Janice C Freeman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02117 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/21/2018
Extend Automatic Stay
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/22/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Reassignment of Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
41
12/14/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
42
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
01/08/2019
Order Rescheduling Hearing
01/08/2019
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.