Janis Armstrong
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01698 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
36
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.