In re Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation mdl 2406
Court Docket Sheet

2:2013-cv-20000 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 109 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/08/2013
TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 9 actions listed on schedule A to the Northern Distirct of Alabama.
1
Schedule with NDAL case numbers) [Deemed filed 12/26/2012 in case 2:12-cv-1133-RDP](AVC
1 Attachment
2
01/08/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 10 actions to the Northern District of Alabama listed on the attached Schedule.
1
CTO-1 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)[deemed filed 12/26/2012 in case 2:12-cv-1133-RDP](AVC
1 Attachment
3
01/08/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 3 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-2 Schedule with NDAL case numbers) [deemed filed 1/2/2013 in case 2:12-cv-1133-RDP](AVC
1 Attachment
4
01/08/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-3 Schedule with NDAL case numbers) [deemed filed 1/3/2013 in case 2:12-cv-1133-RDP](AVC
1 Attachment
5
01/09/2013
NOTICE of Filing by Plaintiffs' Counsel
1
Exhibit Complaint- Attachment A
2
Exhibit Notice of Filing- Attachment B) [deemed filed 1/7/2013 in case 2:12-cv-1133-RDP](AVC
2 Attachments
6
01/09/2013
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/8/2013.
7
01/09/2013
ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/9/2013.
8
01/15/2013
RESPONSE to re 5 NOTICE of Filing by Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
9
01/22/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
Schedule CTO-4 with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
10
02/13/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
Schedule CTO-5 with NDAL case number)(AVC
1 Attachment
11
02/19/2013
PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' Response to the Proposed Annotated Agenda for the February 21,2013 Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Modified on 2/20/2013
12
02/20/2013
PROVIDER PLAINTIFF Group's Response to the Proposed Annotaged Agenda for the February 21, 2013 Status Conference by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D) Modified on 2/21/2013 (AVC
4 Attachments
13
02/21/2013
ORDER -In light of the Transfer Order by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and as discussed at the status conference held on this date, this court will re-open applications for the Interim Lead Counsel position. Applications and/or nominations must be filed with the Clerk's office electronically within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this order and SHALL NOT exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/21/2013.
02/21/2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 2/21/2013. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
02/26/2013
ORDER OF RECUSAL-The undersigned RECUSES from this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on 2/26/2013.
15
02/28/2013
ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS LIAISON COUNSEL AND INVITING APPLICATIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP COMMITTEE POSITIONS-It is ORDERED that Barry Ragsdale is APPOINTED as Pltfs' Liaison Counsel and will serve as a non-voting member of the to-be-formed Pltfs' Steering Committee. Applications for Pltfs' Leadership Positions SHALL be filed with the Clerk's Office electronically by 4/5/2013. The applications or nominations SHALL be accompanied by a disclosure of any and all agreements between the applicant and any other counsel in these consolidated cases related to the subject matter of these cases. Applications and/or nominations SHALL NOT exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/28/2013.
16
03/05/2013
Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/21/2013, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 3/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2013.
17
03/21/2013
APPLICATION of David Boies and William Isaacson to Serve as Interim Lead Counsel for the Subscriber Track Actions by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A) Modified on 3/21/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
18
03/21/2013
MOTION to Appoint Provider Track Lead Counsel and Leadership Structure by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25
26
Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit 27
28
Exhibit 28
29
Exhibit 29
30
Exhibit 30
31
Exhibit 31
32
Exhibit 32
33
Exhibit 33
34
Exhibit 34
35
Exhibit 35
36
Exhibit 36
37
Exhibit 37) Modified on 3/22/2013 (AVC
37 Attachments
19
03/26/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
Schedule CTO-6)(AVC
1 Attachment
20
04/01/2013
TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
21
04/04/2013
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Leadership Committee Position -- Subscribers by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
22
04/04/2013
Application of Virginia M. Buchanan to Serve on MDL 2406 Subscriber Class Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Modified on 4/4/2013
23
04/04/2013
Application of Ben W. Gordon, Jr. to Serve on MDL 2406 Subscriber Class Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Modified on 4/4/2013
24
04/04/2013
Application for Committee Position by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit C.V.) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
1 Attachment
25
04/04/2013
Application of Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. for Committee Position - Subscriber Class by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Modified on 4/5/2013
26
04/05/2013
Application to Serve on Subscriber Committee by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit JW Bio) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
1 Attachment
27
04/05/2013
APPLICATION and Declaration of Joey James for Appointment to Plaintffs' Steering Committee and Other Integrated Committees.
1
Exhibit A) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
1 Attachment
28
04/05/2013
Application of Robert G. Methvin, Jr. of McCallum, Methvin & Terrell, P.C. to Serve as One of Four Subscribers' Counsel on the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee.
1
Exhibit A) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
1 Attachment
29
04/05/2013
MOTION to Appoint Counsel James M. Terrell for Committee Position -- Subscriber Class by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A - Terrell Biographical Information
1 Attachment
30
04/05/2013
Application of Robert B. Roden to Serve on MDL 2406 Provider Class Plaintiffs' Committee(s) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Modified on 4/5/2013
31
04/05/2013
MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF WATSON MCKINNEY AND QUINN CONNOR TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBSCRIBER COMMITTEES by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
32
04/05/2013
Application of Patrick W. Pendley to serve on the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee or, Alternatively, as a Committee Chairman.
1
Exhibit A) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
1 Attachment
33
04/05/2013
Application of Gordon Ball to Serve as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Subscriber Plaintiffs, Membership on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and/or Leadership Committee Positions of the Settlement and/or Litigation Committees.
1
Exhibit Resume
2
Exhibit List of Other BCBS Cases filed by Ball and Co-Counsel) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
2 Attachments
34
04/05/2013
Application of David J. Hodge For Committee Position - Subscriber Class by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Modified on 4/5/2013
35
04/05/2013
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pittman Provider Group Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Provider Steering Committee, Provider Committee Chairs, and Provider Committees by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
15 Attachments
36
04/05/2013
MOTION to Appoint Leadership Positions in the Subscriber Track Actions by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
37
04/05/2013
Application of Lawrence L. Jones II for Appointment to Subscriber Class Plaintiffs' Sterring Committee.
1
Exhibit Application Letter
2
Exhibit Biography/CV) Modified on 4/5/2013 (CVA
2 Attachments
38
04/05/2013
MOTION Application of Philip E. Carby for Committee Position-Subscriber Class by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
39
04/05/2013
MOTION Application of Michael P. McGartland to Serve on MDL 2406 Subscriber Class Committee by MDLPANEL.
40
04/05/2013
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Firm Name Change
41
04/05/2013
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
42
04/05/2013
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Memorandum in Support of Nominations to Committee Positions in Leadership Structure by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
43
04/10/2013
STATUS REPORT Special Master's Rule 23 Report Recommending Interim Plaintiff Leadership Counsel by Special Master. filed by Special Master
44
04/11/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama
1
Schedule CTO 7 - NDAL case #)(ASL
1 Attachment
45
04/11/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama
1
Schedule CTO 8 - NDAL case #)(ASL
1 Attachment
46
04/11/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama
1
Schedule CTO 9 - NDAL case #)(ASL
1 Attachment
47
04/12/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE any objections to recommended slate for Plas' Leadership Counsel from any party SHALL be filed on or before April 17, 2013; Hearing on recommended slate and any objections thereto set for 4/23/2013 at 10:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge R David Proctor. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/12/13.
48
04/16/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 4 actions to the Northern District of Alabama
1
Schedule CTO 10 - NDAL case numbers)(ASL
1 Attachment
49
04/17/2013
Opposition to re 43 Special Master's Report Recommending Whatley Kallas filed by Defendants' Counsel.
50
04/17/2013
RESPONSE to re 43 Special Master's Rule 23 Report Recommending Interim Plaintiff Leadership Counsel filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
51
04/18/2013
REPLY to re 49 Reply of Joe R. Whatley, Jr. and Edith M. Kallas to Objection of Carefirst of Maryland, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
52
04/19/2013
ORDER re: 49 Carefirst of Maryland's Response to the Special Master's Rule 23 Report Recommending Appointment of Whatley Kallas LLC as Interim Lead Counsel; in preparation for hearing on Tuesday, April 23, 2013 at 10:30 AM, all parties with an interest in this issue shall file briefs (of not more than 35 pages) addressing the objection, all such briefs shall be filed no later than 4:30 PM on Monday, April 22, 2013. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/19/13.
53
04/19/2013
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Carefirst of Maryland, Inc. by Defendants' Counsel.
54
04/19/2013
RESPONSE to Joint Response by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross/Blue Shield of Louisiana ("BCBS-LA") and Daniel A. Small filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
55
04/22/2013
Brief re 52 Order, In Support of CareFirst of Maryland's Response in Objection to Special Master's Report Recommending Lead Counsel.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A- Part 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit A- Part 2
2 Attachments
56
04/22/2013
RESPONSE to re 52 Court's April 19, 2013 Order filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit E
2
Exhibit F
3
Exhibit G
4
Exhibit H
4 Attachments
57
04/22/2013
REPLY to Response by Certain Louisiana Plaintiffs' Counsel to Joint Response by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana and CMST filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
04/23/2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Hearing on the appointment of Interim Lead counsel and pla's Steering Committee held on 4/23/2013. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
04/24/2013
TEXT ORDER granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W Martin, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 04/24/13.
04/24/2013
ORDER It has come to the court's attention that a number of attorneys have contacted the Clerk of the Court to inquire about monitoring this matter. This court's CM/ECF system does not provide an automated method for attorneys to monitor a case. Until such time as an MDL website is developed, to monitor a case, an attorney may log into the PACER system and check the docket. Appearances should not be made directly in the MDL, and appearances in any of the individual cases related to the MDL should only be made by attorneys representing a client involved in the litigation. Any attorney appearing in the case is subject to being held responsible for the representation of the client on whose behalf that attorney appeared. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/24/13. (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
04/25/2013
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/23/13, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2013.
61
04/26/2013
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL, LOCAL FACILITATING COUNSEL, PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, AND DISCOVERY LIAISON COUNSEL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/26/13.
62
04/29/2013
STATUS REPORT Special Master's Rule 53 Report Recommending Interim Committee Chairs and Committee Members for the Plaintiff Subscriber and Provider Tracks by Special Master. filed by Special Master
1
Exhibit Exhibit A to Special Master's Rule 53 Report
2
Exhibit Exhibit B to Special Master's Rule 53 Report
2 Attachments
63
04/30/2013
ORDER REGARDING INTERIM COMMITTEE CHAIR AND MEMBER APPOINTMENTS re 62 Special Master's Report; any objections from any party or interested person to the recommended slate for Interim Committee Chairs and Committee Members SHALL be filed on or before May 7, 2013; any responses to such objections SHALL be filed on or before May 10, 2013; court will take any objections under submission. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/30/13.
64
05/03/2013
AMENDED Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/2013, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2013.
65
05/06/2013
AMENDED Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/21/2013, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2013.
66
05/07/2013
RESPONSE to re 62 (of Certain Defendants on Rule 53 Report of Special Master) filed by Defendants' Counsel.
