Jackson, et al v. a & m Express, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2001-cv-00920 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/26/2001
DEMAND for jury trial by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson
07/31/2001
Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge mailed to Attorney Sexton. (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/08/2001
SUMMONS and COMPLAINT issued for Heartland Express by certified mail.
3
08/08/2001
SUMMONS and COMPLAINT issued for A & M Express by certified mail.
4
08/08/2001
SUMMONS and COMPLAINT issued for George Scott Burke Jr. by certified mail.
5
08/13/2001
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of Complaint on illegable on 8/13/01 for A & M Express. Answer due on 9/4/01 for A & M Express
6
08/16/2001
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of complaint on Amanda Beamgard on 8/13/01 for Heartland Express. Answer due on 9/4/01 for Heartland Express
7
08/16/2001
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of Complaint on Kristie Burke on 8/13/01 for George Scott Burke Jr. Answer due on 9/4/01 for George Scott Burke Jr.
8
08/27/2001
ANSWER to Complaint by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. (Attorney Eugene P. Stutts), referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
08/28/2001
Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge mailed to attorney Stutts. (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/06/2001
CASE reassigned to Judge Ira De Ment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/06/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/07/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge Ira De Ment : (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/14/2001
ORDER that the Rule 26 report containing teh discovery plan be filed no later than 12/28/01; Planning Meeting report due on 12/28/01 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
10
02/21/2002
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 3/11/03 in Montgomery before Judge Ira De Ment; Motion Filing deadline on 12/11/02 ; Discovery cutoff 2/25/03 ; jury trial set for 4/14/03 trial term in Montgomery before Judge Ira De Ment; set amended pleading deadline for 5/7/02; proposed jury instructions due on 3/24/03; voir dire questions due 3/24/03; Mediation Notice deadline on 1/6/03 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, MD, WAR, RL.
11
09/20/2002
MOTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson to Extend Time for amending pleading deadline ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
12
09/26/2002
Stamped ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time for amending pleading deadline; resetting Amended Pleadings deadline to 10/3/02 (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
14
10/18/2002
ORDER denying [13-1] motion for Leave to Amend [1-1] complaint; response to show good cause why the Court should reconsider the Order due on 10/25/02 for David Earl Jackson, for Daniel E. Jackson (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
16
10/29/2002
Stamped ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
17
10/29/2002
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand
18
12/11/2002
MOTION by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. for Summary Judgment (w/exhibits A-F); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
19
12/13/2002
ORDER setting response to motion to 1/3/03 for plaintiffs re: [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment ; reply to response to motion set to 1/10/03 for defts re: [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment; that [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by George Scott Burke Jr., Heartland Express, A & M Express set for submission on 1/10/03, without oral argument, as further set out (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to plaintiffs and counsel. (dkt clerk)
20
12/18/2002
NOTICE of Filing by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson of Affidavit of Landis Sexton (w/affidavit); referred to Judge DeMent
21
12/18/2002
MOTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson for Extension of Time pursuant to Rule 56(f) ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
22
12/30/2002
ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Extension of Time pursuant to Rule 56(f); resetting Response to Motion for plaintiffs to 2/3/03 for [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment ; resetting Reply to Response to Motion for defendants to 2/10/03 for [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment ; setting [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by George Scott Burke Jr., Heartland Express, A & M Express for submission on 2/10/03 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
23
01/06/2003
Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation filed by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
24
02/03/2003
BRIEF by Daniel E. Jackson in opposition to [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
25
02/03/2003
NOTICE of Filing by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson affidavit of Donnie Kimbrough; referred to Judge DeMent
26
02/03/2003
NOTICE of Filing by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson of the Affidavit of Byron Bloch (w/affidavit); referred to Judge DeMent
27
02/03/2003
MATTERS by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson in opposition to [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment (w/exhibits 1-64); referred to Judge Ira De Ment. (EXHIBITS 1-64 MAINTAINED IN (2) SEPARATE BINDERS)
28
02/11/2003
ORDER resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 10:30 3/17/03 in chambers in Montgomery before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 3/10/03 ; Jury Trial set for 4/14/03 trial term in Montgomery before Judge Ira De Ment (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, HC, WAR, RL. (mfm) Modified on 02/11/2003
02/11/2003
** Renoticed document [28-2] order (scan fax problem) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/18/2003
REPLY by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. in opposition to [24-1] brief in opposition to motion for summary judgment by Daniel E. Jackson (w/exhibit A); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
30
02/18/2003
EXHIBITS by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. in support of [29-1] reply brief (w/exhibit A); referred to Judge Ira De Ment.
31
02/21/2003
ORDER amending sections 7 and 9 of the [10-1] Scheduling order to conform with the new pretrial hearing date; resetting Discovery deadline to 3/3/03 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
32
03/14/2003
ORDER resetting Pretrial Conference for 10:00 3/19/03 in chambers in Montgomery before Judge Ira De Ment (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, HC, RL.
33
03/18/2003
MOTION by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. for an order allowing District Attorney's Office to make available all files regarding Daniel E. Jackson (w/proposed order); referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
03/20/2003
Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 03/20/03 (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
03/25/2003
ORDER denying [33-1] motion for an order allowing District Attorney's Office to make available all files regarding Daniel E. Jackson (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel.
35
03/25/2003
ORDER denying [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot [29-1] motion to Strike by David Earl Jackson, Daniel E. Jackson (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel.
