Irene Martha Dundas and Archie Emmett Dundas
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00418 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/07/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
12/07/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
12/07/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/07/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/07/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/07/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/07/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/07/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
7
12/07/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
12/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
9
12/09/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
12/10/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
12/10/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
16
12/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
12/13/2018
Declaration
18
12/18/2018
Extend Time
19
12/19/2018
Request for Special Notice
20
12/21/2018
Extend Time
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/18/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
22
01/18/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
23
01/18/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
24
01/21/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
25
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
26
01/31/2019
Proceeding Memo
27
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
28
02/12/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
29
02/12/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.