In re COLONIAL BANCGROUP, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION
Court Docket Sheet

2:2009-cv-00104 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 101 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/09/2009
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602008797.), filed by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees.
1
Attachment
2
Receipt
2 Attachments
02/09/2009
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees. (NO PDF ATTACHED-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 1) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2009
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Earl Dees, Patricia Dees. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
02/11/2009
Summons Issued as to Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint.
3
02/11/2009
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Earl Dees, Patricia Dees; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/26/2009.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
4
02/12/2009
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees re 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2009 to attach the correct PDF document: # 1 main document).
5
02/13/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach the correct PDF document.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
4
None
2 Attachments
6
02/13/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by illegible for Colonial BancGroup, Inc. served on 2/12/2009, answer due 3/4/2009.
7
02/13/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by illegible for T. Brent Hicks served on 2/12/2009, answer due 3/4/2009.
8
02/13/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Deloris Brown for Robert E. Lowder served on 2/12/2009, answer due 3/4/2009.
9
02/18/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Catherine Mays for Sarah H. Moore served on 2/12/2009, answer due 3/4/2009.
10
02/18/2009
Case Reassinged to Honorable Myron H. Thompson and Honorable Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
02/19/2009
Case Reassinged to Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr as referral judge. Honorable Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
03/03/2009
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Suspend Time for Defendants' to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and for Entry of Consent Order, Joint MOTION for Order by Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks.
1
Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Scheduling Order
1 Attachment
03/03/2009
***Attorney Samuel Holley Franklin, Enrique Jose Gimenez for Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore and T. Brent Hicks added pursuant to 11 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
03/03/2009
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/17/2009.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
13
03/03/2009
CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER directing that: 1) Waiving only the defenses of insufficiency of process and insufficiency of service of process, the undersigned counsel, on behalf of each named Dft, acknowledges service of the complaint in this action; 2) The time for Dfts to respond to this action, and any related action that is subsequently consolidated with this action, shall be suspended until such time as a Lead Plf and Lead Plf's Counsel can be selected through the process set forth in the PSLRA and a consolidated amended complaint can be filed; 3) Any potential class member who wishes to be considered for appointment as Lead Plf in the litigation must move the Court for such appointment by no later than 4/10/2009. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/3/2009.
14
03/04/2009
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks.
15
03/05/2009
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Colonial BancGroup, Inc. re 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
16
03/05/2009
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sarah H. Moore re 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
17
03/05/2009
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by T. Brent Hicks re 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
18
03/05/2009
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Robert E. Lowder re 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
19
03/05/2009
Motion for Jeffrey Alan Klafter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
20
03/06/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Battle on behalf of all plaintiffs
21
03/06/2009
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/6/2009.
22
03/06/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 14 Motion to Consolidate is granted; (2) The lead case is Dees v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc., et al, civil action no. 2:09cv104-MHT; (3) All future filings by the parties and their attorneys should be in the Dees case only. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/6/2009.
23
03/06/2009
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 19 Motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602009201.
24
03/09/2009
Return Receipt Card re member case 2:09cv132-MHT showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Catherine Mays for Sarah H. Moore served on 3/7/2009.
25
03/09/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) An on-the-record Status Conference is set for 4/14/2009, at 10:00 AM by telephone before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. Counsel for all parties are to arrange for the conference to be conducted by telephone; (2) On or before 4/8/2009, the parties are to file a joint report suggesting how this litigation should proceed, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/9/2009. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)
03/09/2009
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 2:09cv129-MHT. Summons and Complaint sent CMRRR to The Colonial Bancgroup, Inc. returned with the following USPS notation, "Returned To Sender, Refused." Applies only to member case 2:09cv129-MHT and Counsel for plf is notified via this notice. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/11/2009
Motion for Kurt B. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kurt Olsen by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="03/12/2020" time="">3/12/20</a>09 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the consolidated case numbers and case styles: #
2
main document
2 Attachments
27
03/11/2009
Return Receipt Card re member case 2:09cv129-MHT showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Charlotte Lowder for Robert E. Lowder served on 3/10/2009.
28
03/11/2009
Motion for Emily C. Komlossy to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Komlossy by Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="03/12/2020" time="">3/12/20</a>09 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the consolidated case numbers and case styles: #
2
main document
2 Attachments
29
03/11/2009
Motion for Antonio Vozzolo to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Antonio Vozzolo by Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="03/12/2020" time="">3/12/20</a>09 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the consolidated case numbers and case styles: #
2
main document
2 Attachments
30
03/11/2009
Motion for Donald J. Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Donald Enright by Robert C. Newman. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Certificate of Good Standing for Donald J. Enright) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="03/13/2020" time="">3/13/20</a>09 to attach the corrected PDF document to include the consolidated case numbers and case styles and to attach the correct certificate of good standing: #
2
main document
3
District Court Certificate of Good Standing for Donald J. Enright
3 Attachments
31
03/11/2009
Motion for Elizabeth K. Tripodi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Newman. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth K. Tripodi) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="03/13/2020" time="">3/13/20</a>09 to attach the corrected PDF document to include the consolidated case numbers and case styles and to attach the correct certificate of good standing: #
2
main document
3
District Court Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth Kathleen Tripodi
3 Attachments
32
03/11/2009
Return Receipt Card re member case 2:09cv132-MHT showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Charlotte Lowder for Robert E. Lowder served on 3/10/2009.
33
03/12/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kurt Olsen to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the consolidated case numbers and case styles.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
26
None
2 Attachments
34
03/12/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Komlossy, 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Antonio Vozzolo, to attach corrected PDF documents to include the consolidated case numbers and case styles.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
2
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
28
None
29
None
4 Attachments
35
03/12/2009
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 26 Motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602009286.
36
03/12/2009
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 30 & 31 Motions: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602009287.
37
03/12/2009
Motion to have Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Nadeem Faruqi (Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602009283.) by Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price.
1
Affidavit of Nadeem Faruqi in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice
2
Certificate of Good Standing for Nadeem Faruqi
3
Receipt
3 Attachments
38
03/13/2009
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 28 & 29 Motions: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602009295.
39
03/13/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to attach the corrected PDF document to include the consolidated case numbers and case styles and to attach the correct certificate of good standing.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
2
Corrected Attachment Document to Docket Entry
3
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
4
Corrected Attachment Document to Docket Entry
30
None
31
None
6 Attachments
40
03/13/2009
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/13/2009.
41
03/13/2009
ORDER granting 28, 29, 30, & 31 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/13/2009.
42
03/16/2009
ORDER granting 37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/16/2009.
43
03/17/2009
Motion for Mark C. Gardy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
44
03/17/2009
Motion for James S. Notis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
45
03/19/2009
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey A. Klafter
46
03/19/2009
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 43 & 44 Motions: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602009358.
47
03/19/2009
ORDER granting 43 and 44 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/2009.
48
03/23/2009
ORDER directing that the Playford case be set for a on-the-record telephone Status Conference on 4/14/2009 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Myron H. Thompson, as further set out in order; directing counsel for the plf in the Playford case to arrange with Dees counsel to be included in the status conference, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/23/09. Furnished to YG, HC & AG.
49
04/01/2009
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Craig Bozeman, Robin Reynolds.
50
04/01/2009
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Donald R. Myrick.
04/01/2009
***Attorney Edith M. Kallas, Deborah Clark-Weintraub, Chris Theo Hellums, Leigh King Forstman, and Nicholas B. Roth for Robin Reynolds added pursuant to 49 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2009
***Attorney Darren J. Robbins, David C. Walton, Catherine J. Kowalewski, Kip B. Shuman, and Rusty E. Glenn for Craig Bozeman added pursuant to 49 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2009
***Attorney Corey Daniel Holzer, Michael Ira Fistel, Robert J. Dyer, III, and Jeffrey A. Berens for Donald R. Myrick added pursuant to 50 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Jeffrey A. Berens regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
52
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Robert J. Dyer, III regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
53
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Michael Ira Fistel regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
54
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Rusty E. Glenn regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
55
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Corey Daniel Holzer regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
56
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Edith Kallas regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
57
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Catherine J. Kowalewski regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
58
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Darren J. Robbins regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
59
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Kip B. Shuman regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
60
04/02/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to David C. Walton regarding pro hac vice admission in this case Modified on 4/7/2009.
61
04/02/2009
ORDER directing that the 49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Craig Bozeman, Robin Reynolds and 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Donald R. Myrick be set for Motion Submission Deadline on 4/8/2009, without oral argument, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/2/09.
62
04/06/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price.
63
04/06/2009
Response to Order re 25 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Report in Response to Court Order of March 9, 2009 by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees.
04/07/2009
***Attorney Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr and Adam Patterson Plant for Craig Bozeman and Robin Reynolds added pursuant to 49 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
04/07/2009
NOTICE of ERROR re 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 58, 59, & 60 Notices of Deficiency which are hereby STRICKEN as erroneous docket entries due to a clerical error.
65
04/08/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs Earl and Patricia Dees' Opposition to the Motions of Bozeman and Reynolds, and Myrick, to Consolidate Their Cases with the Dees Action filed by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
66
04/08/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks.
67
04/10/2009
MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel by Stephen Duncan, Wilson A Knott.
2
main document
3
Declaration of David Guin
2 Attachments
68
04/10/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Stephen Duncan, Wilson A Knott. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2009 to attach the correct PDF document to include the consolidated case styles and numbers: # 1 main document).
69
04/10/2009
MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and Selection of Movant as Lead Plaintiff by Robin Reynolds.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
70
04/10/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 69 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and Selection of Movant as Lead Plaintiff filed by Robin Reynolds.
71
04/10/2009
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Thomas J. Butler in Support of 69 Motion for Lead Counsel and Selection of Movant as Lead Plaintiff by Robin Reynolds.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E) Modified on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/13/2020" time="">4/13/20</a>09 to add link to
6
(Redacted) Exhibit E). (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/14/2020" time="">4/14/20</a>09 to attach the correct main PDF document to include a certificate of service: #
7
main document
69
Motion. (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/13/2020" time="">4/13/20</a>09 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to E-government rules: #
8 Attachments
04/10/2009
***Attorney Tammy McClendon Stokes, Joel B. Strauss, Jeffrey P. Campisi, Aviah Cohen Pierson for Stephen Duncan and Wilson A Knott added pursuant to 67 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
04/10/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 76 FOR CORRECTION) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees. Modified on 4/13/2009.
1
Supplement Declaration and Exh A thru E
1 Attachment
73
04/10/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 77 FOR CORRECTION) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Earl Dees, Patricia Dees. Modified on 4/13/2009.
74
04/10/2009
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movant as Lead Plaintiff and Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
75
04/10/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movant as Lead Plaintiff and Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.
76
04/10/2009
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel by Jim Parker Building Company, Inc., David McGiffert, J. Price McGiffert. Modified on 4/13/2009.
1
Supplement Declaration and Exh A thru E) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/13/2020" time="">4/13/20</a>09 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to E-government rules: #
2
(Redacted) Supplement Declaration and Ex A thru E
2 Attachments
77
04/10/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 76 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Jim Parker Building Company, Inc., David McGiffert, J. Price McGiffert.
78
04/10/2009
AFFIDAVIT re 74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movant as Lead Plaintiff and Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel Declaration of Steven A. Schwartz by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/13/2020" time="">4/13/20</a>09 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to E-government rules: #
6
(Redacted) Exhibit E). (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/14/2020" time="">4/14/20</a>09 to attach the correct main PDF document to include a certificate of service: #
8
main document
7 Attachments
79
04/10/2009
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movants as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele, John J. Schoeppner.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
80
04/10/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 79 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movants as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele, John J. Schoeppner.
81
04/10/2009
AFFIDAVIT re 79 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movants as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel Declaration of Thomas J. Butler by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele, John J. Schoeppner.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/13/2020" time="">4/13/20</a>09 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to E-government rules: #
6
(Redacted) Exhibit E). (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/14/2020" time="">4/14/20</a>09 to attach the correct main PDF document to include a certificate of service: #
7
main document
7 Attachments
82
04/10/2009
MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
83
04/10/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 82 Motion for Consolidation, Appointment As Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 4/13/2009 to add link to 82 Motion.
