JIT Industries, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-ap-80069 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
124
11/21/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
125
11/21/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
126
11/21/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
132
12/21/2018
Vacate
133
12/21/2018
Notice of Hearing-Van200
134
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
135
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
137
12/26/2018
Notice of Hearing-Van200
142
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
143
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
144
01/29/2019
Return Mail
145
01/29/2019
Return Mail
150
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.