James v. United States Department of Defense et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00028 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
11
05/17/2018
Order on Stipulation
12
05/30/2018
Summary Judgment
13
06/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
14
06/20/2018
Declaration
15
06/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
16
07/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
17
07/25/2018
Summary Judgment
18
08/08/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
08/12/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
08/23/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
22
10/10/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with the names and current location of those persons whose identifying information was redacted; Defendant is not required to provide any additional documents to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/10/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
23
11/28/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
24
11/29/2018
Attorney Fees
25
11/29/2018
Declaration
26
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
27
12/12/2018
Stipulation
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/03/2019
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
02/05/2019
Stipulation
31
02/06/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.