Intl Refugee Assistance v. Donald j. Trump
Court Docket Sheet

4th Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-01351 (ca4)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 324 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/17/2017
Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Case manager: JeffNeal. [17-1351]
2
03/17/2017
DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351]
3
03/17/2017
BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2017. Response Brief due 05/26/2017. Mailed to Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351]
4
03/17/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044772] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill
5
03/17/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sharon Swingle for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044773] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill
6
03/17/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by H. Thomas Byron III for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044774] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill
7
03/20/2017
NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351]
8
03/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000046140] substituting party (FRAP 43). Daniel R. Coats substituted for Michael Dempsey. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351]
9
03/21/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Omar Jadwat for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046501] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
10
03/21/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lee Gelernt for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046681] [17-1351] Lee Gelernt
11
03/21/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cecillia Wang for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046682] [17-1351] Cecillia Wang
13
03/22/2017
NOTICE ISSUED to Justin Bryan Cox, Nicholas David Espiritu, Lee P. Gelernt, Omar C. Jadwat, Deborah Jeon, Melissa S. Keaney, Daniel Mach, David Robert Rocah, Karen C. Tumlin, Cecillia D. Wang and Heather Lynn Weaver for Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3 requesting response to Motion to expedite decision [12], Motion to accelerate case processing [12]. Response due: 03/22/2017. [17-1351]
14
03/22/2017
Corrected MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump to expedite decision, to accelerate case processing. Date and method of service: 03/22/2017 ecf. [1000047229] [17-1351] H. Byron
15
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Daniel Mach for Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000047248] [17-1351] Daniel Mach
16
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Heather L. Weaver for Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000047259] [17-1351] Heather Weaver
17
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Karen C. Tumlin for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047419] [17-1351] Karen Tumlin
18
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Melissa S. Keaney for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047435] [17-1351] Melissa Keaney
19
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Justin B. Cox for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047446] [17-1351] Justin Cox
20
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Esther Sung for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047456] [17-1351] Esther Sung
21
03/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Nicholas Espiritu for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047461] [17-1351] Nicholas Espiritu
22
03/22/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to Motion to expedite decision [14], Motion to accelerate case processing [14]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
23
03/23/2017
REPLY by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Motion to expedite decision [14], Motion to accelerate case processing [14]. [17-1351] H. Byron
24
03/23/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Anne Murphy for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security.[1000048223] [17-1351] Anne Murphy
25
03/23/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000048277] granting Motion to accelerate case processing [14]; granting Motion to expedite decision [14]; scheduling oral argument. Argument Date or Session: 05/08/2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
26
03/23/2017
Accelerated BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/24/2017. Response Brief due 04/14/2017. Reply Brief due 04/21/2017. [17-1351]
27
03/24/2017
CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 05/08/2017. Registration Time: 12:15 - 12:30. Daily Arguments Begin: 1:00. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. (BY ORDER ENTERED 4/13/2017, ARGUMENT START TIME CHANGED TO 2:30 PM ON MAY 8, 2017) [17-1351]--[Edited 05/07/2017 by PSC]
28
03/24/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Spencer E. Amdur for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000048668] [17-1351] Spencer Amdur
29
03/24/2017
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee International Refugee Assistance Project. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000048681] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
30
03/24/2017
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee HIAS, Inc. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000048687] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
31
03/24/2017
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000048690] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
32
03/24/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cody Wofsy for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000048858] [17-1351] Cody Wofsy
33
03/24/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jeffrey B. Wall for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security.[1000048995] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill
34
03/24/2017
Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/27/2017. [1000049094] [17-1351] H. Byron
35
03/24/2017
MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:3/16/17. Date and method of service: 03/24/2017 ecf. [1000049095] [17-1351] Sharon Swingle
36
03/24/2017
BRIEF by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2017. [1000049096] [17-1351] Sharon Swingle
41
03/24/2017
OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Number of pages: [73]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/28/2017. [1000050605] [17-1351]
42
03/24/2017
APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 823. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: 4. Entered on Docket Date: 03/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/28/2017. [1000050610] [17-1351]