84
04/10/2009
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 82 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/13/2020" time="">4/13/20</a>09 to attach the correct PDF document to include the correct electronic signature: #
6
main document
6 Attachments
04/10/2009
***Attorney Adam Patterson Plant, Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr, Steven A. Schwartz, Alison R. Gabe, Kimberly A. Sanders for Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority added pursuant to 74 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2009
***Attorney James Earnest Fleenor, Jr, Robert E. Battle, Jeffrey A. Klafter, Kurt B. Olsen, Emmett Clayton Lowe, Jr for Jim Parker Building Company, Inc., David McGiffert and J. Price McGiffert added pursuant to 76 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2009
***Attorney Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr, Adam Patterson Plant, David C. Walton, Catherine J. Kowalewski, Kip B. Shuman, Rusty E. Glenn for Employees', Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele and John J. Schoeppner added pursuant to 79 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2009
MOTION to be Appointed as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (NO PDF ATTACHED-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 74) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2009
(WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 98 ORDER) MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele, John J. Schoeppner. (NO PDF ATTACHED-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 79) Modified on 4/21/2009. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2009
***Attorney Henry Lewis Gillis, Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr, Michael Stephen Dampier, Stefanie J. Sundel, Christopher J. Keller, Alan I. Ellman for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 82 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
04/13/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 67 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel and 68 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, to attach the correct PDF documents to include the consolidated case styles and numbers.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
2
Corrected Attachment PDF Document of Declaration to Docket Entry
3
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
67
None
68
None
5 Attachments
86
04/13/2009
NOTICE of ERROR re 72 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and 73 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support which have been STRICKEN as erroneous duplicate docket entries. Counsel are directed to refer to docket entries 76 & 77 for correct entry.
87
04/13/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 84 Affidavit in Support of Motion, to attach the correct PDF document to include the correct electronic signature.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
84
None
2 Attachments
88
04/13/2009
NOTICE by Stephen Duncan, Wilson A Knott of Withdrawal of Counsel
04/13/2009
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stephen Duncan, Wilson A Knott. (NO PDF ATTACHED-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 88) (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
04/14/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 71 Affidavit, 78 Affidavit, 81 Affidavit, to attach the correct main PDF documents to include certificate of service pages.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
2
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
3
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
71
None
78
None
81
None
6 Attachments
90
04/15/2009
ORDERED that the 88 Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel is treated as a Motion to Withdraw and said motion is granted. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/15/2009.
04/15/2009
***Attorney Joel B. Strauss, Jeffrey P. Campisi and Aviah Cohen Pierson terminated as counsel for Stephen L. Duncan and Wilson A. Knott pursuant to 90 Order. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
04/14/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson: Status Conference held on 4/14/2009 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
92
04/17/2009
OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The motions to consolidate, filed in Dees v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv104-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. nos. 49 & 50); Bozeman v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv124-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. no. 33); Myrick v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv149-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. no. 17); and Reynolds v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv148-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. no. 26), are granted and these cases are consolidated; (2) The lead case is Dees; (3) All future filings by the parties and their attorneys should be in the Dees case only. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/17/2009.
04/17/2009
***Attorney Douglas Scott Wilens, Jack Reise and Paul J Geller for Craig Bozeman added. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
04/17/2009
ORDERED that the motions to appoint lead plaintiff (doc. nos. 67, 69, 74, 76, 79 & 82) are set for submission, without oral argument, on 4/24/2009, with all briefs and materials due by said date; Motion Submission Deadline set for 4/24/2009. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/17/2009.
94
04/17/2009
ORDER denying as moot 74, 79, & 82 Motions to Consolidate. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/17/2009.
95
04/20/2009
MOTION to Withdraw 79 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Craig Bozeman. Modified on 4/20/2009 to add link to 79 Motion, to remove as filed on behalf of Craig Bozeman, and to correctly reflect as filed on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele, John J. Schoeppner. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2009 to attach the correct PDF document: # 1 main document).
96
04/20/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 95 MOTION to Withdraw to add link to 79 Motion; to remove as filed on behalf of Craig Bozeman; to correctly reflect as filed on behalf of Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Albert R. Steele, John J. Schoeppner; and to attach the correct PDF document.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
95
None
2 Attachments
97
04/21/2009
ORDERED that on on-the-record Status Conference is set for 5/8/2009, at 10:00 AM by telephone before Honorable Myron H. Thompson, as further set out in order; Counsel for the parties are to arrange for the conference to be conducted by telephone. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/21/2009. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)
98
04/21/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 95 Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice is granted; (2) The 79 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff is withdrawn. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/21/2009.
99
04/22/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 67 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel, 74 MOTION to be Appointed as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel, 82 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 69 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and Selection of Movant as Lead Plaintiff filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Modified on 4/23/2009 to add link to 76 Motion, to remove link to 79 Motion which was Withdrawn pursuant to 98 Order, and to add correct link to 74 Motion to Appoint.
04/23/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 99 Response to Motion, to add link to 76 Motion, to remove link to 79 Motion which was Withdrawn pursuant to 98 Order, and to add correct link to 74 Motion to Appoint. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
04/23/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 67 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel, 82 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Stephen Duncan, Wilson A Knott. Modified on 4/24/2009 to add relationship to 69, 74, and 76 Motions to Appoint Lead Plf. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2009 to attach the correct PDF document to include the correct case style and consolidated case number: # 1 main document).
04/24/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 100 Response to Motion, to add relationship to 69, 74, and 76 Motions to Appoint Lead Plf. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
04/24/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 100 Response to Motion, to attach the correct PDF document to include the correct case style and consolidated case numbers.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
100
None
2 Attachments
102
04/24/2009
MOTION to Withdraw 69 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and Selection of Movant as Lead Plaintiff by Robin Reynolds.
103
04/24/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 67 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel, 76 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel, 74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movant as Lead Plaintiff and Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel, 82 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 69 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and Selection of Movant as Lead Plaintiff, 79 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movants as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel, MOTION to Appoint Counsel Defendants' Statement Relating to Pending Motions As Lead Plaintiff filed by Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Patti Hill. Modified on 4/27/2009 to add remove relationship from 79 Motion which was withdrawn, and to remove relationship from 74 Motion to Consolidate.
104
04/24/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Choice of Co-Lead Counsel, 74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movant as Lead Plaintiff and Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel, 82 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 79 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appoint Movants as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jim Parker Building Company, Inc., David McGiffert, J. Price McGiffert. Modified on 4/27/2009 to remove the extra Exhibit text, add relationship to 69 & 76 Motions to Appoint, and to remove relationship from 79 Motion which was withdrawn.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
105
04/24/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
106
04/24/2009
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
04/27/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 104 Response in Opposition to Motion, to remove the extra Exhibit text, add relationship to 69 & 76 Motions to Appoint, and to remove relationship from 79 Motion which was withdrawn. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/27/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 103 Response to Motion, to add remove relationship from 79 Motion which was withdrawn, and to remove relationship from 74 Motion to Consolidate. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
04/27/2009
ORDER granting 102 Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice; The 69 Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel is withdrawn without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/27/2009.
108
04/28/2009
Motion for Alan I. Ellman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing for Alan Ellman) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/29/2020" time="">4/29/20</a>09 to attach the correct PDF documents to include the certificate of service page and the correct certificate of good standing: #
2
main document
3
District Court Certificate of Good Standing for Alan Ellman
3 Attachments
109
04/28/2009
Motion for Christopher J. Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
District Court Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher Keller) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/29/2020" time="">4/29/20</a>09 to attach the correct PDF documents to include the certificate of service page and the correct certificate of good standing: #
2
main document
3
District Court Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher Keller
3 Attachments
110
04/28/2009
Motion for Stefanie J. Sundel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing for Stefanie Sundel) (Additional attachment(s) added on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="04/29/2020" time="">4/29/20</a>09 to attach the correct PDF documents to include the certificate of service page and the correct certificate of good standing: #
2
main document
3
District Court Certificate of Good Standing for Stefanie Sundel
3 Attachments
111
04/29/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 108, 109, & 110 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to attach the correct PDF documents to include the certificate of service pages and the correct certificates of good standing.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
2
Corrected Attachment PDF Document of Certificate of Good Standing to Docket Entry
3
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
4
Corrected Attachment PDF Document of Certificate of Good Standing to Docket Entry
5
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
6
Corrected Attachment PDF Document of Certificate of Good Standing to Docket Entry
108
None
109
None
110
None
9 Attachments
112
04/29/2009
ORDER granting 108, 109, and 110 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/29/2009.
113
04/30/2009
Filing fee re 108, 109, & 110 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 150.00, receipt number 4602009780.
114
05/05/2009
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
115
05/06/2009
ORDER granting 114 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/6/2009.
116
05/06/2009
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Response to Reply Brief of the Public Pension Fund Group by Jim Parker Building Company, Inc., David McGiffert, J. Price McGiffert.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
117
05/06/2009
REPLY BRIEF re 82 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
118
05/07/2009
ORDER granting 116 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/7/2009.
119
05/07/2009
REPLY BRIEF re 117 Reply Brief filed by Jim Parker Building Company, Inc., David McGiffert, J. Price McGiffert.
120
05/07/2009
ORDER denying 67 and 74 Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Lead Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/7/2009.
121
05/07/2009
OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Public Pension Fund Group's 82 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is granted; (2) The Public Pension Fund Group is appointed lead plf; Labaton Sucharow LLP is appointed lead counsel; and Thomas, Means, Gillis & Seay, PC is appointed liaison counsel; (3) The Parker-McGiffert Group's 76 Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is denied. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/7/2009.
122
05/08/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson: Status Conference held on 5/8/2009 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
123
05/08/2009
ORDER that the following is ORDERED: A. Consolidation - 1. Unless otherwise ordered by this court, this case shall be known as the "Colonial BancGroup, Inc. Securities Litigation" and all future filings shall be docketed only under 2:09cv104-MHT. 2. The court requests the assistance of counsel in calling to the attention of the clerk of this court the filing or transfer of any case that might properly be consolidated as part of this litigation. Any action involving substantially related questions of law and fact hereafter filed in or transferred to this court shall, upon court order, be consolidated under the master file number assigned to this case. 3. Every pleading filed in the Colonial BancGroup, Inc. Securities Litigation shall bear the following caption: In re COLONIAL BANCGROUP, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION, CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:09cv104-MHT; B. Scheduling - 4. Court-appointed lead plaintiff shall file a consolidated complaint (the "complaint") within 45 days of the entry of this order. 5. Defendants shall have 30 days from the filing of the complaint to move or otherwise respond to the complaint. 6. If any defendant moves to dismiss the complaint, lead plaintiff shall respond to such motion within 30 days of the filing of defendant's motion. 7. The moving Defendant shall reply to lead plaintiff's response within 15 days of the filing of lead plaintiff's response. 8. Pending filing and service of the complaint, defendants shall have no obligation to move, answer, or otherwise respond to any of the original complaints in the Colonial BancGroup, Inc. Securities Litigation or any complaint in any action subsequently consolidated with them. 9. Discovery in the Colonial BancGroup, Inc. Securities Litigation is stayed, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 77z-(1)(b)(I) and 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(b)(3)(B), and will remain in place pending a decision on any motion to dismiss unless appropriate relief is sought and granted. 10. In issuing this order, the court makes no ruling and expresses no opinion on any class certification issues, and defendants reserve all rights to oppose certification of the class. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/8/2009.
124
05/08/2009
Motion for James W. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for James W. Johnson
1 Attachment
05/08/2009
***Attorney James W. Johnson for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 124 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
125
05/11/2009
Motion for Angelina Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Angelina Nguyen
1 Attachment
126
05/11/2009
Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602009904 - re: 124 Motion pro hac for Atty James W. Johnson.
05/11/2009
***Attorney Angelina Nguyen for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 125 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
127
05/12/2009
Filing fee received re 125 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602009914.
128
05/13/2009
ORDER granting 124 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/13/2009.
129
05/13/2009
ORDER granting 125 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/13/2009.
130
06/09/2009
Motion for Kimberly A. Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Kimberly A. Sanders
2 Attachments
131
06/09/2009
Motion for Steven A. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Steven A. Schwartz
2 Attachments
06/09/2009
***Attorney Kimberly A. Sanders and Steven A. Schwartz for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 130 & 131 Motions. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
132
06/10/2009
Filing fee received re 130 & 131 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602010207.
133
06/12/2009
ORDER granting 130 & 131 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 6/12/2009.