67
05/10/2013
PARTIES' Report Regarding Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants' Counsel Modified on 5/10/2013
68
05/10/2013
REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: 66 Response (other) SUBSCRIBER AND PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' JOINT RESPONSE TO THE OBJECTIONS OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO THE RULE 53 REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
69
05/13/2013
TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on the Parties' Report Regarding Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. # 67). In light of the Report, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) On or before May 14, 2013, the parties may submit initial briefs limited to eight pages supporting their respective position on whether one consolidated complaint or two should be filed; and (2) on or before May 20, 2013, the parties may file responsive briefs limited to five pages. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/13/2013.
70
05/13/2013
CORRECTED Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs' Joint Response to the Objections of Certain Defendants to the Rule 53 Report of the Special Master 66 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A) Modified on 5/14/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
71
05/14/2013
Brief in Support of Allowing the Plaintiffs to be the Masters of their Complaints filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Exhibit One
2
Exhibit Two) Modified on 5/14/2013 (AVC
2 Attachments
72
05/14/2013
NOTICE of Defendants' Position on Consolidated Amended Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Text of Proposed Order) Modified on 5/15/2013 (AVC
2 Attachments
73
05/16/2013
Special Master's Rule 23 Report Recommending Approval of Proposed Order Regarding Protocols for Plaintiffs' Counsel Time and Expense Submissions by Special Master.
1
Exhibit Proposed Billing Order) Modified on 5/16/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
74
05/16/2013
Corrected Special Master's Rule 53 Report Recommending Approval of Proposed Order Regarding Protocols for Plaintiffs' Counsel Time and Expense Submissions by Special Master.
1
Exhibit Proposed Billing Order) Modified on 5/16/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
75
05/16/2013
ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED PROTOCOLS FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSELTIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2013.
76
05/20/2013
REPLY of Defendants in Favor of A Single Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel. Modified on 5/20/2013
77
05/20/2013
RESPONSE to Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Requiring Plaintiffs to File a Single Complaint 72 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Exhibit 3
2
Text of Proposed Order) Modified on 5/20/2013 (AVC
2 Attachments
78
05/24/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-12) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 3 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-12 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
79
05/30/2013
ORDER-By 7/1/2013, Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel may file either one consolidated class action complaint, or two consolidated calls action complaints. Lead Counsel and Local Facilitating Counsel for Dfts SHALL confer with Interim Co-Lead Class counsel regarding proposed briefing schedule on the anticipated motions to dismiss. By 7/10/2013, the parties SHALL file a joint written status report setting forth the proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/30/2013.
80
05/31/2013
ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOLS FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSELTIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/31/2013.
81
06/03/2013
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT: The court ORDERS that the Special Masters application for payment is hereby APPROVED, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 06/03/2013.
82
06/04/2013
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM COMMITTEE CHAIRS AND COMMITTEE MEMBERS FOR THE PLAINTIFF SUBSCRIBER AND PROVIDER TRACKS. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/4/2013.
83
06/06/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-13 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
84
06/20/2013
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-14 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
85
07/01/2013
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Consolidated Subscriber Track Actions against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
86
07/01/2013
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Consolidated Provider Track against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
87
07/09/2013
*** WITHDRAWN***[to be filed in Conway 2:12-2532-RDP and other invidual actions if necessary]Request for service by certified mail filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Modified on 7/10/2013
88
07/09/2013
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
89
07/10/2013
TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on an informal motion for an extension of time for the parties to file their joint report setting forth a proposed briefing schedule on anticipated motions to dismiss. The request is GRANTED. The parties SHALL file a joint written status report setting forth a proposed briefing schedule on anticipated motions to dismiss on or before July 17, 2013. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/10/2013.
90
07/10/2013
TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on the Unopposed Motion of Herman A. Watson, Jr. to Appoint Rebekah K. McKinney to Replace Him As State Liaison Committee Member for the Subscriber Track (Doc. # 88). For good cause shown, and because the Subscriber Track Lead Counsel, Steering Committee, and Local Facilitating Counsel do not oppose the Motion, the Motion (Doc. # 88) is GRANTED. The court hereby APPOINTS Rebekah K. McKinney to replace Herman A. Watson, Jr. as a State Liaison Committee Member for the Subscriber Track. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/10/2013.
91
07/17/2013
REPORT from the Parties on Motion to Dismiss Schedule 79 by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel Modified on 7/18/2013
92
07/18/2013
TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on the Joint Report from the Parties on Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule (Doc. # 91), which requests an additional short extension of time for the parties to file their joint report setting forth a proposed briefing schedule on anticipated motions to dismiss. The request is GRANTED. The parties SHALL file a joint written status report setting forth a proposed briefing schedule on anticipated motions to dismiss on or before July 19, 2013. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/18/2013.
93
07/19/2013
JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1) Modified on 7/22/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
94
07/22/2013
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re 86 Amended Complaint Filing of Corrected Caption
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
95
07/23/2013
TEXT ORDER -This matter is SET for a status conferenceat 10:00 AM on Wednesday, August 21, 2013 in courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse to discuss, among other issues, a briefing schedule on the anticipated motions to dismiss. The court anticipates that the Special Master will circulate a call in number to counsel who wish to attend by phone. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/23/2013.
08/21/2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 8/21/2013. As indicated on the record, the court will enter a separate order outlining the briefing schedules agreed to by the parties. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
08/27/2013
Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/21/2013, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013.
97
08/30/2013
REPORT Regarding Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Establishing Certain Discovery Procedures by Special Master.
1
Exhibit A Agreed Edits
2
Exhibit B Additional Edits Suggested by the Plaintiffs
3
Exhibit C Additional Edits Suggested by the Defendants) Modified on 9/9/2013 (AVC
3 Attachments
98
09/03/2013
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ESTABLISHING CERTAIN DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/3/2013.
99
09/06/2013
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re 85 Amended Complaint Errata to Subscriber Track Consolidated Class Action Complaint
1
Appendix 1
1 Attachment
100
09/11/2013
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/11/2013.
101
09/11/2013
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/11/2013.
102
09/17/2013
Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
103
09/18/2013
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff Kathleen Cain's Opposed Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. # 102). The Motion is more properly filed in the Conway case, case No. 2:12-cv-02532-RDP. Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED to re-file the motion in that case. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE the Motion (Doc. # 102) in this case. Additionally, interested parties are DIRECTED to coordinate with the Special Master regarding the scheduling of a telephone conference to discuss Plaintiff Cain's Motion. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/18/2013.
104
09/27/2013
MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal by Defendants' Counsel.
105
09/27/2013
TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal (Doc. # 104). The Motion is GRANTED. Defendants are granted leave to file the referenced documents UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/27/2013.
106
09/30/2013
MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal by Capital Blue Cross.
107
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Triple S Salud, Inc.
1
Exhibit Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury
1 Attachment
108
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants' Counsel.
109
09/30/2013
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Capital Blue Cross's Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal. (Doc. # 106). The Motion (Doc. # 106) is GRANTED. Defendant Capital Blue Cross is granted leave to file the referenced documents UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/30/2013.
110
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. by Defendants' Counsel.
111
09/30/2013
Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss 110 by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. Modified on 10/4/2013
112
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, Alternatively, Improper Venue by Capital Blue Cross.
1
Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Meals) Modified on 10/3/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
113
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A-G) Modified on 10/3/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
114
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan.
1
Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit A, Part 1
3
Exhibit A, Part 2
4
Exhibit B, Part 1
5
Exhibit B, Part 2
6
Exhibit C, Part 1
7
Exhibit C, Part 2
8
Exhibit D
9
Exhibit E, Part 1
10
Exhibit E, Part 2
11
Errata F, Part 1
12
Exhibit G, Part 1
13
Exhibit G, Part 2
14
Exhibit H
15
Exhibit I, Part 1
16
Exhibit I, Part 2
17
Exhibit I, Part 3) Modified on 10/3/2013 (AVC
17 Attachments
115
09/30/2013
Brief re 108 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Appendix I
2
Appendix II
3
Exhibit A
3 Attachments
116
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina and Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff Shred 360,LLC by Defendants' Counsel. Modified on 10/3/2013
117
09/30/2013
Brief in Support of Motion of BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina and Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Shred 360, LLC filed by Defendants' Counsel.
118
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
119
09/30/2013
SEALED MOTION re: 112 by Capital Blue Cross.
1
Exhibit 1)(AVC
1 Attachment
120
09/30/2013
Brief re 108 MOTION to Dismiss.
1
Appendix
2
Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit 2
4
Exhibit 3
5
Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit 5
7
Exhibit 6
8
Exhibit 7
9
Exhibit 8
10
Exhibit 9
11
Exhibit 10
12
Exhibit 11
13
Exhibit 12
14
Exhibit 13
14 Attachments
121
09/30/2013
MOTION in Supprot of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania.
1
Affidavit) Modified on 10/3/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
122
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Missippi.
1
Exhibit A (Declaration of John H. Proctor, III)) Modified on 10/3/2013 (AVC
1 Attachment
123
09/30/2013
Brief re 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants' Counsel.
124
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
125
09/30/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Memorandum of Certain Defendants in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue
2
Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Christine Epper
3
Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Fred Palenske
4
Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Robert L. Stroup III
5
Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Dave Keiter
6
Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of David Horn
6 Attachments
127
10/03/2013
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Defendants' Counsel
128
10/04/2013
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1 (Application and Declaration of Lezlie Madden in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
1 Attachment
10/04/2013
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2025167. (Text entry; no document attached.)
129
10/04/2013
Consent MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Capital Blue Cross.
130
10/04/2013
TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on Capital Blue Cross's Unopposed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule (Doc. # 129). The Motion (Doc. # 129) is GRANTED. Capital Blue Cross SHALL respond to the Cerven Complaint (Case No. 2:12-cv-04169-RDP) on or before November 1, 2013. Otherwise the briefing SHALL confirm to the court's existing briefing schedule (Doc. # 98). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/4/2013.
131
10/04/2013
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Defendants' Counsel regarding WellPoint, Inc.
132
10/14/2013
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Defendants' Counsel
133
10/30/2013
MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal (Capital BlueCross) by Defendants' Counsel.
134
10/30/2013
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Capital Blue Cross's Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal. (Doc. # 133). The Motion (Doc. # 133) is GRANTED. Defendant Capital Blue Cross is GRANTED LEAVE to file the referenced documents UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/30/2013
135
11/01/2013
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and, Alternatively, Improper Venue by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1, Declaration of Kimberly Meals
1 Attachment
136
11/01/2013
SEALED MOTION by Capital Blue Cross.
1
Exhibit 1)(AVC
1 Attachment
137
11/04/2013
STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
138
11/04/2013
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants' Counsel.
139
11/08/2013
PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER FED. R. EVID. 502(d) REGARDING NON-WAIVER OF INFORMATION SUBJECT TO ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE OR WORK PRODUCT PROTECTION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/8/2013.
140
11/20/2013
STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel
141
11/26/2013
THIRD STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel.
142
11/27/2013
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/27/2013.
143
11/27/2013
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/27/2013.