37
03/27/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by State of Texas, Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2017. [1000049488] [17-1351] Scott Keller
38
03/27/2017
MOTION by State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, and Phil Bryant for leave to file amicus curiae brief. Date and method of service: 03/27/2017 ecf. [1000049647] [17-1351]
39
03/27/2017
ORDER filed [1000049648] granting Motion for leave to file amicus brief [38]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
40
03/27/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000049798] directing filing of responses to court inquiry. Reponses due by 03/30/2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
43
03/27/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas and State of West Virginia. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/28/2017. [1000050615] [17-1351]
44
03/28/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Counsel arguing: Jeffrey B. Wall [1000050819] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill
45
03/28/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Counsel arguing: Omar Jadwat Answering argument time: 20 [1000051116] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
46
03/29/2017
MOTION by Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 03/29/2017 ecf. [1000051749] [17-1351] Kevin Collins
47
03/29/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/30/2017. [1000051763] [17-1351] Kevin Collins
48
03/29/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to court Order [40],court Order to court inquiry [40]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle
49
03/29/2017
MOTION by Kenneth A. Klukowski, Counsel for American Civil Rights Union as Amicus Supporting Appellants to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 03/29/2017 ecf. [1000051880] [17-1351] Kenneth Klukowski
94
03/29/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Interfaith Coalition. Number of pages: [63]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056414] [17-1351]
50
03/30/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to court Order [40],court Order to court inquiry [40]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
51
03/30/2017
ORDER filed [1000052950] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [46]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
52
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae Boston University, Brandeis University, Brown University, Bucknell University, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University et al. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053140] [17-1351] Lindsay Harrison
53
03/31/2017
MOTION by American Center for Law and Justice (Amicus Curiae) to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053279] [17-1351] Edward White
54
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Center for Law and Justice in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053339] [17-1351] Edward White
55
03/31/2017
MOTION by T.A., Amicus Supporting Appellee to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053348] [17-1351] Richard Bernstein
57
03/31/2017
ORDER filed [1000053413] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [53], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [55].Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
62
03/31/2017
MOTION by SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC. AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS AND REVERSAL to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053626] [17-1351] William Consovoy
63
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC. TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS AND REVERSAL in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053630] [17-1351] William Consovoy
66
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellant American Civil Rights Union in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053876] [17-1351] Kenneth Klukowski
67
03/31/2017
MOTION by Immigration Law Reform Institute, amicus to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053879] [17-1351] Christopher Hajec
70
03/31/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Yolanda C. Rondon, Attorney for Amici Curiae, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee filing amicus brief in support of Appellees for International Refugee Assistance Project.[1000053885] [17-1351] Yolanda Rondon
73
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by US Justice Fndn, Citizens United, Citizens United Fndn, English First Fndn, English First, Public Advocate of the US, Gun Owners Fndn, Gun Owners of America, Conservative Legal Defense & Edu. Fund, US Border Control Fndn, Policy Analysis Center, amici in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/03/2017. [1000053890] [17-1351] William Olson
74
03/31/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to Motion for stay pending appeal [35]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
75
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Immigration Reform Law Institute in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000055034] [17-1351]
76
03/31/2017
MOTION by Victor Williams leave to file amicus curiae brief. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 US mail. [1000055052] [17-1351]
90
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Center for Law and Justice. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [3]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056403] [17-1351]
91
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056407] [17-1351]
92
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, English First, English First Foundation, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Policy Analysis Center, U.S. Border Control Foundation and U.S. Justice Foundation. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056410] [17-1351]
93
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Civil Rights Union. Number of pages: [31]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056412] [17-1351]
95
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Victor Williams. Number of pages: [36]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056416] [17-1351]
96
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Colleges and Universities. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056418] [17-1351]
97
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Colleges and Universities. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [3]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056565] [17-1351]
104
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellant Victor Williams in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/30/2017. [1000057373] [17-1351]
