806) (Text entry; no document attached.)
316
08/18/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions C.A No. 2:04-1281 Janet Alexander, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA, C.A. No. 1:04-5888 Helen Angle, et al v Wyeth, et al, pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, C.A. No. 3:04-2170 Myra F. Grisso, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, C.A. No. 2:04-169 Jane Lapour v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al pending in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA, C.A. No. 1:04-1845 Edith J. Day v. Wyeth, Inc., et al pending in DISTRICT OF MARYLAND, C.A. Nos. 0:04-2964 Marie F. Sloat v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al, C.A. 0:04-2966 Jo Ann V. Galati, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al, C.A. 0:04-2967 Helen Ruth Byrne, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al, C.A. 0:04-2999 Joan Galantini v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. 0:04-3000 Nancy J. Keith, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. 0:04-3003 Ellen Mulcahy, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al, C.A. 0:04-3070 Debra Valente, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A. 0:04-3071 Cheryl Klumpe, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A. 0:04-3073 Katherine Stevens, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A. 0:04:3074 Doris Brinkley v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A 0:04-3075 Mary Shutt, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A. 0:04-3076 Mary Hendrix, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al pending in DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA, C.A. No. 1:04-1133 Judith S. Strauss v. Wyeth, Inc., et al pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, C.A. No. 4:04-501 Candace Bosworth, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OKLAHOMA, C.A. Nos. 2:04-231 Patricia Watson, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. 5:04-145 Mary Connally, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS as part of MDL Docket No. 1507: transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (lej) Modified on 09/17/2004
317
08/19/2004
OPPOSITION by Prempro Products to motion to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 2 [310-1]
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv973 Leona Fay Norman, et al v Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv852) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv988 Mary Ann Kane, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv853) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia C.A. No. CV404-83 Betty Taylor v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv854) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia C.A. No. CV404-93 Veronica G. Mead v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv855) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Georgia C.A. No. CV404-94 June A. Burton v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv856) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv912 Rosanna V. Merk, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv857) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv936 Nancy Dodeja, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv858) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv944 Pamela S. Bryant, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv859) (rjh) Modified on 08/25/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv949 Diane M. Barnett, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv860) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv950 Nancy E. Slitor, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv861) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv951 Joanna H. Garry, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv862) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv953 Bette A. Damron, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv863) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv958 Carol Flannary, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv864) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv963 Mary Ruth Taulbee, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv865) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv971 Geraldine Minnear, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv866) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv987 Bonnie Jo Braden, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv867) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04cv358 Nola Godfrey v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv873) (Text entry; no document attached.)
318
08/25/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference on 7/26/04 before The Honorable Judge William R. Wilson, Jr.
319
08/26/2004
RESPONSE by Wyeth Inc to motion to compel Wyeth to amend its "privilege log" [312-1]
320
08/26/2004
NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of filing of proposed agenda for August 30 Hearing
321
08/26/2004
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Solvay Inc; attorneys Michael L. Hardy, James D. Robenalt, Brian A. Troyer and Robert F. Ware
322
08/27/2004
OPPOSITION by Personal Injury Plaintiffs to motion for appointment of pltfs' Steering Committee filed by Charles Houssiere (bsm) Modified on 09/01/2004
323
08/27/2004
REPLY by pltfs to Wyeth's response to motion to compel Wyeth to amend its "privilege log" [312-1]
324
08/27/2004
NOTICE by Consumer Class Pltfs of Proposed Agenda for 8/30/04 Hearings
325
08/27/2004
MOTION by Consumer Class Plaintiffs to compel production of documents (bsm) Modified on 09/02/2004
326
08/30/2004
JOINER by Class Plaintiffs in opposition to motion for appointment to pltfs' Steering Committee filed by Charles Houssiere (bsm) Modified on 09/01/2004
08/30/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Status Conference w/parties; Status Conference set 9/27/04 is canceled next Status Conference is set for 10/21/04 at 9:00 AM (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, C.A. No. 3:04cv166 Norma K. Hoag, et al v. Wyeth, Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00904) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, C.A. No. 3:04cv167 Olivia R. Woods, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00905) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, Western Division C.A. No. 3:04cv170 Bonnie Gaver, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00907) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, Western Division C.A. No. 3:04cv169 Ocie Bowman v. Wyeth, Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;04cv00906) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division 1:03cv1339 Vera Boyett, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00908) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division, C.A. No. 1:03cv1367 Shirley Neal, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00909) (Text entry; no document attached.)
327
08/31/2004
MOTION by mov Charles R Houssiere III for appointment to Pltfs' Steering Committee
328
08/31/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:04-1341 pending in Arizona, 3:04-2040 pending in the Northern District of California, 1:04-1173 pending in the Central District of Illinois, 1:04-4312 pending in the Northern District of Illinois, 2:04-175 pending in the Southern District of Indiana, 0:04-3083 pending in the Minnesota, 5:04-446 pending in the Eastern District of North Carolina, 8:04-196 pending in Nebraska and 3:04-211 pending in the Southern District of Ohio are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 09/28/2004
329
08/31/2004
ORDER SEVERING AND TRANSFERRING MULTI-PLAINTIFF SUITS by Judge William R. Wilson: complts of each individual pltf in the multi-pltf HRT cases listed in the attach Appendix A of this Order, are to be severed for reason set forth in this Order in accordance with FRCP 21; in order to have a case file created, each pltf must w/in 10 days of the date of this Order, pay the $150.00 civil filing fee for each severed case and should be accompanied with a letter with specifications as listed in this Order; if pltf fails to pay the filing fee, pltf's claims will be dismissed w/out prej for failure to prosecute; Clerk is directed to implement the procedures in this Order upon receipt of the filing fee payment; following the creation of the individual case, Court will enter an Order transferring venue of the case, under 1404, to the appropriate district court and pltfs must provide the Court with the information listed in this Order w/in 20 days of receiving their new case number; failure to provide the Court with this information will result in dismissal of the case w/out prej; this Order will apply to all future, similar cases that may be filed in or transferred by the MDL panel to this Court; if Court has failed to list a case in Appendix A in which the Order should apply, parties should inform Court of this oversight; Clerk is directed to send contemporaneous copies of these severance/transfer orders to the MDL panel to allow, to the extent possible, fast-tracking of 1407 transfers of these cases back to MDL 1507 for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings; counsel is reminded of their obligations under MDL Panel Rule 7.5(e) and directed to promptly notify the MDL panel of the new case number designated to the case in the receiving district; it is also ordered that all attys filing related cases in the future to avoid filing complts joining unrelated individuals as parties-pltf; pltfs' counsel are admonished to keep in mind the objectives of 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) in determining where future hormone therapy cases subject to MDL 1507 jurisdiction should be filed and all attys and the Clerk of the Court must comply with the procedures in this Order, if they apply to any future-filed case (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 09/02/2004
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Washington, C.A. No. 04-1300RSL, Chandler v. Greenstone Ltd (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00915) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Massachusetts, C.A. No. 04-10916EFH, Levine v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00916) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-2964, Marie F. Sloat v. Pharmacia & Upjohn, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00917) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-2966, Jo Ann V. Galati, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00919) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-2967, Helen Ruth Byrne, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00920) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-2999, Joan Galantini v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00921) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-3000, Nancy J. Keith, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00922) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. NO. 0:04-3003, Ellen Mulcahy, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00928) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. NO. 0:04-3070, Debra Valente, et al v. Wyeth, Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00923) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. NO. 0-04-3071, Cheryl Klumpe, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00924) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-3073, Katherine Stevens, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV00918) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-3074, Doris Brinkley v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00925) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 0:04-3075, Mary Shutt, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00926) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 4:04-3076, Mary Hendrix, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00927) (Text entry; no document attached.)