134
06/22/2009
CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS with Jury Demand against all defendants adding The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust as additional plf, filed by The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust, Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Attachments
1 Attachment
06/22/2009
*** Attorneys for the terminated parties: Jeffrey A. Berens; Thomas Julian Butler; Jeffrey P. Campisi; Deborah Clark-Weintraub; Robert J. Dyer, III; Donald J. Enright; Nadeem Faruqi; Michael Ira Fistel; James Earnest Fleenor, Jr; Leigh King Forstman; Samuel Holley Franklin; Jesse Cecil Gardner; Mark C Gardy; Paul J Geller; Enrique Jose Gimenez; Rusty E. Glenn; Wilson F. Green; David Jonathan Guin; Chris Theo Hellums; Corey Daniel Holzer; James Fletcher Hughey, III; Edith M. Kallas; Jeffrey A. Klafter; Emily C. Komlossy; Catherine J. Kowalewski; Emmett Clayton Lowe, Jr; James S. Notis; Kurt B. Olsen; Aviah Cohen Pierson; Adam Patterson Plant; Milton Clay Ragsdale; Jack Reise; Darren J. Robbins; Nicholas B. Roth; Kip B. Shuman; Tammy McClendon Stokes; Joel B. Strauss; Elizabeth K. Tripodi; Antonio Vozzolo; David C. Walton; Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr; Douglas Scott Wilens; James Harold Anderson and Robert E. Battle terminated. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
06/29/2009
ORDERED that an on-the-record Scheduling Conference is set for 7/1/2009, at 09:30 AM by telephone before Honorable Myron H. Thompson; Counsel for the parties are to arrange for the conference to be conducted by telephone. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 6/29/2009. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)
136
06/30/2009
Motion for Thomas A. Dubbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014 to add attorney.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for T. Dubbs
1 Attachment
137
06/30/2009
Motion for Thomas G. Hoffman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014 to add attorney.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for T. Hoffman
1 Attachment
138
06/30/2009
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust. / Proposed Amended Consent Scheduling Order. Modified on 8/19/2009 to remove the party 'Lead Plaintiff' which was incorrectly added by counsel and to add the correct filers.
1
Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
06/30/2009
***Attorney Thomas A. Dubbs for Public Pension Fund Group, Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 136 & 137 Motions. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
139
07/01/2009
Filing fee re 136 & 137 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602010402.
140
07/01/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2009 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
141
07/02/2009
ORDER granting 136 & 137 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 7/2/2009.
142
07/02/2009
ORDERED that paragraphs 5, 6, and 7 of the 123 Scheduling Order are amended as follows: "5. Dfts shall have until 8/21/2009 to move or otherwise respond to the complaint; "6. If any dft moves to dismiss the complaint, lead plf shall respond to such motion by 10/5/2009; "7. The moving dft shall reply to lead plf's response by 11/4/2009." Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 7/2/2009.
143
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Hubert L. Harris, Jr. on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
144
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Clinton O. Holdbrooks on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
145
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Deborah L. Linden on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
146
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John Ed Mathison on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009. Modified on 7/10/2009 to correct the docket text to reflect the notice was sent on 7/10/2009 and not 8/10/2009.
147
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John C.H. Miller, Jr. on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
148
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sheila P. Moody on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
149
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Milton E. McGregor on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
150
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Joseph D. Mussafer on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
151
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to William E. Powell, III on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
152
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Simuel Sippial, Jr. on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
153
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Augustus K. Clements, III on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
154
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Patrick F. Dye on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
155
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert S. Craft on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
156
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lewis E. Beville on 6/30/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009. Modified on 7/10/2009 to correct the docket text to reflect the notice was sent on 6/30/2009 and not 7/10/2009.
157
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to James W. Rane on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
158
07/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Edward V. Welch on 7/10/09 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/10/2009.
07/10/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 146 Request for Waiver of Service, to correct the docket text to reflect the notice was sent on 7/10/2009 and not 8/10/2009. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 156 Request for Waiver of Service, to correct the docket text to reflect the notice was sent on 6/30/2009 and not 7/10/2009. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
07/14/2009
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to John C.H. Miller, Jr. by Colonial BancGroup, Inc.
07/16/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction to Unterminate John C. Miller, Jr. (Docket clerk error) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2009
***Attorney James Fletcher Hughey, III, Jr, Samuel Holley Franklin and, Enrique Jose Gimenez for John C.H. Miller, Jr added pursuant to 159 Suggestion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
160
07/27/2009
Summons Issued as to Price Waterhouse Coopers, B.C. Ziegle and Co.; Banc of America Securities; Bear Stearns Companies; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.; Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; City Securities Corporation; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Crowell, Weedon & Co.; D.A. Davidson & Co.; Davenport & Company LLC; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Doley Securities, LLC; Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc.; Fidelity Capital Markets; Fixed Income Securities, LP; H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc.; J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc.; Janney Montgomery Scott LLC; Jefferies & Company, Inc.; Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc.; Mesirow Financial, Inc.; Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc.; Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.; Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.; Pershing LLC; Piper Jaffray & Co.; Raymond James & Associates; RBC Dain Rauscher Inc.; Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc.; Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc.; Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc.; Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.; Stone & Youngberg LLC; SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.; UBS Securities LLC; Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC; Wedbush Morgan Securities; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC; William Blair & Company, LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of 134 Complaint and 142 Order.
161
07/28/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jerry J. Chesser on 7/28/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/27/2009.
162
07/28/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to William Britton on 7/28/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 8/27/2009.
163
07/29/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by Alan Holmes for Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
164
07/29/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by The Corporation Company for: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; D.A. Davidson & Co. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Davenport & Company LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Janney Montgomery Scott LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Piper Jaffray & Co. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Wedbush Morgan Securities served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
165
07/29/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by James S. Bellamy for: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Pershing LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; UBS Securities LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; William Blair & Company, LLC served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
166
07/30/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by The Corporation Company for Raymond James & Associates served on 7/28/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
167
07/30/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by James S. Bellamy for Oppenheimer & Co. Inc. served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
168
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by Antonios Karantonis for Crowell, Weedon & Co. served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
169
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by D. LaFaver for Stone & Youngberg LLC served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
170
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by K. Karanski for Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc. served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
171
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by E. Buckley C. for: Fixed Income Securities, LP served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
172
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by CSC for Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc. served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
173
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by illegible for Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc. served on 7/29/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
174
08/03/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by Scott LaScala for: Banc of America Securities served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Doley Securities, LLC served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Fidelity Capital Markets served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Jefferies & Company, Inc. served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Mesirow Financial, Inc. served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
175
08/03/2009
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc. with the following USPS notation: "Return To Sender." Counsel for the plf is notified via this notice.
176
08/06/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by NYSOP CT for: Price Waterhouse Coopers served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; B.C. Ziegle and Co. served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009; Bear Stearns Companies served on 7/30/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
177
08/07/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 160 Summons, 134 Complaint, and 142 Order signed by Bill Tuttle for City Securities Corporation served on 8/4/2009, answer due 8/21/2009.
178
08/10/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Price Waterhouse Coopers c/o Elizabeth V. Tanis on 8/10/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2009. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2009 to attach the correct PDF document reflecting the correct defendant name: # 1 main document).
179
08/11/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 178 Request for Waiver of Service, to attach the correct PDF document reflecting the correct defendant name.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
178
None
2 Attachments
180
08/13/2009
Alias Summons issued as to Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of 134 Complaint and 142 Order.
181
08/13/2009
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 142 Order, Joint Motion for Amendment of Scheduling Order by Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Price Waterhouse Coopers, B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Harold D. King, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, John C.H. Miller, Jr, Sheila P. Moody, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch, Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust. Modified on 8/19/2009 to remove the party 'Lead Plaintiff' and to add the correct plf filers.
08/13/2009
***Attorney James Fletcher Hughey, III, Samuel Holley Franklin, and Enrique Jose Gimenez for Sheila P. Moody; Tabor Robert Novak, Jr and Elizabeth V. Tanis for Price Waterhouse Coopers; Larry Brittain Childs for Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr and Edward V. Welch added pursuant to 181 Joint Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
182
08/14/2009
ORDER granting 181 Joint MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order as set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/14/09.
183
08/18/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Banc of America Securities LLC on 8/10/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2009.
184
08/18/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Fidelity Capital Markets on 8/18/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 9/17/2009.
185
08/18/2009
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc. on 8/18/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 9/17/2009.
186
08/18/2009
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of In-Chambers Telephone Scheduling Conference Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on 7/1/2009, before Judge Myron H. Thompson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mitchell P. Reisner, Telephone number 334-235-8218. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2009.
187
08/19/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Stanley Burkhalter on behalf of B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC
188
08/19/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Frederick Enslen on behalf of B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC
189
08/19/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. McPheeters on behalf of B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC
190
08/19/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Hamilton Wilson, Jr on behalf of Price Waterhouse Coopers
191
08/19/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Tabor Robert Novak, Jr on behalf of Price Waterhouse Coopers
192
08/19/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Segall on behalf of Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody
193
08/19/2009
Motion by Elizabeth Tanis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
194
08/19/2009
Motion by Shelby Guilbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
195
08/19/2009
Motion by G. Patrick Montgomery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
196
08/19/2009
Motion by Dan McDevitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
197
08/19/2009
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
08/19/2009
***Attorney Shelby S. Guilbert for Price Waterhouse Coopers, George Patrick Montgomery for Price Waterhouse Coopers, Dan S. McDevitt for Price Waterhouse Coopers added pursuant to 192, 195, & 196 motions (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
198
08/20/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Armistead Inge Selden, III on behalf of B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC
199
08/20/2009
Pro Hac Vice Filing fees received re: motions 193, 194, 195, 196 : $ 200.00, receipt number 4602010970
200
08/20/2009
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
201
08/20/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Their Motion to Lift the Say of Discovery with Respect to the Colonial Defendants and Certain Non-Parties filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Supplement Declaration of James W. Johnson in Support of Motion to Lift The Stay of Discovery
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit Exhibit 2
4
Exhibit Exhibit 3
5
Exhibit Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit Exhibit 5
7
Exhibit Exhibit 6
8
Exhibit Exhibit 7
9
Exhibit Exhibit 8
10
Exhibit Exhibit 9) Modified on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="08/21/2020" time="">8/21/20</a>09 to reflect as in support of
200
motion (qc/djy,
11 Attachments
08/20/2009
MOTION for Order lifting the stay of discovery by Public Pension Fund Group. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry 200). (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2009
(STRICKEN AS A DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO A CLERICAL ERROR) MOTION to Lift Stay by Public Pension Fund Group. (NO PDF ATTACHED-SEE DOCKET ENTRY 200) Modified on 8/27/2009. (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2009
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 201 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support to reflect as in support of 200 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
202
08/24/2009
Return Receipt Card showing service of 180 Alias Summons, 134 Complaint, & 142 Order signed by illegible for Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc. served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009.
203
08/25/2009
Letter received from CT regarding not being the registered agent for Price Waterhouse Coopers.
204
08/25/2009
ORDER granting 193, 194, 195, & 196 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/25/2009.
205
08/27/2009
ORDER directing that the 200 MOTION to Lift Stay is set for submission, without oral argument, on 9/4/2009, with all briefs due by said date; Motion Submission Deadline set for 9/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/27/2009.
206
08/28/2009
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY-SEE CORRECTED ENTRY DOCKET NUMBER 207) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sheila P. Moody on 7/10/2009 by Public Pension Fund Group. Waiver of Service due by 9/18/2009. Modified on 8/28/2009.
207
08/28/2009
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Public Pension Fund Group. Sheila P. Moody waiver sent on 7/10/2009, answer due 9/8/2009.
208
08/28/2009
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Public Pension Fund Group. Price Waterhouse Coopers waiver sent on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/9/2009.
209
08/28/2009
NOTICE of Error re 206 Request for Waiver of Service which is STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry. Parties are instructed to see Docket Entry 207 for the correction by E-filing party.
210
08/28/2009
NOTICE by Colonial BancGroup, Inc. of Suggestion of Bankruptcy
211
08/31/2009
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Public Pension Fund Group. Banc of America Securities waiver sent on 8/18/2009, answer due 10/19/2009.
212
08/31/2009
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Public Pension Fund Group. Fidelity Capital Markets waiver sent on 8/18/2009, answer due 10/19/2009.
213
08/31/2009
ORDER directing that on or before 9/8/09 the parties are to file statements as to whether all or any part of this litigation is stayed and why and why not. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/31/09.
214
08/31/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Grant of Additional Time as to Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore and T. Brent Hicks as a Result of the Bankruptcy of The Colonial BancGroup, Inc. by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks.
