Jarratt et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Arkansas

5:2016-cv-05302 (arwd)

JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.

Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 37 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/22/17 Page 1 of 6 PageID #: 182 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT Pursuant to this Court’s April 14, 2017 Order, the Parties submit the following information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 26.1: 1. Any changes in timing, form, or requirements of mandatory disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a). None, except that the parties agree that initial disclosures will be due two weeks from the date of this report. 2. Date when mandatory disclosures were or will be made. By June 5, 2017. 3. Subjects on which discovery may be needed. i.Liability; ii.Damages; iii.Patent invalidity and non-infringement; iv. The identity, location, affiliation and experience of all persons with knowledge relevant to the issues involved in this lawsuit; v. The existence and location of any and all physical or documentary evidence relevant to the issues involved in this lawsuit; and, vi. In addition to the above-listed topics of discovery, the parties anticipate needing discovery pertaining to the identity and qualifications of any JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT – Page 1 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 37 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/22/17 Page 2 of 6 PageID #: 183 expert witness retained for purposes of offering expert testimony in this case as well as the factual, legal, technical, or scientific basis for any expert opinions. 4. Whether any party will likely be requested to disclose or produce information from electronic or computer-based media. If so: (a) whether disclosure or production will be limited to data reasonably available to the parties in the ordinary course of business; It is anticipated that the disclosures sought will be data reasonably available to the parties. (b) the anticipated scope, cost and time required for disclosure or production of data beyond what is reasonably available to the parties in the ordinary course of business; Unknown at this time, but the parties do not anticipate any need for such data at this time. (c) the format and media agreed to by the parties for the production of such data as well as agreed procedures for such production; Electronic files shall be produced with document-level extracted text, and scanned documents shall be produced with OCR. If particular documents warrant a different format, the parties will cooperate to arrange for the mutually acceptable production of such documents. Excel files and other spreadsheet files may be produced as native files. To the extent either party believes, on a case-by-case basis, that documents should be produced in an alternative format (e.g., in color), the parties have agreed that they will meet and confer in good faith concerning such alternative production arrangements. The parties agree to produce documents in.pdf format. Alternatively, the parties may agree, at a later date, to produce single-page, black and white Group IV.tiff images of at least 300 dpi format, with database image load files (.opt,.dii,.lfp files) that denote document breaks if all parties can properly access and create such files. JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT – Page 2 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 37 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/22/17 Page 3 of 6 PageID #: 184 (d) whether reasonable measures have been taken to preserve potentially discoverable data from alteration or destruction in the ordinary course of business or otherwise; The parties’ counsel have confirmed that the parties have taken steps to preserve relevant, discoverable data. (e) other problems which the parties anticipate may arise in connection with electronic or computer-based discovery. None anticipated. 5. Date by which fact discovery should be completed. The Court’s Initial Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 34) provides the following: "The parties may request that setting of the jury trial and other accompanying deadlines be deferred until after a claims construction hearing is held." Dkt. No. 34 at p.2, Section 6. The parties agree that setting trial in this patent case is best deferred until after the Markman hearing. Accordingly, the parties believe that this deadline and the others below should be determined during a scheduling conference to be held by the parties after the Court issues its Markman ruling. 6. Date by which expert discovery should be completed. See Section 5 above. To be determined during a scheduling conference to be held by the parties after the Court issues its Markman ruling. 7. Any needed changes in limitations imposed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. None. The Court has adopted the Patent Local Rules for the Northern District of California. The parties submit Exhibit 1 with the proposed deadlines all provided by the local patent rules of the Northern District of California. The parties request that the setting of the jury trial and other accompanying deadlines be deferred until after a claims construction hearing is held, pursuant to the Court’s Initial Scheduling Order and as described above in Section 5. 8. Any Orders, e.g. protective orders, which should be entered. The parties expect to submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order for the Court’s review and, if approved, entry. JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT – Page 3 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 37 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/22/17 Page 4 of 6 PageID #: 185 9. Any objections to initial disclosures on the ground that mandatory disclosures are not appropriate in the circumstances of the action. None. 10. Any objections to the proposed trial date. Yes. The parties believe they will be unable to prepare this case for trial by the proposed trial date of April 9, 2018, given the patent-related schedule dictated by the Northern District of California’s patent rules, which this Court has adopted for purposes of this case. As set forth below, the parties respectfully request that the Court set this matter for a claim construction (Markman) hearing in December 2017 or January 2018, with a trial date to be scheduled by the Court after it issues its ruling related to the claim construction hearing, pursuant to this Court’s Initial Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 34), p. 2, Section 6. 11. Proposed Deadline to Join Parties and Amend Pleadings. To be determined during a scheduling conference to be held by the parties after the Court issues its Markman ruling. 12. Proposed deadline for filing motions. All motions, except motions in limine, shall be filed no later than 60 days before trial. Motions in limine shall be filed no later than 14 days before trial. 13. Expert disclosures: To be determined during a scheduling conference to be held by the parties after the Court issues its Markman ruling. 14. Claim Construction (Markman) Hearing. The parties respectfully request that the Court schedule the claim construction (Markman) hearing to take place in December 2017 or January 2018. JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT – Page 4 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 37 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/22/17 Page 5 of 6 PageID #: 186 Respectfully submitted, _/s/Stephen D. Schrantz/_________/s/Darby V. Doan Stephen D. Schrantz, AR Bar No. 2006215 Darby V. Doan Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC Ark. State Bar No. 96064 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Catherine M. Maness Jonesboro, AR 72401 Ark. State Bar No. 2016085 Telephone: (870) 275-7838 HALTOM & DOAN schrantzlaw@gmail.com 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: 903-255-1000 Facsimile: 903-255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Email: cmaness@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT – Page 5 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 37 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/22/17 Page 6 of 6 PageID #: 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on May 22, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Henry Nelkin John Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) j.gherlone@chesneynicholas.com/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT – Page 6

Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order

PageID #: 188 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.) PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER STEP ACTION RULE(S)/ORDER DUE DATE 1 Initial Case Management Fed.R. Civ. P. 26(f); May 12, 2017 Conference P.R. 2-1 2 Patentee serves Disclosure of P.R. 3-1 May 26, 2017 Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions 3 Document Production P.R. 3-2 May 26, 2017 Accompanying Disclosure 4 Invalidity Contentions P.R. 3-3 July 10, 2017 5 Document Production P.R. 3-4 July 10, 2017 Accompanying Disclosure 6 Advice of Counsel P.R. 3-7 30 Days after Claim Construction Ruling PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER – Page 1 PageID #: 189 STEP ACTION RULE(S)/ORDER DUE DATE 7 Damages Contentions P.R. 3-8 July 17, 2017 Monday Responsive Damages P.R. 3-9 August 14, 2017 8 Contentions 9 Exchange of Proposed Terms for P.R. 4-1 July 24, 2017 Construction 10 Exchange of Preliminary Claim P.R. 4-2 August 14, 2017 Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence 11 Joint Claim Construction and P.R. 4-3 September 8, 2017 Prehearing Statement 12 Completion of Claim P.R. 4-4 October 6, 2017 Construction Discovery 13 Plaintiff’s Opening Claim P.R. 4-5 October 23, 2017 Construction Brief 14 Responsive Brief and Supporting P.R. 4-5(b) November 6, 2017 Evidence 15 Reply Brief P.R. 4-5(c) November 13, 2017 16 Claim Construction Hearing P.R. 4-6 December 2017 or January 2018, at the Court’s convenience PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER – Page 2

SHOW CAUSE ORDER- Show Cause Response due by 6/13/2017. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 30, 2017.

Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 38 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/30/17 Page 1 of 4 PageID #: 190 IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION HUGH JARRATT and JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC PLAINTIFFS v. No. 5:16-CV-05302 AMAZON.COM, INC. and CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. DEFENDANTS SHOW CAUSE ORDER Venue in this case is determined solely and exclusively by the patent infringement venue statute, codified at 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b). Fourco Glass Co. v. Transmirra Prods. Corp., 353 U.S. 222, 229 (1957). Under that provision, "[a]ny civil action for patent infringement may be brought in the judicial district where the defendant resides, or where the defendant has committed acts of infringement and has a regular and established place of business." 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b). On May 22, 2017, the Supreme Court held that, "[a]s applied to domestic corporations,'reside[nce]’ in § 1400(b) refers only to the State of incorporation." TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC,--U.S.--, 2017 WL 2216934, *8 (May 22, 2017). Neither Defendant is incorporated in this state. Therefore, venue in this Court is only proper if a Defendant has committed acts of infringement in this district and has an established place of business here. Both Defendants are alleged to have committed acts of infringement in this district, but it is not clear that either "has a regular and established place of business" here. The test for whether a Defendant has a regular and established place of business is fact-specific, and not as easy to apply as the test for residence. Broadly stated, "the appropriate inquiry is whether the corporate defendant does its business in [this] district through a permanent and continuous presence [here] and not... whether it has a fixed physical presence in the sense of a formal office or store." In re Cordis Corp., 769 1 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 38 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/30/17 Page 2 of 4 PageID #: 191 F.2d 733, 737 (Fed. Cir. 1985). Merely doing business in this district is insufficient to make venue in this Court proper, however. Typically, some permanent location in the district is required. See, e.g., Phillips v. Baker, 121 F.2d 752, 756 (9th Cir. 1941) (holding venue is inappropriate in a district where a defendant operates temporarily or for a particular transaction by making itinerant sales, when defendant maintained a regular office in another district). A defendant’s Internet storefront, though permanently accessible in a district, seems indistinguishable from a defendant’s employee in a district who solicits orders and forwards them to a home office in another district, where sales are consummated and orders filled. Cf. W.S. Tyler Co. v. Ludlow-Saylor Wire Co., 236 U.S. 723, 725 (1915) ("This sale was consummated at St. Louis, and did not constitute an infringement of appellant’s patent within the district where suit was brought."). Plaintiff here does not allege that either Defendant has a regular and established business in this district. Rather, Plaintiff’s allegations clarify that it is relying on the general venue statute, 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b), to bring its action in this Court. (Doc. 1, ¶ 11 ("Venue is proper in this district under 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b) because a substantial part of the acts giving rise to the claim occurred in this district and because Defendants are subject to personal jurisdiction in this district.")). Plaintiff alleges that Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") is a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in Seattle, Washington and that Defendant CT Discount Store, Inc. ("CT") is a New York Corporation with its principal place of business in Floral Park, New York. (Doc. 1, ¶¶ 3 and 4). It is even less clear that CT has a presence in any state but New York. It appears to the Court that, based solely on the factual allegations and an analysis of the location of any "regular and established place of business," the most appropriate venue for Plaintiff’s patent infringement action against CT is the Eastern District of New York and the most appropriate venue for Plaintiff’s patent infringement action against Amazon is the Western District of Washington. 2 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 38 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/30/17 Page 3 of 4 PageID #: 192 28 U.S.C. §§ 112(c), 128(b); see also Stonite Prods. Co. v. Melvin Lloyd Co., 315 U.S. 561, 562– 63 (1942) (holding that patent venue statute exclusively controls patent infringement venue, rather than general statute allowing suit against multiple defendants from different districts to be brought in district where one resides); Toombs v. Goss, 768 F.Supp. 62, 65 (W.D.N.Y. 1991) ("Congress has not created an exception to § 1400(b) in cases involving multiple defendants or conspiring defendants."); Bradford Novelty Co. v. Manheim, 156 F.Supp. 489, 491 (S.D.N.Y. 1957) ("The Supreme Court has in fact held that venue in infringement actions is to be exclusively determined by § 1400 and that joint defendants residing in different judicial districts cannot be properly joined in one action."). Because venue is typically regarded as nonjurisdictional, objections to the propriety of venue may be waived. See Olberding v. Illinois Cent. R. Co., 346 U.S. 338, 340 (1953) (noting that waiver of general venue statute may occur); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (h). Amazon has waived the defense of improper venue, but has retained the right to contest the convenience of this venue. (Doc. 32, ¶ 11). CT has not waived the defense of improper venue. (Doc. 21, ¶¶ 2, 3, 25). The matter of venue is best addressed at the outset of litigation. Because the central issue Plaintiff raises appears to be Defendants’ alleged infringement of its patent, it is the Court’s intention to sever this action into separate suits against the Defendants. The Court then intends to transfer the suit against CT to the Eastern District of New York. Plaintiff may show cause why the Court should not do so, or should transfer the matter to a different district, by filing a response to this order on or before June 13, 2017. CT may file a reply within 14 days of Plaintiff’s response. The Court also intends at this stage of litigation to address the issue of Amazon’s objection to the convenience of this forum. Amazon may show cause why this Court should not retain the 3 Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 38 <ifrestricted> Filed 05/30/17 Page 4 of 4 PageID #: 193 suit against it by filing a motion to transfer or similar. Any such motion must be filed on or before June 13, 2017. Plaintiff may file a response to any such motion within 14 days of its filing. IT IS SO ORDERED this 30th day of May, 2017./s/P. K. Holmes, III P.K. HOLMES, III CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE 4

NOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Nelkin on behalf of CT Discount Store, Inc.

Case 5: 16-cv-05302-PKH Document 39 < ifrestricted > Filed 05/31/17 Page 1 of 2 PagelD #: 194 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION HUGH JARRATT and JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC, Plaintiffs,) Civil Action No.: 5: 16-cy-05302-PKH AMAZON.COM, INC., and CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. Defendants. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Please take notice that Henry D. Nelkin of the law firm CHESNEY & NICHOLAS, LLP enters his appearance as counsel of record for Defendant, CT Discount Store, Inc. and requests that any correspondence, motions, notices, and pleadings in this action directed to CT Discount Store, Inc. also be served upon Henry D. Nelkin at the following address: Henry D. Nelkin CHESNEY & NICHOLAS, LLP 485 Underhill Blvd., Suite 308 Syosset, NY 11791 Telephone: (516) 378-1700 Facsimile: (516) 378-7633 Email: h. nelkin@chesneynicholas.com Please add the name of Mr. Nelkin to all service lists in this matter, including the e-filing service list. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PAGE 1 Case 5: 16-CV-05302-PKH Document 39 < ifrestricted > Filed 05/31/17 Page 2 of 2 PageID #: 195 Respectfully Submitted, reachel Setia y Dall. CHÉSNEY & NICHOLAS, LLP By: HENRY D. NELKIN, ESQ. Attorneys for Defendant CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. 485 Underhill Blvd. Suite 308 Syosset, NY 11791 (516) 378-1700 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compliance with Local Rule CV-5. 2 on this the 31 " day of May, 2017. Madele NEPREKA D. NELKIN NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PAGE 2

Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to {{38}} Order to Show Cause by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) JARRATT, JARRATT INDUSTRIES, AND CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.’S JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER (DOC. NO. 38) Plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC ("the Jarratts") and Defendant CT Discount Store, Inc. ("CT") file this joint motion requesting an extension of time to respond to the Court’s Show Cause Order (Doc. No. 38) dated May 30, 2017, states: 1. The Court entered a Show Cause Order (Doc. No. 38) on May 30, 2017 for the Jarratts to show cause by June 13th, 2017. 2. The Jarratts and CT are currently negotiating the terms for settling this matter. 3. The Jarratts and CT have agreed on a number of terms for settling this matter and are currently formalizing the settlement terms in a written settlement agreement. 4. The Jarratts previously sent a written settlement agreement to CT. 5. CT requests additional time to review the settlement agreement. 6. The Jarratts and CT believe that this matter can be resolved within two weeks. 7. Counsel for the Jarratts has requested from counsel for Defendant CT, an extension of time up to and including June 27, 2017, for the Jarratts to show cause to the Court. 8. The Jarratts and CT respectfully request that the Court extend the time period to show cause by two weeks to extend the deadline to June 27, 2017. WHEREFORE, The Jarratts and CT pray that this Court grant their joint motion for extension of time and extend the time in which the Jarratts have to respond to the Show Cause Order to June 27, 2017. Respectfully submitted, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC, Plaintiffs ___6-12-2017___ By:/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Date Stephen D. Schrantz, AR Bar No. 2006215 Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 Telephone: (870) 275-7838 schrantzlaw@gmail.com By:/s/Kathleen M. Stafford Kathleen M. Stafford, NY Bar No. 3983616 Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on June 12, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan Catherine Maness HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Kathleen M. Stafford Henry D. Nelkin John M. Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) k.stafford@chesneynicholas.com Robert T. Cruzen KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com

MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Amazon.Com, Inc.