330
09/01/2004
SUBMISSION filed by Wyeth Inc re adding Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc. to Defts' Steering Committee
331
09/02/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that according to the 8/25/04 letter to Court from Ms. Kathleen M. Dailey, a member of the Pltfs' Steering Committee, Ms. Dailey has been appointed as a Circuit Court Judge in Oregon and has resigned from her position on the Steering Committee (cc: all counsel)
09/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas, Marshall Division, C.A. No. 2:04-231, Watson, et al, v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00938) (Text entry; no document attached.)
332
09/08/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson after reviewing the resume submitted, Mr. Brian A. Troyer is added to the Defts' Steering Committee (cc: all counsel)
09/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 1:04-111, Neal, et al v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00958) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Indiana, C.A. No. 2:04-169 Lapour v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00957) (bsm) Modified on 09/17/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 1:04-01133-SO, Judith S. Strauss v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00956) (Text entry; no document attached.)
333
09/09/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson granting Wyeth's motion to amend Practice and Procedure Order No. 2 [310-1]; paragraph 8 of Practice and Procedure Order No. 2 is amended as shown in this Order 18 (cc: all counsel)
334
09/09/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that based on agreements by the parties, all request for production of documents have been withdrawn except for the request for production No. 1 and it is granted [187-1]; Wyeth is ordered to produce the sales representative databases ("Salesworks/LeapFrog") to the extent defined in the "Michael Deale report"; Court further orders that pltfs will pay $10,800 to Wyeth and the parties are to meet and confer on a schedule of production and report to Court by 9/17/04; this Order is w/out prej to the parties seeking additional production or other relief; based on this Order, Wyeth's motion for protective order is denied as moot [257-1] (cc: all counsel)
335
09/09/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions C.A. No. 6:04-1509 Adams, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, pending in the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, C.A. No. 1:04-456 Simmons v. Wyeth, et al, pending in the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, C.A. No. 2:04-4742 Barbour, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-40344 Nading v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, pending in the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA, C.A. No. 1:04-4497 Dikselis, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-4499 Michalski v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 104-4501 Goldrich v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-4503 Thompson, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS, C.A. No. 3:04-444 Peters v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-45 Sliger v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-46 Ristau v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, pending in the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA, C.A. No. 8:04-2082 Main, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in the MARYLAND, 0:04-3002 Mohr, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3072 Harvill v. Wyeth, et al, 0:04-3091 Baird v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3092 Schrempp, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3093 Schwoegler, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3094 Amalong v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3095 Baker, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No.0:04-3096 Harman, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3100 Floyd v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3101 Tsiavos, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3106 Straube, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. O:04-3107 Fisher v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3108 Leibelt, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3110 Adkins, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3111 Meredith, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3120 Faro, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3121 Lopez, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. NO. 0:04-3122 Lee v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3123 Fisch v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3124 Trinnaman v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3137 Ryan, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3139 Pruitt, v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al, C.A. NO. 0:04-3140 Kalergis, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3141 Mercieca, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3146 McCormick, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3148 Warren, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3155 McRae v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3156 DuFour v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3157 Burke v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3164 Long v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3165 Gatrell v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3166 Miller, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3167 Lefkowitz, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0-04-3168 Smith v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3169 Mallett, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3170 Harris v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3171 Close v. Wyeth, et al, pending in MINNESOTA, C.A. No. 1:04-1247 Hohlakis, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-1253 Fankboner, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7394 Sperber, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-7395 Basinger v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 5:04-1250 Briggs v. Wyeth, et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, C.A. No. 2:04-569 Markovich, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-570 Hapney v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-237 Hollan, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-238 Blue, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in SOUTHERN OHIO, C.A. No. 6:04-280 Stuart, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF OKLAHOMA, C.A. No. 4:04-543 Parks, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OKLAHOMA, C.A. No. 1:04-417 Carroll, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-418 Contreras v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-419 Fleck, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-420 Hoffpauir v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-421 Holder, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-422 Kennedy, et al, v. Wyeth, et al, 6:04-313 Smith, et al, v. Wyeth, et al, pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, C.A. No. 1:04-182 Ammons, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-165 James v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-1443 Weatherford v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-1445 Faulkner, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-1446 Locke, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 3:04-1450 Jenkins, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-501 Vautrain v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-507 Allen, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, C.A. No. 4:04-2427 Mackin v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-2428 Aranda v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-2552 Foster, et al, v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 4:04-2553 Helms, et al v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:04-2624 Webb, et al v. Wyeth, C.A. No. 4:04-2625 Knighten, et al v. Wyeth, pending in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, C.A. No. 2:04-672 Blue, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-673 Wallace, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF WEST VIRGINIA as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 09/14/2004
336
09/10/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson re: EXPERT DISCLOSURE SCHEDULING: that during the MDL Status Conference conducted on 8/30/04, the Class Pltfs requested for expert designation and disclosure of expert reports and the request is granted; the amended schedule in regard to class certification is as listed - pltfs disclose experts, if any, by 9/14/04; Wyeth discloses experts, if any, by 11/9/04; pltfs disclose rebuttal experts, if any, by 11/30/04 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 09/14/2004
09/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of North Carolina, C.A. No. 5:04-446-FL(1), Patricia Bonnano, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00965) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of California, C.A. No. 04:02040, Susan Mars v. Duramed Pharmaceuticals (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00964) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Indiana, C.A. No. 2:04-175, Nancy Buttner, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00969) (Text entry; no document attached.)
