James Gregory Williams, Sr. and Teresa Gene Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00301 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
07/11/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
46
07/26/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
47
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
48
08/14/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
49
09/13/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
50
09/17/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
51
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
09/20/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.