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. Pursuant to the Court’s Show Cause Order (ECF No. 38), Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") respectfully moves this Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1404 to transfer this action to the Western District of Washington because that district is a more convenient venue. In the alternative, Amazon moves to dismiss this case for improper venue over the patent claims asserted under 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b). Amazon’s motion to transfer is based on the facts that all Amazon witnesses and evidence are located in the Western District of Washington, the Western District of Washington would be more convenient for likely third party witnesses, the complained-of conduct occurred in the West-ern District of Washington, there exist only one witness and no identified evidence in this district, and transfer would promote the interests of justice. Amazon’s motion to dismiss respectfully re-quests that the Court consider Amazon’s objection on the basis of improper venue because that objection is based on case law decided after Amazon filed its Answer to the Complaint. In support of this motion, Amazon includes: 1. A brief consisting of a concise statement of relevant facts and applicable law; 2. The Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen in Support of the Motion To Transfer To A More Convenient Venue Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue Of Amazon.com, Inc.; and 3. The Declaration of Gianmarco Vairo in Support of the Motion To Transfer To A More Convenient Venue Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue Of Amazon.com, Inc. MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 1 Respectfully submitted,/s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compli-ance with Local Rule CV-5.2 on this 13th day of June, 2017./s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 2

MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of [41] MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Amazon.Com, Inc.