337
09/15/2004
WITHDRAWAL by Charles R Houssiere III of motion for appointment to Pltfs' Steering Committee [327-1]
338
09/15/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions C.A. No. 6:04-1722 Bradley v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al, pending in the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, C.A. No. 2:04-4743 Aitchison, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, C.A. No. 5:04-2864, Charnofsky, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, C.A. No. 1:04-4545, Peterson, et al v. Wyeth, Inc, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-4546 Dean V. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A. NO. 1:04-4555 Taasaas, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS, C.A. No. 2:04-186, Spurr V. Wyeth, Inc., pending in the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA, C.A. No. 2:04-2312 Stephenson, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in KANSAS, C.A. No. 3:04-500, Jackson v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, pending in the MIDDLE DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA, C.A. No. 0:04-3136, Schuler, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3138 Quemuel v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3361 Bell v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3362 Canavan, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3364 Davenport, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in MINNESOTA, C.A. No. 1:04-2880, Colucci v. Wyeth, et al, pending in the EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, C.A. NO. 1:04-527, Armitage, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in WESTERN OF NEW YORK, C.A. No. 1:04-356, Havens, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 1:04-357, Carter v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, pending in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, C.A. No. 2:04-412, Simmons v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA as part of MDL Docket NO. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the thereof and if any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel /win this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)(bsm) Modified on 09/17/2004
339
09/17/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation: the stay of the Panels' Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-25" is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. No. 2:04-1951 Stephanie Hall, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, pending in the Eastern District of Louisiana; this action is transferred to the Eastern District of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. (cc: all counsel)
340
09/17/2004
NOTICE by pltfs of filing of Status Report on Schedule for Wyeth's Production of Sales Force Databases and request for Order setting a production schedule
341
09/17/2004
LETTER to court from counsel from Wyeth Inc providing a proposed schedule, as ordered in the 9/9/04 Order, for production of information from Wyeth's SalesWorks, LeapFrog, Magic, Madira and VSB databases
09/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:03-00926, Sharon Cherry v. Wyeth, Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00981) (bsm) Modified on 09/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:03-00935, Brenda Caldwell v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00982) (Text entry; no document attached.)
342
09/20/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions C.A. No. 2:04-5038 Aragon, et al v. Wyeth Inc et al, pending in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CA, C.A. No. 1:03-6191 Barlow, et al v. Wyeth, et al, pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, C.A. No. 1:04-1434, Pennington, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO and C.A. No. 5:04-1435, Biniak, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel (cc: all counsel)
343
09/20/2004
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Barr Pharmaceuticals, Duramed Inc, and Barr Laboratories; attorneys Matthew V. Brammer and Gina M. Saelinger
344
09/20/2004
UNDERTAKING pursuant to Confidentiality Order by pltfs [27-1] (all attachments are filed UNDER SEAL for in camera inspection only) (bsm) Modified on 09/22/2004
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of CA, C.A. No. 04-02170 FMS, Myra F. Grisso v. Pharmacia & Upjohn (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV01002) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Oklahoma, C.A. No. 5:04-280-P, Carol Stuart, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01001) (bsm) Modified on 09/23/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Oklahoma, C.A. No. 4:543-H(J), Artie Parks, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01003) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:04-1450-L, Jenkins V. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00996) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, C.A. No. 3:04-0211, Kathleen K. Stevens v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00997) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:04-1446-G, Locke, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00999) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 2:04-0165-J, Sara James v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV01000) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas, C.A. No. 6:04cv313, Lovella Smith, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv00998) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of West Virginia, C.A. No. 2:04-0673, Karen J. Wallace, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01004) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:04-1443-N Weatherford v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01008) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 4:04-507-Y, Allen, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV01015) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 4:04-501-Y, Vautrain v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01018) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 1:04-00182, Ammons, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01022) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Indiana, C.A. No. 3:04-444RLM, Patricia Peters v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01023) (Text entry; no document attached.)
345
09/27/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that actions 2:04-1411 Lana Ehret, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-1412 Sandra Foreman, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 2:04-1413 Kathleen M. Horvat, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in ARIZONA, C.A. No. 1:04-1970 Nancy Oakley v. Wyeth, Inc., et al pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, C.A. No. 5:04-4052 Clifford D. Mann, et al v. Wyeth, Inc, et al pending in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA, C.A. No. 0-04-3363 Janis Craig, et al v Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3367 Shelby Jean Ashbaugh, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3378 Mary Ann Plunkett v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3379 Cynthia Ross, et al V. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3380 Karen Morgan-McKenna, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3381 Dorothy Schweikl, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3384 Brenda Adams, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No.0:04-3385 Teresa Bongiorno, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3386 Carmen Blakely v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3387 Susan Franzen, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3388 Joan Lydie, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3391 Sharon Gloria, et al v. Wyeth, et al, C.A. No. 0:04-3430 Monique Enge, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc, et al pending in MINNESOTA, C.A. No. 6:04-316 Mazie Flowers, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, C.A. No. 5:04-596 Jo Delonga, et al v. Wyeth, et al pending in WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, C.A. No. 3:04-700 Janet Green, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al pending in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF WEST VIRGINIA are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 09/29/2004
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Louisiana, C.A. No. 04-1951 I(4) Stephanie Hall v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01032) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama, C.A. No. 04-U-1722-J Mary C. Bradley, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01034) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of California, Western Division, C.A. No. 04-5038FMC(Mcx) Suzanne Aragon, et al v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01035) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Beaumont Division C.A. No. 1:04-417 Frances Carroll, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01036) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Beaumont Division C.A. No. 1:04-418 Maria Contreras v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01037) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Beaumont Division C.A. No. 1:04-419 Ardell Fleck, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01038) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Beaumont Division C.A. No. 1:04-420 Norma Hoffpauir v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01039) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Beaumont Division C.A. No. 1:04-421 Laura S Holder, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01040) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Beaumont Division C.A. No. 1:04-422 Sandra Kennedy, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01041) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 2:04-412 Judith N. Simmons v Wyeth Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01042) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04:cv3096 DWF/JSM, Deborah Harman, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01059) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04cv3100 JMR/JSM, Kay Floyd v Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01060) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04cv3101 DWF/JSM, Trudie Tsiavos, et al v Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01061) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04cv3094 DSD/SRN, Amalong v Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1058) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04:cv3106 JM/JGL, Joan Straube, et al v Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1062) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3091JNE/SRN, Baird v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01055) (bsm) Modified on 10/07/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3092JNE/SRN Schrempp, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01056) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3093DSD/SRN Schwoegler, et al v Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01057) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3107DSD/SRN Fisher v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01063) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3108JMR/JGL Shirley Leibelt, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01064) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3110 JMR/SRN Linda Adkins, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01065) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3111DSD/SRN Meredith, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01066) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3120ADM/JGL Janet Faro, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01067) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3121PAM/RLE Amanda Lopez, et al v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01068) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesoto, C.A. No. 04-3122JNE/SRN Lee v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01069) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3123ADM/JGL Nianne Fisch v Wyeth Inc., (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01070) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3124JRT/SRN Mary Trinnaman v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01071) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3137DSD/SRN Ryan, et al v Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01072) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3139JMR/SRN Dolores Pruitt v Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01088) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3140JMR/SRN Shirley Kalergis, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01073) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3141JNE/SRN Mercieca, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01074) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3146ADM/JGL Melinda McCormick, et al v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01075) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3148JMR/JSM Natalie Warren, et al v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01076) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3155JRT/JSM Anna McRae v Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01077) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3156DSD/SRN DuFour v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01078) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3157JRT/SRN Mary Burke v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01079) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3164JRT/JGL Blanche Long v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01080) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3165PAM/RLE Joselle Gatrell v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01081) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3166RHK/AJB Lynne Miller, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01082) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3167MJD/JGL Paula Lefkowitz, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01083) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3169RHK/AJB Annie Mallett, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01084) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3168DWF/JSM Barbara Smith v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01085) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3170MJD/JGL Rose Marie Harris v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01086) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3171RHK/AJB Gwen Close v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01087) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-1247 Hohlakis v Wyeth Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01044) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-1253 Fankboner v Wyeth Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01045) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 3:04-7394 Sperber v Wyeth Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01046) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 3:04-7395 Basinger v Wyeth Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01047) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 5:04-1250 Briggs v Wyeth Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01048) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois C.A. No. 04-4499 Ruth Michalski v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01049) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois Eastern Division C.A. No. 04-4497 Stella Dikselis v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01050) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois Eastern Division C.A. No. 04-4503 Jeannie Thompson, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01051) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of California C.A. No. 04-02864RS Jennifer Charnofsky, et al v Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01052) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3002MJD/JGL Carole Mohr, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01053) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3072JRT/JSM Bonnie Harvill v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01054) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3091JNE/SRN Baird v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01055) (Text entry; no document attached.)