107
03/31/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Immigration Reform Law Institute. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/10/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/10/2017. [1000058822] [17-1351]
77
04/03/2017
NOTICE ISSUED to H. Thomas Byron, III, August E. Flentje, Arjun Garg, Edwin Smiley Kneedle, Douglas Neal Letter, Anne Murphy, Chad A. Readler, Rod J. Rosenstein, Daniel Stephen Schwei, Lowell Vernon Sturgill, Jr., Sharon Swingle, Jeffrey Bryan Wall for United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump and Daniel R. Coats, Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur, Justin Bryan Cox, Nicholas David Espiritu, Lee P. Gelernt, Omar C. Jadwat. Deborah Jeon, Melissa S. Keaney,Daniel Mach, David Robert Rocah, Esther Hsiao-In Sung, Karen C. Tumlin, Cecillia D. Wang, Heather Lynn Weaver and Cody H. Wofsy for Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3 requesting response to Motion for leave to file [76]. Responses due: 04/06/2017.[1000055060]. [17-1351]
78
04/03/2017
Docket correction requested from Richard D. Bernstein for T. A., Stuart Alan Raphael for Commonwealth of Virginia, et.al, and Benna Ruth Solomon for City of Chicago, et. al. Re: [56] amicus curiae Brief, [58] amicus curiae Brief, [60] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Briefs have been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
79
04/03/2017
ORDER filed [1000055087] suspending acceptance of amicus brief of T.A. pending filing of a corrected amicus brief in accordance with the docket correction notice of April 3, 2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
80
04/04/2017
ORDER filed [1000055587] granting Motion for leave to file [76]; terminating notice requesting response [77]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
81
04/04/2017
MOTION by New York University, Amicus Curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/04/2017 ecf. [1000056098] [17-1351] Steven Obus
82
04/04/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by New York University, Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/04/2017. [1000056102] [17-1351] Steven Obus
83
04/04/2017
Docket correction requested from Jonathan Marc Freiman for Former National Security Officers. Re: [64] Motion for leave to file, [65] amicus curiae Brief. Access to Motion for leave to file, amicus curiae Brief have been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
84
04/04/2017
Notice issued re: email messages sent to court. [17-1351]
98
04/04/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of New York University. Number of pages: [36]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/04/2017. [1000056568] [17-1351]
85
04/05/2017
ORDER filed [1000056333] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [49]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
86
04/05/2017
ORDER filed [1000056340] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [62].Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
87
04/05/2017
ORDER filed [1000056372] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [67].Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
88
04/05/2017
ORDER filed [1000056382] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [68].Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
89
04/05/2017
ORDER filed [1000056397] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [81].Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
99
04/05/2017
ORDER filed [1000056640] suspending acceptance of amicus brief of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc, and the Southern Poverty Law Center pending filing of a corrected amicus brief in accordance with the docket correction notice of April 3, 2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
100
04/05/2017
Docket correction requested from Richard Brian Katskee for Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Southern Poverty Law Center and Bend the Arc and Yolanda Cher Rondon for American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Re: [72] amicus curiae Brief, [69] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief, amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
101
04/05/2017
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, Paul Harrison, Muhammed Meteab and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000056862] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
102
04/05/2017
REPLY by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Response [74]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle
103
04/06/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Trevor S. Cox for Commonwealth of Virginia.[1000057296] [17-1351] Trevor Cox
106
04/07/2017
Docket correction requested from Mr. Richard D. Bernstein for T.A. Re: [105] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
108
04/10/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000059317] granting initial hearing en banc (FRAP 35) Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
109
04/12/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Deborah A. Jeon for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000060563] [17-1351] Deborah Jeon
110
04/12/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from American Center for Law and Justice. [17-1351]
111
04/12/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Southeastern Legal Foundation. [17-1351]
112
04/12/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Colleges and Universities. [17-1351]
113
04/12/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from New York University. [17-1351]
114
04/12/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/12/2017. [1000060774] [17-1351] Richard Bernstein
115
04/12/2017
MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. file addendum/attachment to Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae T.A. Date and method of service: 04/12/2017 ecf. [1000060776] [17-1351] Richard Bernstein
116
04/12/2017
Addendum/attachment to [114] amicus curiae Brief by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. in electronic and paper format. Method of filing paper copies: US Mail. Date copies mailed, dispatched, or delivered: 04/12/2017 If paper copies filed, number of copies filed: 16 Number of pages per copy if paper copies filed: 10 [17-1351] Richard Bernstein
117
04/12/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas and State of West Virginia. [17-1351]
118
04/12/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher J. Hajec for Immigration Reform Law Institute.[1000061071] [17-1351] Christopher Hajec
124
04/12/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of T.A. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/13/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/13/2017. [1000061394] [17-1351]