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. TABLE OF CONTENTS I. INTRODUCTION-----------------------------------------------------------------------------------1 II. STATEMENT OF FACTS-------------------------------------------------------------------------3 A. Procedural History--------------------------------------------------------------------------3 B. Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs’ Past Patent Suits-----------------------------------------------3 C. Plaintiffs’ Documents are Located Out of District-------------------------------------4 D. Amazon, its Witnesses, and its Evidence Are Located in the Western District of Washington----------------------------------------5 E. Plaintiffs Have Resolved Their Dispute with CT Discount--------------------------7 F. Third-Party Witnesses are Located On the West Coast and in China----------------------------------------------------------7 III. THE COURT SHOULD TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON---------------------------------------------9 A. The Western District of Washington has Jurisdiction Over Amazon, and Venue Would Have Been Proper in that District-----------------------------------------------10 B. The Factors Considered Under the "Convenience" Prong Favor Transfer to the Western District of Washington--------------------------------------------------11 1. The Western District of Washington Would be at Least as Convenient as this District for the Parties------------------------------------------------------------11 2. The Western District of Washington Would be More Convenient for Witnesses---------------------------------------------11 3. The Documents and Other Evidence Most Relevant to this Action are Located in the Western District of Washington and Amazon is Aware of No Relevant Evidence or Documents in this District-----------14 4. The Conduct Complained of in this Action Allegedly Occurred in the Western District of Washington-------15 Page i 5. This District and the Western District of Washington are Equally Capable of Applying the Laws at Issue in this Case---------------------------------------16 C. The Factors Considered Under the Interest of Justice Prong Favor Transfer to the Western District of Washington or are Neutral----------------------------------------------------------------17 1. Judicial Economy Favors Transfer---------------------------------------------18 2. The Court Should Not Give Deference to Plaintiffs’ Choice of Venue------------------------------------------------------19 3. The Comparative Costs to the Parties of Litigating in Each Forum Favors Transfer------------------------------------20 4. Interest of Justice Factors 4 (Ability to Enforce a Judgment), 5 (Obstacles to Fair Trial), and 6 (Conflict of Law Issues), are Neutral----------------------------------------222 5. The Western District of Washington Has a Strong Local Interest in Deciding this Case and Questions of Federal Law Predominate----------------------------------------22 D. On Balance, those Factors Properly Considered Weigh Heavily in Favor of Transferring this Case to the Western District of Washington-------------------------------------------23 IV. ALTERNATIVELY, THE COURT SHOULD DISMISS THIS CASE FOR IMPROPER VENUE IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT’S OPINION IN T.C. HEARTLAND------------------------------------24 V. CONCLUSION--------------------------------------------------------------------------------------25 Page ii Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 31 PageID #: 205 TABLE OF AUTHORITIES Cases: Page(s): Am. Standard, Inc. v. Bendix Corp., 487 F. Supp. 254 (W.D. Mo. 1980)---------------------------------------------------------------------11 Beijing Zhongyi Zhongbiao Elec. Info. Tech. v. Microsoft Corp., No. 4:12-CV-4077, 2013 WL 3808009 (W.D. Ark. July 22, 2013)-------------------------------18 Biometics, LLC v. New Womyn, Inc., 112 F. Supp. 2d 869 (E.D. Mo. 2000)-------------------------------------------------------------15, 16 Crabb v. GoDaddy.com, Inc., No. 07-CV-4040, 2010 WL 5890625 (W.D. Ark. Mar. 29, 2010)---------------------------passim Engel v. CBS, Inc., 886 F. Supp. 728 (C.D. Cal. 1995)---------------------------------------------------------------------25 GeoTag, Inc. v. Starbucks Corp., No. 2:10-CV-572, 2013 WL 890484 (E.D. Tex. Jan. 14, 2013)------------------------------------19 Helicopteros Nacionales de Colombia, S.A. v. Hall, 466 U.S. 408 (1984)--------------------------------------------------------------------------------------10 Holzsager v. Valley Hospital, 646 F.2d 792 (2nd Cir. 1981)----------------------------------------------------------------------------25 In re Apple, Inc., 602 F.3d 909 (8th Cir. 2010)----------------------------------------------------------------------------16 In re Genentech, Inc., 566 F.3d 1338 (Fed. Cir. 2009)--------------------------------------------------------------------11, 14 In re Hoffman-La Roche Inc., 587 F.3d 1333 (Fed. Cir. 2009)-------------------------------------------------------------------------23 In re Horseshoe Entm’t, 337 F.3d 429 (5th Cir. 2003)----------------------------------------------------------------------------11 In re TS Tech USA Corp., 551 F.3d 1315 (Fed. Cir. 2008)-------------------------------------------------------------------------12 Miller v. Christus St. Michael Health Sys., No. 4:16-CV-4077, 2017 WL 2266887 (W.D. Ark. May 23, 2017)-------------------------passim Milo & Gabby, LLC v. Amazon.com, 144 F. Supp. 3d 1251 (W. D. Wash. 2015)-------------------------------------------------------------7 Page iii Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 31 PageID #: 206 Sissel v. Klimley, No. 3:08-CV-00062-JAJ, 2009 WL 700186 (S.D. Iowa Mar. 16, 2009)--------------------------23 TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC,--U.S.--, No. 16-341, 2017 WL 2216934 (U.S. May 22, 2017)------------------------------1, 2, 24 Terra Int’l, Inc. v. Mississippi Chem. Corp., 119 F.3d 688 (8th Cir. 1997)----------------------------------------------------------------9, 10, 17, 19 Statutes and Rules: 28 U.S.C. § 1391------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------2, 24 28 U.S.C. § 1400------------------------------------------------------------------------------------11, 24, 25 28 U.S.C. § 1404----------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------9 Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26------------------------------------------------------------------------------------------7 Page iv I. INTRODUCTION On May 22, 2017, the Supreme Court reversed long-standing Federal Circuit authority in patent cases and held that, "[a]s applied to domestic corporations,'reside[nce]’ in § 1400(b) refers only to the State of incorporation." TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC,--U.S.--, No. 16-341, 2017 WL 2216934, *8 (U.S. May 22, 2017). On May 30, 2017, this Court issued a Show Cause Order (D.I. 38) directing the parties to file briefs addressing venue objections. Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") requests that this case be transferred to the Western District of Washington because it is a more convenient forum for Amazon and third-party witnesses. In the alternative, Amazon requests that the Court dismiss this action for improper venue in light of the Supreme Court’s decision in TC Heartland. First, the Western District of Washington has direct, concrete, and extensive connections to this case in the form of numerous witnesses and evidence, which outweigh any connections this case has to the Western District of Arkansas. Amazon is headquartered in the Western District of Washington. Therefore, the Western District of Washington would be more convenient for all of Amazon’s relevant employee witnesses who work in Seattle, Washington, and reside in the West-ern District of Washington. It would also be more convenient for other witnesses with knowledge potentially relevant to this suit, including third party witnesses such as the inventor of prior art taco plates and Chinese manufacturers who are the alleged source of the accused products. All of Amazon’s relevant documents are located in the Western District of Washington. In contrast, Amazon has no relevant witnesses or documents in this district. Amazon is aware of no relevant third party witnesses or evidence located in this district. Plaintiffs have iden-tified a single witness in this district: plaintiff Hugh Jarratt. And although plaintiffs’ principal place of business is alleged to be in this district, every relevant document that they have identified thus far is alleged to be at plaintiffs’ counsel’s office, outside of this district. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 1 Second, not only do Amazon’s principal relevant party witnesses in this matter reside in Seattle, Washington, but plaintiffs’ contentions in this case implicate Amazon’s alleged conduct that occurred in the Western District of Washington. That district therefore possesses a unique, particularized local interest in passing judgment on the conduct of Western District of Washington residents and a local business. Specifically, the plaintiffs contend (1) that Amazon knowingly infringed their design patent by listing products on its website in Seattle, Washington, completing sales of those products in Seattle, Washington, and collecting profits from such sales in Seattle, Washington, and (2) that Amazon employees (located in Seattle, Washington) intentionally misled consumers nationwide. Amazon denies these allegations. But under Eighth Circuit law, the West-ern District of Washington should resolve that dispute. In contrast, Amazon has committed no acts within this district that are at issue in this case. And plaintiffs have resolved their dispute with the only other defendant named in this case, CT Discount Store, Inc. ("CT Discount"). Because the factors properly considered on this motion all either favor transfer or are neu-tral, the Court should grant Amazon’s motion to transfer. Finally, Amazon requests, in the alternative, that the Court dismiss this action because the Supreme Court’s decision in the TC Heartland case makes clear that venue in this district is im-proper. Amazon noted when it answered that plaintiffs’ venue allegations were improper because Section 1391 did not apply to plaintiffs’ patent claims, but did not contest venue because doing so would have been futile under the Federal Circuit’s then-controlling holding in the TC Heartland case. That decision has now been reversed. The interests of justice would therefore be served— and plaintiffs will not be unduly prejudiced—by considering Amazon’s objection because this case is in its infancy, no discovery requests have been served or answered, no depositions have oc-curred, and a schedule has not yet been set. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 2 II. STATEMENT OF FACTS A. Procedural History On October 25, 2016, plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC (collectively, "Jar-ratt" or "plaintiffs") filed the instant complaint against Amazon and also sued one other defendant alleging infringement of U.S. Patent No. D574,187 ("the'187 patent"), violation of the Lanham Act, common law tortious interference with business relations, and a violation of the Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act. Jarratt served infringement contentions on Amazon’s local counsel on May 26, 2017. (Declaration of Robert Cruzen ("Cruzen Decl."), Ex. A.) Pursuant to the parties’ agreement, initial disclosures were served on June 5, 2017, but no discovery requests or responses have been served, and no depositions have occurred. A scheduling order has not been issued. B. Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs’ Past Patent Suits Plaintiffs’ complaint alleges Hugh Jarratt is an Arkansas resident residing in Fayetteville, Arkansas and that Jarratt Industries, LLC has a principal place of business in Fayetteville, Arkan-sas. (See, e.g., D.I. 1, ¶¶ 1, 2.) Plaintiffs’ initial disclosures identify plaintiff Hugh Jarratt as the sole witness with relevant knowledge regarding this case. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. B at pp. 1-2.) Plain-tiffs list their counsel’s Jonesboro address in the Eastern District of Arkansas for Mr. Jarratt. Plaintiffs have previously sued parties for patent infringement in the Eastern District of Texas, despite not being located there. Specifically, on December 18, 2014, plaintiffs filed suit in the Eastern District of Texas against Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co. and Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., alleging infringement of the same patent at issue in this case. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. C (Com-plaint).) None of the defendants sued in that case was a Texas company. (Id., at ¶¶ III and IV (identifying Illinois and New Jersey as principal places of business and Illinois and New York as states of incorporation).) Plaintiffs litigated that action for a nearly a year in the Eastern District of Texas until it was dismissed on November 10, 2015. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. D (Dismissal Order).) BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 3 C. Plaintiffs’ Documents are Located Out of District Plaintiffs’ initial disclosures list only two categories of documents as relevant to this case: the exhibits attached to the Complaint and documents produced by the defendants in the future. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. B at p. 2.) The documents identified "are being compiled and will be located at the offices of the Jarratts’ attorney" in Jonesboro, Arkansas. Id. As the Court is aware, Jones-boro lies within Craighead County and outside of this district. As noted above, pursuant to the Court’s order adopting the Northern District of California Local Patent Rules, plaintiffs served infringement contentions on May 26, 2017. N.D. Cal. Local Patent Rule 3-2 required plaintiffs to produce or make available for inspection all documents fall-ing into the following patent case-relevant categories:  "(a) Documents (e.g., contracts, purchase orders, invoices, advertisements, mar-keting materials, offer letters, beta site testing agreements, and third party or joint development agreements) sufficient to evidence" each disclosure of the claimed invention prior to the date of application for the patent in suit;  "(b) All documents evidencing the conception, reduction to practice, design, and development of each claimed invention;  "(c) A copy of the file history for each patent in suit;  "(d) All documents evidencing ownership of the patent rights by the party asserting patent infringement;  "(e) If a party identifies instrumentalities pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-1(g) [i.e. if the plaintiff contends it produces products that practice its own patent], documents suf-ficient to show the operation of any aspects or elements of such instrumentalities the patent claimant relies upon as embodying any asserted claims;  "(f) All agreements, including licenses, transferring an interest in any patent-in-suit;  "(g) All agreements that the party asserting infringement contends are comparable to a license that would result from a hypothetical reasonable royalty negotiation;  "(h) All agreements that otherwise may be used to support the party asserting in-fringement’s damages case;  "(i) If a party identifies instrumentalities pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-1(g), documents sufficient to show marking of such embodying accused instrumentalities and if it wants to preserve the right to recover lost profits based on such products, sales, revenues, costs and profits of such embodying accused instrumentalities; and  "(j) All documents comprising or reflecting a F/RAND commitment or agreement with respect to the asserted patent(s)." BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 4 N.D. Cal. Local Patent Rule 3-2. In response to these specific disclosure obligations, plaintiffs informed Amazon that the documents falling into these enumerated categories constituted a total of 65 pages (labeled D00001-D00065), were located in Jonesboro, Arkansas, and could be inspected there. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. A (Infringement Contentions) at Production, pp. 9-14.)1 The rules required plaintiffs to produce or make available for inspection the majority of documents relevant to a patent plaintiff’s case, including damages-related documents (such as sales, revenues and cost information, and information regarding all past relevant agreements bear-ing on damages issues), documents evidencing plaintiffs’ ownership of the patent, and documents establishing that plaintiffs’ products practice their patent. It is unlikely that any other documents relevant to plaintiffs’ patent claims exist in any volume. Amazon is aware of none. And plaintiffs have identified none in their initial disclosures, as noted above. D. Amazon, its Witnesses, and its Evidence Are Located in the Western District of Washington. The'187 patent is titled "Divided Plate for Separating Food." In its case against Amazon, plaintiffs accuse Amazon of hosting CT Discount’s offers of infringing taco plates through the www.amazon.com website. (D.I. 1-4 (exhibit listing for plates "sold by CT Discount Store" on www.amazon.com).; see Cruzen Decl., Ex A (Infringement Contentions), Disclosure at pp. 4-5.) Amazon’s corporate headquarters are in Seattle, Washington. Amazon witnesses with knowledge regarding plaintiffs’ allegations are located in Seattle Washington. (Declaration of Gianmarco Vairo ("Vairo Decl."), ¶¶ 5-11.) For example, witnesses knowledgeable about how 1 Counsel for Amazon had already obtained the file history for the design patent in suit by utilizing the Patent and Trademark Office’s online document system (known as Public PAIR). The file history is 65 pages long, so it is likely that plaintiffs have identified nothing more than publicly available documents. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 5 product listings are created, how Amazon interacts with the third party sellers whose taco plate listings are at issue in this case, Amazon’s agreements with such sellers, Amazon’s lack of pre-suit notice from plaintiffs in this case, Amazon’s prompt efforts to remove the accused listings once it learned of this suit, and Amazon’s profits (if any) from sales are also in Seattle. Id. Alt-hough Amazon’s investigation is just beginning, specific witnesses located in Washington State include at least the following individuals: —Ananth Kuchimanchi. (Vairo Decl. ¶¶ 7-8 (how the content of listings is uploaded and appears on the www.amazon.com website, Amazon’s dealings with specific third parties accused of selling infringing products in this case, and Amazon’s relationship with third party sellers).) —Adrian Garver. (Id., ¶ 9 (knowledgeable regarding Amazon’s lack of pre-suit notice from plaintiffs regarding the alleged infringement of any of their intellectual property rights).) —Gianmarco Vairo. (Id., ¶ 10 (knowledgeable regarding Amazon’s efforts to remove ac-cused listings promptly after this suit was filed).) —Brittany LaRiviere. (Id., ¶ 11 (knowledgeable regarding sales data for the accused prod-ucts, and Amazon’s profits, if any, derived from sales of the accused products).) Documents and electronically stored information relating to sales of the accused products are located in Seattle, Washington. (Id., ¶ 12.) Sales and marketing documents and electronically stored information relevant to the accused products (to the extent Amazon possesses them) are also located in Seattle, Washington. (Id.) Information and documents pertaining to Amazon’s agreements with third party sellers, including those who sold accused products, are located in Se-attle, Washington. (Id.) An important defense in this case is that (1) Amazon had no pre-suit knowledge of the patent asserted here, or of plaintiffs’ allegations of infringement, or plaintiffs’ claims that third BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 6 party listings posted on the Amazon website contained misleading advertising claims and (2) when it learned of the filing of this case, Amazon promptly removed the accused listings. Milo & Gabby, LLC v. Amazon.com, 144 F. Supp. 3d 1251, 1252 (W.D. Wash. 2015) (considering Amazon’s liability for third party listings and concluding that "Amazon did not'offer to sell’ the alleged infringing products and therefore is not liable to Plaintiffs for patent infringement"), aff’d sub nom. Milo & Gabby LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc., No. 2016-1290, 2017 WL 2258605 (Fed. Cir. May 23, 2017). The employees with knowledge of these facts live and work in the Western District of Washington. (Vairo Decl., ¶¶ 9-10.) Documents substantiating Amazon’s defense are likewise located in the Western District of Washington. (Id., ¶ 12.) Finally, Amazon has no facilities in this district: no warehouses, datacenters, brick and mortar stores, or other place of business of any kind. (Id., ¶ 6.) E. Plaintiffs Have Resolved Their Dispute with CT Discount. Plaintiffs resolved their dispute in principal with CT Discount more than a month ago. Amazon’s counsel was informed by plaintiffs’ counsel prior to the Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26(f) con-ference that CT Discount’s counsel would not be participating in that conference because plaintiffs and CT Discount had settled. (Cruzen Decl. ¶ 14; see D.I. 40.) Accordingly, CT Discount did not participate in plaintiffs’ and Amazon’s Joint 26(f) Report to the Court. (D.I. 37). Consequently, the location of CT Discount and its party witnesses is irrelevant to this motion. F. Third-Party Witnesses are Located On the West Coast and in China. While Amazon’s investigations have just begun, the existence of west coast witnesses who likely will have knowledge and documents relevant to this action have been identified. Those witnesses include prior art inventors of taco plates that Amazon will use at trial to demonstrate that Jarratt’s patent is invalid. For example, Bette E. Smith is the named inventor on U.S. Patent No. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 7 D363,413, entitled "Taco Plate for Two Tacos", which issued more than twelve years earlier than the patent-in-suit, and which depicts the following invention: (Cruzen Decl., Ex. E.) The face of that patent lists Ms. Smith’s residence as West Hills, California, a suburb of Los Angeles. Id. Several nonstop flights from Los Angeles to Seattle are scheduled daily and last just over two-and-a-half hours. (Cruzen Decl., ¶ 8 & Ex. F.) Direct flights from Los Angeles to Fayetteville are far less frequent and longer. (Cruzen Decl., ¶ 9 & Ex. G.) Plaintiffs contend that the ultimate manufacturers of the taco plates accused of infringe-ment are located in China. Plaintiffs have not identified those manufacturers to Amazon and Am-azon does not otherwise know the identity of such manufacturers. But discovery concerning those manufacturers is likely based on plaintiffs’ allegations. (See D.I. 1, ¶ 39 ("The infringing plates sold by Defendants were actually made in China....")) Seattle is a far more convenient location for Chinese witnesses than is Fayetteville. (Cruzen Decl., ¶¶ 10-13 & Exs. H-K) Amazon is aware of no relevant third party witnesses located in this district, and plaintiffs have identified none. Amazon is aware of no relevant third party documents or other evidence located in this district and plaintiffs have identified none. To summarize, while a single witness (Mr. Jarratt) resides in this district, plaintiffs docu-ments are elsewhere, Amazon’s witnesses and evidence are located in the Western District of BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 8 Washington, and third party witnesses and evidence are located closer to the Western District of Washington than they are to this district. Finally, the alleged facts on which plaintiffs base their claims against Amazon occurred within the Western District of Washington. III. THE COURT SHOULD TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. The statutory provision governing a motion to transfer to a more convenient forum, 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), states: "For the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought…." Here, there can be no doubt that this action could have been brought against Amazon in its home forum, the Western District of Washington. (See Part III(A), infra.) Under Eighth Circuit law, a district court should consider the "convenience" prong and the "interests of justice" prong of Section 1404(a) when deciding a motion to transfer venue. Addi-tionally, the Court may consider other case-specific factors it finds relevant. Terra Int’l, Inc. v. Mississippi Chem. Corp., 119 F.3d 688, 696 (8th Cir. 1997). Factors properly considered under the "convenience" prong include (1) the convenience of the parties, (2) the convenience of the witnesses, (3) accessibility of records and documents, (4) the location where the conduct com-plained of occurred, and (5) the applicability of each state’s forum law. Id. at 696. As discussed in Part III(B) below, every one of these "convenience" factors favor transfer or is neutral: the Western District of Washington is at least as convenient for the parties; it is more convenient for witnesses; all relevant Amazon documents are located in the Western District of Washington, whereas plaintiffs have identified documents located exclusively outside of this dis-trict; the complained-of conduct occurred primarily in the Western District of Washington; and both districts are equally capable of applying the (primarily federal) laws at issue in this case. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 9 Factors considered under the "interest of justice" prong include (1) judicial economy, (2) the plaintiff’s choice of forum, (3) the costs to the parties of litigating in each forum, (4) each party’s ability to enforce a judgment, (5) obstacles to a fair trial, (6) conflict of law issues, and (7) the advantages of having a local court determine local questions. See Terra Int’l, 119 F.3d at 696. Here, plaintiffs have forum-shopped their patent claims in the past and the Amazon conduct of which they complain allegedly occurred in the Western District of Washington. Therefore, no deference should be given to plaintiffs’ choice of this forum. Judicial economy and the compara-tive costs of litigating as between the two venues both favor transfer. The parties’ ability to enforce judgments, obstacles to a fair trial and conflict of law issues should be given little weight, as no appreciable difference exists as to the two districts with regard to each of these factors. And the final factor weighs heavily in favor of transfer: the Western District of Washington has a strong local interest in adjudicating accusations that a local business and local residents engaged in alleg-edly wrongful conduct. Consequently, the interest of justice factors also weigh in favor of trans-ferring this case to the Western District of Washington. (See Part III(C), infra.) Because this case could have been brought in the Western District of Washington, and that district is clearly more convenient, this action should be transferred. A. The Western District of Washington has Jurisdiction Over Amazon, and Venue Would Have Been Proper in that District. Amazon is headquartered in Seattle, Washington, and this case could originally have been filed against it in the Western District of Washington. (Vairo Decl., ¶¶ 5, 7.) General personal jurisdiction exists over a corporate entity where it has continuous and systematic contacts with a forum (Helicopteros Nacionales de Colombia, S.A. v. Hall, 466 U.S. 408, 416-18 (1984)), and venue in patent cases is also proper where a corporate defendant has a "regular and established place of business" and is alleged to have committed acts of infringement pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 10 1400. Here, Amazon has a regular and established place of business in Seattle, Washington, and is alleged to have committed acts of infringement there. Therefore, suit could have been filed in the transferee forum. See, e.g., In re Horseshoe Entm’t, 337 F.3d 429, 433 (5th Cir. 2003). B. The Factors Considered Under the "Convenience" Prong Favor Transfer to the Western District of Washington. 1. The Western District of Washington Would be at Least as Convenient as this District for the Parties. The Western District of Washington would be far more convenient for Amazon, because it is headquartered there and all of its relevant witnesses and evidence are located there (as dis-cussed in greater detail below). As noted, plaintiffs represented that they settled with co-defendant CT Discount, who did not participate in the parties’ 26(f) conference or their report to the Court for that reason, so its location is irrelevant. (Cruzen Decl., ¶ 14.) This district may be more con-venient for plaintiffs, but plaintiffs have been happy to litigate their patent cases in other jurisdic-tions when that suited them, and have identified only a single party witness, as discussed in greater detail below. This factor either favors transfer to the Western District of Washington or is neutral. 