346
09/29/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to adopt Practice & Procedure Order No. 4, and to extend time to answer complts
347
09/29/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to adopt Practice & Procedure Order No. 4 [346-1] and extend time to answer complts [346-2]
348
09/29/2004
SUBMISSION by Wyeth Inc re Order severing and transferring multi-pltf suits [329-1]
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois, C.A. No. 04-4555-Judge Hart, Eddie Taasaas, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01089) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois, C.A. No. 04-4545-Judge Castillo, Sue Evelyn Peterson, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01090) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-569 Charleen Mary Markovich, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01091) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-370EAS/NMK Plesset v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01100) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-373EAS/NMK Neal v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01101) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-374ALM/MRA Desper, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01102) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-379EAS/MRA McCracken, et al v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01103) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-406JLG/MRA Rosemary K. Reese v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01104) (Text entry; no document attached.)
349
09/30/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to compel service of Fact Sheets
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas, C.A. No. H 04-2427, Mackin v Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01108) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas, C.A. H 04-2428, Aranda v Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01109) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas, C.A. No. H 04-2552, Foster v Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1110) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Alabama, C.A. No. 04-0456-CG-M Bonnie Simmons v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01115) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 1:04-357 Lee Carter v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01116) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 04-2427 Machin v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01112) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/30/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 04-2625 Knighten v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01113) (Text entry; no document attached.)
350
10/04/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 712 actions, (see image of documents for complete listing) listed in this Order, are pending in the Northern District of Alabama and are hereby transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this 15 day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 10/06/2004
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of New York, C.A. No. 04-527 Armitage, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01149) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3364DSD/SRN Davenport, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01150) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3138MJD/JGL Quemuel v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01151) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3136DSD/SRN Schuler, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01152) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3361DWF/JSM Bell v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01153) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3095PAM/RLE Sandra Baker, et al v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01154) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota, C.A. No. 04-3362JRT/JSM Mildred Canavan, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01155) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northen District of Indiana, C.A. No. 4:04-45 Diane Sliger v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01156) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Indiana, C.A. No. 4:04-46 Susan Ristau v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01157) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL 2:04-1415 Rowan, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1539) (Text entry; no document attached.)
351
10/05/2004
MOTION by pltfs to compel defts' Barr and Duramed to comply with Court's Order and produce an objective index
10/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Indiana, C.A. No. 2:04-186RLT/WGH Patricia Spurr v. Wyeth Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01158) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 1:04-356 Mary Sue Havens v. Wyeth Inc. (OUR CASE NO 4:04cv01159) (Text entry; no document attached.)
352
10/08/2004
MOTION by Prempro Products for protection of pltfs' work product and document review selection from disclosure
353
10/08/2004
MEMORANDUM by Prempro Products in support of motion for protection of pltfs' work product and document review selection from disclosure [352-1]
354
10/08/2004
TRANSCRIPT (1 volume) of proceedings for the Status Conference held 8/30/04 before Judge William R. Wilson, Jr.
355
10/12/2004
MOTION by Prempro Products for clarification or reconsideration of Order severing and transferring multi-pltf suits
356
10/12/2004
RESPONSE by Prempro Products to motion to adopt Practice & Procedure Order No. 4 [346-1] and to extend time to answer complts [346-2]
357
10/12/2004
RESPONSE by Prempro Products to motion to compel service of Fact Sheets [349-1]
358
10/13/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee Members, defts' Steering Committee Members and Lead and Liaison Counsel: submit a list of topics to be discussed for the 10/21/04 hearing by 5:00 10/18/04 (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 10/15/2004
10/13/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TN C.A. No. 3:04cv287 Kaman v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01220) (Text entry; no document attached.)
359
10/14/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 203 actions,(see image of documents for complete listing) listed in this Order, are pending in the Northern District of Alabama (1), Central District of California (1), Connecticut (1), Middle District of Florida (1), Northern District of Georgia (1), Northern District of Illinois (1), Northern District of Indiana (3), Middle District of Louisiana (1), Minnesota (7), Southern District of Mississippi (2), Northern District of Ohio (2), Southern District of Ohio (1), Eastern District of Tennessee (1), Eastern District of Texas (12), Northern District of Texas (5), Southern District of Texas (122), Western District of Texas (33) Utah (1), Eastern District of Virginia (2), Western District of Washington (1) and Southern District of West Virginia (4) are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel)
360
10/15/2004
REQUEST/MOTION by Wyeth Inc for an order setting a production schedule
361
10/18/2004
NOTICE by deft's of filing of Proposed Agenda for 10/21/04 Hearing
362
10/18/2004
NOTICE by Consumer Class pltfs' of filing of Proposed Agenda for 10/21/04 Hearing
363
10/18/2004
NOTICE by Personal Injury pltfs of filing of Proposed Agenda for 10/21/04 Hearing
10/18/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Georgia C.A. No. 1:04-cv-1970-TWT Nancy Oakley v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01017) (bsm) Modified on 11/04/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
364
10/19/2004
Opposition by defts Barr Pharmaceuticals, Barr Laboratories and Duramed Inc to pltfs' motion to compel [351-1]
365
10/19/2004
MEMORANDUM by defts Barr Pharmaceuticals, Barr Laboratories and Duramed Inc in support and response memorandum [364-1] [364-1]
366
10/19/2004
PARTIAL Opposition by defts to motion for protection of pltfs' work product and document review selection from disclosure [352-1]
367
10/19/2004
REPLY by defts re motion to adopt Practice & Procedure Order No. 4 [346-1] and extend time to answer complts [346-2]
368
10/20/2004
NOTICE/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson that Eileen Harrison has joined Judge Wilson's staff but will not be a part of the MDL cases; if any party has an issue concerning her position, it should be raised w/in 10 days of the date of this notice (cc: all counsel)
369
10/20/2004
REVISED EXHIBITS submitted by defts to Submission re; Order severing and transferring multi-pltf suits [348-1]
370
10/20/2004
OPPOSITION by deft to pltfs' motion for clarification [355-1] or reconsideration of Order severing and transferring multi-pltf suits [355-2]
10/21/2004
CLERK'S MINUTES: Status Conference w/lawyers before Judge Wilson; pltf counsel Mike Williams to prepare precedent for court's approval and signature (C. Newburg) (Text entry; no document attached.)
