James Nathanael Savok and Paula Nichole Wright
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00054 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/04/2018
Objection to Claim of Exemptions (CM46-COAwith)
06/26/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/02/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
20
07/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
21
08/08/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
08/09/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.