2. The Western District of Washington Would be More Convenient for Witnesses. The second factor under the "convenience" prong is the convenience of the witnesses, which this Court has held to be the most important factor in the transfer analysis. Crabb v. Go-Daddy.com, Inc., No. 07-CV-4040, 2010 WL 5890625, at *2 (W.D. Ark. Mar. 29, 2010) (stating that "the Court will consider the convenience of the witnesses which is the'most important factor in passing on a motion to transfer under § 1404(a)’" (quoting Am. Standard, Inc. v. Bendix Corp., 487 F. Supp. 254, 262 (W.D. Mo. 1980)); cf. In re Genentech, Inc., 566 F.3d 1338, 1343 (Fed. Cir. 2009) (finding the cost of attendance for and convenience of the witnesses "is probably the single BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 11 most important factor in transfer analysis"); In re TS Tech USA Corp., 551 F.3d 1315, 1320 (Fed. Cir. 2008) (finding "clear error" in the failure to consider 900 miles of travel for trial witnesses). In Crabb, this Court found that the location where the complained-of conduct at issue in the case (allegedly unauthorized website advertising) occurred was the critical question in deciding the most convenient location for relevant witnesses: With respect to this factor, the Court finds that the conduct at issue in the case took place in Arizona, thus, the majority of the witnesses are located in that state….This is especially true in light of the fact that Plaintiffs’ allegations focus on GoDaddy’s conduct in Arizona, not on the behavior of potential class members in Arkansas. Thus, it will be more convenient for the majority of the witnesses involved in the case to have it transferred to Arizona. Thus, this factor weighs in favor of transfer. Crabb, 2010 WL 5890625, at *2; see Miller v. Christus St. Michael Health Sys., No. 4:16-CV-4077, 2017 WL 2266887, at *3 (W.D. Ark. May 23, 2017) ("In evaluating the convenience of the witnesses, the Court finds that the conduct at issue in this case…took place in Texas [and] [t]hus, it will be more convenient for the majority of the witnesses involved in the case…to have the case transferred to Texas."). Similarly, here the allegations in plaintiffs’ complaint and in their infringement contentions focus on Amazon’s conduct, which primarily occurred (if at all) in the Western District of Wash-ington. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. A (Infringement Contentions); Vairo Decl., ¶¶ 7-11.) The core of plaintiffs’ contentions are: "Defendant Amazon offers for sell [sic], sells, and exposes for sell [sic] the infringing taco plates. Amazon offers the infringing products through its website, sells the infringing products through its website, completes the sales transaction, collects the purchase money, stores the infringing goods, packages the infringing goods, ships the infringing goods to its customers, disburses the collected money to CT Discount Store, and profits from the sale and fulfillment." (See Cruzen Decl., Ex A (Infringement Contentions), Disclosure at pp. 4-5.) BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 12 None of this conduct occurred in this district. Instead, it occurred, if at all, primarily in the Western District of Washington, where Amazon is headquartered and where its knowledgeable witnesses are overwhelmingly likely to reside. (Vairo Decl., ¶¶ 7-11.) For example, Amazon employees with general knowledge regarding how listings are posted to the www.amazon.com website are located in Seattle, Washington. (Id., ¶ 7.) Amazon employees with knowledge of Amazon’s relationship with third party sellers, including any relationship Amazon had with spe-cific third party sellers of products that plaintiffs contend practice the asserted patent, are similarly in Seattle, Washington. (Id., ¶ 8.) And Amazon employees with knowledge regarding any relevant financial data, including any Amazon profits that resulted from the sale and fulfillment of accused products, are similarly located in Seattle, Washington. (Id., ¶ 11.) Amazon has no facilities at all in the Western District of Arkansas, and is unaware of any Amazon witnesses there. (Id., ¶ 6.) In contrast, plaintiffs have identified a single witness, the plaintiff Hugh Jarratt himself, residing in this district. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. B.) Finally, in terms of third party witnesses, plaintiffs have not identified, and Amazon is not aware of, any likely witnesses who reside in the Western District of Arkansas. But Amazon has identified an inventor of a prior art design patent for taco plates, who is listed as residing in Cali-fornia. (Supra Section II.D.) (See also Cruzen Decl., ¶ 7 & Ex. E.) The Western District of Washington would be more convenient for witnesses residing in California. (Id., ¶¶ 8-9 & Exs. F-G.) And to the extent that plaintiffs intend to prove that Amazon sold accused taco plates it ob-tained from Chinese manufacturers, the Western District of Washington would be more convenient for those third party manufacturers and their employees. Non-stop flights exist between Seattle and major Chinese cities, including Beijing and Shanghai. (Cruzen Decl., ¶¶ 10; 12 & Exs. H; J.) Direct flights between these major Chinese cities and Fayetteville do not appear to exist, and it is BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 13 farther from those cities in any case. (Id., ¶¶ 11; 13 & Exs. I; K.) Accordingly, the burden on witnesses (party and non-party) would be less if the case were transferred to the Western District of Washington. Requiring Amazon’s many witnesses to travel to Fayetteville for trial would greatly inconvenience them, and the same is true of third party wit-nesses. Requiring a single individual, the plaintiff in this action—who has previously elected to sue on his patent in a district away from home—to travel to Seattle for trial would present far less inconvenience to the other witnesses collectively. This factor weighs heavily in favor of transfer. 3. The Documents and Other Evidence Most Relevant to this Action are Located in the Western District of Washington and Amazon is Aware of No Relevant Evidence or Documents in this District. The majority of relevant party evidence is located in the Western District of Washington. "In patent infringement cases, the bulk of the relevant evidence usually comes from the accused infringer. Consequently, the place where the defendant’s documents are kept weighs in favor of transfer to that location." In re Genentech, 566 F.3d at 1345 (citation omitted); see also Crabb, 2010 WL 5890625, at *3 ("Thus, because all the documents relating to GoDaddy’s alleged wrong-ful conduct are located in Arizona, this factor weighs in favor of transfer.") Amazon’s documents and electronically stored information are located in Seattle, Wash-ington. (Supra Section II.C; Vairo Decl., ¶12.) All of this evidence is located in the Western District of Washington. No relevant Amazon document or other evidence is located in this district. In contrast, all of the relevant documents plaintiffs have identified to date are located out-side of this district. Specifically, plaintiffs’ infringement disclosures reference numerous catego-ries of documents pertaining to the patent-in-suit and documents supporting their damages theo-ries, including alleged evidence that they marked their own products with the patent number and documents evidencing their own sales and profits. Plaintiffs have indicated these documents BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 14 (which amount to a total of only 65 pages) are located in the Eastern District of Arkansas, in Jonesboro.2 (Cruzen Decl., Ex. A. (Infringement Contentions, Production Document) at pp. 9-14.) The only other documents identified in plaintiffs’ initial disclosures are exhibits to the Complaint, which are also listed as being located in the Eastern District. (Cruzen Decl., Ex. B at p. 2.) Consequently, no party has identified even one document or other piece of relevant evi-dence located in this district. The vast majority of all relevant evidence and documents are located in the Western District of Washington and this factor weighs heavily in favor of transfer. 4. The Conduct Complained of in this Action Allegedly Occurred in the Western District of Washington. The alleged basis of this suit is described in plaintiffs’ contentions as follows: Defendant Amazon offers for sell [sic], sells, and exposes for sell [sic] the infringing taco plates. Amazon offers the infringing prod-ucts through its website, sells the infringing products through its website, completes the sales transaction, collects the purchase money, stores the infringing goods, packages the infringing goods, ships the infringing goods to its customers, disburses the collected money to CT Discount Store, and profits from the sale and fulfill-ment. (See Cruzen Decl., Ex A (Infringement Contentions), Disclosure at pp. 4-5.) None of that alleged conduct occurred in this district. Instead, it occurred, if at all, primarily in the Western District of Washington, where Amazon is located and coordinates the operations of its retail website. (Vairo Decl., ¶¶ 7-11.) 2 Courts within the Eighth Circuit have noted that a patent plaintiff’s relevant documents, such as patent prosecution records, can be obtained from the United States Patent Office, and their locations "therefore do not factor into the Court’s analysis." Biometics, LLC v. New Womyn, Inc., 112 F. Supp. 2d 869, 876 (E.D. Mo. 2000). BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 15 In analogous settings, courts within this circuit have found that the facts weigh heavily in favor of transfer. For example, in Biometics, 112 F. Supp. at 876, the Court held that patent in-fringement allegations targeting products purchased from a nationwide retailer and its website were directed at conduct occurring in the seller’s home jurisdiction: The location where the conduct occurred in this case is primarily in Illinois, and weighs in favor of transfer. Defendants’ contacts with Missouri, while adequate to permit the exercise of personal jurisdic-tion, are minimal as they consist only of three sales of the accused product and the existence of the web site, which is viewable in every state. In contrast, defendants’ research, development, manufacture, marketing, sale and distribution of the accused product all take place in Illinois. Because the defendants’ allegedly infringing activities have occurred primarily in Illinois, it is more convenient and practi-cal for the case to be tried in that forum where the defendants have a regular place of business, to facilitate the production of books, rec-ords and data necessary to discovery and trial of a patent case. Biometics, 112 F. Supp. at 876. Similarly, this Court held that allegedly wrongful advertising created by GoDaddy in Ari-zona but reaching consumers nationwide (including in this district) comprised conduct that oc-curred in Arizona, and this factor favored transfer. Crabb, 2010 WL 5890625, at *3; see In re Apple, Inc., 602 F.3d 909, 914 (8th Cir. 2010) (holding that "if Apple did carry out a plan to harm Luxpro’s business interests,'alleged wrongs’ occurred in Northern California, while none of the alleged misconduct occurred in Western Arkansas [and] [t]his weighs in favor of transfer."). Because the complained-of conduct occurred in the Western District of Washington, and none of that conduct occurred in this district, this factor weighs heavily in favor of transfer. 5. This District and the Western District of Washington are Equally Capable of Applying the Laws at Issue in this Case. Plaintiffs assert that the defendants have infringed their design patent. Plaintiffs also con-tend that Amazon has violated the Lanham Act, engaged in common law tortious interference with BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 16 their business advantage, and violated one state statute, the Deceptive Business Practices Act. The Western District of Washington is more than capable of adjudicating all of these claims. First, the Western District of Washington, routinely adjudicates intellectual property issues such as those implicated by the plaintiffs’ patent and federal trademark claims. In 2016, 121 in-tellectual property actions were filed in the Western District of Washington in 2016.3 Second, to the extent that plaintiffs’ sole statutory claim under the Deceptive Trade Prac-tices Act implicates Arkansas state law, the Western District of Washington is capable of applying that statute. Similar claims are already familiar to the Western District of Washington: Washing-ton State has its own similar statutory regime that declares "unfair and deceptive acts or practices in the conduct of any trade or commerce" unlawful. See Revised Code of Washington 19.86.020. And this Court has held that the need to apply laws of other states imposes no special burdens on a district court, so the prospect that a court may have to do so is neutral in the analysis: "However, federal courts routinely apply and interpret laws of other states. Thus, the Court finds this factor to be neutral." Crabb, 2010 WL 5890625, at *3, citation omitted. Because both districts are capable of applying the laws that plaintiffs’ claims implicate, this factor is neutral. C. The Factors Considered Under the Interest of Justice Prong Favor Transfer to the Western District of Washington or are Neutral. Factors considered under the "interest of justice" prong include (1) judicial economy, (2) the plaintiff’s choice of forum, (3) the comparative costs to the parties of litigating in each forum, (4) each party’s ability to enforce a judgment, (5) obstacles to a fair trial, (6) conflict of law issues, and (7) the advantages of having a local court determine local questions of law. See Terra Int’l, 3 See http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/data_tables/fcms_na_distpro-file1231.2016.pdf, civil case category "I". By way of comparison, nine such cases were filed in this district during the same period. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 17 119 F.3d at 696. The judicial economy, costs of litigation, and local interest factors favor transfer. Plaintiffs’ choice of forum should be given no weight. The remaining factors are neutral. There-fore, the "interest of justice" factors on balance weigh in favor of transfer. 1. Judicial Economy Favors Transfer Judicial economy favors transfer. This Court has held that judicial economy is fostered when a case is litigated in the forum that encompasses "the locus of operative facts": Judicial economy also favors transfer. As a practical matter, "the administration of justice is served more efficiently when the action is litigated in the forum that more clearly encompasses the locus of operative facts." Thorton Drilling Co. v. Stephens Production Co., No. 4:06–cv–00851, 2006 WL 2583659, at *4 (E.D. Ark. Sept. 6, 2006). Here, the operative facts, particularly those surrounding Mi-crosoft’s manufacture and distribution of the alleged infringing products, occurred in Washington. Therefore, it is reasonable to con-clude that this dispute will be litigated more efficiently there. Beijing Zhongyi Zhongbiao Elec. Info. Tech. v. Microsoft Corp., No. 4:12-CV-4077, 2013 WL 3808009, at *5 (W.D. Ark. July 22, 2013). This Court reached the same conclusion in Miller because the operative facts at issue occurred in Texas. Miller, 2017 WL 2266887, at *4 (finding that judicial economy favored transfer where the operative facts occurred in the transferee district). Here, plaintiffs’ contentions are directed at Amazon’s conduct occurring in the Western District of Washington. Plaintiffs’ contentions primarily target Amazon’s supposed acts in Seattle, Washington, including allegedly listing infringing products for sale, falsely describing them using plaintiffs’ trademarks in drafting product listings, collecting funds, distributing to third parties portions of those funds, and retaining the remainder as Amazon’s own profit. Amazon is not accused of committing one act in this district, except to the extent its website reaches consumers located in every state nationwide and it ships products to citizens of every other state. This stands to reason: Amazon has no facilities whatsoever in the Western District of Arkansas. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 18 And judicial economy will not be negatively affected by transfer. A final schedule has not yet been set in this case, and no discovery beyond plaintiff’s initial infringement contentions and the parties’ initial disclosures has been served (and those disclosures and contentions are equally useable in the Western District of Washington, which also has local patent rules and requires the service of infringement contentions). Transfer at this stage would foster judicial economy by mov-ing this action to a far more convenient forum before discovery begins. See, e.g., GeoTag, Inc. v. Starbucks Corp., No. 2:10-CV-572, 2013 WL 890484, at *6 (E.D. Tex. Jan. 14, 2013). Finally, this case is likely to proceed to trial or be disposed more quickly in the Western District of Washington than it would be in this district. According to the statistics published on the www.uscourts.gov website, the median time from filing to trial for civil actions was 23.9 months in this district for the last reported period (December 2015). (See http://www.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/data_tables/fcms_na_distprofile1231.2016.pdf.) The median time from filing to disposition was 11.9 months for this district (December 2016). (Id.) By comparison, the median time to trial within the Western District of Washington was 18.1 months (December 2015) and the median time from filing to disposition was 6.5 months (December 2016). (Id.) On balance, the judicial economy factor favors transfer of this action. 2. The Court Should Not Give Deference to Plaintiffs’ Choice of Venue. The plaintiff’s choice of forum is given some deference in the form of shifting the burden of persuasion to the movant seeking transfer. Terra Int’l, 119 F.3d at 695. But the Court should not give deference to plaintiffs’ choice of forum here for at least two reasons. First, the events complained of in this case occurred primarily within the Western District of Washington, as noted above. This Court has held that a plaintiffs’ choice of venue is entitled to less deference under these circumstances: BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 19 However, this choice is given less deference when the transaction or underlying facts did not occur in the plaintiff’s chosen forum. In this case, Plaintiff chose the Western District of Arkansas as her fo-rum, but as discussed above, the conduct at issue took place at CHRISTUS St. Michael Hospital in Texarkana, Texas, within the Eastern District of Texas. This requires the Court to provide less deference to Plaintiff’s choice of forum. Miller, 2017 WL 2266887, at *4. Second, plaintiffs’ choice of venue should not be given deference in light of their past forum shopping. Plaintiffs filed their last case for patent infringement in the Eastern District of Texas. Plaintiffs litigated that action for nearly a year, despite the fact that no defendant named in that litigation had any connection to Texas. (Cruzen Decl. Ex. C & D.) Plaintiffs have now opted to proceed in this district for their suit against Amazon, which similarly has no connection to this district. But plaintiffs’ willingness to test the waters by filing patent suits in various districts should not be rewarded, and its choice of venue should be given no weight in the transfer analysis. In the event the Court disagrees, then the only deference owed to plaintiff’s choice of venue is to place the burden of persuasion on Amazon. Because the other factors weigh strongly in favor of transfer or are neutral, Amazon has met that burden. 3. The Comparative Costs to the Parties of Litigating in Each Forum Favors Transfer. The comparative costs to the parties of litigating in each forum strongly favors transfer. Other than one person (plaintiff Hugh Jarratt), Amazon is aware of no witness located within this district whose testimony is remotely relevant to the claims at issue in this case. Even as to plaintiff, his testimony is irrelevant to the core liability issues in dispute, such as: whether Amazon know-ingly infringed plaintiffs’ design patent or Amazon knowingly used plaintiffs’ trademarks. Fur-thermore, plaintiffs have identified no evidence within this district; all of the evidence plaintiffs have identified is located elsewhere. (See Cruzen Decl., Ex. A at Production, pp. 1-6, & B at 2.) BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 20 Plaintiffs were required to identify any relevant evidence on which they intend to rely, including all documents relevant to their contention that they are entitled to lost sales as a result of the alleged infringement here (including any information pertaining to plaintiffs’ own sales or profits related to their own products that allegedly practice the patent-in-suit), and all evidence of past agreements pertaining to damages. Plaintiffs identified a total of 65 pages of documents located outside of this district. (Id., Ex. A at Production, pp. 9-14.) In contrast, Amazon has identified four specific witnesses who live and work in the West-ern District of Washington. (Vairo Decl., ¶¶ 7-11) If this case proceeds to trial in this district, Amazon will be forced to incur the cost of transporting all of these witnesses to this district, and all of these witnesses will be away from work during trial. Furthermore, all of the evidence from Amazon’s headquarters in Seattle would need to be transported to this district for trial. All of this would substantially increase the cost of litigating this suit. By comparison, if this action is trans-ferred, plaintiffs need transport a single witness and 65 pages to Seattle, Washington. For similar reasons, this Court found in the Crabb case that the relative costs of trial favored transfer to the district where the defendant was headquartered: With regard to the comparative costs to the parties, GoDaddy argues that if the case is not transferred to Arizona, virtually all the wit-nesses in the case will be required to travel to Arkansas for trial. Thus, it will be substantially more expensive for GoDaddy to try this case in Arkansas, than it would for the two Plaintiffs to travel to Arizona. The Court agrees and finds that this factor weighs in favor of transfer. Crabb, 2010 WL 5890625, at *4. This factor weighs in favor of transfer in this case. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 21 4. Interest of Justice Factors 4 (Ability to Enforce a Judgment), 5 (Obstacles to Fair Trial), and 6 (Conflict of Law Issues), are Neutral. Amazon is not aware of any difference between this district and the Western District of Washington with regard to each party’s ability to enforce a judgment, obstacles to a fair trial, or conflict of law issues. 5. The Western District of Washington Has a Strong Local Interest in Deciding this Case and Questions of Federal Law Predominate. Here, Amazon’s allegedly wrongful conduct occurred in the Western District of Washing-ton. That district therefore possesses a unique, particularized local interest in passing judgment on the conduct of Western District of Washington residents and a local business within its boundaries. Plaintiffs contend (1) that Amazon knowingly infringed their design patent by listing prod-ucts on its website in Seattle, Washington, completing sales of those products in Seattle, Washing-ton, and collecting profits from such sales in Seattle, Washington, and (2) that Amazon employees (located in Seattle, Washington) intentionally misled consumers nationwide. (D.I. 1.) Amazon denies these allegations. But regardless of the falsity of the allegations, the West-ern District of Washington possesses a far greater interest in evaluating that alleged conduct than does this district. Amazon’s alleged conduct, and the supposed actions of its employees, were directed at this district to no greater degree than any other district within the United States. Thus, if Amazon actually had knowingly listed the accused products on its website with the intent to deceive consumers, those actions would be aimed at consumers with access to Amazon’s website, no matter where they lived. But those alleged acts primarily occurred, if anywhere, at Amazon’s headquarters in Seattle, Washington, and Amazon is alleged to have committed no acts whatsoever within this district that are at issue in this case. BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 22 As in the Miller case, the transferee district (here the Western District of Washington) therefore has a far greater interest in adjudicating allegations that a local business engaged in wrongful conduct within the transferee district, than does this Court in adjudicating that question. Miller, 2017 WL 2266887, at *4 (holding the "State of Texas certainly has more of an interest in regulating and/or remedying alleged negligent medical care provided by a Texas hospital located in Texas."); see also In re Hoffman-La Roche Inc., 587 F.3d 1333, 1336 (Fed. Cir. 2009) (finding a strong local interest where a case "calls into question the work and reputation of several individ-uals residing in or near that district"). This is particularly the case where the court presiding over this action will be applying claims predominately couched in federal law to facts alleged to have occurred in Seattle, Wash-ington: plaintiffs here assert patent infringement and Lanham Act claims. Nor do plaintiffs’ sec-ondary claims alter the calculus, as courts applying 8th Circuit law have concluded. "[B]ecause plaintiffs’ primary claims arise under federal law, the court is to give minimal weight to the local interest in considering plaintiffs’ supplemental state and common law claims." Sissel v. Klimley, No. 3:08-CV-00062-JAJ, 2009 WL 700186, at *6 (S.D. Iowa Mar. 16, 2009). Given the Western District of Washington’s strong local interest in deciding issues affect-ing the reputations of a local company and residents of that district, this factor favors transfer. D. On Balance, those Factors Properly Considered Weigh Heavily in Favor of Transferring this Case to the Western District of Washington. In sum, with regard to the "convenience" prong of the transfer test, the convenience of the witnesses, the location of evidence, and the location where the complained-of conduct occurred all weigh heavily in favor of transfer. The convenience of the parties and the two courts’ respective abilities to apply the law at issue in this case are at worst neutral. The Court should not give deference to plaintiffs’ choice of venue given that the facts at issue occurred in the Western District BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 23 of Washington, and given plaintiffs’ history of forum-shopping. As to the remaining "interest of justice" prong of the transfer analysis, judicial economy, the relative cost of litigating in the two districts, and the Western District of Washington’s strong local interest in adjudicating predomi-nately federal law claims directed at the conduct of local residents and a local business all weigh in favor of transfer, and the remaining factors are neutral. Therefore, and on balance, the factors weigh strongly in favor of transferring this action to the Western District of Washington. IV. ALTERNATIVELY, THE COURT SHOULD DISMISS THIS CASE FOR IMPROPER VENUE IN LIGHT OF THE SUPREME COURT’S OPINION IN T.C. HEARTLAND. The Court should alternatively dismiss this action because venue is improper under 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b). As noted in the Court’s Show Cause Order (D.I. 38), the Supreme Court recently reversed existing Federal Circuit authority in patent cases and held that, "[a]s applied to domestic corporations,'reside[nce]’ in § 1400(b) refers only to the State of incorporation." TC Heartland LLC, 2017 WL 2216934, at *8. In light of this new case law, venue is improper in this district for plaintiffs’ claims against Amazon. Amazon is incorporated in Delaware and headquar-tered in Seattle, Washington. (Vairo Decl. ¶¶ 4-5, 7.) Amazon has no regular and established place of business in this district that could satisfy Section 1400(b). (Id., ¶ 6.) In Amazon’s answer filed April 14, 2017, before the Supreme Court’s TC Heartland deci-sion, Amazon noted that plaintiffs’ reliance on 28 U.S.C. § 1391 to establish venue was misplaced: "Amazon denies that 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b) applies to patent infringement actions. Section 1400(b) is the sole and exclusive provision that governs venue in patent infringement cases." (D.I. 32, ¶ 6.) The Court noted in the Show Cause Order (D.I. 38) that Amazon stated that it did not intend to contest venue for purposes of this action under then-existing law. But that was because a venue objection at that time would have been rejected under the Federal Circuit’s opinion in TC Heart-land. Consequently, Amazon respectfully requests that the Court consider Amazon’s objection to BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 24 venue on the grounds that it is improper under 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b) in light of the Supreme Court’s recent decision in TC Heartland. See, e.g., Holzsager v. Valley Hospital, 646 F.2d 792, 796 (2nd Cir. 1981) (holding that requiring "clairvoyance" in predicting new case law was inconsistent with doctrine of waiver, and therefore considering personal jurisdiction defense raised only after inter-vening Supreme Court decision); Engel v. CBS, Inc., 886 F. Supp. 728, 730 (C.D. Cal. 1995) (con-sidering venue objection in light of intervening change in law because "Defendants cannot be faulted for not having raised a defense that they did not know was available to them"). Given that this case is in its infancy, plaintiffs can demonstrate no prejudice from dismissal of this action— or transfer to the Western District of Washington—for improper venue. V. CONCLUSION For all the foregoing reasons, Amazon respectfully moves the Court to transfer the case to the Western District of Washington. Alternatively, Amazon respectfully requests that the Court entertain Amazon’s improper venue objection, and that this case be dismissed on the grounds that venue is improper under 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b). BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 25 Respectfully submitted, June 13, 2017/s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compli-ance with Local Rule CV-5.2 on this 13th day of June, 2017./s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan BRIEF ISO MOT. TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOT. TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE-Page 26