371
10/25/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-31) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 102 actions, (see image of documents for complete listing) listed in this Order, are pending in the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA (1), ARIZONA (1), COLORADO (1), CONNECTICUT (3), DELAWARE (1), NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (1), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (1), EASTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA (1) MARYLAND (2), MINNESOTA (11), NEBRASKA (1), NEVADA (2), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (1), NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO (5), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO (3), MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA (1), SOUTH CAROLINA (1), EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (13), NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (1), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (46), EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA (5) are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 10/27/2004
372
10/25/2004
TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, Juanita Gornor, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al, C.A. No 3:04-273, pending in the MIDDLE DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA is transferred to the Eastern District of AR, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 10/27/2004
10/25/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 2:04cv00392-GLF-MRA Carol M. Boyer, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01245) (Text entry; no document attached.)
373
10/27/2004
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict litigation: the stay of the Panels' Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-31" filed on 9/28/04, is LIFTED insofar as it relates to C.A. No. 3:03-1818 Rose Marie Butts, et al v. Wayner Chilcott, Inc, et al, pending in the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS; this case is transferred to the Eastern District of AR for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings being conducted by the Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr. (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/02/2004
10/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of West Virginia C.A. NO. 2:04-0690 Leah Royce v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01259) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of West Virginia C.A. No. 2:04-0691 Mava Lou McCumbers, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01260) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/27/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of West Virginia C.A. No. 2:04-0692 Rosemary Keffer v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01261) (Text entry; no document attached.)
374
10/28/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 27 actions (see image of documents for complete listing) listed in this Order, are pending in the EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (1), MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (1), NORTHER DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (1), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI (7), EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (1), NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO (2), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO (3), NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OKLAHOMA (1), EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (1), NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (1), SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (7) and SOUTHER DISTRICT OF WEST VIRGINIA (1) are transferred to the Eastern District of AR as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel ((cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 10/28/2004
10/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 2:04-cv-0166-J Linda Morris v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01268) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of TX C.A. No. 2:04cv169 Anita Gurwell, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01269) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of orignial record from District of NE C.A. No. 8:04cv537 Swanson, et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1270) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv1419-G Pelc v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1271) of (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv1480 Sharon Bland v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1272) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Utah C.A. No. 2:03cv734 PGC Wankier v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1273) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 6:04cv310 Mulcahy v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1279) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of IN C.A. No. 3:04cv484-AS Lavada Gosa v. Wyeth, Inc. Et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1281) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of CT C.A. No. 3:04cv1259 Corso v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1282) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of WV C.A. No. 3:04cv693 Anna Seekens v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1283) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Central District of CA C.A. No. CV04-3755 DT (MANx) Houieh Namin vs. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1284) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Iowa C.A. No. 4:04cv40344-JEG Nading v. Wyeth Pharm Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1287) (Text entry; no document attached.)
375
11/01/2004
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference before The Honorable William Wilson, Jr on 10/21/04
376
11/01/2004
SUBMISSION by defts re: Proposed Order re: rulings from 10/21/04 Hearing
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04cv3743 PAM/RLE Dorothy Bornstein, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01292) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of MN C.A. No. 04cv3534 JMR/JSM Morene Baker v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01293) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of MN C.A. No. 04cv3634 ADM/AJB Denise M Cheltra v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1294) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of MN C.A. No. 04cv3533 ADM/AJB Patsy Lawrence, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01295) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of MN C.A. No. 04cv3535 DSD/SRN Mamie McLean v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01296) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of MN C.A. No. 04cv3732 JMR/SRN Darlene Kay Anderson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1297) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District MN C.A. No. 04cv3452 JNE/SRN Lois Storey, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1298) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of OH C.A. No. C2-04cv570 Hapney v. Wyeth Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01299) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt for original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-423 Yvonee Largent et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01300) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt for original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-424 Janiece Marshall et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01301) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-425 Karen Ocraman et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 404cv01302) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-426 Sandra Noble et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01303) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-430 Barbara McBride et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01304) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt from original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-432 Greraldine Schuster et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01305) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-433 Marjorie Pennington v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01306) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 1:04-435 Joan Landry et al v. Wyeth et al (OUR CASE NO.4:04cv01307) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Nothern District of IL C.A. No. 04cv5213 Adrienne Banas, et al v. Wyeth et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1308) (awj) Modified on 12/27/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 2:04cv243 McMinn, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1309) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of OH C.A. No. 1:04-1417 Coudriet v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1310) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of OH C.A. No. 1:04-01418 McGrath v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1311) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of LA C.A. No. 3:04-567-C-M3 Kowal v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1312) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of OH C.A. No. C2-04-427 Lawson, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1313) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of MS C.A. No. 1:04-608 Sharon Kelley, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01314) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of OH C.A. No. C2-04-799 Whittington v. Wyeth Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1315) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of TX C.A. No. 9:04cv132 Bohannon v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV01316) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of IN C.A. No. 1:04cv256 Christine Smith v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1317) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of IN C.A. No. 4:04cv50 Marilyn Eckholm, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01318) (Text entry; no document attached.)
377
11/04/2004
ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson re: RULINGS FROM 10/21/04 HEARING: that pltfs' motion to compel Wyeth to amend its "privilege log" is granted in part and still under consideration in part [312-1]; as to the request for a Order setting a Production Schedule for Wyeth's Sales Force Databases, 200,000 entries are to be submitted by 11/23/04 and the issue to be readdressed at 12/10/04 hearing; as to service issues, each deft must identify by 11/9/04, a person to whom notice and request may be sent under FRCP 4(d); motion to compel service of pltfs' Fact Sheets is granted [349-1]; motion to compel defts' Barr and Duramed to comply with Court's Order and produce an objective index is granted in part and denied in part [351-1]; pltfs' motion for protection of document review selection from disclosure is granted until 12/11/04, at which time it will expire unless renewed at the 12/10/04 status conference [352-1]; denying defts' motion to adopt Practice & Procedure Order No. 4 as submitted [346-1]; however a master complt and answer system will be implemented in this case as established in this Order; granting motion to extend time to answer complts [346-2]; all defts are granted an extension of time to answer complts until further order of the Court; Scope of Court's Order Severing and Transferring multi-pltf suits is still under consideration by the Court; simultaneous briefs from both sides are due 5:00 11/4/04; additional arguments on this issue will be at 12/10/04 hearing; as to Mr. Khorrami's multi-pltf complt, his oral motion for additional time to respond is granted; oral argument by telephone will be heard on 2:30 11/4/04; the following dates are scheduled for MDL status conferences in 2005: January 14,2005, February 18, 2005, March 25, 2005, April 22, 2005, June 1, 2005 (in conjunction will class certification motion), June 24, 2005, July 22, 2005, August 19, 2005, September 16, 2005 October 14, 2005, November 18, 2005, December 16, 2005; motion to amend Order No. 1 - Practice and Procedure, motion to extend time to answer HT complts filed in this judicial district [287-1], motion to compel production of documents [325-1] motion for an order setting a schedule [360-1] and motion for relief from Standing Order regarding cost and production of core documents[364-1] are denied as moot (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 11/05/2004
378
11/04/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-33) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 14 actions listed in this Order (see image of documents for complete listing) are pending in Northern District of Florida (1), Southern District of Florida (1), Northern District of Illinois (1), Southern District of Illinois (1), Minnesota (1), Northern District of Ohio (3), Southern District of Ohio (1), Oregon (1), Eastern District of Tennessee (1) and Southern District of Texas (3) are transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel)
379
11/04/2004
OPPOSITION by Wyeth to pltfs' several motions for voluntary dismissal w/out prej
11/04/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Maryland C.A. No. WDQ-04-2625 Pamela Conwell, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1323) (Text entry; no document attached.)
