Israelson v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cv-00011 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
06/07/2018
Order Dismissing Case
10
06/21/2018
Reopen Case
11
07/09/2018
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
07/10/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
13
08/22/2018
Clerks Notice
14
09/10/2018
Order
09/10/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
16
10/05/2018
Answer to Complaint
17
10/05/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
18
12/10/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.