144
12/06/2013
STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel
1
Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order
1 Attachment
145
12/17/2013
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/17/2013.
146
01/09/2014
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Change of Firm Name
147
01/13/2014
TEXT ORDER - The pending Motions to Dismiss in this matter are SET for a hearing at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, April 9, 2014, in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. The court anticipates that the Special Master will circulate a call in number for counsel wishing to attend by telephone. However, anyone wishing to present argument SHALL attend in person. All persons attending by phone are REMINDED to mute their phones unless actually addressing the court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/13/14.
148
01/15/2014
OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss 108 & 120 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
149
01/15/2014
JOINT OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss Arguments Common to both Providers and Subscribers 108 MOTION filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
150
01/15/2014
Brief in Joint Opposition to Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue 107, 112, 113, 119, 121, 122, 125, 135 and 136 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
151
01/15/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 114 MOTION to Dismiss (Provider Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 114)) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
152
01/15/2014
OPPOSITION to Carefirst of Maryland, Inc's Motion to Dismiss 110 & 111 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
153
01/15/2014
Brief on Non-Common Issues in Oppostion to Motions to Dismiss 108, 114, 115, 116, 117 and 120 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
154
01/16/2014
AMENDED Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 108 & 120 by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
155
01/16/2014
AMENDED Response to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion to Dismiss 114 by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
156
01/21/2014
MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Unopposed Motion of Co-Lead Counsel to Appoint Thomas V. Bender to the Discovery Committee for the Provider Track and Notification of Withdrawal of D. Brian Hufford as Provider Counsel) by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
157
01/22/2014
MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Antitrust Professors by movant.
1
Exhibit EX 1 - Amici Curiae Brief
2
Certificate of Service
2 Attachments
158
01/22/2014
TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Antitrust Professors in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine 157. The Motion 157 is GRANTED. The Antitrust Professors are directed to file their proposed brief electronically with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/22/14.
159
01/22/2014
Brief of Amici - Antitrust Professors.
1
Exhibit A - Areeda & Hovencamp Excerpt
2
Certificate of Service
2 Attachments
160
01/22/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by Henry C Quillen
161
01/22/2014
TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the Unopposed Motion of Co-Lead Counsel to Appoint Thomas V. Bender to the Discovery Committee for the Provider Track and Notification of Withdrawal of D. Brian Hufford as Provider Counsel 156. For good cause shown, and because the Motion is unopposed, the Motion 156 is GRANTED. The court hereby APPOINTS Thomas V. Bender to the Discovery Committee for the Provider Track and ACCEPTS the withdrawal of D. Brian Hufford from the Written Submissions Committee for the Provider Track. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/22/14.
162
02/11/2014
MOTION to Amend the May 31, 2013 Order 80 Order by Special Master.
1
Exhibit Proposed Order
1 Attachment
163
02/11/2014
ORDER GRANTING THE SPECIAL MASTERS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMENDTHE MAY 31, 2013 ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOLS FOR PLAINTIFFSCOUNSEL TIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS-re: 162. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/11/2014.
164
02/24/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/24/2014.
165
02/24/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/24/2014.
166
03/04/2014
NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406 Notice of Firm Change
167
03/04/2014
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel Notice of Change of Firm Name
168
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 107 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 150 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1- Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury
1 Attachment
169
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 119 SEALED MOTION, 135 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and, Alternatively, Improper Venue, 150 Response in Opposition to Motion, 112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, Alternatively, Improper Venue filed by Defendants' Counsel.
170
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 114 MOTION to Dismiss by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit A
2 Attachments
171
03/06/2014
MOTION to Amend/Correct Order of Dismissal by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
172
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 121 MOTION in Supprot of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania filed by Defendants' Counsel.
173
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 108 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants' Counsel.
174
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 116 MOTION to Dismiss BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina and Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff Shred 360,LLC filed by Defendants' Counsel.
175
03/06/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. filed by Defendants' Counsel.
176
03/06/2014
REPLY to re 113 Reply Memorandum of Excellus Health Plan, Inc., d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield, on Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants' Counsel.
177
03/06/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Missippi filed by movant.
1
Exhibit A (Supplemental Declaration of John Proctor)
1 Attachment
178
03/06/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
179
03/06/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants' Counsel.
180
04/07/2014
TEXT ORDER - Based upon the parties' request, the argument previously set for 10:00 AM on Wednesday, April 9, 2014, is hereby RE-SET at 9:00 AM the same day. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/7/14.
04/09/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2014 re pending motions to dismiss. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
181
04/10/2014
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants' Counsel.
182
04/10/2014
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Allow Withdrawal of Additional Counsel for USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield. The Motion was filed in Case No. 2:13-cv-20000-RDP, but should have been filed in the underlying case, Case No. 2:13-cv-00014-RDP, Sosebee v. USAble Mutual Insurance Company. The Motion (Case No. 2:13-cv-20000-RDP, Doc. # 181) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE attorneys Gordon S. Rather, Jr. and Scott A. Irby as counsel for USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield in both cases, and to docket this text order in Case No. 2:13-cv-00014-RDP also. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/10/2014.
183
04/16/2014
REPLY to (Correspondence to Judge Proctor) filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
184
04/18/2014
RESPONSE to Subcriber Plaintiffs' April 16, 2014 Letter filed by Defendants' Counsel.
185
04/25/2014
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff, Gaston CPA Firm, P.C. by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
1 Attachment
186
04/25/2014
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney Anu M. Brady. 185. The Motion 85 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE attorney Brady. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/25/2014.
187
04/29/2014
Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/9/2014, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014.
188
05/15/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by Edwin J Kilpela, Jr
189
05/22/2014
MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw of Andrew C. Allen by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
190
05/22/2014
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney Andrew C. Allen. 189. The Motion 189 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE attorney Allen. Generally, appearances and Motions to Withdraw should be filed in the underlying case in which the attorney wishes to or has appeared, rather than in the MDL, since the service list for the MDL is generated from those cases. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is FURTHER DIRECTED to TERMINATE Attorney Allen also in the underlying case in which he appeared, case No. 2:12-cv-02532. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/22/2014.
191
05/22/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/22/2014.
192
05/22/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/22/2014.
193
06/02/2014
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re 108 MOTION to Dismiss Provider Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
194
06/02/2014
STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel
195
06/05/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by Henry C Quillen
196
06/06/2014
RESPONSE to re 193 Provider Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants' Counsel.
197
06/10/2014
ORDER REGARDING NON-WAIVER OF WORK PRODUCT DOCTRINE PROTECTION AND ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AS A RESULT OF THE SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS COMMON BENEFIT TIME AND EXPENSE RECORDS TO THE SPECIAL MASTER AND THE COURT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/10/2014.
198
06/11/2014
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and For Appointment of Substitute Counsel by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
2
Exhibit A
2 Attachments
199
06/12/2014
ORDER granting 198 Tanya Chutkan's Motion to Withdraw and for Appointment of Substitute Counsel; attorney Richard A. Feinstein is APPOINTED as Co-Chair of the Subscriber Track Experts Committee; Added attorney Richard A Feinstein for Plaintiffs' Counsel. Attorney Tanya Chutkan terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/12/14.
200
06/12/2014
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
201
06/13/2014
TEXT ORDER This matter before the court on the Motion of the Subscriber Plaintiffs to Amend the Subscriber Track Consolidated Class Action Complaint. 200 To the extent Defendants have any opposition to the Motion consistent with Rule 15(a), such opposition SHALL be filed on or before June 20, 2014. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/13/2014.
202
06/16/2014
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Defendants' Counsel.
203
06/17/2014
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Joint Request for an Amended Scheduling Order. 202. The request 202 is GRANTED. To the extent Defendants have any opposition to the Motion of the Subscriber Plaintiffs to Amend the Subscriber Track Consolidated Class Action Complaint 200 consistent with Rule 15(a), such opposition SHALL be filed on or before June 27, 2014. Subscriber Plaintiffs may reply on or before July 11, 2014. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/17/2014.
204
06/18/2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/18/2014.
205
06/18/2014
ORDER-In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion 204, the court concludes that various Dfts' Motions to Dismiss 107, 110, 112, 113, 114, 116, 119, 121, 122, 125,and 135 are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Dfts' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss 108 is DENIED IN PART. By 7/15/2014, the parties SHALL file a joint status report regarding a proposal for consideration of the remaining issues raised in Dfts' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss 115 related to the Consolidated Motion to Dismiss 108. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/18/2014.
206
06/19/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles C Hunter
207
06/19/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J Axelrod
208
06/27/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Defendants' Counsel.
209
07/11/2014
REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
210
07/15/2014
STATUS REPORT (Joint Report) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel
211
07/15/2014
STATUS REPORT (Joint Report Regarding Discovery Plan) by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel
212
07/15/2014
STATUS REPORT (Joint Report Regarding Pending Motions to Dismiss) by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel
213
07/29/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Phillip Campbell
214
08/06/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by J Allen Schreiber
215
08/14/2014
ORDER -re: Motion to Amend the Subscriber Track Consolidated Class Action Complaint 200. The motion is GRANTED. All current deadlines to file amended complaints are VACATED. The remainder of the relief sought in the Motion to dismiss 108 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Complaints to which those arguments are addressed will no longer be the operative Complaints. Therefore, the remainder of that Motion is MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/14/2014.
216
08/14/2014
NOTICE of Change of Address by R Christopher Cowan
217
08/25/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/25/2014.
218
08/25/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/25/2014.
219
08/28/2014
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
220
08/28/2014
Brief (Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan).
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
221
08/28/2014
Brief re 219 Status Report (Brief in Support of Defendants' Discovery Plan).
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
4 Attachments
222
09/02/2014
STATUS REPORT (Advanced Surgery Plaintiffs' Supplemental Status Report) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel
223
09/22/2014
ORDER -This case is SET for a status conference on 11/7/2014 at 10:00a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. By 11/3/2014, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed briefing schedule for motions to dismiss, as well as a proposed agenda of other items that should be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/22/2014.
224
09/30/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
225
10/01/2014
TEXT ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 10/6/2014 at 11:30 AM in courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam; court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/1/14.
10/06/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 10/6/2014; statements from plas' and dfts' counsel; parties to submit discovery plan by 10/14/14; discovery plan to be entered by Judge Putnam; hrg adj (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
226
10/09/2014
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/6/2014, before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number 205-492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2015.
1
cert page) (AVC
1 Attachment
227
10/10/2014
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing of Amended Proposed Discovery Plan)
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
228
10/14/2014
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding Updated Discovery Plan Proposal
1
Exhibit A (Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan)
1 Attachment
229
10/16/2014
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2014.
230
10/20/2014
TEXT ORDER re 229 Discovery Order No. 1. At the request of the parties, the conference with the Magistrate Judge previously set for October 23, 2014, is RESET for Wednesday, October 22, 2014, at 3:00 PM CT in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 20, 2014.
10/20/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 10/20/2014. (Court Reporter none.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
231
10/22/2014
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/22/14.
