Isaac Mendenhall
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01410 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
01/18/2019
Transfer of Claim
33
01/18/2019
Objection to Claim
34
01/18/2019
Objection
01/18/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
01/23/2019
Notice of Hearing - (Van020 Enter Matter)
42
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.