James Brian Quick
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80830 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/23/2018
Approving
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
02/21/2019
Granting Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments
57
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.