10/22/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 10/22/2014; statements from plas' and dfts' counsel; Discovery Order No. 2 to be entered; hrg adj (Court Reporter Cheryl Powell.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
232
10/31/2014
NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company of Service of Discovery Responses
233
11/05/2014
Transcript of Proceedings held on October 22, 2014, before Judge Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cheryl Powell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2015.
234
11/06/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Yawanna Nabors McDonald on behalf of Defendants' Counsel
11/07/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 11/7/2014. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
235
11/10/2014
TEXT ORDER - The court conducted a status conference in this matter on November 7, 2014. As discussed during that conference, on or before December 8, 2014, the parties SHALL file a joint status report regarding whether they have been able to reach a stipulation regarding how the court and parties should approach the personal jurisdiction, venue, and improper party-plaintiff arguments advanced by certain of the Defendants. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/10/2014.
236
11/25/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
237
12/02/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/2/2014.
238
12/02/2014
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/2/2014.
239
12/02/2014
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/7/2014, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah Turner, Telephone number 256-656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2015.
240
12/08/2014
JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Personal Jurisdiction and Venue Motions filed by Defendants' Counsel
241
12/17/2014
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Notice of Agreement Regarding Discovery Order
242
12/18/2014
ORDER -re: Notice of Agreement Regarding Discovery Order 241. The court construes the notice as a Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 1. The motion is GRANTED. The date for completing meet and confers under Section III.B.1 of Discovery Order No. 1 is extended to 1/14/2015, and the date for submitting to the Court any unresolved disputes under Section III.B.1 is extended to 1/16/2015. All other dates and provisions in Discovery Order No. 1 remain in place.Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/18/2014.
243
12/18/2014
MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal by Defendants' Counsel.
244
12/19/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Subscriber Track Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
245
12/19/2014
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Capital Blue Cross's Motion to Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal. 243. The Motion 243 is GRANTED. Capital Blue Cross may file the referenced documents UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/19/2014.
246
12/22/2014
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel OF AGREEMENT REGARDING CFMI'S NEED TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Modified on 12/22/2014.
247
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama.
248
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama.
249
12/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Kimberly Meals)
1 Attachment
250
12/22/2014
TEXT ORDER. Telephone Conference set with Ed Gentle, Barry Ragsdale, and Kimberly West, for Tuesday, January 6, 2015, at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Counsel may call chambers by dialing 866-933-0528 and entering PIN number 3894. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on December 22, 2014.
251
12/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue as to Triple-S Salud, Inc. by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Osvaldo Feliu-Villegas
1 Attachment
252
12/22/2014
USAble Mutual Insurance Company, dba Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield's Answer to Subscriber Track Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.
253
12/22/2014
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint to Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.
254
12/22/2014
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan ANSWER to 85 Amended Complaint of Subscriber Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.
255
12/22/2014
USAble Mutual Insurance Company dba Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield's Answer to Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Track Complaint ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.
256
12/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi by movant.
1
Exhibit 1 (Second Supplemental Declaration of John Proctor III)
1 Attachment
257
12/22/2014
Brief re 256 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi filed by movant.
258
12/22/2014
Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield by Defendants' Counsel.
259
12/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by National Account Service LLC, Consortium Health Plans, Inc.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
260
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Anthem, Inc.
261
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
262
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company.
263
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
264
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by BCBSM, Inc.
265
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina.
266
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island.
267
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina.
268
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.
269
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Vermont.
270
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.
271
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Hawaii Medical Service Association.
272
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey.
273
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Wellmark, Inc.
274
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Anthem, Inc.
275
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
276
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company.
277
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
278
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by BCBSM, Inc.
279
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina.
280
12/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania.
1
Memorandum in Support
2
Affidavit of Brian Rinker
3
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 Attachments
281
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island.
282
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina.
283
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.
284
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Vermont.
285
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.
286
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Hawaii Medical Service Association.
287
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey.
288
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Wellmark, Inc.
289
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association.
290
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.
291
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by CareFirst, Inc.
292
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
293
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.
294
12/22/2014
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re: 244 (Subscriber Track, D.I. 244) by Defendants' Counsel.
295
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield Association.
296
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by CareFirst, Inc.
297
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Blue Shield of California.
298
12/22/2014
Defendant Premera Blue Cross's Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Premera Blue Cross.
299
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
300
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Blue Shield of California.
301
12/22/2014
Defendant Premera Blue Crosss Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Premera Blue Cross.
302
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.
303
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Health Care Service Corporation and Caring for Montanan's, Inc.
304
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Health Care Service Corporation and Caring for Montanan's, Inc.
305
12/22/2014
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to 236 Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.
306
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Highmark, Inc.
307
12/22/2014
ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint by Highmark, Inc.
308
12/22/2014
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to 244 Amended Complaint for Subscriber Track Plaintiffs against All Defendants) by Defendants' Counsel.
309
12/22/2014
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to 236 Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.
310
12/22/2014
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to 244 Amended Complaint for Subscriber Track Plaintiffs against All Defendants by Defendants' Counsel.
311
12/22/2014
Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to 236 Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.
312
12/22/2014
Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to 244 Amended Complaint for Subscriber Track Plaintiffs against All Defendants) by Defendants' Counsel.
313
12/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss
2
Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Affidavit of Christine Epper (AZ)
3
Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Shelley Pittman (KS)
4
Exhibit 3 - Supplemental Affidavit of Dave Keiter (WY)
5
Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Affidavit of David Horn (HHNY)
6
Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Sharon Fletcher (ND
6 Attachments
314
12/22/2014
SEALED MOTION of Capital BlueCross to dismiss.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
01/06/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2015. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
315
01/06/2015
TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the telephone conference held on January 6, 2015, the Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, January 22, 2015, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3B, at the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Any letter briefs regarding issues to be discussed at the Status Conference shall be submitted by the Plaintiffs no later than January 16, 2015. The Defendants may file a response no later than noon CST on January 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on January 6, 2015.
316
01/12/2015
ORDER -This case is SET for a status conference on 1/21/2015 at 10:00a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse. By 1/19/2015, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed briefing schedule for pending motions, as well as a proposed agenda of other items that should be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/12/2015.
317
01/13/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-15 schedule with NDAL case number)(AVC
1 Attachment
318
01/15/2015
NOTICE of Change of Address by R Christopher Cowan
319
01/19/2015
REPORT Regarding Briefing Schedule and Agenda for Status Conference of January 21 2015 by Special Master.
320
01/20/2015
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Case Management Order Regarding Deposition Guidelines
1
Proposed Case Management Order No. ___ : Deposition Guidelines
1 Attachment
01/21/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 1/21/2015. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing/Status Conference held on 1/22/2015. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
321
01/27/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from 12/1/2014 through 12/31/2014. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/27/2015.
322
01/27/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from 12/1/2014 through 12/31/2014. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/27/2015.
323
02/06/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, 258 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield, 249 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, 280 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, 251 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue as to Triple-S Salud, Inc., 256 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
324
02/06/2015
DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM NO. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/6/2015.
325
02/06/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 259 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, 313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, 258 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield, 249 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, 280 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, 251 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue as to Triple-S Salud, Inc., 314 SEALED MOTION, 256 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi (Subscriber Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dismiss Asserting Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue) filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
326
02/10/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/21/2015, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 3/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015.
327
02/12/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/12/2015.
328
02/13/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 259 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
329
02/16/2015
Joint MOTION for Discovery Order for New Parties by Consortium Health Plans, Inc., National Account Service LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
330
02/18/2015
TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to notification by the Special Master that the parties are not in need of a discovery conference at this time, the monthly status call implemented by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) is cancelled for the month of February, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 18, 2015.
331
02/20/2015
MOTION for Discovery Schedule for Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production (Unopposed) by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
332
02/23/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 4 (NEW PARTIES). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/23/2015.
333
02/23/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 5 -- SETTING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION- Certain dfts who have identified themselves to pltfs will have until 2/26/2015 to serve written responses and objections to the RFPs; The remaining dfts will have until 3/25/2015 to serve their written responses and objections to the RFPs. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/23/2015.
334
02/27/2015
ORDER -This case is SET for a status conference on 3/17/2015 at 10:00a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. By 3/13/2015, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/27/2015.
335
03/09/2015
NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard P Rouco
336
03/10/2015
RESPONSE in Support re 313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants' Counsel.
337
03/10/2015
STATUS REPORT Report Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of March 17, 2015 by Special Master. filed by Special Master
338
03/10/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 258 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A: Affidavit of Todd Muscatello
2
Exhibit B: Affidavit of Denise Carlson
2 Attachments
339
03/10/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, 314 SEALED MOTION of Capital BlueCross filed by Defendants' Counsel.
340
03/10/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue as to Triple-S Salud, Inc. filed by Defendants' Counsel.
341
03/10/2015
REPLY Brief filed by Movant movant re: 256 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi filed by movant.
342
03/10/2015
MOTION to Intervene by Amber Lambert, Jonathan Rich.
343
03/11/2015
Joint MOTION For Entry of Proposed Case Management Order Regarding Protocol Relating to the Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
344
03/12/2015
ORDER -re: Motion to Intervene with Newly Discovered Evidence 342. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because it fails to attach a proposed Complaint in Intervention. The parties should be prepared to discuss an appropriate resolution of Lambert's and Rich's desire to intervene at the status conference on 3/17/2015 at 10:00a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/12/2015.
345
03/16/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by National Account Service LLC, Consortium Health Plans, Inc.
03/17/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 3/17/2015. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
346
03/23/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, March 26, 2015, at 3:00 PM, via telephone, as arranged by the Special Master. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions by the parties are governed by subsection II.D.2. of Discovery Order No. 1. (Doc. 229, p. 6). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 23, 2015.
347
03/23/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/17/2015, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number 256-656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 4/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2015.
348
03/25/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from January 1, 2015 through February 28, 2015. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/25/2015.
349
03/25/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from January 1, 2015 through February 28, 2015. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/25/2015.
350
03/25/2015
JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Discovery by Defendants' Counsel.
03/26/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/26/2015. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
351
04/07/2015
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Filings in Related MDL Proceedings
352
04/08/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 5 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-16 schedule)(AVC
1 Attachment
353
04/09/2015
ORDER -The parties are ORDERED to file a joint written status report by 4/20/2015 addressing the issues as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/9/2015.
354
04/15/2015
Joint MOTION for Entry of Expert Stipulation and Proposed Order by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
355
04/15/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 6 - EXPERT STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/15/2015.
356
04/16/2015
CASE MANAGEMENT AND DISCOVERY ORDER No. 7: PROTOCOL RELATING TO THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/16/2015.
357
04/20/2015
TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to notification by the Special Master that the parties are not in need of a discovery conference at this time, the monthly discovery status conference call implemented by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) is cancelled for the month of April, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 20, 2015.
358
04/20/2015
ORDER -This case is SET for a status conference on 5/19/2015 at 10:30a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. By 5/15/2015, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/20/2015.
359
04/20/2015
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel.
