Jack Kurt Nixon, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00393 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
11/08/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
11/08/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/08/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
11/09/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/09/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
9
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/26/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
14
11/26/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
11/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/12/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/09/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
01/11/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/14/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/14/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
01/14/2019
Vacating Order (SA)
20
01/16/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
21
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
01/23/2019
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
23
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/05/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/08/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
02/08/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/11/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
27
02/14/2019
Vacating Order (SA)
28
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/15/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
02/22/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
02/22/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
02/25/2019
Generic Motion / Application
33
02/25/2019
Certificate of Service
34
02/26/2019
Generic Motion
35
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
36
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
37
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
38
03/18/2019
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
39
03/20/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
40
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/21/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.