215
09/01/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 214 MOTION to amend scheduling order is granted; (2) the entire schedule as to the Colonial BancGroup Defendants is now consistent with that for the Director Defendants, Note Underwriter Defendants, and Stock Underwriter Defendants; (3) the following schedule applies in this case, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/1/09.
216
09/02/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 200 Notice (Other) to Lift the Stay of Discovery with Respect to the Colonial Defendants and Certain Non-Parties by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time
1 Attachment
217
09/03/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Edgar McGowan on behalf of Lehman Brothers, Inc. Modified on 9/3/2009 to add as also filed on behalf of Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Harold D. King, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
218
09/03/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 216 MOTION for Extension of Time is GRANTED; (2) the 200 Motion to Lift Stay is reset for submission, without oral argument, on 9/11/2009, with briefs from all parties due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/3/09.
219
09/03/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement Addressing Effect of Colonial's Bankruptcy Filing by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
09/03/2009
***Attorney Walter Edgar McGowan for Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Harold D. King, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr and Edward V. Welch added pursuant to 217 Notice. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
09/04/2009
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lehman Brothers, Inc., Harold D. King.
221
09/04/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 219 Motion for Extension of Time is granted; (2) all parties are allowed until 9/16/09 to file statements on the bankruptcy issue; (3) the underwriter defendants are allowed until 9/25/09 to respond to the consolidated complaint. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/4/09.
222
09/04/2009
ORDER granting 220 Motion for Walter E. McGowan to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/4/09.
09/04/2009
*** Attorney Walter Edgar McGowan terminated as counsel for Lehman Brothers & Harold King pursuant to 222 order (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
223
09/11/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 200 MOTION for Order to Lift the Discovery Stay and Notice of Joinder filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers. Modified on 9/14/2009 to add link to 200 Motion.
224
09/11/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 200 MOTION for Order to Lift Statutory Discovery Stay filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks. Modified on 9/14/2009 to add link to 200 Motion.
1
Exhibit Correspondence dated 9/3/09
1 Attachment
225
09/11/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 200 MOTION for Order filed by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC. Modified on 9/14/2009 to add link to 200 Motion.
226
09/14/2009
Joint MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Life Statutory Stay by Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
09/14/2009
JOINDER re 224 Response in Opposition to Motion to Lift Statutory Stay by Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 226 Which Was Incorrectly E-filed As A Motion for Joinder) (Text entry; no document attached.)
227
09/16/2009
Response to Order re 213 Order, Set Deadlines Director Defendants' Statement Regarding Colonial BancGroup Inc.'s Bankruptcy Filing and Request for Suspension of Briefing Schedule by Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
228
09/16/2009
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
229
09/16/2009
JOINDER re 227 Response to Order, 213 Order, Set Deadlines Joinder of Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody in the Director Defendants' Statement Regarding Colonial BancGroup, Inc.'s Bankruptcy Filing and Request for Suspension of Briefing Schedule by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody.
230
09/16/2009
Response to Order re 213 Order, Set Deadlines Statement Regarding Defendant Colonial BancGroup's Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Exhibit A -- Unreported Cases
1 Attachment
231
09/16/2009
Response to Order re 213 Order, Set Deadlines Lead Palintiffs' Statement in Response to Court's Order Regarding Whether Any Part of this Litigation Should be Stayed by Public Pension Fund Group.
232
09/18/2009
First MOTION to Dismiss of William Britton and Jerry Chesser by William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser.
233
09/18/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 232 First MOTION to Dismiss of William Britton and Jerry Chesser filed by William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser.
234
09/18/2009
MOTION to Dismiss of Outside Director Defendants by Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
235
09/18/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 234 MOTION to Dismiss of Outside Director Defendants filed by Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
1
Exhibit United States Securities and Exchange Commission Form 10-K
1 Attachment
236
09/18/2009
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody.
237
09/18/2009
Evidentiary Submission in Support of 236 Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody. Modified on 9/21/2009 to add link to 236 Motion.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17 (Part 1)
18
Exhibit 17 (Part 2)
19
Exhibit 18
20
Exhibit 19
21
Exhibit 20
22
Exhibit 21
23
Exhibit 22
24
Exhibit 23
25
Exhibit 24
26
Exhibit 25
27
Exhibit 26
28
Exhibit 27
29
Exhibit 28
30
Exhibit 29
31
Exhibit 30
32
Exhibit 31
33
Exhibit 32
34
Exhibit 33
35
Exhibit 34
36
Exhibit 35
37
Exhibit 36
38
Exhibit 37
39
Exhibit 38
40
Exhibit 39
41
Exhibit 40
42
Exhibit 41
43
Exhibit 42
44
Exhibit 43 (Part 1)
45
Exhibit 43 (Part 2)
46
Exhibit 44
47
Exhibit 45
48
Exhibit 46
49
Exhibit 47
50
Exhibit 48
51
Exhibit 49
52
Exhibit 50
53
Exhibit 51 (Part 1)
54
Exhibit 51 (Part 2)
55
Exhibit 51 (Part 3)
56
Exhibit 52 (Part 1)
57
Exhibit 52 (Part 2)
58
Exhibit 52 (Part 3)
59
Exhibit 52 (Part 4)
60
Exhibit 52 (Part 5)
61
Exhibit 52 (Part 6)
62
Exhibit 53
63
Exhibit 54
64
Exhibit 55
65
Exhibit 56
66
Exhibit 57
67
Exhibit 58
68
Exhibit 59
68 Attachments
09/18/2009
***Attorney Sheila Watters Sawyer for Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr and Edward V. Welch added pursuant to 232 and 234 Motions. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
238
09/21/2009
MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending a Ruling on the Effect of Colonial's Bankruptcy by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
239
09/21/2009
ORDER directing that the 238 MOTION to suspend is set for Motion Submission Deadline on 9/23/2009, without oral argument, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/21/09.
240
09/22/2009
ORDER directing that the 228 MOTION to Stay Proceedings is set for a Motion Submission Deadline on 9/30/2009, without oral argument, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/22/2009.
241
09/23/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 238 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending a Ruling on the Effect of Colonial's Bankruptcy filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
242
09/23/2009
JOINDER re 238 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending a Ruling on the Effect of Colonial's Bankruptcy by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
243
09/24/2009
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
244
09/24/2009
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
09/24/2009
***Attorney Geoffrey M. Ezgar for Price Waterhouse Coopers added pursuant to 243 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
245
09/24/2009
Filing fee received re 243 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey M. Ezgar: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602011316.
246
09/25/2009
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
247
09/25/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 246 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, William Blair & Company, LLC.
248
09/25/2009
OPINION AND ORDER granting the Underwriter defendants' 238 motion to suspend the proceedings pending the court's ruling on the effect of Colonial BancGroup's bankruptcy as to the 215 scheduling order, as amended. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/25/09.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
249
09/25/2009
ORDER granting 243 Motion for Geoffrey M. Ezgar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/25/09.
250
09/25/2009
ORDER granting 244 Motion for Sheila Watters Sawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/25/09.
251
09/25/2009
REPLY BRIEF re 228 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Underwriter Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC. Modified on 9/28/2009 to add link to 228 Motion.
252
09/28/2009
Filing fee received re 244 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sheila Watters Sawyer: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602011346.
253
09/30/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 228 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Affidavit
2
Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit 2
4
Exhibit 3
5
Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit 5
6 Attachments
254
09/30/2009
RESPONSE in Support re 228 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Notice of Joinder filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
255
10/06/2009
MOTION to Amend/Correct 254 Response in Support of Motion by Underwriter Defendants to Stay Proceedings and Notice of Joinder by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
256
10/07/2009
MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Lehman Brothers, Inc. by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Voluntary Dismissal
2
Supplement Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
2 Attachments
257
10/08/2009
ORDER granting 255 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Brief. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/8/2009.
258
10/08/2009
ORDER granting 256 Motion for Leave to File Voluntary Dismissal; Dft Lehman Brothers, Inc. is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/8/2009.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
259
10/28/2009
ORDER directing that on-the-record oral argument is set for 11/18/2009, at 3:00pm, on the following: the 200 motion to lift the stay of discovery; the 228 motion to stay proceedings; and the 227, 230, & 231 statements regarding the impact of Colonial BancGroup, Inc.'s bankruptcy; Counsel for the parties are to arrange for the argument to be conducted by telephone; Oral Argument set for 11/18/2009, at 03:00 PM by telephone before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/28/2009. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)
260
11/05/2009
Joint MOTION for Hearing to be Conducted in Person by Colonial BancGroup, Inc. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2009 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct e-signatures and the required consent statement: # 1 main document).
261
11/06/2009
NOTICE of Correction re 260 Joint MOTION for Hearing to be Conducted in Person, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct e-signatures and the required consent statement.
1
Corrected Main Document to Docket Entry
260
None
2 Attachments
262
11/06/2009
ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 260 Joint MOTION to conduct hearing in person is granted; (2) the on-the-record Oral Argument is set for 11/18/2009 @ 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson, FMJUSCC, Montgomery, AL. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 11/6/09. Furnished to YG, HC & AG.
263
11/18/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson: Oral Argument held on 11/18/2009 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
264
11/25/2009
Motion by Ira M. Levee to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 11/25/2009 to add movant's name.
1
Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
265
11/25/2009
Motion by Michael S. Etkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 11/25/2009 to add movant's name.
1
Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
266
11/25/2009
Pro hac vice filing fees received for Michael S. Etkin and Ira M. Levee: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602012035
11/25/2009
***Attorneys Ira M. Levee and Michael S. Etkin added for Public Pension Fund Group pursuant to their motions 264 and 265 to appear pro hac vice. (Text entry; no document attached.)
267
12/01/2009
ORDER granting 264 & 265 Motions for Leave to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/1/2009.
268
12/01/2009
MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Appendix A
1 Attachment
12/01/2009
NOTICE Lead Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice by Public Pension Fund Group. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 268 Which Was Incorrectly E-Filed By Counsel As A Motion For Leave To File) (Text entry; no document attached.)
269
12/02/2009
OPINION AND ORDER denying 200 Motion to Lift the Stay of Discovery. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2009.
270
12/02/2009
ORDER directing that the motion for judicial notice is granted to the extent that notice is taken that the "proofs of claim" were filed; notice is not taken of the accuracy of any information contained in the "proofs", as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2009.
271
12/02/2009
STANDARD BANKRUPTCY ORDER, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this case is dismissed as to dft Colonial BancGroup, Inc. without prejudice, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2009. (furn: Bankruptcy Clerk)
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
272
12/07/2009
Response to the Court regarding the scheduling of briefing pursuant to 11/18/09 hearing Jointly Proposed Scheduling Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss The Consolidated Amended Complaint by Price Waterhouse Coopers. Modified on 12/7/2009 to clarify text.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
273
12/09/2009
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
274
12/09/2009
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 1-A
3
Exhibit 1-B
4
Exhibit 1-C
4 Attachments
275
12/28/2009
Motion for Timothy N. Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014 to add attorney.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Timothy N. Mathews
1 Attachment
12/28/2009
***Attorney Timothy N. Mathews for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 275 Motion. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
276
12/29/2009
Filing fee received re 275 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602012347.
277
01/05/2010
ORDER granting 275 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/5/2010.
278
01/07/2010
OPINION AND ORDER denying 228 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/7/2010.
279
01/07/2010
ORDER directing as follows: (1) The suspension of proceedings, as required by the order entered on 9/25/2009 (Doc. No. 248), is lifted; (2) The pending dismissal motions (Doc. Nos. 232, 234, 236, 246, and 273) are set for submission, without oral argument on 2/16/2010, with the lead plf to file its brief by 1/29/2010, and all dfts to file reply briefs by 2/16/2010; (3) A Status Conference is set for 4/7/2010, at 10:30 AM by telephone before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. Counsel for the parties are to arrange for the conference to be conducted by telephone. Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2010, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/7/2010. (furn: yg, hc, ag, sc)
280
01/29/2010
MOTION to Strike 236 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws, 237 Evidentiary Submission, by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike
1 Attachment
281
01/29/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 280 MOTION to Strike 236 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/1/2010 to correct the docket text.
282
01/29/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 234 MOTION to Dismiss, 246 MOTION to Dismiss of Outside Director Defendants filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/1/2010 to add link to 246 Motion.
283
01/29/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 274 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
284
01/29/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 236 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
01/29/2010
***Attorney Paul J Geller, Jack Reise, Douglas Scott Wilens for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 280 Motion. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
285
02/02/2010
ORDER directing that the 280 MOTION to Strike is set for submission, without oral argument, on 2/8/2010, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/2/2010.