360
04/21/2015
ORDER - re: 359 Joint Status Report. In light of the stated desire of a subgroup of the moving Dfts to present additional oral argument on the pending personal jurisdiction and venue motions, the court will entertain additional argument at the 5/19/2015 status conference. However, those Dfts wishing to present argument SHALL confer and coordinate so that only one attorney will argue for those Dfts wishing to present additional argument on the issue of personal jurisdiction and another single attorney will argue for those Dfts wishing to present additional argument on the issue of venue. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/21/2015.
361
04/27/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-17 schedule)(AVC
1 Attachment
362
05/04/2015
REPORT Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of May 19, 2015 by Special Master.
363
05/08/2015
NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel of Plaintiffs' Position on Discovery Limits
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
364
05/08/2015
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Defendants' Proposed Discovery Limits
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
365
05/14/2015
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel re 249 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, 314 SEALED MOTION Capital BlueCross's Notice of Filing of Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue
1
Supplement Supplemental Declaration of Kimberly Meals
1 Attachment
05/19/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 5/19/2015. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
366
05/21/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, May 28, 2015 at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions by the parties are governed by subsection II.D.2. of Discovery Order No. 1. (Doc. 229, p. 6). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 21, 2015.
367
05/26/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from March 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/26/2015.
368
05/26/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from March 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/26/2015.
369
05/27/2015
ORDER-re: Supplemental Motions to Dismiss 249, 251, 256, 258, 280, 313, and 314. The Motions are due to be and hereby are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The moving dfts may renew those motions after jurisdictional discovery is complete, if there is a basis for dismissal under Rules 12(b)(2) and/or (3). The parties are DIRECTED to work with Judge Putnam to develop a discovery plan which will allow for jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/26/2015.
370
05/27/2015
ORDER-re: Motion to Dismiss filed by NAS and CHP 259. The motion is DENIED. The parties are DIRECTED to work with Judge Putnam to develop a discovery plan which will encompass expedited discovery on issues relevant to these Defendants' arguments for dismissal. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/26/2015.
371
05/27/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/19/2015, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2015.
05/28/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 5/28/2015. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
372
06/04/2015
CASE MANAGEMENT AND DISCOVERY ORDER No. 8. Signed by Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam on 6/4/2015. Modified on 6/5/2015.
373
06/12/2015
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Michael Murphy to Discovery Committee for the Provider Track (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
374
06/15/2015
ORDER-re: 373 Motion to Appoint Michael L. Murphy to the Discovery Committee for the Provider Track. The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Murphy is APPOINTED to serve on the Provider Track Discovery Committee. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/15/2015.
375
06/19/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, June 25, 2015 at 3:00 PM, via telephone, as arranged by the Special Master. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions by the parties are governed by subsection II.D.2. of Discovery Order No. 1. (Doc. 229, p. 6). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 19, 2015.
06/25/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2015. (Court Reporter Cheryl Powell.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
376
06/25/2015
ORDER -Discovery Order No. 1 229 is hereby amended that all meet and confers regarding Structured Data request shall be completed by 8/28/2015. All other dates and provisions in Discovery Order No. 1 remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/25/2015.
377
07/01/2015
STATUS REPORT Regarding Case Management by Defendants' Counsel.
378
07/01/2015
Provider Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Streamlining of the Litigation, Class Certification and Trial by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
379
07/01/2015
Subscriber Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Streamlining of the Litigation, Class Certification and Trial by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
380
07/09/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, July 23, 2015 at 1:00 PM, in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions by the parties are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 9, 2015.
381
07/09/2015
ORDER-This case is SET for a status conference on 8/19/2015 at 10:30a.m. in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. By 8/17/2015, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/9/2015.
382
07/13/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference previously set for July 23, 2015, is RESET for Wednesday, July 29, 2015 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions by the parties are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 13, 2015.
383
07/15/2015
REPLY in Support of 377 Defendants' Case Management Proposal filed by Defendants' Counsel.
384
07/15/2015
Reply in Support of 378 Provider Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Streamlining of the Litigation, Class Certification and Trial by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
385
07/15/2015
Subscriber Plaintiffs' Response to 377 Defendants' Status Report Regarding Case Management by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
386
07/17/2015
JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Order No. 8 by Defendants' Counsel.
387
07/21/2015
SEALED MOTION-Motion to Compel BCBS-SC Production of 30(B)(6) Witnesses and Documents and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Declaration
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D)(AVC
5 Attachments
388
07/22/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/22/2015.
389
07/22/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/22/2015.
07/29/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 7/29/2015. Written order to be entered at a later date. (Court Reporter Teresa Robertson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
390
08/04/2015
TEXT ORDER re 387 SEALED MOTION filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. As discussed at the Status Conference held July 29, 2015, the defendants' response to the Sealed Motion (doc. 387) is due no later than August 7, 2015. Any reply is due no later than August 14, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on August 4, 2015.
391
08/04/2015
DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM NO. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/4/2015.
392
08/07/2015
***Document Sealed-Pursuant to Protective Order 145 -Response in Opposition to Joint Motion to Compel Production of 30(B)(6) Witnesses and Documents
1
Table of Contents and Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3 Part 1
4
Exhibit 3 Part 2
5
Exhibit 3 Part 3
6
Exhibit 3 Part 4
7
Exhibit 3 Part 5
8
Exhibits 4-7) (AVC
8 Attachments
393
08/10/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 5 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-19 schedule w/NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
394
08/14/2015
Report Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of August 19, 2015
395
08/14/2015
***SEALED*** Joint REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of Its 387 Motion to Compel BCBS-SC Production of 30(B)(6) Witnesses and Documents.
08/19/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 8/19/2015. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
396
08/20/2015
ORDER -It is ORDERED that by 9/2/2015, the parties SHALL file simultaneous initial briefs, limited to thirty (30) pages, addressing the questions posed by the court at the status conference. By 9/9/2015, the parties may file responsive briefs, limited to fifteen (15) pages, on these issues. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/20/2015.
397
08/21/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No.1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, August 27, 2015 at 1:00 PM, in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam.Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions by the parties are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on August 21, 2015.
398
08/24/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/19/2015, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number 256-656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2015.
399
08/25/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/6/2015, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number 205-492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015.
1
certification page) (AVC
1 Attachment
400
08/25/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/26/2015, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number 205-492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015.
1
certification page) (AVC
1 Attachment
401
08/25/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/29/2015, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number 205-492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015.
1
certification page) (AVC
1 Attachment
402
08/25/2015
MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery of Unrelated Litigation by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406.
1
Supplement Index of Exhibits
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
5 Attachments
403
08/26/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-20) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-20 schedule w/NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
404
08/26/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-21) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-21 schedule w/NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
08/27/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Status Conference - Discovery Hearing held on 8/27/2015. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
405
08/27/2015
ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/27/2015.
406
08/27/2015
TEXT ORDER re 402 MOTION for Protective Order. Plaintiffs may file a Response to the Motion for Protective Order and a Motion to Compel no later than September 1, 2015. Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan may file a Response to the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel no later than September 8, 2015. No Replies to be filed. A Hearing regarding the Motion for Protective Order and any Motion to Compel filed by the Plaintiffs is SET for Thursday, September 17, 2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on August 27, 2015.
407
08/27/2015
TEXT ORDER. As discussed in the Discovery Status Conference held August 27, 2015, any Motions to Compel by the Plaintiffs regarding access to BCBSA archives or production of documents concerning the pending Anthem/Cigna merger may be filed no later than September 14, 2015. Any Response by the Defendants may be filed no later than September 21, 2015. No Replies shall be filed. Oral argument on the Motions will be heard immediately following the September 2015 Discovery Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on August 27, 2015.
408
09/01/2015
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
409
09/01/2015
Brief in Support of 408 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and in Opposition to 402 Motion for Protective Order by filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
8 Attachments
410
09/02/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/2/2015.
411
09/08/2015
BRIEF in Response to 408 Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan.
412
09/08/2015
Brief Regarding 396 Certification and Trial of a Nationwide Injunction Class and an Alabama Damages Class.
413
09/08/2015
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION Regarding Case Management by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
414
09/08/2015
POST-HEARING Submission in Support of 396 Proposal to Streamline the Litigation filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
415
09/08/2015
Brief in Response to 396 Court's August 20,2015 Order, filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
416
09/09/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
cto-22 schedule with NDAL case number)(AVC
1 Attachment
417
09/11/2015
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to Court's Discovery Order No. 9 by Defendants' Counsel.
418
09/11/2015
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Object to the Court's Discovery Order No. 9. 417. The Motion 417 is GRANTED. The deadline to object is EXTENDED until fourteen (14) days after a ruling on Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina's anticipated Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/11/2015.
419
09/14/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Monday, October 5, 2015 at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 14, 2015.
420
09/14/2015
MOTION to Compel Inspection of the Blue Cross Blue Shield Association's Archives by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
7
Exhibit F
8
Exhibit G
9
Exhibit H
9 Attachments
421
09/14/2015
MOTION to Compel Anthem's Production of the Anthem-Cigna Merger Documents by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
7
Exhibit F
8
Exhibit G
9
Exhibit H
10
Exhibit I
11
Exhibit J
12
Exhibit K
13
Exhibit L
13 Attachments
422
09/16/2015
MOTION to Amend 327 Discovery Order No. 3 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
423
09/16/2015
Brief in Support of 422 MOTION to Amend Discovery Order No. 3 filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
424
09/16/2015
MOTION for Reconsideration of 410 the Court's Discovery Order No. 9 by Defendants' Counsel.
425
09/17/2015
TEXT ORDER re 422 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend 327 Discovery Order No. 3. The plaintiffs and defendants may file briefs in support or opposition to the motion by no later than September 28, 2015. The briefs may be no more than ten (10) pages in length. Oral argument on the motion will be heard immediately following the Discovery Status Conference set for October 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 17, 2015.
426
09/17/2015
TEXT ORDER re 424 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina's Motion for Reconsideration of 410 the Court's Discovery Order No. 9. The plaintiffs may file a response to the Motion no later than September 28, 2015. The response may be no more than twelve (12) pages in length. Oral argument on the motion will be heard immediately following the Discovery Status Conference set for October 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 17, 2015.
09/17/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2015 re 402 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Discovery of Unrelated Litigation filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406, and 408 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel; counsel for plas and dfts present; arguments by counsel; court's remarks; hrg adj (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
427
09/21/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition to 420 Motion to Compel filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A - 7/23/15 Letter to Plaintiff
1 Attachment
428
09/21/2015
MOTION to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Amending Discovery Order No. 1)
1 Attachment
429
09/21/2015
OPPOSITION to 421 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Proposed CIGNA Acquisition filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A - Correspondence
2
Exhibit B - Anthem's Letter Brief
2 Attachments
430
09/22/2015
JOINT STATUS Regarding Additional Subscriber & Provider Underlying Complaints by Defendants' Counsel.
431
09/22/2015
REPLY Brief regarding 396 Certification and Trial of a Nationwide Injunction Class and an Alabama Damages Class.
1
Exhibit 1 - SEALED
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
432
09/22/2015
REPLY to Supplemental Submissions Regarding Case Management filed by Defendants' Counsel.