Vairo Declaration

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) DECLARATION OF GIANMARCO VAIRO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. I, Gianmarco Vairo, declare as follows: 1. Unless otherwise indicated, I have personal knowledge of the facts stated in this declaration and I could and would testify that they are true if called upon to do so. 2. I work for Amazon Corporate LLC, a subsidiary of Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon"), where I have been employed since November 2012. My current job title is Litigation Paralegal. I work in Amazon’s offices in Seattle, Washington. 3. The plaintiff in this case has named Amazon as a defendant. 4. Amazon is incorporated in the State of Delaware. 5. Amazon has been located in the Western District of Washington since its founding. Amazon’s headquarters are in Seattle, Washington, which is in the Western District of Washing-ton. Amazon’s headquarters are the strategic center of Amazon’s business. 6. I have researched whether Amazon maintains any places of business within the Western District of Arkansas, including by speaking with Amazon personnel knowledgeable re-garding Amazon’s locations of business. I have confirmed that Amazon has no facilities located in that district. Amazon maintains no offices, retail establishments, datacenters, or warehouses in the Western District of Arkansas. 7. Amazon’s Seattle headquarters is the hub of its business and where the majority of its employees with knowledge relevant to the operations of www.amazon.com are likely to be located. Amazon’s retail and marketplace website operations are coordinated from Amazon’s headquarters in Seattle, Washington, where it employs thousands of employees. Amazon’s em-ployees with general knowledge of the third party sellers that listed the products alleged to practice the patent asserted in this case include the account managers for third party sellers of such products. DECLARATION OF GIANMARCO VAIRO – Page 1 Although not every third party seller has an account manager, account managers are knowledgea-ble generally concerning how the content of listings is uploaded and appears on the www.ama-zon.com website and how third party representations concerning products come to appear in those third parties’ listings (including Amazon’s lack of responsibility for such representations). For the sellers of products that plaintiffs contend practice the patent asserted in this case, the account man-agers include Ananth Kuchimanchi. Mr. Kuchimanchi works and resides within the Western Dis-trict of Washington. 8. Account managers, including Mr. Kuchimanchi, are also the individuals within Amazon most likely knowledgeable regarding Amazon’s dealings with specific third parties sell-ing products that allegedly practice the patent asserted in this case, to the extent specific relevant dealings occurred. Mr. Kuchimanchi is also generally knowledgeable regarding the nature of Am-azon’s relationship with third party sellers, such as those who sell products that plaintiffs contend practice the patent asserted in this case. 9. Amazon’s employees with knowledge of patent-or other intellectual property rights holders’ efforts to contact Amazon in advance of suing Amazon regarding allegedly infring-ing products listed by third parties on the www.amazon.com website, and of plaintiffs’ apparent failure to contact Amazon in this specific case prior to suing Amazon, include Adrian Garver. Mr. Garver works and resides within the Western District of Washington. 10. I am knowledgeable regarding Amazon’s efforts to remove from its website third party listings for the products accused in the complaint promptly after Amazon learned of this lawsuit. I live and work in the Western District of Washington. 11. Amazon’s employees with knowledge of Amazon’s profit derived from third party sellers’ sales of products accused in this action include Amazon’s finance department personnel, DECLARATION OF GIANMARCO VAIRO – Page 2 who work at Amazon's headquarters located within the Western District of Washington. For ex-ample, Brittany LaRiviere, who lives and works in the Western District of Washington, is knowl-edgeable regarding the calculation of profits (if any) from third party sellers' sales of the products accused in this action. 12. Amazon's relevant electronically stored information and documents are located in Seattle, Washington. This includes records of the listings for the accused products, agreements with third paity sellers of the accused products, communications with third party sellers of the accused products, sales data for the accused products, records regarding Amazon's profit for third paity sales of accused products, Amazon's records regai·ding removing accused listings after it received notice that this action had been filed, and Amazon's repository of any notices it received from plaintiffs prior to the time they filed suit complaining of the infringement of their intellectual property rights or of false advertising (although I am not aware of any such notices being provided in this case). I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the United States of America that the foregoing is trne and correct. Executed on Jt1Al11\ 2'an Seattle, Washingtoli1 Gia DECLARATION OF GIANMARCO VAIRO-Page 3

R. Cruzen Declaration

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) DECLARATION OF ROBERT T. CRUZEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. I, Robert T. Cruzen, declare as follows: 1. I am a partner with Klarquist Sparkman, LLP, counsel for defendant Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") in this action. I have personal knowledge of the facts herein, and, if called as a witness, could testify competently thereto. 2. I submit this declaration in support of Motion To Transfer To A More Convenient Venue Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue Of Amazon.com, Inc. 3. Attached hereto as Exhibit A is a true and correct copy of Plaintiffs’ Disclosure Of Asserted Claims And Preliminary Infringement Contentions Under P.R. 3-1, dated, May 26, 2017. 4. Attached hereto as Exhibit B is a true and correct copy of Plaintiff’s Initial Disclo-sure Statement Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), dated, June 5, 2017. 5. Attached hereto as Exhibit C is a true and correct copy of Plaintiff’s Original Com-plaint in Hugh Jarratt v. Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co. and Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Texas (Texarkana Division), Case No.: 5:14-cv-00159-RWS-CMC, dated De-cember 18, 2014. 6. Attached hereto as Exhibit D is a true and correct copy of Order of Dismissal in Hugh Jarratt v. Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co. and Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Texas (Texarkana Division), Case No.: 5:14-cv-00159-RWS-CMC, dated November 10, 2015. 7. Attached hereto as Exhibit E is a true and correct copy of U.S. Patent No. D363,413, titled Taco Plate For Two Tacos, issued on October 24, 1995. 8. I have reviewed available commercial flights from Los Angeles International Air-port (LAX), located in Los Angeles, California, to Seattle-Tacoma International Airport (SEA), located in the Western District of Washington. Attached hereto as Exhibit F is a true and accurate DECLARATION OF ROBERT T. CRUZEN – Page 1 copy of the reservation page from the website of Orbitz, www.orbitz.com, printed on June 7, 2017, illustrating the shortest available commercial flights. The shortest commercial flights are slightly more than two-and-a-half hours of total time, and numerous non-stop flights exist. 9. I have reviewed available commercial flights from Los Angeles International Air-port (LAX), located in Los Angeles, California, to Northwest Arkansas Regional Airport (XNA), located in Bentonville, Arkansas. Attached hereto as Exhibit G is a true and accurate copy of the reservation page from the website of Orbitz, www.orbitz.com, printed on June 7, 2017, illustrating the shortest available commercial flights. The shortest commercial flights are approximately three-and-a-half hours of total time. 10. I have reviewed available commercial flights from Shanghai Pudong International (PVG) and Shanghai Hongqiao International (SHA) Airports in Shanghai, China, to Seattle-Ta-coma International Airport (SEA), located in the Western District of Washington. Attached hereto as Exhibit H is a true and accurate copy of the reservation page from the website of Orbitz, www.orbitz.com, printed on June 7, 2017, illustrating the shortest available commercial flights. The shortest commercial flights are between ten hours, fifty-five minutes and twelve hours, five minutes of total time, and nonstop flights exist. 11. I have reviewed available commercial flights from Shanghai Pudong International (PVG) and Shanghai Hongqiao International (SHA) Airports in Shanghai, China, to Northwest Arkansas Regional Airport (XNA), located in Bentonville, Arkansas. Attached hereto as Exhibit I is a true and accurate copy of the reservation page from the website of Orbitz, www.orbitz.com, printed on June 7, 2017, illustrating the shortest available commercial flights. These flights require at least one stop, and the shortest commercial flights are between seventeen hours, twenty-three minutes and eighteen hours, eighteen minutes of total time. DECLARATION OF ROBERT T. CRUZEN – Page 2 12. I have reviewed available commercial flights from Beijing Capital International Airport (PEK) in Beijing, China, to Seattle-Tacoma International Airport (SEA), located in the Western District of Washington. Attached hereto as Exhibit J is a true and accurate copy of the reservation page from the website of Orbitz, www.orbitz.com, printed on June 7, 2017, illustrating the shortest available commercial flights. The shortest commercial flights are between ten hours, forty-five minutes and eleven hours, thirty-five minutes of total time, and nonstop flights exist. 13. I have reviewed available commercial flights from Beijing Capital International Airport (PEK) in Beijing, China, to Northwest Arkansas Regional Airport (XNA), located in Ben-tonville, Arkansas. Attached hereto as Exhibit K is a true and accurate copy of the reservation page from the website of Orbitz, www.orbitz.com, printed on June 7, 2017, illustrating the shortest available commercial flights. These flights require at least one stop, and the shortest commercial flights are between sixteen hours, forty-three minutes and seventeen hours, fifty-nine minutes of total time. 14. On May 12, 2017, I was informed by plaintiffs’ counsel, Steven Schrantz, prior to our Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26(f) conference that CT Discount Store, Inc.’s counsel would not be par-ticipating in that conference because plaintiffs and CT Discount had resolved their dispute. CT Discount was not a signatory to the joint scheduling report that plaintiffs and Amazon filed with the Court. CT Discount’s counsel did not participate in any of our discussions regarding the sched-ule proposed in that report. DECLARATION OF ROBERT T. CRUZEN – Page 3 I declare under penalty of perjury that the foregoing is true and correct. Executed on June 13, 2017 in Portland, Oregon. Robert T. Cruzen DECLARATION OF ROBERT T. CRUZEN – Page 4