286
02/08/2010
RESPONSE in Opposition re 280 MOTION to Strike 236 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody. Modified on 2/9/2010 to correct the docket text.
287
02/12/2010
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 282 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
288
02/15/2010
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody. Modified on 2/16/2010 to reflect as not filed on behalf of Dft Patti Hill.
289
02/16/2010
ORDER granting 287 Motion for Three-Day Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/16/2010.
290
02/16/2010
ORDER granting 288 Motion for Three-Day Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/16/2010.
291
02/16/2010
REPLY BRIEF re 273 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
292
02/16/2010
REPLY BRIEF re 234 MOTION to Dismiss, 282 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition Outside Director Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch. Modified on 2/17/2010 to add link to 234 Motion.
293
02/16/2010
REPLY BRIEF re 246 MOTION to Dismiss, 282 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser. Modified on 2/17/2010 to add link to 246 Motion.
1
Exhibit Prospectus Supplement Dated March 3, 2008
1 Attachment
294
02/19/2010
REPLY BRIEF re 247 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 246 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Banc of America Securities, Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., City Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
295
02/19/2010
RESPONSE in Support re 236 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks and Sheila Moody's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks.
296
02/19/2010
Evidentiary Submission in Support of 295 Response in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks. Modified on 2/19/2010 to add link to 295 Response.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
297
02/19/2010
Evidentiary Submission in Support of 295 Response in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks. Modified on 2/19/2010 to add link to 295 Response.
1
Exhibit D
1 Attachment
298
02/19/2010
Evidentiary Submission in Support of 295 Response in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks. Modified on 2/19/2010 to add link to 295 Response.
1
Exhibit E
1 Attachment
299
03/03/2010
MOTION to Strike 295 Response in Support of Motion, 297 Evidentiary Submission, 296 Evidentiary Submission, 298 Evidentiary Submission, by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike
1 Attachment
300
03/03/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 299 MOTION to Strike 295 Response in Support of Motion, 297 Evidentiary Submission, 296 Evidentiary Submission, 298 Evidentiary Submission, filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 3/4/2010 to correct the docket text.
301
03/05/2010
NOTICE by Price Waterhouse Coopers of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel
302
03/05/2010
ORDER directing that the 299 MOTION to Strike is set for submission, without oral argument, on 4/2/2010, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/5/2010.
03/05/2010
301 Notice of Withdrawal is treated as a MOTION to Withdraw by Price Waterhouse Coopers pursuant to the 303 Order. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 301) (Text entry; no document attached.)
303
03/05/2010
ORDER treating 301 Notice of Withdrawal as a Motion to Withdraw and said motion is granted. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/5/2010.
03/05/2010
***Attorney Dan S McDevitt terminated pursuant to 303 Order. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
304
03/12/2010
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Claims Against Certain Underwriter Defendants by B.C. Ziegle and Co., Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., City Securities Corporation, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Mesirow Financial, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC, Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust. Modified on 3/15/2010 to also reflect as filed on behalf of the Public Pension Fund Group and The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
305
03/19/2010
JUDGMENT, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice is granted; (2) The "Tolled Underwriter Defendants" listed in said motion are dismissed without prejudice; (3) This case remains pending in all other respects; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
306
04/02/2010
RESPONSE in Opposition re 299 MOTION to Strike 295 Response in Support of Motion, 297 Evidentiary Submission, 296 Evidentiary Submission, 298 Evidentiary Submission, MOTION to Strike 295 Response in Support of Motion, 297 Evidentiary Submission, 296 Evidentiary Submission, 298 Evidentiary Submission, filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Sheila P. Moody.
307
04/02/2010
STATUS REPORT by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore, T. Brent Hicks, Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust, Price Waterhouse Coopers, Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Harold D. King, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, John C.H. Miller, Jr, Sheila P. Moody, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
308
04/07/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson: Status Conference held on 4/7/2010 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
309
05/12/2010
Motion for Matthew C. Moehlman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014 to add attorney.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
05/12/2010
***Attorney Matthew Christopher Moehlman for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 309 Motion. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
310
05/13/2010
Filing fee received re 309 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Christopher Moehlman: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602014051.
311
05/14/2010
ORDER granting 309 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
312
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 280 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
313
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 299 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
314
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 232 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
315
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 234 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
316
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 236 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
317
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 246 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
318
05/14/2010
ORDER denying 273 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
319
05/14/2010
(SUSPENDED PURSUANT TO 364 ORDER) RULE 26(F) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/4/2010. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/14/2010. Modified on 5/28/2010.
320
05/18/2010
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/28/2010.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
321
05/18/2010
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Banc of America Securities; Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc.; Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.; RBC Dain Rauscher Inc.; Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc.; SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.; USB Securities LLC; Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/28/2010.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
322
05/18/2010
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr., Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Harold D. King, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Samuel Sippial, Jr., Edward V. Welch; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/28/2010.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
323
05/18/2010
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to John C.H. Miller, Jr., Sheila P. Moody; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/28/2010.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
324
05/18/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John C.H. Miller, Jr re 323 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/18/2010 to add link to 323 Notice.
325
05/18/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sheila P. Moody re 323 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2010 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct case style and number: # 1 main document). Modified on 5/18/2010 to add link to 323 Notice.
326
05/18/2010
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY PURSUANT TO CONVERSATION WITH ATTORNEY) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by T. Brent Hicks. Modified on 5/18/2010.
327
05/18/2010
(STRICKEN AS AN ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY PURSUANT TO CONVERSATION WITH ATTORNEY) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patti Hill. Modified on 5/18/2010.
328
05/18/2010
NOTICE of ERROR re 326 & 327 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statements, which are hereby STRICKEN as erroneous docket entries.
329
05/18/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 325 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct case style and number.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
325
None
2 Attachments
330
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
331
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by UBS Securities LLC re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
332
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
333
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
334
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
335
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
336
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
337
05/19/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/20/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
338
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deborah L. Linden re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
339
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Edward V. Welch re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
340
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Ed Mathison re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
341
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Milton E. McGregor re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
342
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joseph D. Mussafer re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
343
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William E. Powell, III re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
344
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James W. Rane re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
345
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Simuel Sippial, Jr re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
346
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lewis E. Beville re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
347
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Augustus K. Clements, III re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
348
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Robert S. Craft re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
349
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick F. Dye re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
350
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hubert L. Harris, Jr re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
351
05/20/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Clinton O. Holdbrooks re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
352
05/21/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/21/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
353
05/21/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Banc of America Securities re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/21/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
354
05/21/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. re 321 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 5/21/2010 to add link to 321 Notice.
355
05/21/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Britton re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
356
05/21/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jerry J. Chesser re 322 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
05/24/2010
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/27/2010 03:00 PM in by telephone before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
357
05/25/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Public Pension Fund Group re 320 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
358
05/25/2010
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust re 320 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
359
05/26/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Klafter on behalf of The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust
360
05/26/2010
MOTION for Reconsideration re 318 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
361
05/26/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 360 MOTION for Reconsideration re 318 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
362
05/27/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson: Telephone Conference re Judge's Conflict held on 5/27/2010 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
363
05/28/2010
ORDERED that the clerk of the court is to arrange for the reassignment of this case to a new district or circuit judge. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/28/2010.
364
05/28/2010
ORDERED that, pending reassignment of this case to a new judge, the 319 Rule 26(f) Order is suspended. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/28/2010.
365
06/04/2010
MOTION for Reconsideration re 316 Order of the Denial of Their Motion to Dismiss by T. Brent Hicks, Robert E. Lowder, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore. Modified on 6/7/2010 to add link to 316 Order.
366
06/16/2010
NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Stephen Dampier
367
06/17/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn L. Dietrich on behalf of Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC
368
06/22/2010
MOTION for Reconsideration re 314 Order on Motion to Dismiss by William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser.
369
06/22/2010
MOTION for Reconsideration re 315 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch.
370
06/23/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Athanas on behalf of Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch
371
06/23/2010
Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation and Suspend Deadlines Pending Assignment of New Judge by Price Waterhouse Coopers, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch, Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, T. Brent Hicks, Robert E. Lowder, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore. LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, T. Brent Hicks, Robert E. Lowder, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore.
1
Text of Proposed Order) Modified on 6/23/2010 to add as also filed on behalf of Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch, Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA
1 Attachment
372
06/23/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 371 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation and Suspend Deadlines Pending Assignment of New Judge filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch, Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, T. Brent Hicks, Robert E. Lowder, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore. Modified on 6/23/2010 to add as also filed on behalf of, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch, Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, T. Brent Hicks, Robert E. Lowder, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore.
06/23/2010
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 371 Joint MOTION to Stay and 372 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, to add as also filed on behalf of, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch, Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, T. Brent Hicks, Robert E. Lowder, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
373
06/24/2010
MOTION for Reconsideration re 247 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 317 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
374
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lewis E. Beville. Lewis E. Beville waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
375
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerry J. Chesser. Jerry J. Chesser waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
376
07/15/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 371 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation and Suspend Deadlines Pending Assignment of New Judge filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
377
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Augustus K. Clements, III. Augustus K. Clements, III waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
378
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert S. Craft. Robert S. Craft waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
379
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick F. Dye. Patrick F. Dye waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
380
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hubert L. Harris, Jr. Hubert L. Harris, Jr waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
381
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clinton O. Holdbrooks. Clinton O. Holdbrooks waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
382
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah L. Linden. Deborah L. Linden waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
383
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Milton E. McGregor. Milton E. McGregor waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
384
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph D. Mussafer. Joseph D. Mussafer waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
385
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William E. Powell, III. William E. Powell, III waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
386
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James W. Rane. James W. Rane waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
387
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Simuel Sippial, Jr. Simuel Sippial, Jr waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
388
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edward V. Welch. Edward V. Welch waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
389
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Ed Mathison. John Ed Mathison waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
390
07/15/2010
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Britton. William Britton waiver sent on 6/30/2009, answer due 8/29/2009.
391
07/16/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 360 MOTION for Reconsideration re 318 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 373 MOTION for Reconsideration re 247 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 317 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 365 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Denial of Their Motion to Dismiss, 368 MOTION for Reconsideration re 314 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 369 MOTION for Reconsideration re 315 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 7/19/2010 to correct the docket text.
392
07/20/2010
(THIS PLEADING SHOULD BE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF) REPLY to Response to Motion re 371 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation and Suspend Deadlines Pending Assignment of New Judge filed by Banc of America Securities, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, Price Waterhouse Coopers, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch. Modified on 7/21/2010 to reflect that this entry was incorrectly e-filed as a reply and should actually be a MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF and to remove the incorrect filers which have been either terminated at a previous date or are not represented by defense counsel. Modified on 7/21/2010.
1
Exhibit Reply Brief
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
07/20/2010
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Banc of America Securities, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, John C.H. Miller, Jr, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, Price Waterhouse Coopers, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 392 Which Was Incorrectly E-Filed By Counsel As A Reply) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/21/2010
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 392 Reply to Response to Motion, to reflect that this entry was incorrectly e-filed as a reply and should actually be a MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF and to remove the incorrect filers which have been either terminated at a previous date or are not represented by defense counsel. Counsel is again reminded to select the proper parties when e-filing any pleadings. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
393
07/30/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 392 Joint Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 7/30/2010 to add a link to the 392 Joint Motion and to remove the incorrect link to the erroneous 392 Reply.
394
08/06/2010
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re 360 Motion for Reconsideration, 361 Brief in Support by Price Waterhouse Coopers. Modified on 8/6/2010 to add link to 360 Motion and 361 Brief.
1
Reply Brief in Support of Reconsideration
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
08/06/2010
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 394 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief, to add link to 360 Motion and 361 Brief. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
395
08/11/2010
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group re 393 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition
396
08/11/2010
AMENDED BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re MOTION for Leave to File filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 8/12/2010 to reflect as Amended Opposition amending 393 opposition (qc/djy,).
08/12/2010
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 396 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to reflect as Amended Opposition amending 393 opposition (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
397
08/16/2010
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Reply Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Stay Litigation and Suspend Deadlines Pending Assignment to New Judge
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
398
08/24/2010
NOTICE by Price Waterhouse Coopers of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel G. Patrick Montgomery
08/24/2010
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Price Waterhouse Coopers. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 398) (Text entry; no document attached.)
