International Insurance Company of Hannover SE v. Alaska Industrial, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00242 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/12/2018
Complaint
2
10/12/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
10/12/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/12/2018
Unissued Summons
4
10/15/2018
Unissued Summons
10/15/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/16/2018
Preliminary Injunction
6
10/16/2018
Declaration
7
10/16/2018
Declaration
8
10/16/2018
Expedite
9
10/16/2018
Declaration
10
10/16/2018
Notice of Appearance
10/17/2018
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/17/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
14
10/17/2018
Order
15
10/18/2018
Notice (Other)
16
10/18/2018
Affidavit of Service
17
10/18/2018
Affidavit of Service
18
10/18/2018
Order
19
10/18/2018
Notice (Other)
20
10/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
21
10/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
22
10/22/2018
Appear
23
10/22/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
24
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
25
11/21/2018
Status Report
11/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
12/28/2018
Status Report
28
01/17/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.