380
11/05/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Wyeth re: Order severing and transferring multi-pltf suits [370-1] (bsm) Modified on 11/09/2004
381
11/05/2004
OPPOSITION by pltfs to defts' request for expansion of Court's Order relating to AR cases to create global severance (bsm) Modified on 11/12/2004
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-399 Judith Carter v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01331) (bsm) Modified on 11/15/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-400 Sharon Brumley V. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO 4:04cv01132) (bsm) Modified on 11/16/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-401 Betty Boucher v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01333) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-402 Judy Allen v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01334) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-403 Charles Ockletree v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01335) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-404 Connie McComas v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01336) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-405 Hetty Hornbrook v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01337) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-406 Lynda Lindsay v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01338) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-407 Ella Powell v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01339) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-408 Suzanne Hardy v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01340) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-409 Fairy Rutland v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01341) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-410 Nancy Trammell, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO 4:04cv01342) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-411 Susan Robbins, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01343) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-412 Betty McMahon, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01344) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-413 Paula Lesser, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE No. 4:04CV01345) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-414 Barbara Gallien v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01346) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-415 Ida Jeanette Grant, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01347) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-416 Nina Klipple, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01348) (bsm) Modified on 11/16/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-424 Gail Franczak v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01356) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-425 Carol Rook v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01357) (bsm) Modified on 11/15/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-426 Laura Shelby Cameron, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01358) (bsm) Modified on 11/15/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-427 Cynthia Rupp, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01359) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-428 Pauline Gamble v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01360) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-429 Judith Jacobsen v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01361) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. NO. 1:04-417 Sharon Freeman v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01349) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-418 Shirley Deininger v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01350) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-419 Loveta Cummings v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01352) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-420 Carole Duran v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01352) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-421 Rebecca Adams, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01353) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-422 Karen K. Gibson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01354) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-423 Jan Ballard, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV01355) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 5:04-145 Connally, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01369) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Connecticut C.A. No. 3:04-1374 Buccini, et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01370) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Maryland C.A. No. WDQ-04-2625 Pamela Conwell, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01371) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of West Virginia C.A. No. 3:04-0672 Doris Blue, et al v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01372) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division, C.A. No. 9:04-130 Coleman v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01373) (bsm) Modified on 11/16/2004 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division, C.A. No. 9:04-131 Tubb v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01374) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division, 9:04-133 Holmes v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01375) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 3:04-1492-L Kenney v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01375) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio, C.A. No. 2:04-423 Carol Jean May v. Wyeth Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01377) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Nebraska C.A. No. 8:04-397 Olive Johnson v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01378) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Louisiana, C.A. No. 04-2340 A(2) Dixie King, et al v. Wyeth Inc et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01379) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. NO. 1:04-944 Sally Kingsley v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01380) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 1:04-945 Georgia Torkie-Tork v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01381) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 1:04-946 Linda Cardwell v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01382) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 1:04-947 Trudi Malik v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01383) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 1:04-948 Josephine Eural v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01384) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 1:04-949 Jin Hines v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01335) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Virginia C.A. No. 1:04-950 Betty Swaggerty v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01386) (Text entry; no document attached.)
382
11/09/2004
NOTICE by defts Barr Laboratories, Barr Pharmaceuticals and Duramed Inc of filing of identification of person to whom notice and request may be sent under FRCP 4(d)
383
11/09/2004
NOTICE by Solvay Inc of filing in response to the Court's 11/4/04 Order
384
11/09/2004
NOTICE by Novartis Corp of filing of identification of person to whom notice and request may be sent under FRCP 4(d) (bsm) Modified on 11/12/2004
385
11/09/2004
NOTICE by Aventis Inc of filing of FRCP 4(d) notice
386
11/09/2004
NOTICE by Elan Pharmaceuticals of filing of designate for notice pursuant to FRCP 4(d)
387
11/09/2004
NOTICE by deft Ortho-McNeil of filing of person to whom notice and request may be sent
388
11/09/2004
NOTICE by defts Watson Laboratories and Watson Pharmaceutica of filing of FRCP 4(d) notice
389
11/09/2004
NOTICE by defts Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert LLC, Pharmacia Corp, Pharmacia & Upjohn, Pharmacia Company and Greenstone Ltd of filing of response to Court's Order regarding requests for waivers of service, pursuant to FRCP 4(d)
11/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Pennsylvania C.A. NO. 1:04-01902-YK Cheri L. Ross v. Wyeth (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01371) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas (Tyler) C.A. No. 6:04-00384-MHS Reta Taylor, et al v. Walmart Stores, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01393) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas (Tyler) C.A. No. 6:04-00311-WMS Donna Stewart, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv001394) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 5:04-309 Ruth Howard, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01395) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. NO. 6:04-308 Katherin Carey v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01396) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 5:04-396 Helen Bell, et al v. Wyeth, et al (0UR CASE NO. 4:04CV01397) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/10/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of South Carolina C.A. No. 0:04-21942 (SCD) Vera Harned, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01400) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/10/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Delaware C.A. No. 1:04-892-SLR Malfitano v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01401) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/10/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Maryland C.A. No. 4-2082 Kay Main, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01403) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/10/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Maryland C.A. No. AW-04-2709 Martha Tappan, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01404) (Text entry; no document attached.)
390
11/12/2004
NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take the videotyped deposition of Robert Gale, M.D. on 9:00 11/18/04
391
11/12/2004
NOTICE by Wyeth Inc of intention to take the videotaped deposition of Maxine Jochelson, M.C. on 9:00 11/20/04
392
11/12/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc to compel production of documents from The National Institutes of Health and The Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center
393
11/12/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to compel production of documents from The National Institutes of Health and The Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center [392-1]
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Florida C.A. No. 3:04cv295/RV/MD Evelyn Joiner, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01406) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-992 Barath v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01407) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-994 Cruce v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01408) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 3-04-cv-1523 Brenda K. Davis v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01410) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 1:04cv705GRO Mary Linton v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01414) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Mississippi C.A. No. 1:04cv706GuRo Norene Whitehead v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01415) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-429 Elizabeth Weber v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01420) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-431 Janis Williams, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01421) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-428 Marlene Steely, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01422) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:04-427 Lola Snyder v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01423) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois C.A. No. 1:04cv4501 Jean Goldrich v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01427) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Texas C.A. No. 3:03cv1818-P Rose Marie Butts, et al. v. Chilcott, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01428) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 1:03-565 Wanda Strong v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01429) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3001 Melinda Chapman v. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01431) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3365 Phyllis Bennett, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01432) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3390 Leah Perona v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01433) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3151 Patricia Contreras v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01434) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3389 Barbara Olivotto v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01435) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3383 Providence Stefanik, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01436) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3147 Maria Rogers, et al. v. GlaxoSmithKline, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01437) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3366 Josephone Barnes v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01438) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3382 Rosario Taja, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01439) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3964 Marietta Foster v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01440) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/12/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Minnesota C.A. No. 04-cv-3973 Sherry Welch v. Wyeth, Inc. et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01441) (Text entry; no document attached.)
