Janice Barbara Duff
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00144 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
10/26/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
49
10/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
11/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
11/20/2018
Certificate of No Objection
51
11/21/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
52
12/10/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
53
12/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
54
12/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.