119
04/13/2017
Additional copies of the OPENING BRIEF received from Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. [17-1351]
120
04/13/2017
Additional copies of the APPENDIX received from Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. [17-1351]
121
04/13/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Interfaith Coalition. [17-1351]
122
04/13/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, English First, English First Foundation, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Policy Analysis Center, Public Advocate of the United States, U.S. Border Control Foundation and U.S. Justice Foundation. [17-1351]
123
04/13/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from American Civil Rights Union. [17-1351]
125
04/13/2017
ORDER filed [1000061649] scheduling oral argument. Argument Date or Session: 05/08/17 at 2:30 PM Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
126
04/13/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Former National Security Officials in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/13/2017. [1000061735] [17-1351] Jonathan Freiman
128
04/13/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by MacArthur Justice Center as Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/13/2017. [1000061816] [17-1351] Amir Ali
129
04/13/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Former National Security Officials. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/14/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/14/2017. [1000062064] [17-1351]
136
04/13/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/17/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/17/2017. [1000062771] [17-1351]
130
04/14/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Immigration Reform Law Institute. [17-1351]
131
04/14/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Victor Williams. [17-1351]
134
04/14/2017
Docket correction requested from Omar C. Jadwat, Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur, Justin Bryan Cox, Nicholas David Espiritu, Lee P. Gelernt, Deborah Jeon, Daniel Mach, Esther Hsiao-In Sung, Karen C. Tumlin, Cecillia D. Wang, Heather Lynn Weaver, and Cody H. Wofsy for International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2 and John Does #1 & 3. Re: [132] Response. Access to Response has been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
135
04/17/2017
Docket correction requested from Karla Mari McKanders for University Professors and Higher Education Associations. Re: [133] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
139
04/17/2017
MOTION by Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Non-Governmental Organizations leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief. Date and method of service: 04/18/2017 ecf. [1000063708] [17-1351] Elisabeth Frost
140
04/18/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Non-Governmental Organizations in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/18/2017. [1000063717] [17-1351] Elisabeth Frost
141
04/18/2017
ORDER filed [1000063719] granting Motion for leave to file [139]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
142
04/18/2017
Corrected BRIEF by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/17/2017. [1000064113] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
144
04/19/2017
MOTION by History Professors and Scholars, Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees for leave to file amici curiae brief court Order [108],court Order for initial hearing en banc (FRAP 35) [108]. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064535] [17-1351] Carlos Singer
145
04/19/2017
MOTION by Amicus Curiae Ismail Elshikh leave to file Brief Amicus Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064600] [17-1351] Neal Katyal
146
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Curiae Ismail Elshikh in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064604] [17-1351] Neal Katyal
147
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Anti-Defamation League; Jewish Council for Public Affairs; Union for Reform Judaism; Central Conference of American Rabbis; Women of Reform Judaism in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/17/2017. [1000064640] [17-1351] David Mills
148
04/19/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee City of Chicago in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064741] [17-1351] Benna Solomon
149
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064793] [17-1351] Sidney Rosdeitcher
150
04/19/2017
Docket correction requested from Benna Ruth Solomon for City of Chicago. Re: [148] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-1351]
151
04/19/2017
MOTION by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064804] [17-1351] Sidney Rosdeitcher
152
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Muslim Justice League; Muslim Public Affairs Council; Islamic Circle of North America; Council on American-Islamic Relations, California; and Asian Americans Advancing JusticeAsian Law Caucus as Amici Curiae supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees and Affirmance in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064837] [17-1351] Benjamin Shatz
153
04/19/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000064846] [17-1351] Stuart Raphael
154
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by History Professors and Scholars, Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064851] [17-1351] Carlos Singer
155
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by National Immigrant Justice Center in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064861] [17-1351] Robert Hochman
156
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064881] [17-1351] Elizabeth Wydra
157
04/19/2017
MOTION by leave to file amicus curiae Brief [148]. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064885] [17-1351] Benna Solomon
159
04/19/2017
MOTION by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (Amicus); Center for Reproductive Rights (Amicus); Southern Coalition for Social Justice (Amicus); National Center for Lesbian Rights (Amicus); Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law (Amicus) to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064985] [17-1351] Alan Kabat
162
04/19/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; Center for Reproductive Rights; Southern Coalition for Social Justice; National Center for Lesbian Rights; Judge David T. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law et al. (Amicus) in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065039] [17-1351] Alan Kabat
163
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Technology Companies - Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065112] [17-1351] Andrew Pincus
