In re the EXXON VALDEZ
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:1989-cv-00095 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
07/18/2018
USCA Order
07/18/2018
Notice (Other)
08/02/2018
USCA Order
08/13/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
08/29/2018
Declaration
08/30/2018
USCA Mandate
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
09/17/2018
Response to Order
09/18/2018
Notice of Change of Address
09/19/2018
Response to Order
09/20/2018
Order
10/22/2018
Response to Order
10/26/2018
Notice (Other)
11/01/2018
Notice (Other)
11/15/2018
Order
11/15/2018
Order
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
11/27/2018
Notice (Other)
12/01/2018
Response to Order
12/01/2018
Response to Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.