Exhibit A

EXHIBIT A Ex. A Page 1 of 15 Ex. A Page 2 of 15 Ex. A Page 3 of 15 Ex. A Page 4 of 15 Ex. A Page 5 of 15 Ex. A Page 6 of 15 Ex. A Page 7 of 15 Ex. A Page 8 of 15 Ex. A Page 9 of 15 Ex. A Page 10 of 15 Ex. A Page 11 of 15 Ex. A Page 12 of 15 Ex. A Page 13 of 15 Ex. A Page 14 of 15 Ex. A Page 15 of 15

Exhibit B

EXHIBIT B ', '' ' (Ex. B Page 1 of 4 to Ex. B Page 2 of 4 Ex. B Page 3 of 4 Ex. B Page 4 of 4

Exhibit C

EXHIBIT C IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS TEXARKANA DIVISION HUGH JARRATT § PLAINTIFF § § vs. § Civil Action No. § (Jury Requested) ARROW PLASTIC MANUFACTURING CO. § and BED BATH & BEYOND INC. § DEFENDANTS § PLAINTIFF’S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE OF SAID COURT: COMES NOW Plaintiff Hugh Jarratt, by and through his undersigned counsel, and files this Original Complaint against Defendants Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co. and Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. and in support thereof would show unto the Court as follows: NATURE OF THE ACTION I. This is a patent infringement action to stop Defendants’ infringement of Plaintiff’s United States Patent No. D574,187S entitled "Divided Plate for Separating Food" (hereinafter referred to as the "‘187 patent"), a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit "A". Plaintiff is the owner of the'187 patent. Plaintiff seeks injunctive relief and monetary damages. PARTIES II. Plaintiff Hugh Jarratt is a citizen of the state of Arkansas and resides in Fayetteville, Ex. C Page 1 of 6 Arkansas. III. On information and belief, Defendant Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co. is an Illinois corporation with its principal place of business located in Elk Grove Village, Illinois. Said Defendant may be served with process through its registered agent, David L. Weinstein, 311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 4400, Chicago, Illinois 60606. IV. On information and belief, Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. is a New York corporation with its principal place of business located in Union, New Jersey. Said Defendant may be served with process at 650 Liberty Avenue, Attn: Tax Department, Union, New Jersey 07083. JURISDICTION V. This action arises under the patent laws of the United States, 35 U.S.C. § 271, 282-85. This Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case for patent infringement under 28 U.S.C. § 1331 and 1338(a). VI. Venue is proper in this Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b). VII. This Court has personal jurisdiction over Defendants because Defendants are present within or have minimum contacts with the state of Texas and the Eastern District of Texas. Defendants have Plaintiff’s Original Complaint Page 2 Ex. C Page 2 of 6 purposefully availed themselves of the privilege of conducting business in the state of Texas and in the Eastern District of Texas. Defendants have sought protection and benefit from the laws of the state of Texas. Defendants regularly conduct business in the state of Texas and within the Eastern District of Texas. Plaintiff’s causes of action arise directly from Defendants’ business contacts and other activities in the state of Texas and in the Eastern District of Texas. Defendants have directly and/or indirectly committed and/or induced acts of patent infringement in this district. COUNT I-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT D574,187S VIII. Plaintiff hereby reasserts and realleges the allegations contained in Paragraphs I-VII herein above as if set forth word for word. IX. The'187 patent was duly and legally issued by the United States Patent and Trademark Office on August 5, 2008, after full and fair examination. The'187 patent is full force and effect. Plaintiff is the owner of the'187 patent and possesses all rights of recovery under the'187 patent, including the exclusive right to sue for infringement and recover past damages. X. Some time after January of 2013, Defendants began selling taco plates which infringe the'187 patent. XI. Defendants sell and ship infringing taco plates into the state of Texas and the Eastern District of Texas. Defendants, on information and belief, transact or have transacted business within this Plaintiff’s Original Complaint Page 3 Ex. C Page 3 of 6 judicial district for their individual gain and benefit. XII. On information and belief, without Plaintiff’s authorization, Defendants have offered for sale and have sold in the United States and the state of Texas the infringing taco plates, which have designs that are covered by the'187 patent. XIII. On information and belief, Defendants knowingly and intentionally sold and continue to sell Defendants’ infringing taco plates as simulations of Plaintiff’s taco plates. XIV. On information and belief, Defendants have infringed and continue to infringe the'187 patent within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) at least by selling and offering to sell Defendants’ infringing taco plates without Plaintiff’s authorization or license. XV. Plaintiff has sold and is currently selling his taco plates bearing the design claimed in the'187 patent. As contemplated by 35 U.S.C. § 287, Plaintiff has provided notice of the'187 patent by marking the'187 patent number on his taco plate models bearing those patented designs since the United States Patent and Trademark Office issued the'187 patent. XVI. Defendants have willfully and intentionally infringed the'187 patent from at least the date Plaintiff’s Original Complaint Page 4 Ex. C Page 4 of 6 of the filing of this lawsuit. XVII. Defendants’ aforesaid activities have been without authority and/or license from Plaintiff. XVIII. Plaintiff is entitled to recover from Defendant the damages sustained by Plaintiff as a result of Defendants’ wrongful acts in an amount subject to proof at trial, which by law, cannot be less than a reasonable royalty, together with interest and costs as fixed by this Court under 35 U.S.C. § 284. XIX. Defendants’ infringement of Plaintiff’s exclusive rights under the'187 patent will continue to damage Plaintiff, causing irreparable harm for which there is no adequate remedy at law, unless enjoined by this Court. JURY DEMAND XX. Plaintiff hereby requests a trial by jury pursuant to Rule 38 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. PRAYER FOR RELIEF Plaintiff Hugh Jarratt respectfully requests that the Court find in his favor and against the Defendants, and that the Court Plaintiff the following relief: a. Judgment that Defendants have infringed one or more of the claims, directly, jointly and/or indirectly, by way of inducing and/or contributing to infringement of the'187 patent; Plaintiff’s Original Complaint Page 5 Ex. C Page 5 of 6 b. Permanent injunction pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 283 enjoining Defendants and their officers, directors, agents, servants, affiliates, employees, divisions, branches, subsidiaries, parents, and all others acting in active concert therewith from infringement, inducing the infringement of, or contributing to the infringement of the'187 patent, or such other equitable relief the Court determines is warranted; c. Award to Plaintiff of damages adequate to compensate Plaintiff for the Defendants’ acts of infringement, together with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest; d. That, should Defendants’ acts of infringement be found to be willful from the time that Defendants became aware of the infringing nature of their actions, which is the time of filing of Plaintiff’s Original Complaint at the latest, the Court award treble damages for the period of such willful infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284; e. That the Court declare this to be an exceptional case and award Plaintiff his reasonable attorneys’ fees and costs in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 285; and f. Any further relief that the Court deems just and proper. December 18, 2014 Respectfully submitted,/s/W. David Carter-Lead Attorney TSB No. 03932780 MERCY p CARTER p TIDWELL, L.L.P. 1724 Galleria Oaks Drive Texarkana, Texas 75503 (903) 794-9419-Telephone (903) 794-1268-Facsimile wdcarter@texarkanalawyers.com Attorneys for Plaintiff Hugh Jarratt Plaintiff’s Original Complaint Page 6 Ex. C Page 6 of 6

Exhibit D

EXHIBIT D Case Case5:14-cv-00159-RWS-CMC 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document Document 42-629 Filed Filed06/13/17 11/10/15 Page Page21ofof21PageID PageID#:#:271 116 IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS TEXARKANA DIVISION HUGH JARRATT § § VS. § No. 5:14-cv-159-RWS-CMC § ARROW PLASTIC MANUFACTURING§ CO., ET AL. § ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Before the Court is the parties’ Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice (Dkt. No. 28). According to the joint motion, the parties have come to terms on a settlement, a full release of all claims has been executed, and all terms of the release have been fulfilled pending the dismissal with. prejudice of Plaintiff’s claims in this action. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED the Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice (Dkt. No. 28) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff’s above action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this civil action. So ORDERED and SIGNED this 10th day of November, 2015. ____________________________________ ROBERT W. SCHROEDER III UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE Ex. D Page 1 of 1

Exhibit E

EXHIBIT E llllllll 06/13/17 Il lllll llllllUSOOD363413S llllPage lllll lllll2l l loflllll4lllll lllllll I lllll#: llll273 PageID United States Patent [19J [lll Patent Number: Des. 363,413 Smith [45J Date of Patent: *** Oct. 24, 1995 [54] TACO PLATE FOR TWO TACOS D. 327,814 7/1992 Graham et al........................... D7/504 D. 340,384 1011993 Couillard et al......................... D7/504 [76] Inventor: Bette E. Smith, 23681 Posey La., West Hills, Calif. 91304 Primary Examiner-Terry A Wallace Attorney, Agent, or Firm-Jack C. Munro [*] Notice: The portion of the term of this patent [57] CLAIM subsequent to Oct. 3, 2009 has been dis-claimed. The ornamental design for taco plate for two tacos, as shown and described. [**] Term: 14 Years DESCRIPTION [21] Appl. No.: 22,248 FIG. 1 is an isometric top view of the taco plate for two [22] Filed: May 2, 1994 tacos, showing my new design; [52] U.S. Cl................................................................ D7/504 FIG. 2 is a front view thereof; [58] Field of Search................... D7/504, 546, 549-557; FIG. 3 is a right side view thereof; D9/341; 206/562-564, 557; 211/10, 11, FIG. 4 is a top plan view thereof; 13, 71; 220/23.8, 500, 507, 512 FIG. 5 is a cross-sectional view thereof taken along line 5-5 of FIG. 4; and, [56] References Cited FIG. 6 is a bottom plan view thereof. U.S. PATENT DOCUMENTS D. 293,994 2/1988 Conrady et al.......................... D7/555 1 Claim, 2 Drawing Sheets Ex. E Page 1 of 3 U.S. Patent Oct. 24, 1995 Sheet 1of2 Des. 363,413 Fig. I. ~----~. I v Fig.2. Fig. 3. T-I~:::~-.-~-.-~-.~1 5 Fig. 4. 'tlsssss)s_S\?',,,,·,~ Fig. 5. Ex. E Page 2 of 3 U.S. Patent Oct. 24, 1995 Sheet 2 of 2 Des. 363,413 ·-. ·--...· ·.--:-Fig. 6. Ex. E Page 3 of 3