164
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: Amicus Curiae. [1000065118] [17-1351] Pratik Shah
165
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae The Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065170] [17-1351] Kevin Martin
166
04/19/2017
MOTION by Service Employees International Union Amicus Curiae leave to file Corrected Brief Amici Curiae of Service Employees International Union, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, and American Federation of Teachers Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065183] [17-1351] Claire Prestel
167
04/19/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Service Employees International Union Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065185] [17-1351] Claire Prestel
169
04/19/2017
MOTION by The Episcopal Bishops to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065189] [17-1351] Michael Scott
171
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by FORMER FEDERAL IMMIGRATION AND HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICIALS AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS-APPELLEES AND AFFIRMANCE, AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS-APPELLANTS MOTION TO STAY in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065194] [17-1351] Michael Gottlieb
172
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by The Episcopal Bishops in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065195] [17-1351] Michael Scott
173
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Constitutional Law Scholars as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065196] [17-1351] Joshua Matz
176
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Tahirih Justice Center, The Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Casa de Esperanza, and National Domestic Violence Hotline, Amicus Supporting Appellants and Affirmance in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065211] [17-1351] Scott Winkelman
177
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065216] [17-1351] Marc Hearron
178
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Oxfam America, Inc. as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065218] [17-1351] Richard Bress
179
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc and Southern Poverty Law Center in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: AMICUS CURIAE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065220] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Richard Katskee
180
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Fred A. Rowley, Jr. - Counsel for Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065221] [17-1351] Fred Rowley
181
04/19/2017
MOTION by American Jewish Committee leave to file Amicus Brief. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 Courier delivery. [1000065222] [17-1351] Adam Lurie
182
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Jewish Committee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065223] [17-1351] Adam Lurie
184
04/19/2017
MOTION by Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab American Professionals; Amici Curiae Supporting Appellees to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065225] [17-1351] Robert DeRise
185
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Cato Institute, Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065226] [17-1351] Peter Jaffe
186
04/19/2017
MOTION by Cato Institute, Amicus to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065227] [17-1351] Peter Jaffe
187
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab American Professionals; Amici Curiae Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065229] [17-1351] Robert DeRise
189
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by The Association of Art Museum Directors, The American Alliance of Museums, The College Art Association, and 94 Art Museums in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065236] [17-1351] Abraham Gesser
190
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065242] [17-1351] Mary Kelly Persyn
191
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Advocates for Human Rights, et al., as amici curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065248] [17-1351] Alina Das
192
04/19/2017
MOTION by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amicus Supporting Appellees leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Airport Attorneys Coalition in Support of Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065249] [17-1351] Michael Roberts
193
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amici Curiae in Support of Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065250] [17-1351] Michael Roberts
194
04/19/2017
MOTION by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amici Curiae in Support of Appellees leave to file Attachments in Support of Brief of Amici Curiae Airport Attorneys Coalition amicus curiae Brief [193]. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065251] [17-1351] Michael Roberts
195
04/19/2017
DOCUMENT referencing [194] Motion for leave to file, [193] amicus curiae Brief by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amici Curiae in support of Appellees. [1000065252] [17-1351] Michael Roberts
196
04/19/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065253] [17-1351] Yolanda Rondon
197
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000066131] [17-1351]
198
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee National Asian Pacific American Bar Association in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. [1000066153] [17-1351]
225
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of History Professors & Scholars. Number of pages: [29]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/19/2017. [1000066939] [17-1351]
226
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Anti-Defamation League, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Jewish Council for Public Affairs, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism. Number of pages: [47]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/19/2017. [1000066940] [17-1351]
227
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Dr. Ismail Elshikh. Number of pages: [17]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066943] [17-1351]
228
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Bar Association. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066944] [17-1351]
229
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington. Number of pages: [45]. Number of Copies: [17]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066947] [17-1351]
230
