Ishma Nicole Daniel Cantrell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81213 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
07/01/2018
Schedule E/F
27
07/06/2018
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (prior to confirmation)
38
10/26/2018
Limit Notice
45
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
02/04/2019
Dismiss Case - Other
50
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.