James Arthur Ingram and Connie Diane Ingram
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00326 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 220 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/26/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by James Arthur Ingram, Connie Diane Ingram
3
01/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Diane Ingram, Debtor James Arthur Ingram.
4
01/26/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Connie Diane Ingram, Debtor James Arthur Ingram.
01/26/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00326-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21651573. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/26/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/05/2018 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 05/04/2018.
6
01/26/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 1/26/2018.
7
01/27/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
8
01/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/28/2018.
01/29/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors James Arthur Ingram and Connie Diane Ingram Case Number 94-00921, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/15/1994; Case Number 94-00921, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/15/1994, Dismissed for Other Reason on 08/25/1994.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/31/2018.
10
02/19/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Joint Debtor
11
02/19/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
12
03/01/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard C Dean Jr. Filed by Creditor 1st Franklin Financial Corporation.
03/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Thomas E Reynolds, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 3700.00, Assets Exempt: $ 1925.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 21818.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 21818.00. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and 1st Franklin Financial Corporation Filed by Creditor 1st Franklin Financial Corporation.
14
05/07/2018
Order Discharging Both Debtors Signed on 5/7/2018 (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)).
15
05/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 14 Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 05/09/2018.
16
07/09/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.