James Cecil Gunn
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01482 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 238 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/05/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by James Cecil Gunn
2
04/05/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn.
4
04/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn.
5
04/05/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn.
04/05/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01482-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21923777. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/05/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn.
7
04/05/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn.
8
04/05/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/14/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/09/2018.
9
04/06/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
10
04/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/07/2018.
11
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
12
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
13
05/03/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
14
05/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 05/09/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
15
05/14/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
16
05/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
05/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/17/2018.
18
06/20/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/20/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
06/21/2018
Objection to Claim # 9 of PNC Bank National Association in the amount of $24,813.86 Filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn. (Shinn, J.)
20
06/22/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor James Cecil Gunn). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/22/2018.
22
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/24/2018.
35
02/11/2019
Final Hearing Set
37
02/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
03/12/2019
Order Rescheduling Hearing
42
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
03/20/2019
Bench Sheet from Trustee Motion to Dismiss Hearing
45
03/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.