Jackie William Lester
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00398 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
11/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/14/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
3
11/14/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
11/14/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
11/15/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/15/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.