433
09/22/2015
REPLY Brief in Response to the Court's August 20, 2015 Order 396 filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel.
434
09/22/2015
Subscriber Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Response in Further Support of their Proposal to Streamline the Litigation re 396, 414, 412, 413 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
435
09/23/2015
***Document Sealed -Pursuant to Protective Order 145 -Exhibit 1 to 431 Provider Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Regarding Certification and Trial of a Nationwide Injunction Class and an Alabama Damages Class.
1
Exhibit 1) (AVC
1 Attachment
436
09/23/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from July 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/23/2015.
437
09/23/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from July 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/23/2015.
438
09/28/2015
Opposition to 424 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
439
09/28/2015
Opposition to 422 Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 3 filed by Defendants' Counsel.
440
10/05/2015
TEXT ORDER re 424 MOTION for Reconsideration of 410 the Court's Discovery Order No. 9. Oral Argument of the Motion is RESET for Thursday, October 8, 2015, at 3:00 PM, via telephone, before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam, as arranged by the Special Master. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 5, 2015.
10/05/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2015; re: SC Motion for reconsideration (doc #424); Ed Gentle, Special Master, plas' counsel Barry Ragsdale & Bill Butterfield, and SC counsel Bruce Rogers present; motion hearing to be held by telephone re: doc #424 on Thursday, 10/8/15 at 3:00 PM (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Status Conference held on 10/5/2015; updates from counsel on meet & confer process; discussion regarding items for next discovery conference; arguments by counsel on motions #420, #421, & #422; hrg adj (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/08/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held by telephone on 10/8/2015 re 424 MOTION for Reconsideration of 410 the Court's Discovery Order No. 9 filed by Defendants' Counsel; arguments by counsel for SC dft; arguments by counsel for plas; court's remarks; taken under submission (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
441
10/15/2015
MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal by Capital BlueCross by Defendants' Counsel.
442
10/16/2015
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Capital Blue Cross's Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration Under Seal. 441. The Motion 441 is GRANTED. Capital Blue Cross may file the referenced documents UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/16/2015.
443
10/19/2015
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel re 255 Answer to Amended Complaint, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, dba Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield's Notice that its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint Applies to Newly Filed Provider Track Complaints
444
10/19/2015
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi.
445
10/19/2015
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by Consortium Health Plans, Inc.
446
10/19/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi by movant.
1
Exhibit 1 (Declaration of John H. Proctor, III)
1 Attachment
447
10/19/2015
Brief in Support of 446 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi.
448
10/19/2015
ANSWER to 236 Amended Complaint by National Account Service LLC.
449
10/19/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly-Filed Complaints by Defendants' Counsel
450
10/19/2015
NOTICE that Its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Corrected Consolidated Second Amended Provider Complaint Applies to Newly Filed Provider-Track Complaints by Independence Hospital Indemnity Plan, Inc.'s (f/k/a Independence Blue Cross)
451
10/19/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly Filed Complaints by Highmark Inc.
452
10/19/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly Filed Complaints by Health Care Service Corporation and Caring For Montanans, Inc.
453
10/19/2015
NOTICE of Answers and Affirmative Defenses to Tag-Along Actions by Defendants' Counsel
454
10/19/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleading to Newly-Filed Complaints by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
455
10/19/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly-Filed Complaints by Premera Blue Cross, Also, d/b/a Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska.
456
10/19/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Provider Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, and Brief in Support Thereof by Triple-S Salud.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
457
10/20/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 10-The Motion for Protective Order 402 is DENIED, and the Motion to Compel 408 is GRANTED as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/20/2015.
458
10/20/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/20/2015.
459
10/20/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 12. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/20/2015.
460
10/22/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, November 19, 2015 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. Oral Argument on 428 MOTION to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 will be heard immediately following the conference. Any response to the motion may be no more than two (2) pages in length and is due no later than October 29, 2015. No replies shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 22, 2015.
461
10/23/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by California Physicians' Service, Inc., d/b/a Blue Shield of California.
462
10/23/2015
Brief in Support of 461 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction.
1
Affidavit of Jennifer Garrison
1 Attachment
463
10/23/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly Filed Complaints by California Physicians' Services Inc., d/b/a Blue Shield of California.
464
10/28/2015
Highmark Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track - Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.
465
10/28/2015
Highmark Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track - Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.
466
10/29/2015
JOINT NOTICE of Agreement to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 229 by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
467
10/29/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
9 Attachments
468
10/29/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/27/2015, before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number (205) 527-2958. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2016.
1
certificaion page) (AVC
1 Attachment
469
10/30/2015
ORDER -The court ORDERS that the pending Motions to Dismiss 446, 456, 461 and 467 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Moving dfts' personal jurisdiction and venue defenses are DEEMED PRESERVED to be addressed by this court immediately prior to remand, or by the respective transferor courts after remand. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/30/2015.
470
10/30/2015
JOINT NOTICE of Agreement to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 229 by Defendants' Counsel
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
471
11/03/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/17/2015, before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy S. Fuller, Telephone number (205) 527-2958. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2016.
1
certification page) (AVC
1 Attachment
472
11/03/2015
Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposed MOTION to Modify the Time to Object to Discovery Order No. 10 by Defendants' Counsel.
473
11/03/2015
Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposed Motion for Clarification of Discovery No. 10 by Defendants' Counsel.
474
11/03/2015
Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Brief in Support of 473 Opposed Motion for Clarification of Discovery No. 10.
475
11/04/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 13-Dft's motion for reconsideration 424 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/4/2015.
476
11/05/2015
MOTION to Compel Blue Cross Blue Shield Association to De-Designate Documents Improperly Designated as Confidential in Violation of Protective Order by Plaintiffs.
1
Affidavit Declaration of Joe R. Whatley, Jr.
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
477
11/05/2015
***Document Sealed, pursuant to Protective Order 145 -Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Joe R. Whatley, Jr. in Support of 476 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Blue Cross Blue Shield Association to De-Designate Documents Improperly Designated as Confidential in Violation of the Protective Order.
1
Exhibit 5) (AVC
1 Attachment
478
11/05/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 472 Motion to Modify the Time to Object to Discovery Order No. 10. Parties shall have fourteen (14) days following the entry of the court's decision regarding 473 Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposed Motion for Clarification of Discovery Order No. 10 to file objections to 457 Discovery Order No. 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 5, 2015.
479
11/05/2015
TEXT ORDER. Any response to 473 Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposed Motion for Clarification of Discovery No. 10 is due no later than November 18, 2015, and may be no more than eleven (11) pages in length. Any response to 476 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Compel is due no later than November 18, 2015 and may be no more than sixteen (16) pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 5, 2015.
480
11/18/2015
RESPONSE to 473 Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion for Clarification filed by Plaintiffs.
481
11/18/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition to 476 Motion to Compel filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
482
11/19/2015
***Document Sealed, pursuant to Protective Order 145 -Exhibit A to Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel.
11/19/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Status Conference held on 11/19/2015; updates by counsel re meet & confer; streamlining question and issues anticipated for Dec conf discussed; arguments by counsel on BCBS Michigan Motion 473 ; arguments by counsel on plas' motion to compel association re confidential doc designation 476 ; motions under submission, order to be entered; hrg adj (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
483
11/20/2015
ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/20/2015.
484
11/20/2015
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Tuesday, December 15, 2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 20, 2015.
485
11/20/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 14. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/20/2015.
486
11/24/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services and expenses incurred from 9/1/2015 through 10/31/2015 relating solely to serviced provided to the plaintiffs, and totaling $25,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/24/2015.
487
11/24/2015
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from 9/1/2015 through 10/31/2015 as it relates to serviced rendered for both sided of the case, and totaling $10,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/24/2015.
488
12/01/2015
MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Designate Koko Mackin and Robin Stone as Production Custodians by Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
489
12/07/2015
ORDER -This case is SET for a discovery conference and a status conference on 1/14/2016. The discovery conference will be held at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Al before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. The status conference will be held at 2:00p.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Al. By 1/8/2016, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/7/2015.
490
12/08/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/2015, before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number (205)527-2958. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2016.
491
12/09/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 15. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/9/2015.
492
12/10/2015
RESPONSE to 488 Opposed Motion to Compel Designation of Koko Mackin and Robin Stone as Production Custodians filed by Defendants' Counsel.
493
12/10/2015
MOTION To Limit The Time Period Applicable To Production Of Documents In Response To Certain Unstructured Data Requests by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Appendix Exhibit Index
2
Exhibit A - Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs Requests for Production to All Defendants, January 20, 2015
3
Exhibit B - iDS Affidavit, December 10, 2015
4
Exhibit C - C. Cottrell Letter to B. Ragsdale, February 6, 2015
5
Exhibit D - C. Cottrell Letter to B. Ragsdale, April 16, 2015
6
Exhibit E - P. Sheehan Letter to C. Cottrell, December 1, 2015
7
Exhibit F - C. Cottrell Letter to B. Ragsdale, December 5, 2015
8
Exhibit G - C. Cottrell Email to Plaintiffs, December 9, 2015
9
Exhibit H - In re Ready-Mixed Concrete Antitrust Litig Entry August 18, 2006
9 Attachments
494
12/14/2015
JOINT NOTICE of Agreement to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 by Defendants' Counsel
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
495
12/14/2015
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 16-The Motion to Compel BCBAS to de-designate certain documents as confidential 476 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/14/2015.
12/15/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 12/15/2015; meet & confer updates by counsel; arguments by counsel re: motion 492 & motion 493 ; response by pla to motion 493 to be filed by Monday 12/21/15; order to be entered; hrg adj (Court Reporter Cheryl Powell.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
496
12/18/2015
Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/15/15, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cheryl K. Powell, Telephone number 256-508-4050. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. Modified on 1/11/2016.
497
12/21/2015
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
Schedule CTO-23 with NDAL Case Numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
498
12/21/2015
MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Seal by Capital BlueCross by Defendants' Counsel.
499
12/21/2015
RESPONSE to 493 Motion To Limit The Time Period Applicable To Production Of Documents In Response To Certain Unstructured Data Requests filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
500
12/22/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by movant.
1
Exhibit 1 (Declaration of John H. Proctor, III)
1 Attachment
501
12/22/2015
Brief re 500 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by movant.
502
12/23/2015
ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 1-The parties Joint Notice of Agreement to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 494 is GRANTED. Discovery Order No. 1 hereby is amended as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/23/2015.
503
12/23/2015
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Capital Blue Cross's Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Version of Declaration Under Seal 498. The Motion 498 is GRANTED. Capital Blue Cross may file the referenced document UNDER SEAL. All Counsel are REMINDED to file pleadings related only to individual cases on the docket for the individual cases rather than on the MDL docket. That is, further Motions to Dismiss should be filed in the individual cases to which they relate. The court also directs attention to its October 30, 2015 Order 469. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/23/2015.