399
08/27/2010
DESIGNATION OF UNITED STATES JUDGE FOR SERVICE WITHIN THE CIRCUIT; Case reassigned to The Honorable R. David Proctor for all further proceedings; Honorable Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to case as presiding judge. Signed by Honorable Joel F. Dubina on 8/27/2010.
400
08/30/2010
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE; Status Conference set for 10/20/2010, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2D before The Honorable R. David Proctor; On or before 10/6/2010, counsel for the parties are to file a joint report on the status of the litigation, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 8/30/2010. (furn: yg, hc, ag)
401
09/30/2010
Evidentiary Submission re 360 MOTION for Reconsideration re 318 Order on Motion to Dismiss Notice of Filing of Supplemental Authority filed by Price Waterhouse Coopers.
1
Belmont Holdings Corp. v. Sun Trust Banks, Inc., 1:09-cv-1185, 2010 WL 3545389 (N.D. Ga. Sept. 10, 2010)
1 Attachment
402
10/05/2010
ORDER directing that the status conference previously set for Wednesday, October 20, 2010, is hereby RE-SET at 10:30 AM on Wednesday, December 15, 2010, in Courtroom 2D of the Frank M. Johnson United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. The joint report on the status of the litigation previously due October 6, 2010 SHALL be filed on or before December 7, 2010, as set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 10/5/10. (Furnished to Calendar and AG.) (Term'd: Status Conf 10/20/2010)
403
10/07/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Jon Davis on behalf of Banc of America Securities, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC (Main Document 403 replaced on 10/14/2010 to attach a corrected PDF document to include a correct certificate of service and the correct Judge's initials in the case number). Modified on 10/14/2010.
404
10/14/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 403 Notice of Appearance, to attach a corrected PDF document to include a correct certificate of service and the correct Judge's initials in the case number.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
403
None
2 Attachments
405
12/07/2010
JOINT STATUS REPORT ON THE LITIGATION by Banc of America Securities, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Mesirow Financial, Inc., John C.H. Miller, Jr, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, Price Waterhouse Coopers, Public Pension Fund Group, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust, UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch. (Main Document 405 replaced on 12/8/2010 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the e-signature on the certificate of service page). Modified on 12/8/2010 to remove the following terminated parties as filers: B.C. Ziegle and Co., Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., City Securities Corporation, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC.
406
12/08/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 405 Joint Status Report, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the e-signature on the certificate of service page.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
405
None
2 Attachments
12/08/2010
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 405 Joint Status Report, to remove the following terminated parties as filers: B.C. Ziegle and Co., Bear Stearns Companies, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., City Securities Corporation, Crowell, Weedon & Co., D.A. Davidson & Co., Davenport & Company LLC, Doley Securities, LLC, Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Fidelity Capital Markets, Fixed Income Securities, LP, H&R Block Financial Advisors, Inc., J.J.B. Hilliard, W.L. Lyons, Inc., Janney Montgomery Scott LLC, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Pershing LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Stone & Youngberg LLC, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, LLC. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
407
12/14/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Walker on behalf of Price Waterhouse Coopers
12/15/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge The Honorable R. David Proctor: Status Conference held on 12/15/2010 (No PDF attached). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
408
12/17/2010
ORDER directing as follows: 1) In response to the 398 Notice of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel, attorney George Patrick Montgomery is TERMINATED; 2) All other pending motions, including Dfts' 371 Motion to Stay and Suspend Deadlines Pending Reassignment, all motions to reconsider Judge Thompson's denial of Dfts' motions to dismiss, and all related motions (Docs. # 360, 365, 368, 369, 373, 392, 392, 397), are MOOT; 3) On or before 2/15/2011, counsel for the parties SHALL meet, face to face, and confer regarding an amended consolidated class action complaint to be filed by Lead Plfs, as further set out in order; 4) On or before 4/20/2011, having carefully considered these discussions, Lead Plfs SHALL file their amended consolidated class action complaint; 5) Dfts SHALL respond to Lead Pls' amended consolidated class action complaint on or before 6/22/2011, as further set out in order; 6) Lead Plfs may, subject to objections by Dfts and third parties, seek third party discovery from the FDIC as discussed at the status conference, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 12/16/2010.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
12/17/2010
***Attorney George Patrick Montgomery terminated pursuant to 408 Order. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
409
01/04/2011
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: In-Court Status Conference (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on 12/15/2010, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mitchell P. Reisner, Telephone number 334-235-8218. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 1/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2011.
410
02/04/2011
ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 2/9/2011 @ 10:30 AM before The Honorable R. David Proctor to discuss lead plf counsel's request to issue additional subpoenas to non parties, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/4/11. Furnished to Calendar group.
411
02/08/2011
MOTION for Protective Order by Banc of America Securities, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, Price Waterhouse Coopers, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch. (Main Document 411 replaced on 2/8/2011 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct e-signature on the certificate of service). Modified on 2/8/2011.
412
02/08/2011
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 411 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Banc of America Securities, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, Price Waterhouse Coopers, Public Pension Fund Group, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch. Modified on 2/8/2011.
1
Exhibit Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Protective Order) (Main Document 412 replaced on 2/8/2011 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct e-signature on the certificate of service
1 Attachment
413
02/08/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 411 MOTION for Protective Order, 412 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, to attach corrected PDF documents to include the correct e-signature on the certificate of service.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
2
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
411
None
412
None
4 Attachments
02/09/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge The Honorable R. David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2011 (No PDF attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
414
02/11/2011
RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
415
02/18/2011
MOTION to Stay Discovery in State Court Action by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore. Modified on 2/22/2011 to correct the docket text.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K) (Main Document 415 replaced on 2/22/2011 to attach a corrected PDF document to include a correct certificate of service
11 Attachments
416
02/22/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 415 MOTION to Stay Discovery in State Court Action, to attach a corrected PDF document to include a correct certificate of service.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
415
None
2 Attachments
417
02/23/2011
ORDER re 415 MOTION to Stay Discovery in State Court Action; that any interested parties who oppose the motion SHALL brief the issues raised by Dfts' motion no later than 14 calendar days after the entry of this order; Reply submission(s) shall be filed no later than 7 calendar days after the date on which the responsive submission(s) was due, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/23/2011.
418
03/01/2011
NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell David Greggs on behalf of Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore
419
03/01/2011
MOTION to Stay re 415 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery in State Court Action Defendants' Supplemental Filing in Support of by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore.
1
Exhibit 1 -- February 25, 2011 Order
2
Exhibit 2 -- Letter of April 15, 2010
3
Exhibit 3 -- April 30, 2010 Order
4
Exhibit 4 -- Second Amended Complaint
5
Exhibit 5 -- Order of September 7, 2010
6
Exhibit 6 -- Fourth Amended Complaint
7
Exhibit 7 -- Lowder's Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint
8
Exhibit 8 -- Order of December 13, 2010
9
Exhibit 10 -- Letter dated January 20, 2011
10
Exhibit 10 -- Letter dated January 21, 2011
11
Exhibit 11 -- Defendants' Motion for Protective Order
12
Exhibit 12 -- Letter of February 21, 2011
13
Exhibit 13 -- Plaintiffs Motion to Compel
14
Exhibit 14 -- Defendants' Supplement Filing Concerning Briefing Scheduling
14 Attachments
03/01/2011
Supplemental Filing in Support of 415 MOTION to Stay Discovery in State Court Action filed by Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 419) (Text entry; no document attached.)
420
03/09/2011
RESPONSE in Opposition re 415 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery in State Court Action filed by Elizabeth R Carter, John R Roper, Estate of Frances Elizabeth Parham Roper. Modified on 3/10/2011 to correct the docket text.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
13
Exhibit M
14
Exhibit N
14 Attachments
03/09/2011
***Attorney Richard Earl Smith, Kenneth O'Neal Simon, Maxwell Homer Pulliam, Oscar M Price, IV for Interested Parties Elizabeth R Carter, Estate of Frances Elizabeth Parham Roper, John R Roper added pursuant to 420 Response. (No PDF Attached) Modified on 9/27/2011. (Text entry; no document attached.)
421
03/10/2011
ORDER directing counsel in this case and in the Roper case to meet and confer, in good faith, to develop and file an agreed-upon protective order which will prevent access by Lead Plfs' Counsel in this case to the discovery produced in the Roper case until after motions practice over the upcoming amended consolidated class action complaint in this case is resolved; In all other respects, the 415 Motion to Stay Discovery in State Court filed by Dfts Lowder and Moore is DENIED. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 3/10/2011.
422
04/15/2011
STIPULATION and Proposed SCHEDULING ORDER by Banc of America Securities, Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Elizabeth R Carter, Jerry J. Chesser, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Estate of Frances Elizabeth Parham Roper, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Harold D. King, Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, John C.H. Miller, Jr, Sheila P. Moody, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, Price Waterhouse Coopers, Public Pension Fund Group, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, John R Roper, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust, UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch. Modified on 4/18/2011 to remove the terminated parties as filers.
04/18/2011
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 422 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order, to remove the terminated parties as filers. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
423
04/18/2011
ORDER re 422 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order: 1) Lead Plfs SHALL file their amended consolidated class action complaint on or before 4/29/2011; 2) Dfts SHALL respond to Lead Plfs' amended consolidated class action complaint on or before 7/1/2011. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 4/18/2011.
424
04/29/2011
FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against Banc of America Securities LLC, Lewis E. Beville, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Sarah H. Moore, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Edward V. Welch, filed by Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust, City of Worcester. Modified on 5/2/2011 to correct the docket text, to add as also filed on behalf of City of Worcester and The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust and to remove the terminated defendants.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
04/29/2011
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Worcester, Public Pension Fund Group, The Horace F. Moyer and Joan M. Moyer Living Trust. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 424) (Text entry; no document attached.)
425
05/02/2011
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Worcester. Modified on 5/3/2011 to add the correct filer City of Worcester and to remove the incorrect filer Public Pension Fund Group.
426
05/18/2011
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group of the Withdrawal of Attorney Kimberly Sanders
05/18/2011
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Kimberly Sanders by Public Pension Fund Group. (No PDF Attached-See Docket Entry 426) (Text entry; no document attached.)
427
05/19/2011
ORDER granting 426 Motion to Withdraw; DIRECTING the Clerk to TERMINATE Attorney Sanders. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 5/19/2011.
05/19/2011
***Attorney Kimberly A. Sanders terminated pursuant to 427 Order. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
428
06/14/2011
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Modified on 6/14/2011 to reflect that this is an Unopposed Motion rather than a Supplemental Motion.
429
06/14/2011
ORDER granting 428 Unopposed Motion of Certain Dfts for Extension of Time; PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and the Underwriter Dfts SHALL respond to Plfs' FirstAmended Consolidated Class Action Complaint on or before 8/1/2011. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 6/14/2011.
430
06/22/2011
ORDER granting informal motion by the Director Dfts for an extension of the time to respond to Plfs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; The Director Dfts SHALL respond to Plfs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint on or before 8/1/2011. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 6/22/2011.
431
07/20/2011
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
432
07/21/2011
ORDER granting 431 Unopposed Motion of Certain Defendants for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 7/21/2011.
433
08/01/2011
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group, Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Deborah L. Linden, Milton E. McGregor, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, T. Brent Hicks, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Robert E. Lowder, John Ed Mathison, Sarah H. Moore, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch JOINT NOTICE OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' ENTRY INTO STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF SETTLEMENT WITH OFFICER AND DIRECTOR DEFENDANTS (Main Document 433 replaced on 8/2/2011 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct parties). Modified on 8/2/2011 to remove the previously terminated parties John C.H. Miller, Jr. Sheila P. Moody, William Britton and Jerry J. Chesser and to add as also filed on behalf of Public Pension Fund Group, Lewis E. Beville, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Deborah L. Linden, Milton E. McGregor. Modified on 8/8/2011.
434
08/01/2011
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
435
08/01/2011
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
436
08/01/2011
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
437
08/01/2011
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Modified on 8/2/2011.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
13
Exhibit M
14
Exhibit N) Modified on 8/2/2011 to add a link to the
436
Motion. (Main Document 437 replaced on 8/2/2011 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the page numbers
15 Attachments
438
08/02/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 433 Joint Notice, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct parties.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
433
None
2 Attachments
439
08/02/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 437 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the page numbers.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
437
None
2 Attachments
440
08/08/2011
ORDER re 433 Joint Notice of Lead Plfs' Entry into Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Officer and Director Dfts: ORDERED as follows: 1) The Officer and Director Dfts' obligation to respond to the First Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws is hereby SUSPENDED; and 2) Lead Plfs are GRANTED a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to apply to the court for preliminary approval of Lead Plfs' settlement with the Officer and Director Dfts. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 8/8/2011.
