James E. Bradley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

7:2015-bk-71441 (alnb)

Trustee's Letter to Cease Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.

C. David Cottingham, Standing Chapter 13 Trustee Northern District of Alabama Western Division P.O. Drawer 020588 Tuscaloosa, AL 35402 (205) 758-8595 TO EMPLOYER TO CEASE REMITTING TO: HERR ENTERPRISES, INC 1709-7TH AVENUE ATTN PAYROLL DEPT JASPER, AL 35501- Date: 01/24/2018 Chapter 13 Case Number: 15-71441-JHH-13 Debtor: JAMES E BRADLEY Debtor's Social Security Number: ###-##-2993 Gentlemen: Please cease making deductions from the wages of the above captioned debtor unless subsequently directed to do so. Thank you for your cooperation. Very truly yours, /s/ C. David Cottingham C. David Cottingham Standing Chapter 13 Trustee CDC/hb cc: JAMES E BRADLEY Employer Attorney: BOND, BOTES,REESE & SHINN PC Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court Case 15-71441-JHH13 Doc 25 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 09:06:03 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Direction for Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA WESTERN DIVISION In the Matter of:) Case No: 15-71441-JHH-13 JAMES E BRADLEY) S.S. No: ###-##-2993) In Proceeding under Chapter 13 In the Matter of:) of the Bankruptcy Code DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION TO: SCOTT CRUMP AUTOMOTIVE 3815 HWY 78 EAST ATTN: PAYROLL DEPT JASPER, AL 35501- the employer of the above Debtor, The Debtor herein, having filed a Petition under Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code, thereby having subjected all future earnings to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court until further order of the Court; and having filed a written plan; and the Court having assumed exclusive jurisdiction over all the Debtor's future earnings, which are not subject to levy or garnishments, except continuing wage withholding orders for current child support; and the Debtor herein having requested the issuance of the DIRECTIVE to implement the proposed plan in this case as evidenced by the Debtor's written consent below; or Confirmation having been had as proposed by law; and Section 1325(b) of Title 11 of the United States code providing that, "After confirmation of a plan, the court may order any entity from whom the debtor receives income to pay all or any part of such income to the trustee." IT IS DIRECTED: that the Employer be, and hereby is ordered to deduct from Debtor's earnings, vacation pay or bonuses, for payment into this Court, the sum of: $131.00 WEEKLY beginning immediately, AND TO FORWARD SAID DEDUCTION AT LEAST ONCE EACH MONTH to: C. David Cottingham, Standing Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Drawer 020588 Tuscaloosa, AL 35402 The above Employer is hereby informed that it is prohibited from imposing any type of penalty or the taking of any type or form of disciplinary action against the employee-debtor because of the issuance and effort of this Direction, said Direction having been issued to implement the Debtor's voluntary Chapter 13 plan as authorized by the Federal Bankruptcy Code. Any such disciplinary action is prohibited by Section 525 of Title 11 of the United States Code. Consented to by: SEE ATTACHED REQUEST /s/ C. David Cottingham Debtor C. David Cottingham Standing Chapter 13 Trustee IF ANY INFORMATION IS DESIRED REGARDING THIS ORDER, PLEASE CALL THE TRUSTEE'S OFFICE – TELEPHONE (205) 758-8595 FACSIMILE (205) 758-0149 PLEASE NOTIFY THE TRUSTEE'S OFFICE IF AND WHEN THE DEBTOR LEAVES YOUR EMPLOYMENT cc: Debtor Employer Attorney: BOND, BOTES,REESE & SHINN PC Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court Mailed: 1/24/18 (hollyb) DATE: January 24, 2018 Case 15-71441-JHH13 Doc 26 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 09:09:20 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/15/2015
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by James E. Bradley (Shinn, J.)
3
09/15/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley. (Shinn, J.)
4
09/15/2015
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley. (Shinn, J.)
5
09/15/2015
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley. (Shinn, J.). Related document(s) 11 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).
09/15/2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(15-71441-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18472818. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/15/2015
*ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong case number* Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley. (Shinn, J.) Modified on 9/16/2015
7
09/15/2015
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Incorrect case number Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley (RE: related document(s) 6 Tax Documents). (Shinn, J.)
8
09/15/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley. (Shinn, J.)
9
09/15/2015
Direction for Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.
10
09/16/2015
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
09/16/2015
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor James E. Bradley Case Number 12-71980, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/25/2012, Dismissed for Other Reason on 11/15/2012; Case Number 92-01284, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/19/1992, Standard Discharge on 05/20/1992; Case Number 92-08353, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/05/1992.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
09/15/2015
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/15/2015 at 09:00 AM at Room 111 Jasper. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/12/2015 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Proof of Claim due by 01/13/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/14/2016 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/14/2015.
12
09/18/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/18/2015.
13
09/18/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor James E. Bradley). Notice Date 09/18/2015.
14
09/18/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/18/2015.
15
10/15/2015
Direction for Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.
16
10/19/2015
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared.
17
10/22/2015
Summary of Schedules, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule I, Amended Schedule J Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley.
18
10/22/2015
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor James E. Bradley. (Shinn, J.). Related document(s) 11 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).).
19
10/23/2015
Notice of Confirmation Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated October 22, 2015, filed by Debtor James E. Bradley). Hearing scheduled 12/17/2015 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
20
10/25/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/25/2015.
21
12/16/2015
Trustee's Bench Sheet.
22
12/22/2015
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Trustee Recommends Confirmation - Confirmation Order to be Entered) RE: Doc #18; Confirmation Hearing on Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated October 22, 2015
23
12/28/2015
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 12/28/2015 (RE: related document(s) 18 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor James E. Bradley).
24
12/30/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 12/30/2015.
25
01/24/2018
Trustee's Letter to Cease Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.
26
01/24/2018
Direction for Deduction Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.