Jan Marie Keffer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-01513 (alnb)

Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[22] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).

Case: 17 - 01513 - DSC13 BENCH SHEET FOR HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Hearing Date: 01 / 23 / 2018 Hearing Time: 10: 30 am Debtor: KEFFER, JAN MARIE Co - Debtor: Attorney: BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P. C. Case Filed: 04 / 07 / 2017 Case Confirmed: 06 / 22 / 2017 () Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. () Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. O Case isCONVERTED to Chapter 7 on debtor's Notice of Conversion. () Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. () Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is / ACCEPTED. () Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. (1) the debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on 02 / 22 / 2018; and, (2) the debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on the dates due. If the debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the debtor and debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS this case without further notice or hearing. Begin Payments: 05 / 07 / 2017 Schedule 390. 00 MONTHLY Payment Method: Order Sent: Employer: WILLIAM MORRIS HOME FASHIONS Delinquency Since On Schedule: Actual Payments: Amount Delinquent: 05 / 07 / 2017. 3, 510. 00 2, 340. 00 1, 170. 00 Balance Due Claims: Expected Admin: less Funds On Hand: Approximate Balance Due: 12, 959, 10 887. 70 0. 00 13, 846. 80 (O) Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. () Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ _ OOTHER: - Months (on Schedule) to Pay Out Case: 27 01 / 23 / 2018 Date: Case Filed 9 Months Ago (36 Month Plan) Last 12 Transactions 12 / 14 / 17 PC 390. 00 10 / 02 / 17 PC 390. 00 08 / 22 / 17 390. 00 07 / 11 / 17 PC 390. 00 06 / 05 / 17 PC 390. 00 04 / 11 / 17 CASH 390. 00 Appearances Chapter 13 TrusteeU.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Debtor Joint Debtor Debtor's Attorney or Other Spouse (standing in) Deputy Clerk Case 17 - 01513 - DSC13 Doc 33 Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 12: 55: 04 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments; Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. (Related Doc # [22]) Signed on 1/24/2018.

Van−122 [TMD Order] (Rev. 08/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−01513−DSC13 Jan Marie Keffer Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−3751 Debtor(s) ORDER This matter came before the Court on 1/23/2018 for a hearing on the Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Case is CONVERTED to Chapter 7 on Debtor's Notice of Conversion. Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. 1. The Debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on 2/22/2018 and, 2. The Debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on the dates due and on or before the 22nd day of each month thereafter. If the Debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS the case without further notice or hearing. Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. OTHER: Dated: January 24, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge mwb Case 17-01513-DSC13 Doc 34 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 15:25:41 Desc Order on TMD Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/07/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Jan Marie Keffer
2
04/07/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
4
04/07/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
5
04/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
04/07/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-01513-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20560334. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/07/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
7
04/07/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
8
04/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
9
04/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/03/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/23/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 08/01/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/04/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/03/2017.
10
04/08/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
04/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/09/2017.
12
04/10/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing: PROBLEM: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, Attorney for Debtor, has filed a document not in an upright position when filing the Employee Income Records. SOLUTION: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, Attorney for Debtor, should refile the document scanning it in the portrait orientation. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerks Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 8 Employee Income Records filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer).
13
04/12/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer.
14
04/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer). Notice Date 04/12/2017.
15
04/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/12/2017.
16
05/04/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/3/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
05/22/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 05/23/2017 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
05/24/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
19
06/22/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 6/22/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer).
20
06/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 06/24/2017.
21
09/14/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor CitiMortgage, Inc.
22
12/13/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
23
12/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
25
12/19/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor CitiMortgage, Inc.
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Pay History) Modified on 12/21/2017 TO SHOW THAT RECEIPT #21527960 WAS VOIDED AS TO THIS CASE# ONLY DUE TO ERROR IN PROCESSING. PAYMENT FOR THIS CASE WAS NOT PROCESSED IN PAY.GOV; THEREFORE, $181 PAYMENT FOR THE MOTION FOR RELIEF IN THIS CASE WAS NOT RECEIVED BY RECEIPT #21527960. ATTORNEY TO REPAY THIS FEE. (bht
3 Attachments
26
12/19/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor CitiMortgage, Inc (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
12/19/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-01513-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21527960. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc25) (U.S. Treasury) Modified on 12/21/2017 TO SHOW THAT RECEIPT #21527960 AS TO THIS CASE WAS VOIDED DUE TO FAILURE TO PROCESS IN PAY.GOV. FUNDS FOR THIS MOTION WERE NOT RECEIVED BY THE COURT. (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
12/20/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by CitiMortgage, Inc (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor CitiMortgage, Inc). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
12/21/2017
Payment of Fee for Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay. Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor CitiMortgage, Inc (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,). (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee for Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay(17-01513-DSC13) [misc,payrfs] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21536712. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
30
01/11/2018
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
31
01/12/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 30 Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debtor Jan Marie Keffer). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
32
01/12/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Crowe shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #25; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for CitiMortgage, Inc.
33
01/24/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[22] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
34
01/24/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments; Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. (Related Doc # [22]) Signed on 1/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.