JIT Industries, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80892 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Reducing Notice Time and Notice of Hearing
119
12/04/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
120
12/04/2018
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
121
12/04/2018
Expediting Hearing
124
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
128
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
129
12/17/2018
Operating Report (DIP)
137
12/21/2018
Vacate
138
12/21/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
139
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
140
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
144
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
145
12/31/2018
Compensation
147
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
150
01/23/2019
Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement
01/23/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
01/30/2019
Report to Court
162
01/31/2019
Chapter 11 Ballots
164
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
165
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
172
03/20/2019
Operating Report (DIP)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.