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of ASISTA, Americans for Immigrant Justice, Futures Without Violence, NIJC, North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sanctuary for Families. Number of pages: [29]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066948] [17-1351]
231
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Jewish Committee. Number of pages: [32]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066949] [17-1351]
232
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Former Federal Immigration & Homeland Security Officials. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066951] [17-1351]
233
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Cato Institute. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066952] [17-1351]
234
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc, Members of the Clergy, Riverside Church in the City of New York and Southern Poverty Law Center. Number of pages: [47]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066954] [17-1351]
235
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Civil Rights Organizations, FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW & EQUALITY, Jay Hirabayashi, Karen Korematsu, National Bar Associations of Color and Holly Yasui. Number of pages: [30]. Number of Copies: [13]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066955] [17-1351]
236
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Oxfam America, Inc. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066956] [17-1351]
237
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of 94 Art Museums, American Alliance of Museums, Association of Art Museum Directors and College Art Association. Number of pages: [25]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066959] [17-1351]
238
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Casa de Esperanza, National Domestic Violence Hotline and Tahirih Justice Center. Number of pages: [32]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066962] [17-1351]
239
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Muslim Rights, Professional & Public Health Organizations. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066963] [17-1351]
240
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Interfaith Group of Religious & Interreligious Organizations. Number of pages: [49]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066964] [17-1351]
241
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, Council on American-Islamic Relations, Islamic Circle of North America, Muslim Justice League and Muslim Public Affairs Council. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [15]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066967] [17-1351]
242
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Constitutional Law Scholars. Number of pages: [45]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066968] [17-1351]
243
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Foundation for the Children of Iran. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066969] [17-1351]
244
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Advocates for Human Rights, Asian Law Alliance, Asian Pacific American Network of Oregon, CASA, Community Refugee & Immigration Services, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrant Rights Clinic of Washington, Integrated Refugee & Immigrant Services, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center and Square Legal Services, Inc. Number of pages: [42]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066970] [17-1351]
245
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Center for Reproductive Rights, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Center for Lesbian Rights, Southern Coalition for Social Justice and Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs. Number of pages: [55]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066971] [17-1351]
246
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Members of Congress. Number of pages: [53]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066972] [17-1351]
247
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Technology Companies. Number of pages: [66]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066973] [17-1351]
250
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/24/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/24/2017. [1000067846] [17-1351]
267
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000069042] [17-1351]
268
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000069045] [17-1351]
272
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of City Council of New York, City of Austin, City of Boston, City of Chicago, City of Gary, City of Iowa City, City of Jersey City, City of Los Angeles, City of Madison, City of Minneapolis, City of New Haven, City of New York, City of Oakland, City of Philadelphia, City of Portland, City of Providence, City of Saint Paul, City of San Francisco, City of San Jose, City of Santa Monica, City of Seattle, City of South Bend, City of St. Louis, City of Tuscon, City of West Hollywood, Cook County, Illinois, County of San Francisco, James A. Diossa, Jorge O. Elorza, Toni N. Harp, Mayor of the City of New York, Montgomery County, Svante L. Myrick, Santa Clara County, Town of Carrboro, Village of Skokie and Martin J. Walsh. Number of pages: [49]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/26/2017. [1000069734] [17-1351]
274
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Constitutional Law Professors. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000069853] [17-1351]
275
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000069956] [17-1351]
277
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Number of pages: [30]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/27/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/27/2017. [1000070666] [17-1351]
281
04/19/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/02/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/02/2017. [1000073915] [17-1351]
200
04/20/2017
ORDER filed [1000066157] granting Motion for leave to file [157]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
201
04/20/2017
Docket correction requested from Fatma Essam Marouf for Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims, Manvin Singh Mayell for Medical Institutions, Advocacy Organizations and Individual Physicians, Joshua David Rogaczewski for National Asian Pacific American Bar Association and Gare Alan Smith for Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council. Re: [168] Motion for leave to file, [170] Motion to file amicus curiae brief, [174] Motion to file amicus curiae brief, [188] Motion to file amicus curiae brief; requesting amended motions. Amended motions due: 04/24/2017. [17-1351]
