Inter-Cooperative Exchange v. United States Department of Commerce et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00227 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/02/2018
Complaint
2
10/02/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
3
10/02/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
10/02/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/02/2018
Unissued Summons
5
10/08/2018
Affidavit
6
12/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
12/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/05/2019
Stipulation
02/06/2019
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)
11
02/22/2019
Answer to Complaint
12
03/05/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
13
04/02/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.