James R. Fanning and Shirley G. Fanning
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82076 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
07/14/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
12
07/28/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
13
07/28/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
15
10/05/2018
Extend Time
19
11/02/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of)
28
12/20/2018
Extend Time
33
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
01/18/2019
Extend Time
37
01/22/2019
Incorrect Event (Notice of)
01/22/2019
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/22/2019
Notice of Dismissal/Withdrawal of a Document
42
01/23/2019
Approving
43
01/23/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)
02/07/2019
Closing Order: Discharge Trustee, Release Bond Liability & Close Case (Ch 7 No Asset Non-Image) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.