Exhibit F

EXHIBIT F 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 2 of 19 PageID #: 277 1  Account My Scratchpad 1 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  LAX ­ SEA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Seattle Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (38) $153 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (15) $166 Save up to $181 when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: Alaska Airlines $153 1:55p ­ 4:28p 2h 33m 4 left at $192.40 (18) Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Delta (10) $180 Nonstop    Earn $1.92 plus an extra $1.92 United (10) $166 American $210 Select Airlines (7) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) Virgin America $227 (6) 2:46p ­ 5:20p 2h 34m $224.40 Spirit Airlines (2) $210 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.24 Departure time ­ Los plus an extra $2.24 Alaska Airlines 1795 operated by Virgin America Angeles Select Morning (5:00a ­ 11:59a) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Afternoon (12:00p ­ 5:59p) 2:46p ­ 5:20p 2h 34m 4 left at $226.22 Virgin America LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Evening (6:00p ­ Nonstop    Earn $2.26 11:59p) plus an extra $2.26 ad Run this search to Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Select on these travel sites: Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 11:35p ­ 2:10a +1 2h 35m $178.40 Book flight + hotel together and Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip save! Nonstop    Earn $1.78 plus an extra $1.78 SPONSORED LISTINGS Select Book now and save on flights to Seattle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) 3:55p ­ 6:30p 2h 35m 4 left at $192.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.92 plus an extra $1.92 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) Ex. F GO Page 1 of 18 4:30p ­ 7:05p 2h 35m $192.40 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 1/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 3 of 19 PageID #: 278 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA $192.40 Nonstop    roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ Earn $1.92 Redmond ­ Seattle ­ One plus an extra $1.92 Way as low as $74. Always Get Our Lowest Fare. Select Book Your RDM to SEA Flight Today & Save! Free Movies on Alaska Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) Ratings: Service 10/10 · Artisan Food & Drink #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 12:00p ­ 2:36p 2h 36m $192.40 Program ­ U.S. News & Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip World Report Nonstop    Earn $1.92 Alaska Air® Miles Card plus an extra $1.92 Join ­ Mileage Plan™ Flight Deals Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) tripadvisor.com ▼ (4.9) 9:55p ­ 12:32a +1 2h 37m 4 left at $178.40 5 Cheap Flights to Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Seattle, Washington from $119 Nonstop    Earn $1.78 Cheap flights to all plus an extra $1.78 destinations Search on TripAdvisor for deals Ratings: Travel info 10/10 Select ­ Website 10/10 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 7:25a ­ 10:03a 2h 38m $224.40 (4.6) Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip $119 Seattle RoundTrip Nonstop    Earn $2.24 Fares ­ Book By plus an extra $2.24 Midnight, Fares Change Alaska Airlines 1781 operated by Virgin America Cheap Flights To Seattle From $119. Fly From Select Houston. Book Today & Save! No Hidden Costs Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Types: Round­Trip, One­Way · All Major Airlines "...Flights for those, Multi­City, Domestic 7:25a ­ 10:03a 2h 38m $226.22 inspired to Virgin America LAX ­ SEA roundtrip travel." ­ CrunchBase Nonstop    Earn $2.26 Round­Trip To Seattle plus an extra $2.26 One­Way Deals To Seattle Last Minute Seattle Fares Select ad Run this search to Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Book flight + hotel together and save! 6:00p ­ 8:39p 2h 39m $224.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.24 plus an extra $2.24 Book now and save on flights Alaska Airlines 1797 operated by Virgin America to Seattle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 6:00p ­ 8:39p 2h 39m 4 left at $226.22 Virgin America LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.26 plus an extra $2.26 Select Ex. F GO Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Page 2 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 2/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 19 PageID #: 279 6:17p ­ 8:57p 2h 40m $209.06 Spirit Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop Earn $2.09 plus an extra $2.09 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 2:45p ­ 5:25p 2h 40m $211.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.11 plus an extra $2.11 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) Run Los Angeles ­ Seattle on Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: ad GO  Los Angeles ­ Seattle  Jul 10 ­ Jul 12  1 Traveler 7:45p ­ 10:27p 2h 42m 1 left at $152.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.52 plus an extra $1.52 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) ad Run this search to Seattle 9:55a ­ 12:37p 2h 42m 4 left at $211.40 Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 roundtrip Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA on these travel sites: Nonstop    Earn $2.11 plus an extra $2.11 Select Book flight + hotel together and save! Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 6:55p ­ 9:38p 2h 43m $192.40 Book now and save on flights Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip to Seattle Nonstop    Earn $1.92 plus an extra $1.92 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 5:35p ­ 8:18p 2h 43m 4 left at $211.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop Earn $2.11   plus an extra $2.11 Ex. F GO Page 3 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 3/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 19 PageID #: 280 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) 7:05p ­ 9:49p 2h 44m $179.80 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.80 plus an extra $1.80 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 6:10a ­ 8:54a 2h 44m $203.40 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.03 plus an extra $2.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 6:20a ­ 9:04a 2h 44m $209.06 Spirit Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop Earn $2.09 plus an extra $2.09 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 5:30p ­ 8:15p 2h 45m $203.40 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.03 plus an extra $2.03 Select ad Run this search to Seattle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: 2:45p ­ 5:30p 2h 45m $240.41 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.40 plus an extra $2.40 Book flight + hotel together and save! Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Book now and save on flights to Seattle 4:00p ­ 6:46p 2h 46m $240.41 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.40 plus an extra $2.40 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 2:55p ­ 5:42p 2h 47m $235.00 Ex. F United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip GO Page 4 of 18 Nonstop Earn $2.35 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 4/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 6 of 19 PageID #: 281   Earn $2.35 plus an extra $2.35  Basic Economy United 5475 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) 8:51p ­ 11:39p 2h 48m $179.80 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.80 plus an extra $1.80 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 3:48p 2h 48m $203.40 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.03 plus an extra $2.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8 out of 10) 2:00p ­ 4:49p 2h 49m $209.07 American Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.09 plus an extra $2.09 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 9:49a 2h 49m 5 left at $211.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.11 plus an extra $2.11 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) ad Run this search to 6:00a ­ 8:50a 2h 50m 4 left at $178.40 Seattle Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Earn $1.78 on these travel sites: Nonstop    plus an extra $1.78 Select Book flight + hotel together and Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) save! 7:40p ­ 10:30p 2h 50m $546.40 $209.07 American Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Book now and save on flights Nonstop    Earn $2.09 to Seattle plus an extra $2.09 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8 out of 10) 9:55a ­ 12:48p 2h 53m $240.41 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.40 plus an extra $2.40 Ex. F GO Select Page 5 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 5/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 7 of 19 PageID #: 282 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) 11:35a ­ 2:28p 2h 53m $240.41 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.40 plus an extra $2.40 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 8:20a ­ 11:14a 2h 54m $203.40 Delta LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.03 plus an extra $2.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 7:55a ­ 10:50a 2h 55m 3 left at $268.61 American Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop   Earn $2.69 plus an extra $2.69 American Airlines 6047 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.7 out of 10) 2 left at 4:56p ­ 7:53p 2h 57m American Airlines LAX ­ SEA $546.40 $209.07 Nonstop   roundtrip Earn $2.09 American Airlines 6031 operated by Compass Airlines As plus an extra $2.09 American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.7 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 11:00a 3h 0m 4 left at $211.40 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.11 ad plus an extra $2.11 Run this search to Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Select on these travel sites: Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 9:55a ­ 12:56p 3h 1m $235.00 Book flight + hotel together and United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip save! Nonstop   Earn $2.35 plus an extra $2.35  Basic Economy United 5608 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Book now and save on flights to Seattle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) 9:05a ­ 1:02p 3h 57m 1 left at $237.85 Virgin America LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.38 43m in SFO plus an extra $2.38 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) Ex. F GO Page 6 of 18 3 left at $248.00 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 6/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 8 of 19 PageID #: 283 6:40p ­ 10:40p 4h 0m 3 left at $248.00 Virgin America LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.48 50m in SFO plus an extra $2.48 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 12:13p ­ 4:38p 4h 25m $197.60 United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $1.98 44m in SFO plus an extra $1.98  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) 8:17p ­ 1:00a +1 4h 43m $197.60 United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $1.98 1h 3m in SFO plus an extra $1.98  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 12:13p ­ 5:20p 5h 7m $165.60 United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $1.66 1h 27m in SFO  Basic Economy plus an extra $1.66 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 6:50a ­ 12:04p 5h 14m $253.60 United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.54 1h 36m in SFO plus an extra $2.54  Basic Economy Select ad Run this search to Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: 5:20p ­ 10:51p 5h 31m $197.60 United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $1.98 1h 53m in SFO  Basic Economy plus an extra $1.98 Book flight + hotel together and Select save! Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) Book now and save on flights 7:12p ­ 1:00a +1 5h 48m $165.60 to Seattle United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $1.66 2h 14m in SFO plus an extra $1.66  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 6:08a ­ 12:04p 5h 56m $243.60 roundtrip United LAX ­ SEA Earn $2.44 Ex. F 1 stop   Page 7 of 18  GO 2h 18m in SFO  Basic Economy plus an extra $2.44 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 7/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 9 of 19 PageID #: 284 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 10:40p 6h 10m 3 left at $248.00 Virgin America LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.48 3h 1m in SFO plus an extra $2.48 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 12:13p ­ 6:27p 6h 14m $239.10 United LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.39 2h 34m in SFO  Basic Economy plus an extra $2.39 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 11:45p ­ 6:52a +1 7h 7m $181.00 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $1.81 4h in PDX plus an extra $1.81 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.1 out of 10) 11:00p ­ 8:04a +1 9h 4m $593.68 American Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.94 5h 23m in SFO plus an extra $5.94 American Airlines 6055 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select American Airlines 6962 operated by Alaska Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 9:35p ­ 8:55a +1 11h 20m $581.57 ad roundtrip Run this search to American Airlines LAX ­ SEA Seattle 1 stop    Earn $5.82 Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 7h 54m in SJC plus an extra $5.82 on these travel sites: American Airlines 6076 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle American Airlines 6818 operated by Alaska Airlines Book flight + hotel together and Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.8 out of 10) save! 11:00p ­ 10:36a +1 11h 36m $593.68 American Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Book now and save on flights 1 stop    Earn $5.94 to Seattle 7h 57m in SFO plus an extra $5.94 American Airlines 6055 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select American Airlines 7048 operated by Alaska Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) Ex. F GO Page 8 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 8/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 10 of 19 PageID #: 285 SPONSORED LISTINGS seattle‑flights.one… ▼ $167 Seattle RoundTrip (888) 481­9454 Airfares for Seattle Just Dropped. Book Your Flights Today & (4.4) Save! Over 450 Airline Partners · Low Cost Airfares · Fast & Easy Booking · 24 X 7 Customer Support Services: Extensive Offerings, Awesome Experience Low Fare Promise ­ Online­Travel­Sites­Review, Deals change frequently, 24/7 Customer Service Cheap OneWay Flights Discount Airfares hipmunk.com ▼ Cheap Seattle Airfare ­ 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Seattle Airfare Today. Compare Top Airline Brands Online. Find Today's Deals · Top Brands · Save Up to 60% · Search, Select & Save Amenities: Inflight WiFi, Free Checked Bags, Inflight Meals Ratings: Website 8/10, Movies, TV and Sports "Hipmunk is the new gold standard in hotel and flight cheaptickets.com ▼ Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Lowest Price Guaranteed (877) 468­5247 Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you book today! (4.2) Free Rewards · Cheap Event Tickets · Cheap Car Rentals · 24/7 Customer Support Destinations: New York, Las Vegas, San Francisco, Maui Ratings: Selection 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10, Los Angeles, Rome, London, Chicago, Key West ­ Prices 9/10, Barcelona One of the best online travel sites in 2017 ­ Service 9/10 ­ Website 9/10 ­ Top Ten Reviews lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle Airfare Sale On Now to Seattle. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! Amazing Deals on Flights · Get Cheap Flights Now Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions ad Run this search to Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Other Links Price Guarantee Travel Deals on these travel sites: Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Book flight + hotel together and save! Book now and save on flights to Seattle Ex. F GO Page 9 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 9/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 11 of 19 PageID #: 286 1  Account My Scratchpad 1 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  LAX ­ SEA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Your selected 1:55p ­ 4:28p 2h 33m from $192.40 departure Alaska Airlines LAX ­ SEA roundtrip Mon, Jul 10 Change Nonstop Select your return to Los Angeles Wed, Jul 12 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (38) $193 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (14) $258 9:25p ­ 12:02a +1 2h 37m + $0.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Airlines included From: Nonstop    Earn $1.92 plus an extra $1.92 Alaska Airlines $193 (18) Select Delta (11) $194 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) United (9) $409 Virgin America $235 11:00a ­ 1:37p 2h 37m 3 left at + $35.00 (6) Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip American $224 Nonstop    Earn $2.27 Airlines (5) plus an extra $2.27 Alaska Airlines 1784 operated by Virgin America Spirit Airlines (3) $239 Select Departure time ­ Seattle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Morning (5:00a ­ 11:59a) 11:00a ­ 1:37p 2h 37m 3 left at + $42.00 Virgin America SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Afternoon (12:00p ­ Earn $2.34 Nonstop    5:59p) plus an extra $2.34 Evening (6:00p ­ 11:59p) Select ad Run this search to Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: 5:00a ­ 7:38a 2h 38m 4 left at + $0.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.92 plus an extra $1.92 Book flight + hotel together and save! Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS Book now and save on flights to Seattle 9:45p ­ 12:25a +1 2h 40m + $45.93 Spirit Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop Earn $2.38 plus an extra $2.38 Select Ex. F Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) Page 10 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 1/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 12 of 19 PageID #: 287 9:49a ­ 12:31p 2h 42m + $45.93 Spirit Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ Nonstop Earn $2.38 Airfare Seattle GO plus an extra $2.38 Fly to Seattle & Save! Book Your Flight on AlaskaAir.com Artisan Food & Drink Select Ratings: Service 10/10 · 20­Minute Bag Guarantee #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) Program ­ U.S. News & World Report 3:35p ­ 6:18p 2h 43m + $33.82 Plan & Book A Flight Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Alaska Air® Miles Card Nonstop    Earn $2.26 Flight Deals plus an extra $2.26 Select justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) (4.6) $119 Seattle RoundTrip Fares ­ Book By 5:11p ­ 7:55p 2h 44m + $5.56 Midnight, Fares Change Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Cheap Flights To Seattle Earn $1.98 From $119. Fly From Nonstop    Houston. Book Today & plus an extra $1.98 Save! No Booking Fees Select Types: Round­Trip, One­Way · Any Flight Combinations "...Flights for those, Multi­City, Domestic Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) inspired to travel." ­ CrunchBase 7:06a ­ 9:50a 2h 44m + $35.00 Round­Trip To Seattle roundtrip Last Minute Seattle Fares Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX One­Way Deals To Seattle Nonstop    Earn $2.27 plus an extra $2.27 Alaska Airlines 1780 operated by Virgin America Select hipmunk.com ▼ Cheap Seattle Airfare ­ Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Seattle Airfare Today. Compare Top Airline 6:56p ­ 9:40p 2h 44m 2 left at + $36.85 Brands Online. Compare Prices · Top Brands Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Amenities: Inflight WiFi · Find Today's Deals Nonstop    Earn $2.29 Ratings: Website 8/10, Free Checked Bags plus an extra $2.29 "Hipmunk is the new Alaska Airlines 1798 operated by Virgin America gold standard in hotel Select and flight searches" ­ Forbes Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Email Sign­up Seattle Hotels Flight Deals ad Run this search to Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: 7:06a ­ 9:50a 2h 44m + $42.00 Virgin America SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.34 Book flight + hotel together and plus an extra $2.34 save! Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Book now and save on flights to Seattle 6:56p ­ 9:40p 2h 44m 2 left at + $42.00 Virgin America SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.34 plus an extra $2.34 Select Ex. F Page 11 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 2/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 13 of 19 PageID #: 288 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) GO 7:40p ­ 10:25p 2h 45m + $4.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.96 plus an extra $1.96 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 9:45a ­ 12:30p 2h 45m 1 left at + $5.56 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.98 plus an extra $1.98 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Run Los Angeles ­ Seattle on Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: ad GO  Los Angeles ­ Seattle  Jul 10 ­ Jul 12  1 Traveler 11:15a ­ 2:00p 2h 45m + $5.56 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.98 plus an extra $1.98 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 10:15a ­ 1:00p 2h 45m + $32.00 ad Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Run this search to Earn $2.24 Seattle Nonstop    plus an extra $2.24 Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) Book flight + hotel together and save! 8:25p ­ 11:12p 2h 47m + $1.53 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.94 plus an extra $1.94  Basic Economy Book now and save on flights to Seattle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 5:45p ­ 8:32p 2h 47m 1 left at + $44.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Ex. F Nonstop   Earn $2.36 Page 12 of 18 plus an extra $2.36 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 3/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 14 of 19 PageID #: 289 plus an extra $2.36 Select GO Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) 6:10a ­ 8:58a 2h 48m + $1.53 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.94 plus an extra $1.94  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) 5:34p ­ 8:22p 2h 48m + $30.80 American Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.23 plus an extra $2.23 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) 1:45p ­ 4:34p 2h 49m + $1.53 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.94 plus an extra $1.94  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 7:55a ­ 10:45a 2h 50m + $1.53 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.94 plus an extra $1.94  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) ad Run this search to 12:25p ­ 3:15p 2h 50m + $1.53 Seattle Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Earn $1.94 on these travel sites: Nonstop    plus an extra $1.94  Basic Economy Select Book flight + hotel together and Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) save! 6:30p ­ 9:20p 2h 50m + $1.53 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Book now and save on flights Nonstop    Earn $1.94 to Seattle plus an extra $1.94  Basic Economy Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Ex. F 8:50p ­ 11:41p 2h 51m + $4.00 Page 13 of 18 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Earn $1.96 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 4/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 15 of 19 PageID #: 290 Nonstop   Earn $1.96 plus an extra $1.96 GO Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) 12:05p ­ 2:56p 2h 51m + $32.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop   Earn $2.24 plus an extra $2.24 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8 out of 10) 1:50p ­ 4:41p 2h 51m + $32.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.24 plus an extra $2.24 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 8:52a 2h 52m + $0.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.92 plus an extra $1.92 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 6:59p ­ 9:55p 2h 56m + $4.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.96 plus an extra $1.96 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 3:55p ­ 6:52p 2h 57m + $32.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $2.24 plus an extra $2.24 ad Run this search to Seattle Select Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 8:58a 2h 58m + $30.80 American Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Book flight + hotel together and Nonstop    Earn $2.23 save! plus an extra $2.23 Select Book now and save on flights Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8 out of 10) to Seattle 8:05a ­ 11:05a 3h 0m + $4.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $1.96 plus an extra $1.96 Ex. F Select Page 14 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 5/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 16 of 19 PageID #: 291 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) GO 8:25p ­ 11:25p 3h 0m 5 left at + $30.80 American Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop   Earn $2.23 plus an extra $2.23 American Airlines 6031 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.7 out of 10) 11:20a ­ 2:20p 3h 0m + $61.07 American Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop   Earn $2.53 plus an extra $2.53 American Airlines 6047 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.7 out of 10) 7:02p ­ 10:06p 3h 4m + $216.00 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $4.08 plus an extra $4.08 United 5191 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (9.1 out of 10) 9:29a ­ 12:34p 3h 5m + $32.00 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop   Earn $2.24 plus an extra $2.24 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8 out of 10) 1:35p ­ 4:40p 3h 5m + $216.00 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $4.08 plus an extra $4.08 United 5384 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.8 out of 10) ad Run this search to Seattle 7:00a ­ 10:08a 3h 8m + $4.00 Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip on these travel sites: Nonstop    Earn $1.96 plus an extra $1.96 Select Book flight + hotel together and Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) save! 3:30p ­ 7:52p 4h 22m 4 left at + $85.36 Alaska Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Book now and save on flights 1 stop Earn $2.78 to Seattle plus an extra $2.78 35m in STS Alaska Airlines 2475 and 2475 operated by Horizon Air As Select Alaskahorizon Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.1 out of 10) Ex. F 5:43a ­ 10:20a 4h 37m + $268.60 Page 15 of 18 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 6/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 17 of 19 PageID #: 292 roundtrip United SEA ­ LAX Earn $4.61 1 stop   plus an extra $4.61 40m in SFO GO Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 6:15p ­ 10:57p 4h 42m + $268.60 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $4.61 50m in SFO plus an extra $4.61 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 2:08p ­ 7:14p 5h 6m + $268.60 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $4.61 1h 1m in SFO plus an extra $4.61 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 1:50p ­ 7:05p 5h 15m 1 left at + $64.61 Virgin America SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.57 1h 45m in SFO plus an extra $2.57 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) 5:43a ­ 11:08a 5h 25m + $268.60 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $4.61 1h 28m in SFO plus an extra $4.61 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 9:55a ­ 3:25p 5h 30m + $268.60 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $4.61 1h 30m in SFO plus an extra $4.61 ad Run this search to Seattle Select Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.1 out of 10) 2:08p ­ 8:28p 6h 20m + $264.10 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip Book flight + hotel together and save! 1 stop   Earn $4.57 2h 15m in SFO plus an extra $4.57 Select Book now and save on flights to Seattle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.9 out of 10) 1:50p ­ 8:12p 6h 22m 1 left at + $64.61 Virgin America SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.57 2h 45m in SFO plus an extra $2.57 Ex. F Page 16 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 7/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 18 of 19 PageID #: 293 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) GO 9:55a ­ 4:27p 6h 32m + $268.60 United SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $4.61 2h 22m in SFO plus an extra $4.61 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.8 out of 10) 3:15p ­ 9:52p 6h 37m + $79.76 Spirit Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop Earn $2.72 2h 49m in LAS plus an extra $2.72 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 8:20a ­ 3:27p 7h 7m 1 left at + $111.06 American Airlines SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $3.03 2h 36m in PHX plus an extra $3.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.7 out of 10) 1:50p ­ 9:15p 7h 25m 1 left at + $64.61 Virgin America SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.57 3h 43m in SFO plus an extra $2.57 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.8 out of 10) 10:45p ­ 8:45a +1 10h 0m 4 left at + $93.44 Delta SEA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $2.86 6h 32m in PDX plus an extra $2.86 Delta 4832 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select ad Run this search to Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.8 out of 10) Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Book flight + hotel together and save! SPONSORED LISTINGS Book now and save on flights to Seattle Ex. F Page 17 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 8/9 6/7/2017 LAX to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-8 Filed 06/13/17 Page 19 of 19 PageID #: 294 cheaptickets.com ▼ Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Lowest Price Guaranteed (877) 468­5247 Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you book today! GO (4.2) Cheap Event Tickets · Free Rewards · Hotels Under $50 · 24/7 Customer Support Destinations: New York, Las Vegas, San Francisco, Maui Ratings: Selection 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10, Los Angeles, Rome, London, Chicago, Key West ­ Prices 9/10, Barcelona One of the best online travel sites in 2017 ­ Service 9/10 ­ Website 9/10 ­ Top Ten Reviews lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle Airfare Sale On Now to Seattle. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! Get Cheap Flights Now · Amazing Deals on Flights trvl.deals ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle ­ 24 Hour Sale Just Went Live (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Flight Sale to Seattle. Cheap Flights on Sale 24/7. Book Now & Save! seattle‑flights.one… ▼ $167 Seattle RoundTrip (888) 481­9454 Airfares for Seattle Just Dropped. Book Your Flights Today & Save! (4.4) Fast & Easy Booking · Low Cost Airfares · 24 X 7 Customer Support · Over 450 Airline Partners Services: Use Coupons & Save More, Up To $15 Off on bkg Fee Low Fare Promise ­ Online­Travel­Sites­Review, Deals from 450+ Airlines, Free Cancellation Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. ad Run this search to Seattle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Book flight + hotel together and save! Book now and save on flights to Seattle Ex. F Page 18 of 18 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from:Los%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angeles%20Intl.),to:Seattle­Tacoma%20Intern… 9/9

