In re Crash of Aircraft N93PC on July 7, 2013, at Soldotna, Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00112 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
165
04/03/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Joint MOTION to Continue. Jurisdictional discovery to be completed 7/2/18. Supplemental response to motion to dismiss due 7/23/18. Reply brief due 10 days after the filing of the supplemental brief. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/3/18.
166
07/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
167
07/20/2018
Stipulation
168
07/25/2018
Order on Stipulation
169
08/30/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
170
08/30/2018
Declaration
172
09/10/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
173
09/10/2018
Declaration
174
09/10/2018
Declaration
175
09/10/2018
Declaration
176
10/09/2018
ORDER granting 146 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/9/18.
177
10/10/2018
Order
178
10/23/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
179
10/24/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
180
10/29/2018
Response to Order
181
11/05/2018
Order
182
11/08/2018
Notice of Appeal
183
11/20/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
184
11/20/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
185
11/20/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
186
11/20/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
187
11/21/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
188
11/21/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
189
11/21/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
190
11/21/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
11/21/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
192
11/27/2018
USCA Case Number
193
11/27/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
11/28/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
197
12/10/2018
USCA Mandate
198
01/30/2019
Notice of Change of Address
199
02/27/2019
Stipulation
200
02/28/2019
Order on Stipulation
201
02/28/2019
Notice (Other)
202
03/05/2019
Notice (Other)
203
04/29/2019
Witness List
204
04/29/2019
Witness List
205
04/29/2019
Witness List
206
04/29/2019
Witness List
207
04/29/2019
Witness List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.