441
08/11/2011
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lewis E. Beville, William Britton, Jerry J. Chesser, Augustus K. Clements, III, Robert S. Craft, Patrick F. Dye, Hubert L. Harris, Jr, Clinton O. Holdbrooks, Deborah L. Linden, John Ed Mathison, Milton E. McGregor, Joseph D. Mussafer, William E. Powell, III, James W. Rane, Simuel Sippial, Jr, Edward V. Welch. (Main Document 441 replaced on 8/12/2011 to correct main PDF document to include address of counsel) (qc/djy,).
442
08/12/2011
ORDER granting 441 Motion for Sheila Sawyer to Withdraw as Attorney; directing the clerk to terminate attorney Sawyer. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 8/12/11.
08/12/2011
*** Attorney Sheila Watters Sawyer terminated pursuant to 442 order (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
443
08/12/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 441 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney to correct main PDF document to include address of counsel
1
Corrected main document to Docket Entry
441
None
2 Attachments
444
08/12/2011
MOTION for Settlement /Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement and Certification of Class for Settlement Purposes by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 8/15/2011.
1
Declaration of James W. Johnson In Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement
2
Text of Proposed Order) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2011 to attach a corrected attachment PDF document to include Exhibit 1 to the Declaration
2 Attachments
445
08/12/2011
STIPULATION re 444 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement and Certification of Class for Settlement Purposes, /Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Johnson in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 8/15/2011 to correct the docket text.
446
08/12/2011
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 444 MOTION for Settlement /Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement and Certification of Class for Settlement Purposes filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
447
08/15/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 444 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement and Certification of Class for Settlement Purposes, to attach a corrected attachment PDF document to include Exhibit 1 to the Declaration.
1
Corrected Attachment PDF Document to Docket Entry
444
None
2 Attachments
448
08/15/2011
STIPULATION and Proposed Scheduling Order by Public Pension Fund Group, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Secuirities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Main Document 448 replaced on 8/15/2011 to attach a corrected PDF document.). Modified on 8/15/2011 to add as also filed on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Secuirities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
449
08/15/2011
NOTICE of Correction re 448 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order, to attach a corrected PDF document.
1
Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry
448
None
2 Attachments
450
08/19/2011
ORDER directing that: (1) any opposition by lead plaintiffs to the 434 & 436 motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before 9/26/2011; (2) any Reply Briefs by the Underwriter defendants and PwC shall be filed on or before 10/28/2011; additionally, on or before Friday 8/26/2011, the parties are to submit a proposed scheduling order for submissions and a hearing on Public Pension Group's 444 motion for preliminary approval of partial settlement and certification of class for settlement purposes. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 8/19/11.
451
08/24/2011
ORDER directing the clerk to administratively terminate 411 Motion for Protective Order, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 8/24/11.
452
08/29/2011
STIPULATION and Proposed Scheduling Order re 450 Order, Set Deadlines, by Public Pension Fund Group, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. Modified on 8/30/2011 to correct the docket text and to add as also filed on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Public Pension Fund Group, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
453
08/30/2011
ORDER re 452 Stipulation, that the following deadlines SHALL apply: 1) The Underwriter Dfts and Dft PricewaterhouseCoopers LLC SHALL file any submissions with respect to the Public Pension Group's 444 Motion on or before 9/14/2011; 2) The preliminary approval hearing on the Public Pension Group's Motion is SET, at the parties' request, at 2:00 PM on Monday, 9/19/2011, in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 8/30/2011. (furn: Calendar, sc) Modified on 8/31/2011 to add link to the 452 Stipulation.
454
09/09/2011
Motion for Nicole Zeiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014 to add attorney.
1
Certificate of Good Standing for Nicole Zeiss
1 Attachment
09/09/2011
***Attorney Nicole M. Zeiss for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 454 Motion. (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
455
09/12/2011
ORDER conditionally granting 454 Motion for Nicole M. Zeiss to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; that on or before 9/16/2011, Attorney Zeiss SHALL pay the filing fee of $50.00, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/12/2011.
456
09/15/2011
STIPULATION re 445 Stipulation, /Amended and Restated Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement With Officer and Director Defendants by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A - (Proposed) Revised Preliminary Approval Order Providing for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Proposed Partial Class Action Settlement
2
Exhibit A-1 - Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Proposed Partial Settlement
3
Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim and Release
4
Exhibit A-3 - Summary of Pendency of Class Action and Proposed Partial Settlement
5
Exhibit B - (Proposed) Final Order and Judgment as to Officer and Director Defendants
5 Attachments
09/19/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before The Honorable R. David Proctor: Preliminary Approval of Settlement Hearing held on 9/19/2011 (in Birmingham) re 444 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement filed by Public Pension Fund Group. A separate Order of Preliminary Settlement Approval will enter; the final settlement hearing will be set at a later day. (No PDF attached). (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
457
09/20/2011
ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE AND HEARING IN CONNECTION WITH PARTIAL CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/20/2011.
1
Exhibit 1 - Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Proposed Partial Settlement
2
Exhibit 2 - Proof of Claim and Release
3
Exhibit 3 - Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Proposed Partial Settlement
3 Attachments
458
09/21/2011
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /Public Pension Group's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
459
09/21/2011
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 454 Motion for Nicole M. Zeiss: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602019928.
460
09/22/2011
ORDER granting 458 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/22/2011.
461
09/26/2011
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint /Public Pension Funds' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion to Dismiss filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Appendix A
2
Appendix B
2 Attachments
462
09/26/2011
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint /Public Pension Group's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Appendix A
1 Attachment
463
09/23/2011
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Drew D. Dropkin (Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 46020109954.) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
1
Correct Certificate of Service
2
Declaration of Drew D. Dropkin
3
Certificate of Good Standing
4
Proposed Order
5
Receipt
5 Attachments
464
09/30/2011
ORDER granting 463 Motion for Drew D. Dropkin Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/30/11.
465
10/24/2011
ORDER setting out deadlines that SHALL apply to the 457 Order, as further set out in order; that the Scheduling Hearing is hereby SET for 1/25/2012, at 01:00 PM before The Honorable R. David Proctor. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 10/24/2011. (furn: Calendar, ag, sc)
466
10/26/2011
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Certain Defendants (Unopposed) by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
467
10/27/2011
ORDER granting 466 Unopposed Motion of Certain Dfts for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 10/27/2011.
468
10/28/2011
REPLY BRIEF re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
469
10/28/2011
REPLY to Response to Motion re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
470
12/21/2011
MOTION for Settlement /Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Settlement, Certification of Class and Approval of Plan of Allocation by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Declaration of James W. Johnson in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Action Settlement
2
Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit 2
4
Exhibit 3
5
Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit 5
7
Exhibit 6
8
Exhibit 7
9
Exhibit 8
10
Exhibit 9
11
Exhibit 10
12
Exhibit 11
13
Exhibit 12
14
Exhibit 13
15
Exhibit 14
16
Exhibit 15
16 Attachments
471
12/21/2011
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 470 MOTION for Settlement /Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Settlement, Certification of Class and Approval of Plan of Allocation filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 12/21/2011 to clarify the docket text.
472
12/21/2011
MOTION for Attorney Fees /Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Declaration of James W. Johnson in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
2
Exhibit 1
3
Exhibit 2
4
Exhibit 3
5
Exhibit 4
6
Exhibit 5
7
Exhibit 6
8
Exhibit 7
9
Exhibit 8
10
Exhibit 9
11
Exhibit 10
12
Exhibit 11
13
Exhibit 12
14
Exhibit 13
15
Exhibit 14
16
Exhibit 15
16 Attachments
473
12/21/2011
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 472 MOTION for Attorney Fees /Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 12/21/2011 to clarify the docket text.
12/21/2011
MOTION for Certification of Class, MOTION for Approval of Plan Allocation by Public Pension Fund Group. (No pdf attached-See docket entry 470) (Text entry; no document attached.)
474
12/30/2011
Objection to Proposed Settlement by Linda W. Stafford, Charles L. Stafford.
475
01/05/2012
Objection to Proposed Settlement by Sandra Lee Douglas.
476
01/05/2012
Objection to Proposed Settlement by Beyla Alvarado, Edoardo Rimola.
477
01/11/2012
AFFIDAVIT in Support (Declaration of James W. Johnson Concerning Objections and Exclusion Requests) re 472 Lead Counsel's MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, 470 Lead Plfs' MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Settlement, MOTION for Certification of Class and MOTION for Approval of Plan of Allocation, filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 1/12/2012 to clarify the docket text to reflect as a Declaration.
478
01/18/2012
REPLY MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 470 MOTION for Approval of Proposed Partial Settlement, and 472 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 1/19/2012 to clarify the docket text.
479
01/18/2012
AFFIDAVIT in Support (Reply Declaration of James W. Johnson) re 470 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Settlement, Certification of Class and Approval of Plan of Allocation and 472 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 1/19/2012 to clarify the docket text.
1
Exhibit A
2
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation
3
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses
3 Attachments
480
01/24/2012
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group re 470 MOTION for Settlement /Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Settlement, Certification of Class and Approval of Plan of Allocation, MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Approval of Plan Allocation, 478 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 479 Affidavit in Support of Motion, /Notice of Filing of Proposed Final Order and Judgment As To Officer and Director Defendants
1
Proposed Final Order and Judgment As To Officer and Director Defendants
1 Attachment
01/25/2012
Minute Entry for proceedings held before The Honorable R. David Proctor: Settlement Conference held on 1/25/2012. Counsel for plaintiffs class members and defendants present. Oral argument by parties. The court will take the settlement approval under advisement and will enter a separate order (NO PDF document attached to this notice-available for court use only). (Court Reporter McCorvey.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
481
02/06/2012
AFFIDAVIT in Support (Supplemental Declaration of Nicole M. Zeiss Concerning Invalid Exclusion Requests) re 472 MOTION for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, 470 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Partial Class Settlement, Certification of Class and Approval of Plan of Allocation, filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/7/2012 to clarify the docket text.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
6 Attachments
482
04/18/2012
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED PARTIAL CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 4/18/2012.
483
04/18/2012
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 4/18/2012.
484
08/29/2012
NOTICE by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint of Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
485
09/20/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition re 484 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by Public Pension Fund Group.
486
09/21/2012
REPLY BRIEF re 485 Response in Opposition to Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
487
10/10/2012
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plfs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plfs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Motion Hearing SET for Thursday, 11/29/2012, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2F before The Honorable R. David Proctor; A court reporter will be present. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 10/10/2012. (furn: Calendar, kg)
488
11/20/2012
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Request for Judicial Notice in Further Opposition to Defendant Pricewaterhousecooper's Motion to Dismiss filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
489
11/20/2012
Motion for Craig A. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 2/28/2014 to add attorney.
1
Certificate of Good Standing for Craig A. Martin
1 Attachment
11/20/2012
***Attorney Craig Anthony Martin for Public Pension Fund Group added pursuant to 489 Motion. (No pdf attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
490
11/21/2012
Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 489 Motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602025008.
491
11/26/2012
ORDER granting 489 Motion for Craig A. Martin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 11/26/2012.
492
11/27/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition re 488 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition, and Support to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
493
11/27/2012
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN FURTHER OPPOSITION filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
494
11/29/2012
Minute Entry for proceedings held before The Honorable R. David Proctor: Motion Hearing held on 11/29/2012 re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.)
495
12/03/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition to 493 Public Pension Groups REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Further Opposition tot he Motions to Dismiss, by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. Modified on 12/4/2012 to add the link to the 493 Request and to remove Lewis E. Beville and the previously terminated underwriter defendants as filers.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
12/04/2012
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 495 Response in Opposition, to add the link to the 493 Request and to remove Lewis E. Beville and the previously terminated underwriter defendants as filers. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
496
12/14/2012
RESPONSE in Support re 434 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint PUBLIC PENSION GROUPS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLPS AND UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
497
12/18/2012
ORDERED as follows: 1) On or before 1/22/2013, Plfs SHALL provide to Dfts the remaining portions of the charts at issue with respect to both their Section 10(b) and their Section 11 and 12 claims; 2) On or before 1/29/2013, all counsel SHALL confer regarding the charts as applicable to the Section 11 and 12 claims; 3) On or before 2/1/2013, all counsel SHALL submit a joint written report, as further set out in order; 4) On or before 2/12/2013, PricewaterhouseCoopers SHALL provide its response to the additional portions of the pleadings summary as to the Section 10(b) claims and, depending on the contents of the 2/1/2013 Joint Report, also the Section 11 and 12 claims. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 12/18/2012.