202
04/20/2017
Docket correction requested from Fatma Essam Marouf for Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims. Re: [183] amicus curiae Brief. Corrected brief due: 04/24/2017. [17-1351]
203
04/20/2017
Follow Up Notice issued to Karla McKanders re: docket correction requested, re: [133] amicus curiae Brief.Corrected brief due: 04/24/2017. [17-1351]
204
04/20/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Marielena Hincapie for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000066179] [17-1351] Marielena Hincapie
205
04/21/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lynne Bernabei for Center for Reproductive Rights, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Center for Lesbian Rights and Southern Coalition for Social Justice.[1000066258] [17-1351] Lynne Bernabei
206
04/21/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by J. Wells Harrell for Former Federal Immigration & Homeland Security Officials.[1000066300] [17-1351] James Harrell
207
04/21/2017
Calendar notice sent. Nature of notice: Updated check-in time. [17-1351]
208
04/21/2017
Corrected MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council leave to file Amicus Brief Motion for leave to file [168]. Date and method of service: 04/21/2017 ecf. [1000066448] [17-1351] Gare Smith
210
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066661] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) [144]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
211
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066670] granting Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 20(e)) [145]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
212
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066681] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [151]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
213
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066690] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [159].Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
214
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066696] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [169]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
215
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066705] granting Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) [181]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
216
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066714] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [184]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
217
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066724] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [186]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
218
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066726] granting Motion for leave to file amicus brief (FRAP 29(e)) [192]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
219
04/21/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000066900] [17-1351] Fatma Marouf
220
04/21/2017
Corrected MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims leave to file amicus curiae Brief [219]. Date and method of service: 04/21/2017 ecf. [1000066901] [17-1351] Fatma Marouf
221
04/21/2017
BRIEF by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/24/2017. [1000066914] [17-1351] Anne Murphy
222
04/21/2017
ORDER filed [1000066915] granting Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) [220]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
260
04/21/2017
REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Number of pages: [40]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/25/2017. [1000068818] [17-1351]
273
04/21/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims. Number of pages: [44]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/26/2017. [1000069738] [17-1351]
223
04/22/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sirine Shebaya for Airport Attorneys Coalition.[1000066923] [17-1351] Sirine Shebaya
224
04/22/2017
Amended petition/motion by National Asian Pacific American Bar Association amending [188] Motion to file amicus curiae brief. Document: NAPABA Am. Mot. Leave.pdf. [1000066933] [17-1351] Joshua Rogaczewski
248
04/24/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000067247] [17-1351] Nicholas Steiner
249
04/24/2017
ORDER filed [1000067418] granting Motion for leave to file [166]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
251
04/24/2017
NOTICE ISSUED to Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Daniel R. Coats, International Refugee Assistance Project, Hias, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Paul Harrison, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, John Does #1 & 3, Jane Doe #2, and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., requesting response to amended Petition for leave to file amicus brief[224], Motion for leave to file amicus brief [208]. Responses due: 04/25/2017.[1000067873]. [17-1351]-[Edited 04/24/2017 by JSN]
252
04/24/2017
Amended MOTION by Amici Supporting Appellee Advocacy Organizations, Individual Physicians and Medical Institutions to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/24/2017 ecf. [1000067937] [17-1351] Manvin Mayell
253
04/24/2017
Amended AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Advocacy Organizations, Individual Physicians and Medical Institutions in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/24/2017. [1000067962] [17-1351] Manvin Mayell
254
04/24/2017
MOTION by John Doe #8, Proposed Intervenor to intervene, to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/24/2017 ecf. [1000067990] [17-1351] Lena Masri
255
04/24/2017
ORDER filed [1000068007] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [252]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
256
04/24/2017
NOTICE ISSUED to Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Daniel R. Coats, International Refugee Assistance Project, Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3, requesting response to Motion to intervene [254]. Responses due:04/27/2017.[1000068038]. [17-1351]
257
04/24/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to notice requesting response [251]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle
258
04/24/2017
MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Airport Attorneys Coalition leave to file Supplemental Attachments to Brief of Amici Curiae Airport Attorneys Coalition Document [195], Motion for leave to file [194], amicus curiae Brief [193], Motion for leave to file [192]. Date and method of service: 04/24/2017 ecf. [1000068177] [17-1351] Michael Roberts
259
04/24/2017