36
03/28/2003
PRETRIAL ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury selection set for 10:00 4/14/03 in Montgomery; Jury Trial, which is to last 3-4 days, set for 10:00 4/21/03 in Montgomery before Judge Truman M. Hobbs ; proposed jury instructions due on 4/1/03; voir dire questions due 4/1/03 (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, HC, WAR, SL.
37
04/01/2003
Requested Jury charges by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
38
04/01/2003
MOTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson in Limine to exclude the toxicology report on Brad Ward for the night of the accident ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
39
04/01/2003
Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
40
04/01/2003
MOTION by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. in Limine to exclude any reference to George Soctt Burke's driving record, past traffic offenses or any traffic offense obtained after the accident at issue ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
41
04/01/2003
Requested Jury charges by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr.; referred to Judge DeMent
42
04/01/2003
MOTION by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. to Exclude Testimony of plaintiff's expert, Byron Bloch (w/exhibits A-E); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
43
04/01/2003
Voir Dire Questions by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr.; referred to Judge DeMent
44
04/04/2003
ORDER setting Response to Motion for non-movants to 4/8/03 for [40-1] motion in Limine and [38-1] motion in Limine ; setting motion hearing for 10:00 4/10/03 in Courtroom 2-D in Montgomery before Judge Truman M. Hobbs for [40-1] motion in Limine and [38-1] motion in Limine (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, HC, SL.
45
04/08/2003
RESPONSE by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson to [40-1] motion in Limine by George Scott Burke Jr., Heartland Express, A & M Express; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
46
04/10/2003
ORDER resetting Jury Selection for 10:00 4/21/03 in Courtroom 2-D in Montgomery before Judge Truman M. Hobbs (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel; furnished to YG, HC, WAR, SL.
47
04/10/2003
ORDER denying [42-1] motion to Exclude Testimony of plaintiff's expert, Byron Bloch; granting in part, denying in part [40-1] motion in Limine; granting in part, denying in part [38-1] motion in Limine; advising that in the event Plaintiffs intend to have a toxicologist testify as to the consumption of alcohol and drugs by the driver of the vehicle, plaintiffs are directed to file a toxicology report with the court and fax copies of said report to defense counsel on or before 04/14/03 (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel.
48
04/10/2003
MOTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson for Sanctions to exclude defense expert Joseph Liechty ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
49
04/10/2003
RESPONSE by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson to [40-1] motion in Limine by George Scott Burke Jr., Heartland Express, A & M Express; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
50
04/15/2003
OBJECTION by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. to plaintiff's exhibit list; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
51
04/15/2003
Supplemental Requested Jury charges by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr.; referred to Judge DeMent
52
04/16/2003
Amended Witness list by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
53
04/16/2003
Amended Exhibit list by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
54
04/16/2003
OBJECTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson to defendants witness and exhibit list; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
55
04/17/2003
MOTION by A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. for an Order allowing interviews with Haynes Ambulance Emergency service crew members (w/proposed order); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
56
04/18/2003
Requested Jury charges by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
57
04/18/2003
Requested Jury charges by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
58
04/18/2003
Requested Jury charges by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
59
04/21/2003
Requested Jury charges by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson; referred to Judge DeMent
60
04/21/2003
OBJECTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson to defendant's exhibit list and witness list; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
04/21/2003
Jury Trial held before Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 4/21/03 - 4/25/03 (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
04/23/2003
MOTION by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson to substitute experts ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
62
04/23/2003
BRIEF by Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson in support of [61-1] motion to substitute experts; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
04/23/2003
Court reporter's TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 04/22/03 of Excerpt of Jury Trial proceedings from the testimony of Clark Boutwell before Judge Truman Hobbs; Risa Entrekin Court Reporter (mfm) Modified on 04/24/2003 (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
04/24/2003
MOTION by A & M Express, George Scott Burke Jr. for Judgment as a Matter of Law at the close of plaintiffs' evidence ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
04/24/2003
Court reporter's TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 04/22/03 of Excerpt of Jury Trial proceedings testimony of Donnie Kimbrough; Risa L. Entrekin Court Reporter (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
04/25/2003
MOTION by A & M Express, George Scott Burke Jr. for Judgment as a Matter of Law at the close of all the evidence ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
65
04/25/2003
JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants A & M Express, Heartland Express, George Scott Burke Jr. and against plaintiffs Daniel E. Jackson, David Earl Jackson and that plaintiffs take nothing by their said suit; taxing costs against the plaintiffs (signed by Judge Truman M. Hobbs), copies provided to counsel.
66
04/25/2003
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: granting [64-1] motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Mr. Burke; denying as to negligence; Exhibits Lists and Witness Lists attached. Risa Entrekin - Court Reporter
67
04/25/2003
JURY VERDICT in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiffs on all claims.
04/25/2003
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2003
Court reporter's TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 04/23/03 of "Excerpt of Jury Trial proceedings testimony of C. Andrew Robinson, Ph.D."; Risa L. Entrekin Court Reporter (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
11/16/2009
NOTICE of Disposal of Discovery Materials, Depositions, and Trial Exhibits
1
Notice to Return or Dispose of Trial Exhibits
1 Attachment
69
11/16/2009
NOTICE to Dispose of trial Exhibits by A & M Express, et al. filed by Attorney Eugene Stutts. Blow up exhibits destroyed on 12/11/09.
12/18/2009
NOTICE of no response by counsel for the plaintiff to notice to return or dispose of trial exhibits. Blow up charts destroyed on 12/18/09. (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.