James Donald Hyde, Jr. and Julie Ann Hyde
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

7:2017-bk-71962 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 123 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by James Donald Hyde Jr., Julie Ann Hyde
2
11/07/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde. Related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).
4
11/07/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde.
5
11/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr.
6
11/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde.
11/07/2017
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-71962-13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21371558. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/07/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde.
8
11/07/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 1990 Cavalier HMC 28x50 Mobile Home financed by Southland, LLC Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde
9
11/07/2017
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde
10
11/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 1502 Tuscaloosa. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/23/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Proof of Claim due by 03/15/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/07/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/13/2018.
11
11/07/2017
Direction for Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.
12
11/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde, Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde, 9 Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde, Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
13
11/07/2017
Amended Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien of Allergy and Asthma Center of Tuscaloosa Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde
14
11/07/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 13 Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde, Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
15
11/07/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, attorney for Debtor(s), has filed a document that does not have a Certificate of Service attached when filing the Amended Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien - Doc. 13. SOLUTION: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, attorney for Debtor(s), should file a Certificate of Service pursuant to Local Rule 9013-3 for the Amended Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien - Doc. 13. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 13 Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde, Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde).
16
11/07/2017
Notice and Opportunity for Hearing (RE: related document(s) 13 Amended Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien of Allergy and Asthma Center of Tuscaloosa Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde).
17
11/08/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
18
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
19
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde, Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
20
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
21
11/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/10/2017.
22
12/15/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared.
23
01/22/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 13 Amended Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien of Allergy and Asthma Center of Tuscaloosa Filed by Debtor James Donald Hyde Jr., Joint Debtor Julie Ann Hyde).
24
01/24/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #8; Debtors' Motion to Determine Value of Collateral (1990 Cavalier Mobile Home) of Southland, LLC) Hearing scheduled 02/27/2018 at 01:45 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
25
01/24/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #9; Debtors' Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien of Allergy and Asthma Center of Tuscaloosa Recorded in Judgment Book 2014 at Page 6612, Tuscaloosa County, Alabama) Hearing scheduled 02/27/2018 at 01:45 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
26
01/24/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 02/27/2018 at 01:45 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.