DOCUMENT referencing [258] Motion for leave to file, [195] Document, [194] Motion for leave to file, [193] amicus curiae Brief, [192] Motion for leave to file by Amicus Supporting Appellee Airport Attorneys Coalition. [1000068180] [17-1351] Michael Roberts
261
04/24/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Advocacy Organizations, Individual Physicians and Medical Institutions. Number of pages: [37]. Number of Copies: [17]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/25/2017. [1000068826] [17-1351]
279
04/24/2017
Supplemental ADDENDUM/ATTACHMENT (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Airport Attorneys Coalition. Number of pages: [11]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on docket date: 04/27/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/26/2017. [1000070696] [17-1351]
262
04/25/2017
Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/25/2017. [1000068875] [17-1351] Karla McKanders
263
04/25/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to notice requesting response [251]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
264
04/25/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to notice requesting response [256]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
265
04/25/2017
ORDER filed [1000069022] granting Motion for leave to file [208]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
266
04/25/2017
ORDER filed [1000069031] granting amended Petition/ motion for leave to file [224]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
269
04/25/2017
MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 04/25/2017 ecf. [1000069128] [17-1351] Karla McKanders
270
04/25/2017
ORDER filed [1000069191] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [269]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
285
04/25/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of University Professors and Higher Education Associations. Number of pages: [55]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/04/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/04/2017. [1000075864] [17-1351]
271
04/26/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Peter Karanjia for Members of Congress.[1000069551] [17-1351] Peter Karanjia
276
04/26/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000070135] approving/authorizing C-Span request for live audio feed of oral argument. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
278
04/27/2017
Docket correction requested from Yolanda Cher Rondon for American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Re: [277] amicus curiae Brief (paper). [17-1351]
280
04/27/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Motion to intervene [254], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [254]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill
282
05/03/2017
MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellant Victor Williams to participate in oral argument. Date and method of service: 05/02/2017 US mail. [1000074892] [17-1351]
283
05/03/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000075346] denying Motion to intervene [254]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
284
05/03/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000075350] denying Motion to participate in oral argument [282]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victor Williams. [17-1351]
286
05/04/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sonia Kumar for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000076118] [17-1351] Sonia Kumar
287
05/04/2017
MOTION by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to supplement record. Date and method of service: 05/04/2017 ecf. [1000076357] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
289
05/04/2017
Corrected Supplemental FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/04/2017. [1000076932] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
290
05/05/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Sealed volume: N. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 4. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? N. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/05/2017. [1000076942] [17-1351]
291
05/05/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Motion to supplement [287]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle
292
05/07/2017
REPLY by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to Response [291], Motion to supplement [287]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat
293
05/08/2017
EN BANC ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Paul V. Niemeyer, Diana Gribbon Motz, William B. Traxler, Jr., Robert B. King, Dennis W. Shedd, G. Steven Agee, Barbara Milano Keenan, James A. Wynn, Jr., Albert Diaz, Henry F. Floyd, Stephanie D. Thacker and Pamela A. Harris. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. Jeffrey Bryan Wall for Appellants United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump and Daniel R. Coats and Mr. Omar C. Jadwat for Appellees Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3. Courtroom Deputy: RJ Warren. [1000077923] [17-1351]
294
05/10/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000079712] granting Motion to supplement [287]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
296
05/25/2017
JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 17-1351 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed in part, vacated in part. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 05/25/2017. [1000088546] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [17-1351]
297
05/25/2017
OPINION ATTACHMENT. [17-1351]
298
05/31/2017
AMENDING ORDER filed. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
300
05/31/2017
SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 06/01/2017. 16-1436. [17-1351]
301
06/15/2017
AMENDING ORDER filed. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
302
06/15/2017
AMENDED OPINION filed amending and superseding opinion dated 5/25/17. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Copies to all parties. Annotation added to opinion reflecting Supreme Court history [17-1351]--[Edited 07/12/2017 by SJC]
303
06/29/2017
SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari granted and application for stay of preliminary injunction granted in part. 06/26/2017 [17-1351]
306
07/17/2017
ORDER filed [1000119441] recalling mandate. Copies to all parties. [17-1351]
doc
08/01/2017
RECORD requested by Supreme Court from court of appeals and district court/agency. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-1436. [17-1351]
doc
08/01/2017
RECORD (4CCA) transmitted to Supreme Court. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-1436. [17-1351]
307
10/10/2017
SUPREME COURT REMARK--order remanding case received. 10/10/2017, REMANDED vacated. [17-1351]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.