James v. General Dynamics Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00046 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
65
05/31/2018
Status Report
06/03/2018
Order Staying Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/03/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
07/20/2018
Status Report
07/23/2018
Order Staying Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
~Util - Set/Clear Flags (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
10/02/2018
Status Report
70
11/11/2018
Leave to File Document
11/14/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
11/16/2018
Amended Complaint
73
11/21/2018
Unissued Summons
11/21/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.