Jack Lester Berdeaux
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00223 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/16/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/16/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
3
07/16/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/16/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
07/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/16/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
07/16/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
07/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
14
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
07/23/2018
Schedules A-J
07/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/25/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
08/02/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
08/02/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/02/2018
Generic Motion / Application
20
08/02/2018
Certificate of Service
21
08/06/2018
Certificate of Service
22
08/10/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
23
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
08/14/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
08/14/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/14/2018
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
26
08/14/2018
Notice Requiring Original Signature
08/14/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/17/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/20/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
08/31/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
30
08/31/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
31
08/31/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
08/31/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/31/2018
Clerks Notice
08/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
09/10/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
39
09/12/2018
Certificate of Service
40
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
09/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
42
09/14/2018
Certificate of Service
43
09/17/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
44
09/17/2018
Certificate of Service
45
09/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
46
09/18/2018
Certificate of Service
47
09/18/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
48
09/25/2018
Certificate of Service
49
09/25/2018
Certificate of Service
09/25/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
09/25/2018
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
09/25/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/04/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/09/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
53
10/09/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
54
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
55
10/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
56
10/16/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
57
10/16/2018
Certificate of Service
58
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
10/22/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
60
10/22/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
61
10/22/2018
Certificate of Service
62
11/05/2018
Non-Opposition
11/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
11/28/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
64
11/28/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
65
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.