498
12/21/2012
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on November 29, 2012, before Judge Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Reisner, Telephone number 334-313-7185. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 1/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2013.
499
02/01/2013
JOINT REPORT ON THE STATUS OF THE LITIGATION, by Public Pension Fund Group, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. Modified on 2/4/2013 to add as also filed on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP, and the Underwriter Dfts.
500
02/05/2013
ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for 2/14/2013 @ 02:30 PM before The Honorable R. David Proctor to discuss the competing proposals contained within the Joint Report on the Status of the Litigation, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/5/13. Furnished to calendar group & WR.
501
02/12/2013
ORDER RESETTING Telephone Conference presently set for 2/14/2013 @ 2:30 to 2/20/2013 @ 02:30 PM before The Honorable R. David Proctor, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/12/13. Furnished to calendar group & WR.
502
02/14/2013
ORDER directing that the telephone conference previously set for Wednesday, February 20, 2013, at 2:30 PM is hereby RE-SET at 11:00 AM on Monday, February 25, 2013, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/14/13. (Furnished to Calendar/AG/KG)
503
02/26/2013
ORDER: The court conducted a telephone status conference on 2/25/2013, to discuss the competing proposals contained within the Joint Report on the Status of the Litigation (Doc. 499), as to briefing on Plaintiff's anticipated motion for leave to amend the complaint. As a result of the matters occurring during the status conference, it is ORDERED as follows: 1. On or before March 15, 2013, Plaintiffs SHALL file their anticipated motion for leave to amend the complaint, not to exceed twenty (20) pages in length. 2. On or before March 29, 2013, Defendants SHALL file their anticipated briefs in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend, not to exceed twenty (20) pages in length. 3. On or before April 5, 2013, Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their motion, not to exceed ten (10) pages in length. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/26/2013.
504
03/04/2013
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Modified on 3/5/2013 to clarify the docket text.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
505
03/15/2013
MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Declaration of James W. Johnson
2
Proposed Second Amended Complaint
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
506
03/15/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
507
03/27/2013
Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadline to file Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
508
03/27/2013
Amended MOTION for Extension of Deadline to file Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re 507 Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadline to file Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
509
03/27/2013
ORDER granting 507 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition Brief and 508 Amended Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition Brief; it is ORDERED as follows: 1) On or before 4/2/2013, Dfts SHALL file their anticipated briefs in opposition to Plfs' motion for leave to amend, not to exceed 20 pages in length; 2) On or before 4/10/2013, Plfs may file a reply in support of their motion, not to exceed 10 pages in length. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 3/27/2013.
510
04/02/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
511
04/02/2013
BRIEF in Opposition re 505 MOTION to Amend the Complaint filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. Modified on 4/3/2013 to remove the link to the 506 Brief and add the correct link to the 505 Motion.
512
04/10/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint Reply in Further Support of their Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint and to the Opposition of Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
513
04/10/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint Reply in Support of their Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint and to the Opposition of the Underwriter Defendants filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
514
05/30/2013
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint, 506 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Supplemental Authority
515
06/12/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 514 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
516
07/02/2013
NOTICE by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC Notice of Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
517
07/22/2013
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group re 516 Notice (Other), Response to Underwriter Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority
07/22/2013
RESPONSE to 516 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Public Pension Fund Group. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 517 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
518
08/20/2013
REPLY BRIEF re 517 Notice (Other) filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
519
08/22/2013
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group re 505 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint Notice of Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
520
09/09/2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/9/2013.
521
09/09/2013
ORDER denying 505 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/9/2013.
522
09/09/2013
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 434 & 436 MOTIONS to Dismiss; Counts III, IV, VI, and VII are DISMISSED as to all issues other than relating to Colonial's MWLD; As to Colonial's MWLD, Counts III, IV, VI, and VII remain pending; The court continues to take the Motions to Dismiss as to Count I, the Exchange Act Section 10(b) claim against PwC, under submission, as further set out in order. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/9/2013.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
523
09/20/2013
Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadline for Underwriter Defendants to Answer Complaint by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
524
09/23/2013
ORDER granting 523 Consent Motion to Extend Deadline For Underwriter Defendants to Answer Complaint; The Underwriter Defendants deadline to answer the First Amended Complaint will be twenty-one (21) days after the date on which the court rules on the remainder of PwCs Motion to Dismiss. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/23/13.
525
11/21/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
526
11/26/2013
RESPONSE in Support re 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Response to Request for Judicial Notice filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
527
02/27/2014
MOTION for Settlement (Distribution of Net Settlement Fund) by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Declaration of Paul Mulholland, CPA
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
528
02/27/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 527 MOTION for Settlement (Distribution of Net Settlement Fund) filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
529
02/28/2014
ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT WITH OFFICER AND DIRECTOR DEFENDANTS directing that the Public Pension Funds' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund (Doc. # 527) is GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/28/14.
530
03/27/2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 3/27/14.
531
03/27/2014
ORDER directing that, in accordance with the accompanying memorandum opinion, the remaining portion of PwC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. # 436) ("FAC"), relating to Count I, the Exchange Act Section 10(b) claim against PwC, is GRANTED; Count I of the FAC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; On or before April 25, 2014, the parties SHALL file a Rule 26 planning report. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 3/27/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
532
04/08/2014
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
1 Attachment
533
04/09/2014
ORDER directing that Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. # 532) the is GRANTED; PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and the Underwriter Defendants SHALL answer the First Amended Complaint on or before May 2, 2014. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 4/9/14.
534
04/10/2014
NOTICE by Public Pension Fund Group re 424 Amended Complaint, of Supplemental Filing
1
Amended Certification
1 Attachment
535
04/25/2014
STIPULATION and (Proposed) Scheduling Order by Public Pension Fund Group.
536
05/01/2014
ORDER directing that this matter is SET for a telephone scheduling and status conference at 1:30 PM Central Time on Thursday, May 15, 2014. The parties are DIRECTED to call (205) 278-2186 and use the following user access number to join the call: 3893. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 5/1/14. (Furnished to Calendar Group)
537
05/02/2014
Underwriter Defendants' ANSWER to 424 Amended Complaint, by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
538
05/02/2014
ANSWER to 424 Amended Complaint, by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
539
05/13/2014
ORDER directing that the telephone scheduling and status conference previously set at 1:30 PM Central Time on Thursday, May 15, 2014, is hereby RE-SET at 2:30 PM on Tuesday, May 20, 2014. The parties are directed to call (205) 278-2186 and use the following user access number to join the call: 3893. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 5/13/14. (Furnished to Calendar)
540
05/20/2014
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 5/20/14. (Furnished to Calendar)
541
06/09/2014
ORDER directing that, on or before Monday, June 16, 2014, the parties SHALL provide the court with an additional report regarding their efforts to find a mutually agreeable mediator with availability for mediation, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 6/9/14.
542
06/17/2014
TEXT ORDER directing that the parties SHALL provide the court with an additional report on their efforts to select a mediator on or before June 27, 2014. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 6/17/14. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
543
07/16/2014
STIPULATION by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.
544
07/17/2014
ORDER directing that, in accordance with the parties' 543 Stipulation, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The parties SHALL exchange initial disclosures on or before September 26, 2014; (2) The parties may commence discovery on September 12, 2014; and (3) All other deadlines set forth in the court's May 20, 2014 Scheduling Order (Doc. # 540) remain unchanged. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 7/17/14.
545
09/12/2014
ORDER directing that this matter is SET for a telephone scheduling and status conference at 10:00 AM Central Time on Tuesday, September 23, 2014, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/12/14. (Furnished to Calendar)
546
09/15/2014
ORDER directing that the telephone scheduling conference previously set for 10:00 AM Central Time on Tuesday, September 23, 2014, is hereby RE-SET at 9:00 AM Central Time on Wednesday, October 1, 2014, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/15/14.
547
09/30/2014
ORDER directing that the telephone scheduling conference previously set for 9:00 AM Central Time on Wednesday, October 1, 2014, is hereby RE-SET at 9:00 AM Central Time on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/30/14.
548
02/18/2015
MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Remaining Defendants) by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
549
02/18/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 548 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Remaining Defendants) filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
550
02/18/2015
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 548 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Remaining Defendants) filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
4 Attachments
551
02/26/2015
ORDER directing that the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Remaining Defendants (Doc. # 548) is SET for a telephone hearing at 10:00 AM Central Time on Thursday, March 12, 2015, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on February 26, 2015. (Furnished to Calendar)
552
03/13/2015
ORDER directing as follows: The court has reviewed the Stipulation and preliminarily finds the Settlement set forth therein to be fair, reasonable and adequate, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing, as further set out; a hearing (the "Settlement Hearing") pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is hereby scheduled to be held before the court in Courtroom 7A at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama, on Thursday, June 18, 2015, at 9:30 AM, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 03/13/2015.
553
05/14/2015
MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement with Remaining Defendants, Certification of Class, and Approval of Plan of Allocation, by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 5/14/2015 to clarify text pursuant to PDF document.
554
05/14/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 553 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement with Remaining Defendants, Certification of Class, and Approval of Plan of Allocation, filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 5/14/2015 to clarify text pursuant to PDF document.
555
05/14/2015
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses by Public Pension Fund Group.
556
05/14/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 555 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
557
05/14/2015
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 553 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement with Remaining Defendants, Certification of Class, and Approval of Plan of Allocation, 555 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
12 Attachments
558
06/11/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 553 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement with Remaining Defendants, Certification of Class, and Approval of Plan of Allocation, 555 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Text of Proposed Order Final Order and Judgment as to Remaining Defendants
2
Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Plan of Allocation
3
Text of Proposed Order Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2015: #
4
Affidavit of Josephine Bravata
4 Attachments
559
06/11/2015
(STRICKEN AS ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY) AFFIDAVIT in Support re 553 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement with Remaining Defendants, Certification of Class, and Approval of Plan of Allocation, 555 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses Declaration of Josephine Bravata Concerning Mailing of Notice filed by Public Pension Fund Group. Modified on 6/11/2015.
560
06/11/2015
NOTICE of PDF Correction re 558 Reply to Response to Motion, to reflect addition of Bravata affidavit.
1
Affidavit of Josephine Bravata
1 Attachment
561
06/11/2015
NOTICE of ERROR re 559 Affidavit in Support of Motion, to reflect striking as erroneous docket entry.
06/18/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before The Honorable R. David Proctor: Settlement Conference held in Birmingham, AL on 6/18/2015 (NO PDF ATTACHED) (Text entry; no document attached.)
562
06/19/2015
FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, after careful deliberation, this court MAKES the following findings and conclusions, and ENTERS this Final Judgment in connection with the parties' proposed settlement, as further set out. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on June 19, 2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
563
06/19/2015
ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on June 19, 2015.
564
06/19/2015
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on June 19, 2015.
565
06/22/2015
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Hearing Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on June 18, 2015, before Judge R. David Proctor, at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone Number (256)656-8239. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS.
06/22/2015
Corrected Transcript Deadlines re 565 Transcript; Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015; Redaction Request due 7/14/2015; Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
566
12/21/2017
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds in Connection with Settlement with Remaining Defendants by Public Pension Fund Group.
1
Declaration of Josephine Bravata
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
567
12/21/2017
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 566 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds in Connection with Settlement with Remaining Defendants filed by Public Pension Fund Group.
568
01/03/2018
ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT WITH REMAINING DEFENDANTS: ORDER granting 566 Motion for Disbursement of Net Settlement Fund in Connection with Settlement with Remaining Dfts, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable R. David Proctor on 1/3/2018.
569
02/15/2018
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Drew Dropkin) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
570
02/15/2018
ORDER granting [569] Motion to Withdraw as Individual Counsel for PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; directing the Clerk to terminate attorney Dropkin's representation of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP in this case. Signed by Honorable R. David Proctor on 2/15/2018.
02/15/2018
***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S [570] ORDER - Attorney Drew David Dropkin terminated. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.