In the Matter of the Complaint of Angelette, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2015-cv-00012 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
101
06/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
102
07/09/2018
In Limine
103
07/09/2018
Memorandum
104
07/09/2018
In Limine
105
07/09/2018
Memorandum
106
07/16/2018
ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS: Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment at Docket 73 is GRANTED solely as to Claimants unearned wages claims. Plaintiffs motions at Docket 73 and 75 are DENIED in all other respects. Claimants Motions for Summary Judgment at Docket 67, Docket 69, and Docket 70 are DENIED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/16/2018.
07/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
07/18/2018
Stipulation
07/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
07/20/2018
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
111
07/31/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
112
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
113
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
114
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
115
09/18/2018
Order
116
11/12/2018
Writ
117
11/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
118
11/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
119
11/26/2018
Supplement
120
12/10/2018
Order on Motion for Writ
12/10/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
12/31/2018
Writ Returned
122
03/01/2019
Release of Funds
123
03/01/2019
Memorandum

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.