394
11/15/2004
NOTICE by Berlex Labs LLC and Berlex Inc of identification of person to whom notice and request may be sent under FRCP (bsm) Modified on 11/17/2004
395
11/15/2004
LETTER to court from Bristol-Myers Squibb identify the person to whom notice and request may be sent under FRCP 4(d) (bsm) Modified on 11/17/2004
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Connecticut C.A. No. 3:04cv1373 Margaret B. Fraser, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01443) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Nevada C.A. No. CV-S-04-1106-RCJ Roseanne Davis, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01444) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 2:04-cv-0424 Sandra Henery, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01445) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of Florida C.A. No. 3:04-cv-663-J-32 Marilyn Duke v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01446) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Florida C.A. No. 3:04cv296/RV/EMT Arlene Agar, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01447) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York C.A. No. 1:03-cv-6191 Sherri Barlow, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01448) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-cv-601 Sherry L. Linneman, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01449) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio C.A. No. 2:04-cv-0422 Sandra Henery, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01455) (Text entry; no document attached.)
396
11/16/2004
NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Labs Inc of filing of identification of person to whom notice and request may be set under FRCP 4(d)
397
11/16/2004
NOTICE by Organon USA Inc of filing of FRCP 4(d) notice
398
11/17/2004
MOTION by pltfs to compel Wyeth witnesses to answer questions regarding their compensation
399
11/17/2004
NOTICE by Smithkline Beecham of filing of FRCP 4(d) notice
400
11/17/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to defts' opposition to pltfs' several motions for voluntary dismissal w/out prej
11/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Georgia C.A. No. 1:04-cv-2232-ODE Misty Carter v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01456) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/17/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas C.A. No. 4:04cv235 Della Joyce v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01457) (Text entry; no document attached.)
401
11/18/2004
NOTICE by defendant USL Pharma Inc of filing FRCP 4(d) notice purs to Paragraph III of the Court's 11/4/04 Order
402
11/19/2004
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Wyeth Inc to compel production of documents from The National Institutes of Health and The Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center
403
11/19/2004
MOTION by Prempro Products to compel production of Wyeth's custodial files
404
11/19/2004
MEMORANDUM by Prempro Products in support of motion to compel production of Wyeth's custodial files [403-1]
405
11/19/2004
NOTICE by Valeant Pharm Intl of filing F.R.C.P. 4(D) Notice
406
11/19/2004
NOTICE by Amarin Pharm Inc of filing F.R.C.P. 4(D) Notice
407
11/19/2004
NOTICE by King Pharmaceuticals and Monarch Pharm Inc of filing F.R.C.P. 4(D) Notice
11/19/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Illinois C.A. No. 04-675-GPM Therese A. McKinney v. Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories Co. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01466) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Tennessee C.A. No. Bowman, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01467) (Text entry; no document attached.)
408
11/22/2004
NOTICE by Gallipot Inc of filing F.R.C.P. 4(d) Notice
11/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Florida C.A. No. 3:04cv306/RV/EMT Joan Asnip, et al. v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01471) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Western District of Texas C.A. No. EP-04-cv-262-FM Maria Bishop v. Wyeth, et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01472) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/22/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of Oregon C.A. No. 3:04-cv-985-MO Catherine Stevens, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01473) (Text entry; no document attached.)
409
11/23/2004
EMERGENCY MOTION by Wyeth Inc to preserve evidence, produce original fact sheets, and conduct investigation FILED UNDER SEAL
410
11/23/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion to preserve evidence [409-1], produce original fact sheets [409-2], and conduct investigation [409-3] FILED UNDER SEAL
411
11/23/2004
APPENDIX filed by Wyeth Inc to emergency motion to preserve evidence [409-1], produce original fact sheets [409-2] and conduct investigation [409-3] 4 VOLUMES FILED UNDER SEAL
11/23/2004
REMARK:Receipt of original record from Northern District of OH, C.A. No. 1:04-995 Winston v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01478) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of OH, C.A. No. 1:04-999 Miller v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01479) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of OH, C.A. No. 1:04-1000 Lee v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01480) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of OH, C.A. NO. 1:04-1717 Frye V. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01481) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-999 Miller v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01478) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-995 Winston v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01479) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern Disrict of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-1000 Lee v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01480) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 1:04-1717 Frye v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01481) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 4:04-1805 Raybits v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01482) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 5:04-1803 Warrior v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01483) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/23/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Ohio C.A. No. 5:04-1806 Speck v. Wyeth, Inc. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01484) (Text entry; no document attached.)
412
11/24/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc for entry of Confidentiality Order No. 1 re WHI Study Data
413
11/24/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc in support of motion for entry of Confidentiality Order No. 1 re WHI Study Data [412-1]
414
11/24/2004
MOTION by Wyeth Inc and Wyeth Pharmaceutical for order to show cause why certain pltfs' should not be dismissed for willful failure to comply with the Court's discovery orders
415
11/24/2004
MEMORANDUM by Wyeth Inc and Wyeth Pharmaceutical in support of motion for order to show cause why certain pltfs' should not be dismissed for willful failure to comply with the Court's discovery orders [414-1]
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from District of MN C.A. No. 04-3978 Swanson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1486) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of IL C.A. No. 04-5509 Janet Palumbo vs. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1487) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv423 Quisenberry, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1488) (awj) Modified on 01/03/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv439 Easley v. Pharmacia & Upjohn, et (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1489) (awj) Modified on 01/03/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv445 Pashalidis, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1490) (awj) Modified on 01/03/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv447 Trapp, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1491) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv457 Hamilton v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1492) (awj) Modified on 03/01/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt from original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv455 Jurke v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1493) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv453 Struve v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1494) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv443 Hinton, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1495) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv451 Fipps v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1496) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv449 Gillaspy v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1497) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv441 Eddleman, et al v. Pharmacia & Upjohn et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1498) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv532 Kathleen Barnett, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1504) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv424 Cook v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1505) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv438 Sandra K. Amon v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1506) (awj) Modified on 01/03/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv440 Blake, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1507) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv442 Hill, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1508) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Tx C.A. No. 3:04cv444 Jennings, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1509) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv446 Seifert, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1510) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv448 Wright, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1511) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv450 Garcia v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1512) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04-452 Villarreal v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4;04cv1513) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04-454 Stroud v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1514) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04-456 Hudson v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1515) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04cv458 Griffice v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1516) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of TX C.A. No. 3:04-460 Dillon v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1521) (Text entry; no document attached.)