504
12/23/2015
NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Exhibit In Support of Their Response to BCBSA's Motion to Limit the Time Period Applicable to Production of Documents in Response to Certain Unstructured Data Requests by Plaintiffs
1
Exhibit F - Part 1
2
Exhibit F - Part 2
2 Attachments
505
12/28/2015
NOTICE That Its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Subscriber-Track Amended Consolidated Class-Action Complaint Applies to Newly Amended Subscriber-Track Complaints by Defendants' Counsel
506
12/28/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleading to Newly-Filed Complaints by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
507
12/28/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly Filed Complaints by Highmark Inc.
508
12/28/2015
NOTICE of Answers and Affirmative Defenses to Tag-Along Actions by Defendants' Counsel.
509
12/28/2015
MOTION For Leave To File A Reply by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1 - Reply In Support Of Motion To Limit The Time Period For Production Of Certain Unstructured Data
1 Attachment
510
12/28/2015
NOTICE Regarding Responsive Pleading to Newly Filed Complaints by Blue Shield of California.
511
12/29/2015
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly-Filed Complaints
512
12/30/2015
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly-Filed Complaints
513
12/31/2015
MOTION to Compel by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
514
01/04/2016
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit 1 - Surreply
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
515
01/05/2016
ORDER granting motions 509 & 514. The Association is directed to file its reply by 1/8/2016, and the pltfs are directed to file a surreply by 1/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/5/2016.
516
01/05/2016
REPLY in Support of 493 Motion to Limit the Time Period for Production of Certain Unstructured Data filed by Defendants' Counsel.
517
01/06/2016
SURREPLY in Support of Their Response to BCBSA's Motion to Limit the Time Period Applicable to Production of Documents in Response to Certain Unstructured Data Requests filed by Plaintiffs.
518
01/06/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 17- The pltfs' Motion to Compel 488 is GRANTED, and dft BCBS-AL is DIRECTED to designate Koko Mackin and Robin Stone as production custodians. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/6/2016.
519
01/06/2016
STATUS REPORT Regarding Proposed Agenda For Status Conference of January 14, 2016 filed by Special Master.
520
01/08/2016
Revised Report Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of January 14, 2016 by Special Master.
521
01/11/2016
RESPONSE to 513 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
522
01/11/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 18- The Motion to Limit The Applicable Time Periods Relation to the Plaintiff's Requests for Unstructured Data 493 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. BCBSA shall be required to produce responsive unstructured data back to 1995 and through December 31, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/11/2016.
523
01/11/2016
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants' Counsel.
524
01/11/2016
JOINT Brief in Support of 523 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants' Counsel.
525
01/11/2016
Evidentiary Material re: 523 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 524 Brief.
526
01/12/2016
***Document Sealed -Pursuant to Protective Order 145 -Joint Brief in Support of Their Motion Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine for Summary Judgment on the Alabama Subscribers' Damages Claims.
1
Table of Contents
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit A-1
4
Exhibit A-2
5
Exhibit A-3
6
Exhibit A-4
7
Exhibit A-5
8
Exhibit A-6
9
Exhibit A-7
10
Exhibit A-8
11
Exhibit A-9
12
Exhibit A-10
13
Exhibit A-11
14
Exhibit A-12
15
Exhibit A-13
16
Exhibit A-14
17
Exhibit A-15
18
Exhibit A-16
19
Exhibit A-17
20
Exhibit A-18
21
Exhibit A-19
22
Exhibit A-20
23
Exhibit A-21
24
Exhibit A-22
25
Exhibit A-23
26
Exhibit A-24
27
Exhibit A-25
28
Exhibit A-26
29
Exhibit A-27
30
Exhibit A-28
31
Exhibit A-29
32
Exhibit A-30
33
Exhibit A-31
34
Exhibit A-32
35
Exhibit A-33
36
Exhibit A-34
37
Exhibit A-35
38
Exhibit A-36
39
Exhibit A-37
40
Exhibit A-38
41
Exhibit A-39
42
Exhibit A-40
43
Exhibit A-41
44
Exhibit A-42
45
Exhibit A-43
46
Exhibit A-44
47
Exhibit A-45
48
Exhibit A-46
49
Exhibit A-47
50
Exhibit A-48
51
Exhibit A-49
52
Exhibit A-50
53
Exhibit A-51
54
Exhibit B) (AVC
54 Attachments
527
01/13/2016
Provider Plaintiffs' STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs.
01/14/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 1/14/2016; discussions regarding progress of discovery and time periods for production; arguments by counsel re: 513 motion to compel by dft BCBS AL; hrg adj (Court Reporter Cheryl Powell.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 1/14/2016. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
528
01/19/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on January 14, 2016, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cheryl Powell, Telephone number 256-508-4050. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 2/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016.
529
01/19/2016
NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Newly Filed Complaints
530
01/19/2016
ORDER-A Discovery Status Conference is SET for Monday, January 25, 2016, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/19/2016.
531
01/21/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/14/2016, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 2/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2016.
532
01/21/2016
Joint MOTION For Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule and Proposed Order by Plaintiffs.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
533
01/22/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE-re: 532 Joint Motion For Entry of Discovery and Briefing Schedule. The joint Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Consortium and NASCO will substantially complete production of agreed-upon documents by 1/31/2016. Provider Plaintiffs may notice up to three Rule 30(b)(6) deposition sessions to be completed by 3/31/2016. Consortium and NASCO will file any motions and their opening brief within thirty (30) days of Providers Plaintiffs' last Rule 30(b)(6) deposition session. Provider Plaintiffs will file any opposition papers within thirty (30) days of Consortium and NASCO's opening brief. Consortium and NASCO will file any reply papers within twenty-one (21) days of Provider Plaintiffs' opposition papers. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/22/2016.
534
01/24/2016
STATUS REPORT in Advance of January 25, 2016 Hearing by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
16 Attachments
01/25/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 1/25/2016; arguments by counsel re BCBS AL Motion to Compel (doc # 513) (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
535
01/28/2016
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from 11/1/2015 through 12/31/2015 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the plaintiffs Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/28/2016. Modified on 1/28/2016.
536
01/28/2016
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from 11/1/2015 through 12/31/2015 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/28/2016.
537
02/04/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/25/2016, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number (205) 527-2958. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 2/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2016.
538
02/05/2016
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, February 25, 2016, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 5, 2016.
539
02/08/2016
MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs.
540
02/08/2016
Brief in Support of Motion to Compel.
541
02/10/2016
ORDER - re: 539 Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama Regarding the Filed-Rate Doctrine. Dft Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama SHALL respond to the Motion by 2/18/2016. Pltfs may reply by 2/23/2016. The Motion is set for a hearing on 3/18/2016 at 9:30a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/10/2016.
542
02/12/2016
TEXT ORDER - This case is SET for a status conference on Friday, March 18, 2016, in conjunction with the hearing previously set on the Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama Regarding the Filed-Rate Doctrine. On or before March 11, 2016, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items that should be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/12/2016.
543
02/12/2016
MOTION to Quash Deposition and Document Production Notices by Alabama Department of Insurance, The, Steve Ostlund, Robert Turner.
1
Exhibit Depo notice to Dept. of Insurance
2
Exhibit Depo notice to S. Ostlund
3
Exhibit Depo notice to R. Turner
3 Attachments
544
02/15/2016
BRIEF in Support of Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Supplement Certificate of Compliance With Rule 37
2
Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit 2
4
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
4 Attachments
545
02/17/2016
ORDER-re: 543 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas. Subscriber Plaintiffs SHALL respond to the Motion by 2/26/2016. The Department of Insurance may reply by 3/4/2016. The Motion is SET for a hearing during the status conference previously set for 3/18/2016 at 9:30a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/17/2016.
546
02/18/2016
Joint MOTION to Amend Protective Order by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
547
02/18/2016
Opposition to 539 Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding the Filed-Rate Doctrine filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
548
02/22/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 539 MOTION to Compel (Provider Plaintiffs' Response) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
549
02/22/2016
Opposition to re 544 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
550
02/23/2016
QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER amending the terms of the Protective order entered 12/17/2013 as set out in this order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/23/2016. ** SUPPLEMENTED BY 1488 ** Modified on 9/1/2017.
551
02/23/2016
REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re: 539 MOTION to Compel Discovery from BCBS-AL re the Filed-Rate Doctrine filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
552
02/23/2016
***Document Sealed - Evidentiary submissions in support of 549
1
TOC
2
Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit 2
4
Exhibit 3
5
Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit 5
6 Attachments
02/25/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Hearing held on 2/25/2016; 513 dft BCBS-AL's motion to compel is granted by agreement of the parties, provider plas' to produce documents within 10 days; 544 Alabama Subscriber Plas' motion to compel, arguments by counsel, motion taken under submission; hrg adj. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
553
02/25/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 19; granting 513 Motion to Compel; The Provider Plaintiffs are ORDERED to produce, within ten (10) days of theentry of this Order, documents in the Provider Plaintiffs possession that support the allegationthat hospitals and other facilities have closed and that other providers have reduced the scope oftheir services as a result of the defendants alleged antitrust conduct. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/25/2016.
554
02/26/2016
Opposition to 543 MOTION to Quash Discovery Subpoenas filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
555
03/01/2016
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama
1
CTO-24 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
556
03/02/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on February 25, 2016, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 3/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2016.
557
03/02/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/5/2015, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number (205) 492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 3/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2016.
1
Certification Page) (AVC
1 Attachment
558
03/03/2016
Submission of Proposed Order by Defendants' Counsel re: 539 Motion to Compel
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
559
03/04/2016
Brief in Support of 543 Motion to Quash filed by Defendants' Counsel.
560
03/04/2016
Brief in Support of 543 Motion to Quash Deposition and Document Production Notices filed by Alabama Department of Insurance, Steve Ostlund, Robert Turner.
561
03/07/2016
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Wednesday, March 23, 2016, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 7, 2016.
562
03/09/2016
JOINT MOTION to Compel Search Term Disclosures by Hogan Lovells Defendants and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Affidavit Declaration of William P. Butterfield and Supporting Exhibits A-E
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
563
03/09/2016
MOTION to Compel Defendant Highmark to Expedite the Production of Documents Related to Meetings Between Defendants by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Modified on 3/10/2016.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Text of Proposed Order
10 Attachments
564
03/09/2016
Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Expedite Production of Certain Documents by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
565
03/10/2016
SURREPLY to 551 Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding the Filed Rate Doctrine filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
566
03/11/2016
REPORT Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of March 18, 2016 by Special Master.
567
03/15/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 20-re: 544 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/15/16.
