James Clyde Berry
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00210 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
07/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
07/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
08/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.