416
11/26/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-34) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 34 actions listed in this Order (see image of documents for complete listing) are pending in Western District of AR (2), Connecticut (2), Northern District of Florida (1), Northern District of Illinois (3), Kansas (1), Middle District of Louisiana (1), Western District of Louisiana (1), Massachusetts (1), Minnesota (10), Eastern District of Missouri (1), Northern District of Mississippi (1), Middle District of North Carolina (1), South Dakota (1), Southern District of New York (1), Northern District of Ohio (1), Eastern District of Pennsylvania (2), South Carolina (1), Eastern District of Texas (1), Northern District of Texas (1), Eastern District of Wisconsin (1) are transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party files notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel)(bsm) Modified on 11/30/2004
11/26/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of WI C.A. No. 04cv757 Houdek v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1517) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of NY C.A. No. 1:04cv2880 Colucci v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1518) (Text entry; no document attached.)
417
11/29/2004
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-35) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the 5 actions listed in this Order (see image of documents for complete listing) are pending in the Middle District of Louisiana (1), Minnesota (2), Western District of Oklahoma (1), and Eastern District of Wisconsin (1) are transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas as part of MDL Docket No. 1507; transmittal of this Order to the Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof and if any party filed notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this period, the stay will be continued until further order of the panel (cc: all counsel) (bsm) Modified on 12/16/2004
11/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Texas C.A. No. 2:04cv366 Granier v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1523) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from the District of CT C.A No. 3:04cv1372 Egan, et al v. Wyeth, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1524) (Text entry; no document attached.)
418
11/30/2004
OPPOSITION by Wyeth Inc to pltfs' motion to compel Wyeth witnesses to answer questions regarding their compensation [398-1] FILED UNDER SEAL
419
11/30/2004
LETTER/ORDER by Judge William R. Wilson to Steering Committee, Defts Steering Committee and Lead and Liaison Counsel; submit a list of topics to be on the agenda for the 12/10/04 hearing by 12/6/04 (cc: all counsel)
420
11/30/2004
MOTION by Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center for protective order re production of records (bsm) Modified on 12/01/2004
421
11/30/2004
DECLARATION of June K. Campbell by Fred Hutchinson in support of motion for protective order re production of records [420-1] and in opposition to motion to compel [420-1]
422
11/30/2004
DECLARATION of Garnet Anderson by Fred Hutchinson in support of motion for protective order re production of records [420-1] and in opposition to motion to compel [420-1]
424
12/02/2004
RESPONSE by mov National Institute to motion to compel production of documents from The National Institutes of Health and The Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center [392-1]
12/02/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Middle District of LA C.A. No. 3:04cv500 Jackson v. Wyeth Inc, et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1530) (Text entry; no document attached.)
425
12/03/2004
RESPONSE by pltfs to motion to preserve evidence [409-1], produce original fact sheets [409-2], and conduct investigation [409-3] FILED UNDER SEAL (bsm) Modified on 12/06/2004
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04-1413 Young, et al vs. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1537) (awj) Modified on 01/27/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of origignal record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04-1414 Dismuke, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1538) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04cv1416 Chambers v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1540) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04-1417 Kelly v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1541) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04cv1418 Richardson, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1542) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04cv1419 Eddings, et al v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1543) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL 2:04-1420 Dominguez v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1544) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL 2:04cv1421 Cahill v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04CV1545) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. 2:04-1422 Lackey v. Wyeth, Inc. et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1546) (awj) Modified on 01/05/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of AL C.A. No. 2:04-1423 Wingfield v. Wyeth, Inc., et al (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv1547) (awj) Modified on 01/07/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1415 Shirley Kay Rowan, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01539) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1424 Mary Nancy Ellis, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01548) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1425 James Lenwood Mcgee, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01549) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1426 Danielle Leskovsek v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01550) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1427 Nancy M. Lee v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01551) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1428 Dorothy Sylvia Miller v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01552) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1429 Leroy H. Thornley, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01553) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1430 Saundra Ann Summersett, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01554) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1431 William Patrick Taylor, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01555) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1432 John Robert Hill, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01556) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1433 Warren A. Stewart, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01557) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1434 Martha Pope Toedte, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01558) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1435 Marilyn J. Hammond, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01559) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1436 Patricia A. Strops v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01560) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1437 Robert J. Howell, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01561) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1438 Cecelia Ann Hyatt v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01562) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1439 Barbara S. Schwartz v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01563) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1440 Jack Cunningham, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01564) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1441 Edward J. Merk, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01565) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1442 Sally Anne Godt Tobin, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01566) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1443 Betty J. Walden v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01567) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1444 Martha Ann Freeman v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01568) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1445 Eloise McGill, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01569) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1446 Anthony P. Maslousky, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01570) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1447 Jonathan Roy Craven, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01571) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1448 Rosalind Kay Nichols, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01572) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1449 Robert J. Beiber, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01573) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1450 Kenneth Coday, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01574) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1451 Linda S. Cox, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01575) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1452 Tommy Campis, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01576) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1453 Mary Ann Blunk, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01577) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1454 Leon Baker, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01578) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1455 Georgiana C. Breyfogle, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01579) f (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1456 Richard Portman, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01580) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1457 Joseph T. Richardson, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01581) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1458 Nellie O. Cork, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01582) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1459 Odis T. Morrison, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01583) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1460 Roberta J. Barrett, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01584) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1461 Joyce Margaret Bell, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01585) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1462 Joan C. Gray, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01586) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1463 Sarah T. Anderson, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01587) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1464 Rebecca A. Stancil v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01588) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1465 Ruby L. Kendrick v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01589) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1466 Diana R. Sands v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01590) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt or original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1467 Frankie Parker v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01591) (ade) Modified on 03/28/2005 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1468 Cherry K. Fowler v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01592) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1469 Odra C. Hamilton v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01593) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1481 Janet E. Shearin, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01594) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1482 Carole A. MacLeod, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01595) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1483 Luis Nodine, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01596) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1484 Joan Miller Dutt, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01597) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1485 Lottie L. Hardison, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01598) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record form Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1486 Shirley Kay Ewing, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01599) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1487 Eloise C. Battle, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01600) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1488 Patsy Neely Keaton, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01601) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1489 Deborah Kay Dornblaser, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01602) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1490 Pearlie D. Pendergrass, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01603) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1491 Raymond D. Horn, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01604) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1492 Teresa Ann Romer, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01605) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1493 Joyce Rae Wagner, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01606) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1494 Mark Ward, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01607) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1495 Peggy Neil Moffett, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01608) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1496 David Henry Spiers, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01609) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1497 Willie Kincaid, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01610) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1498 Rosetta M. Magner, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01611) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1499 Martha C. Snyder, et al. v. Wyeth, Inc., et al. (OUR CASE NO. 4:04cv01612) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2004
REMARK: Receipt of original record from Northern District of Alabama C.A. No. 2:04-1500 Wil