Jackson v. Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2015-cv-00047 (ared)

MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 12/07/2016, as to [16] Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Jackson.

Case 4:15-cv-00047-KGB Document 21 Filed 01/30/17 Page 1 of 3 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE EIGHTH CIRCUIT No: 16-1804 Jamie Lee Jackson Appellant v. Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Appellee ______________________________________________________________________________ Appeal from U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas-Little Rock (4:15-cv-00047-KGB) ______________________________________________________________________________ MANDATE In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 12/07/2016, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. January 30, 2017 Clerk, U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit Appellate Case: 16-1804 Page: 1 Date Filed: 01/30/2017 Entry ID: 4495654 Case 4:15-cv-00047-KGB Document 21 Filed 01/30/17 Page 2 of 3 16-1804 Jamie Jackson v. Carolyn W. Colvin "Mandate Issued" (4:15-cv-00047-KGB) ca08ml_cmecf_Notify to: 01/30/2017 04:42 PM ***NOTE TO PUBLIC ACCESS USERS*** Judicial Conference of the United States policy permits attorneys of record and parties in a case (including pro se litigants) to receive one free electronic copy of all documents filed electronically, if receipt is required by law or directed by the filer. PACER access fees apply to all other users. To avoid later charges, download a copy of each document during this first viewing. Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals Notice of Docket Activity The following transaction was filed on 01/30/2017 Jamie Jackson v. Carolyn W. Case Name: Colvin Case Number: 16-1804 Document(s): Document(s) Docket Text: MANDATE ISSUED. [4495654] [16-1804] (Yvette Lisenby) Notice will be electronically mailed to: Honorable Kristine G. Baker, U.S. District Judge: Kristine_Baker@ared.uscourts.gov Mr. Paul Bradford Eaglin: peaglin@windisability.com, paul.eaglin@gmail.com Michelle Fecio: mfecio@windisability.com Honorable Jerome Kearney, U.S. Magistrate Judge: jerome_kearney@ared.uscourts.gov, LaShawn_Coleman@ared.uscourts.gov Mr. Jim McCormack, Clerk of Court: ared_appeals@ared.uscourts.gov Ms. Una McGeehan, Assistant Regional Counsel: una.mcgeehan@ssa.gov, ogc.dallas.8th@ssa.gov Mr. Howard D. Olinsky: holinsky@windisability.com Ms. Stacey E. McCord, Assistant U.S. Attorney: Stacey.McCord@usdoj.gov, maria.altadonna@usdoj.gov (daily summary) Notice will be mailed to: Mr. Michael McGaughran No Longer at this Address Case 4:15-cv-00047-KGB Document 21 Filed 01/30/17 Page 3 of 3 No City, Mr. Howard D. Olinsky OLINSKY LAW FIRM Suite 420 300 S. State Street Syracuse, NY 13203 The following document(s) are associated with this transaction: Document Description: Mandate Original Filename:/opt/ACECF/live/forms/YvetteLisenby_161804_4495654_MandateIssuedForms_386.pdf Electronic Document Stamp: [STAMP acecfStamp_ID=1105112566 [Date=01/30/2017] [FileNumber=4495654-0] [c9193b90008c8dedcc106670d6f392c529b59311e28acc5eb5f07a38d6f833a2d804fb4fd0fe734b b4c6038770feb570c3dd64be2a3ace5042bc87569fea2724]] Recipients:  Honorable Kristine G. Baker, U.S. District Judge  Mr. Paul Bradford Eaglin  Michelle Fecio  Honorable Jerome Kearney, U.S. Magistrate Judge  Ms. Stacey E. McCord, Assistant U.S. Attorney  Mr. Jim McCormack, Clerk of Court  Mr. Michael McGaughran  Ms. Una McGeehan, Assistant Regional Counsel  Mr. Howard D. Olinsky The following information is for the use of court personnel: DOCKET ENTRY ID: 4495654 RELIEF(S) DOCKETED: DOCKET PART(S) ADDED: 5728061

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 628 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/20/2015
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jamie Lee Jackson.
2
01/20/2015
COMPLAINT filed by Jamie Lee Jackson against Social Security Administration.
1
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02713442109" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02713442109','98974','10','','2','0','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
1 Attachment
3
01/20/2015
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and cost or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/20/2015.
01/20/2015
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned for service. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/13/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Una McGeehan on behalf of Social Security Administration
5
04/13/2015
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.
6
04/13/2015
NOTICE by Social Security Administration
7
04/14/2015
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re 5 Answer to Complaint and 6 Notice (Other). Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (rhm) (Documents w/restricted access added on 04/14/2015 for review by Court users only.)
8
04/15/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Brief due by 5/27/2015. Defendant's Brief due within 42 days of the date Plaintiff's Brief is served. Signed by L. Coleman at the Direction of the Court on 04/15/2015.
9
05/01/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Lee Jackson. Social Security Administration served on 2/12/2015.
10
05/27/2015
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Jamie Lee Jackson. Defendant Brief due by 7/13/2015
1
Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
11
07/07/2015
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration.
12
09/15/2015
Recommended Disposition recommending that 2 Jackson's request for relief be denied and that the Commissioner's decision be affirmed. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/15/2015.
13
09/23/2015
OBJECTION to 12 Report and Recommendations by Jamie Lee Jackson
1
Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
14
03/02/2016
ORDER adopting 12 Recommended Disposition and denying Mr. Jackson's 2 request for relief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/02/2016.
15
03/02/2016
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 14 Order entered in this case on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that the final decision of Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, is affirmed. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/02/2016.
16
03/25/2016
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 14 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations, 15 Judgment, by Jamie Lee Jackson.
17
03/28/2016
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 16 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Jackson re: 14 Order and 15 Judgment.
18
04/04/2016
USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to 16 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Jackson. USCA Case Number 16-1804.
19
12/07/2016
OPINION of USCA as to 16 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Jackson.
20
12/07/2016
USCA JUDGMENT as to 16 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Jackson: The judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court.
21
01/30/2017
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 12/07/2016, as to [16] Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Jackson.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.