03/18/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2016 re 543 MOTION to Quash, 539 MOTION to Compel. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
568
03/18/2016
RESPONSE to 563 Motion to Compel Defendant Highmark to Expedite the Production of Documents Related to Meetings Among Certain Defendants filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
12 Attachments
569
03/18/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition to 563 Provider Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Highmark to Expedite the Production of Documents Related to Meetings Between Defendants filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
570
03/18/2016
Hogan Lovells Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to 562 Joint Motion to Compel Search Term Disclosures filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A - Cohen Declaration
2
Exhibit B - 2016.01.06 Subscriber Pls ltr to Hogan in resp to 10.16 & 11.30 ltrs re search terms w appx
3
Exhibit C - 2015.11.17 Hogan ltr to Butterfield in resp to 11.06 ltr re search terms
4
Exhibit D - 2015.07.10 DFs' Response to Pls' 6.23 ltr re unstructured disc proposal w appx
5
Exhibit E - 2015.10.16 Hogan ltr to Pls re revised search term proposal w appx
6
Exhibit F - 2015.05.21 Hogan ltr to PLs re 4.29.15 m&c and re search terms w appx
7
Exhibit G - 2015.06.02 Pls' (Sheehan) ltr to Hogan re RFPs & in resp to 05.21 ltr
8
Exhibit H - 2015.06.09 Hogan response to Pls 06.02 ltr re certain RFPs
9
Exhibit I - 2015.07.30 Hogan ltr to PLs re ESI protocol
10
Exhibit J - 2015.10.30 Hogan ltr to Butterfield, et al in resp to 10.27 ltr re search terms
11
Exhibit K - 2015.10.31 Hogan Response to Lemmon 10.30 ltr re search terms
12
Exhibit L - 2015.11.05 Sheehan ltr to Hogan re Search Terms w appx
13
Exhibit M - 2015.11.30 Hogan ltr to Sheehan in resp to 11.05 ltr re search terms w appx
14
Exhibit N - 2016.02.01 Martin ltr to Butterfield re plans' search terms w appx
15
Exhibit O - 2016.03.17 Cohen email to Pls re Search Terms
16
Exhibit P - In-re-Takata-Airbag-Prods-Liab-Litig
17
Exhibit Q - In re Polyuretheane (ESI)
18
Exhibit R - Fresh and Process Potatoes ESI Protocol
18 Attachments
571
03/21/2016
ORDER-It is ORDERED that that the Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama Regarding the Filed Rate Doctrine 539 is GRANTED. The Alabama Department of Insurance's Motion to Quash Subpoenas 543 is DENIED. The depositions at issue SHALL go forward. Plaintiffs are allowed a total of eight (8) hours for the two depositions, and those eight hours may be allocated between the two deponents as needed. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/21/2016.
572
03/21/2016
RESPONSE to 564 Motion to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Expedite Production of Certain Documents filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
9 Attachments
573
03/22/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/18/2016, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number (205) 492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 4/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2016.
1
certification page) (AVC
1 Attachment
574
03/23/2016
Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule in October 30 Order 469 by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
03/23/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 3/23/2016; arguments by counsel on motions, doc # 562, # 563 & # 564. (Court Reporter Cheryl Powell.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
575
03/24/2016
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER-The court hereby AMENDS the schedule in the court's October 30, 2016 Order 469 as set out. The schedule SHALL apply to the prioritized proceedings in American Electric Motor Services Inc. v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al., Case No. 2:12-cv-02169-RDP, Conway v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al.,Case No. 2:12- cv-02532-RDP, and Pettus Plumbing & Piping, Inc. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama et al., Case no. 3:16-cv-00297-RDP. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/23/2016.
576
03/24/2016
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT of services rendered and expenses incurred from January 1, 2016 through February 29, 2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/24/2016.
577
03/24/2016
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT of services rendered and expenses incurred from January 1, 2016 through February 29, 2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/24/2016.
578
03/29/2016
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-25 Schedle with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
579
03/31/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on March 23, 2016, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cheryl Powell, Telephone number 256-508-4050. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 4/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2016.
580
04/01/2016
JOINT NOTICE of Agreement to Amend Discovery Order No. 1 by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
581
04/04/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
582
04/08/2016
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-26 Schedule w/NDAL case number)(AVC
1 Attachment
583
04/08/2016
NOTICE That Its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Applies to Newly Filed Subscriber Track Complaints by USAble Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield.
584
04/13/2016
ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/13/2016.
585
04/13/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 21. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/13/2016.
586
04/13/2016
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, April 28, 2016, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 13, 2016.
587
04/14/2016
Joint MOTION To Enter Order Authorizing Disclosure of Certain Personally Identifiable Information by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
588
04/14/2016
Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Materials Related to the Drummond Litigation by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A - Part 1
2
Exhibit A - Part 2
3
Exhibit A - Part 3
4
Exhibit B
4 Attachments
589
04/14/2016
MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with the ESI Protocol or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
7 Attachments
590
04/15/2016
ORDER AUTHORIZING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN PERSONALLY IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION-granting Motion 587. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/15/2016.
591
04/18/2016
Opposed MOTION for a Protective Order Requiring any Party to Receive Leave of the Court Before Serving Discovery on Absent Class Members by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
592
04/18/2016
Brief in Support of 591 Opposed Motion for a Protective Order Requiring any Party to Receive Leave of the Court Before Serving Discovery on Absent Class Members.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
7 Attachments
593
04/19/2016
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 1 action to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-27 Schedule w/NDAL case number)(AVC
1 Attachment
594
04/19/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 22. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/19/2016.
595
04/20/2016
NOTICE of Change of Address by Archie C Lamb, Jr
596
04/20/2016
AMENDED Brief in Support of 591 Opposed Motion for a Protective Order Requiring any Party to Receive Leave of the Court Before Serving Discovery on Absent Class Members.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
7 Attachments
597
04/21/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 23 regarding 562 Motion to Compel ; Except as provided herein, the motion to compel is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/21/2016.
598
04/22/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 24-denying 563 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/22/2016.
599
04/25/2016
ORDER -This case is SET for a status conference on 8/11/2016 at 9:00a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. By 8/5/2016, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/25/2016.
600
04/25/2016
JOINT Opposition to 589 Motion to Compel or, in the Alternative, For a Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
601
04/25/2016
RESPONSE to 588 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of All Discovery from the Drummond Litigation filed by Defendants' Counsel.
602
04/25/2016
RESPONSE to 591 Opposed Motion for a Protective Order Requiring any Party to Receive Leave of the Court Before Serving Discovery on Absent Class Members filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A - 4/13/16 Cottrell Letter to Ragsdale & Brown
2
Exhibit B - 4/12/16 Notice of Document Subpoena to UnitedHealth Grp. Inc.
3
Exhibit C - 4/8/16 Cottrell Letter to Ragsdale & Brown
3 Attachments
04/28/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 4/28/2016; arguments by counsel on motions (docs 588, 589, & 591) (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
603
05/06/2016
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 3 actions to the Northern District of Alabama.
1
CTO-28 Schedule with NDAL Case Numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
604
05/09/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on April 28, 2016, before Judge T Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie A. Martin. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016.
605
05/11/2016
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29) from Judicial Panel on MDL 2406 transferring 2 actions to the Northern District of Alabama
1
CTO-29 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)(AVC
1 Attachment
606
05/12/2016
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, May 26, 2016, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 12, 2016.
607
05/12/2016
Plaintiffs' MOTION to Amend Discovery Order No. 14 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
608
05/12/2016
Brief in Support of 607 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 14 filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
609
05/12/2016
MOTION To Amend Discovery Order No. 1 by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
610
05/12/2016
Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Defendants National Account Service Company LLC and Consortium Health Plans, Inc. to Produce Documents and Disclosures and to Set the Time Period for NASCO and CHP's Production in the Accelerated Alabama Case by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Text of Proposed Order
11 Attachments
611
05/12/2016
MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Post-2013 Materials Related to Hospital Tiering and Provider Contract Cancellations and For Clarification of Discovery Order No. 18 by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Text of Proposed Order
7 Attachments
612
05/13/2016
TEXT ORDER re 589 Motion of Health Care Service Corporation and Caring for Montanans, Inc., to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with the ESI Protocol or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order. The court has been informed by the parties that the matter has been resolved and, accordingly, the motion is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 13, 2016.
613
05/16/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 25 denying the Motion to Compel 588. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/13/2016.
614
05/16/2016
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs' Counsel
615
05/17/2016
Subscriber Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Organizational Charts by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
616
05/17/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER No. 26- granting 591 Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/17/2016.
617
05/19/2016
Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Court Reporters by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
618
05/23/2016
ORDER granting Joint Motion for Order Regarding Court Reporters 617. This Order shall apply to all depositions taken by court reporters contracted in the Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation in cases that are currently pending in MDL No. 2406. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/23/2016.
619
05/23/2016
RESPONSE to 609 MOTION To Amend Discovery Order No. 1 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
620
05/23/2016
OPPOSITION to 607 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 14 filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1- Provider Plaintiffs' Subpoena to United
1 Attachment
621
05/23/2016
Opposition to 611 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Post-2013 Materials filed by Defendants' Counsel.
622
05/24/2016
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from March 1, 2016 through April 30, 2016 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/24/2016.
623
05/24/2016
ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from March 1, 2016 through April 30, 2016 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/24/2016.
624
05/24/2016
RESPONSE to 615 Motion to Compel Production of Organizational Charts filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
05/26/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 5/26/2016; discovery updates; arguments by counsel on motions docs 611 and 615 ; hrg adj (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
625
05/27/2016
DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 27 granting 615 Motion to Compel as set out in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/27/2016.
626
05/27/2016
Joint MOTION to Amend Discovery Order Nos. 1 and 3 by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
627
05/31/2016
TEXT ORDER re 610 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants National Account Service Company, LLC and Consortium Health Plans, Inc. to Produce Documents and Disclosures and to set the Time Period for NASCO and CHP's Production in the Accelerated Alabama Case. The court has been informed by the parties that the matter has been resolved and, accordingly, the motion is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 31, 2016.
628
05/31/2016
ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER Nos. 1 AND 3- The parties Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Orders No. 1 and 3 626 is GRANTED. Motions 607 and 609 are MOOT. This order supersedes the December 23, 2015 (Doc. 502) and April 13, 2016 (Doc. 584) orders amending Discovery Order No. 1. All other dates and provisions in Discovery Order No. 1 remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/31/2016.
629
05/31/2016
MOTION to Reconsider Discovery Order No. 26. 616 by Defendants' Counsel.
630
05/31/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, or, alternatively to Treat Their Motion for Reconsideration as a Rule 72 Objection by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
631
06/01/2016
Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/26/2016, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number (205) 492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2016.
1
certification page) (AVC
1 Attachment
632
06/01/2016
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, or, Alternatively, to Treat Their Motion for Reconsideration as a Rule 72 Objection. 630. The Motion 630 is GRANTED IN PART. The deadline to object to Discovery Order No. 26 is EXTENDED until fourteen days after the Magistrate Judge's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Reconsider Discovery Order No. 26. 629. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/1/2016.
633
06/02/2016
TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, June 30, 2016, at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 2, 2016.
634
06/10/2016
NOTICE of Supplemental Response to 629 Motion to Reconsider Discovery Order No. 26. filed by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
635
06/13/2016
Subscriber Plaintiffs' Report Concerning Filed Rate Discovery by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
636
06/16/2016
MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Structured Data by Defendants' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A-H
1 Attachment
637
06/16/2016
MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Structured Data Dating Between 1995 and 2004 by Plaintiffs' Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Text of Proposed Order
4 Attachments
638
06/16/2016
MOTION to Compel Defendant Capital Bluecross to Designate Former CEOs Anita Smith and William Lehr as Production Custodians and to Compel Production of Certain Documents by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B