Exhibit G

EXHIBIT G 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 2 of 23 PageID #: 296 1  Account My Scratchpad 2 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  LAX ­ XNA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Fayetteville Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (2) $640 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (52) $550 Save up to $101 when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  2+ Stops (17) $529 Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: 9:45a ­ 3:09p 3h 24m $639.50 American $595 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Airlines (43) Nonstop   Earn $6.40 plus an extra $6.40 United (16) $529 American Airlines 6026 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Delta (10) $671 Select Alaska Airlines $705 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) (2) 9:45a ­ 3:09p 3h 24m $704.39 Departure time ­ Los Alaska Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Angeles Nonstop   Earn $7.04 Early Morning (12:00a plus an extra $7.04 Alaska Airlines 4662 operated by Compass Airlines As American ­ 4:59a) Eagle Select Morning (5:00a ­ 11:59a) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) Afternoon (12:00p ­ 5:59p) 6:15a ­ 1:29p 5h 14m 3 left at $635.01 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Evening (6:00p ­ 1 stop    Earn $6.35 11:59p) plus an extra $6.35 43m in DFW American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 12:45a ­ 8:01a 5h 16m 5 left at $594.59 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.95 plus an extra $5.95 SPONSORED LISTINGS 49m in DFW American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 3:55p ­ 11:16p 5h 21m $594.59 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.95 52m in DFW plus an extra $5.95 American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.2 out of 10) Ex. G Page 1 of 22 2:00p ­ 9:28p 5h 28m 4 left at $700.64 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 1/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 3 of 23 PageID #: 297 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA 4 left at $700.64 1 stop    roundtrip justfly.com ▼ 55m in DFW Earn $7.01 (800) 717­5015 plus an extra $7.01 $174 Fayetteville Round American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Trip ­ Our Cheapest Select Flights. Cheap Flights To Fayetteville From $174. Fly Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) From Newark. Book Today! Any Flight Combinations "...Flights for those · Service Excellence 5:29a ­ 1:00p 5h 31m $557.70 inspired to United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip travel." ­ CrunchBase 1 stop    Earn $5.58 Fayetteville Daily Deals 1h 14m in DEN plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy Last Minute Fayetteville RoundTrip To Fayetteville United 5542 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.9 out of 10) cheaptickets.com ▼ (877) 468­5247 10:45a ­ 6:21p 5h 36m $557.70 (4.2) United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Flights ­ Cheap Flight 1 stop    Earn $5.58 Tickets 1h 12m in DEN plus an extra $5.58 Lowest price guaranteed.  Basic Economy Free cancellation. Save up to $537 with bundle. Book! United 3614 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Cheap Car Rentals Destinations: New York · Hotels Under $50 Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.1 out of 10) Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 travel sites in 11:40a ­ 7:29p 5h 49m $700.64 2017 ­ Top Ten American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Reviews 1 stop    Earn $7.01 Flight Deals Under $199 1h 17m in DFW plus an extra $7.01 Up to 50% Off Hotels American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Vacation Deals Under $500 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) onetravel.com ▼ (888) 481­9454 6:30a ­ 2:33p 6h 3m $557.70 (4.4) United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip $264 Fayetteville 1 stop    Earn $5.58 RoundTrip ­ Absolutely 1h 1m in IAH plus an extra $5.58 Low Fare on Flights  Basic Economy Find Our Low Airfares to Fayetteville Flights. Book United 4033 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Your Flight & Save Today! Fast & Easy Booking Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.8 out of 10) Destinations: Orlando, Miami · Over 450 Airline Partners Low Fare, Chicago, Denver, New York Promise ­ Online­ 11:55p ­ 8:01a +1 6h 6m 4 left at $609.59 Travel­Sites­Review American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip One Way Flights Specials 1 stop    Earn $6.10 Round Trip Cheap Flights 1h 37m in DFW plus an extra $6.10 Military Flights Discount American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.8 out of 10) 9:03a ­ 5:14p 6h 11m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.58 1h 3m in IAH plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy United 3621 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.8 out of 10) 12:45p ­ 9:08p 6h 23m $822.75 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Ex. G Earn $8.23 1 stop   Page 2 of 22 1h 21m in IAH plus an extra $8.23 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 2/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 23 PageID #: 298 plus an extra $8.23  Basic Economy United 4142 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 11:05a ­ 7:29p 6h 24m 5 left at $700.64 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.01 1h 48m in DFW plus an extra $7.01 American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.7 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 9:46p 6h 46m $1,164.92 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.65 40m in ORD plus an extra $11.65 American Airlines 3812 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) 1:50p ­ 10:37p 6h 47m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.58 1h 26m in SFO  Basic Economy plus an extra $5.58 United 5289 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 12:40p ­ 9:28p 6h 48m 3 left at $635.01 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $6.35 2h 17m in DFW plus an extra $6.35 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 12:40p ­ 9:28p 6h 48m 4 left at $681.21 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.81 AUS, DFW plus an extra $6.81 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 9:28a ­ 6:21p 6h 53m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.58 2h 32m in DEN  Basic Economy plus an extra $5.58 United 3614 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 4:53p 6h 53m $1,164.92 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.65 47m in ORD plus an extra $11.65 American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Ex. G Select Eagle Page 3 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 3/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 23 PageID #: 299 Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 7:30a ­ 4:24p 6h 54m 3 left at $822.75 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $8.23 1h 20m in MSP plus an extra $8.23 Delta 4667 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 6:15a ­ 3:10p 6h 55m $1,116.47 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.16 58m in ORD plus an extra $11.16 American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 4:02p 7h 2m $700.64 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.01 2h 30m in DFW plus an extra $7.01 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 5:28a ­ 2:33p 7h 5m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.58 2h 5m in IAH plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy United 4033 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 8:06a ­ 5:14p 7h 8m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.58 2h 10m in IAH plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy United 3621 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 8:25a ­ 5:39p 7h 14m 1 left at $830.89 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $8.31 AUS, DFW plus an extra $8.31 American Airlines 3624 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 12:45a ­ 10:01a 7h 16m 3 left at $594.59 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.95 2h 44m in DFW plus an extra $5.95 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) Ex. G 2:00p ­ 11:16p 7h 16m Page 4 of 22 5 left at $636.19 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 4/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 6 of 23 PageID #: 300 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA 5 left at $636.19 2 stops    roundtrip LAS, DFW Earn $6.36 plus an extra $6.36 American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 5:30a ­ 2:50p 7h 20m 3 left at $747.06 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.47 1h 7m in ATL plus an extra $7.47 Delta 3994 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 11:55p ­ 9:15a +1 7h 20m $747.06 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.47 57m in ATL plus an extra $7.47 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 1:50p ­ 11:16p 7h 26m 2 left at $704.74 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $7.05 SAN, DFW plus an extra $7.05 American Airlines 6032 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 11:36p ­ 9:04a +1 7h 28m $549.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.50 1h 30m in ORD  Basic Economy plus an extra $5.50 United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.9 out of 10) 8:06a ­ 5:39p 7h 33m 5 left at $704.74 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $7.05 TUS, DFW plus an extra $7.05 American Airlines 3015 operated by Skywest Airlines As American Eagle Select American Airlines 3624 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.2 out of 10) 6:15a ­ 4:02p 7h 47m 5 left at $700.64 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.01 3h 13m in DFW plus an extra $7.01 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5 out of 10) Ex. G 11:40a ­ 9:28p 7h 48m 4 left at $635.01 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip Page 5 of 22 Earn $6.35 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 5/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 7 of 23 PageID #: 301 1 stop    Earn $6.35 3h 17m in DFW plus an extra $6.35 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5 out of 10) 11:10p ­ 9:04a +1 7h 54m $618.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $6.19 2h 2m in ORD plus an extra $6.19  Basic Economy United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 9:35a ­ 7:29p 7h 54m 2 left at $704.74 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $7.05 OKC, DFW plus an extra $7.05 American Airlines 6098 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 9:45p 7h 55m $790.21 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.90 1h 26m in ATL plus an extra $7.90 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5 out of 10) 11:30a ­ 9:28p 7h 58m 1 left at $631.20 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.31 LAS, DFW plus an extra $6.31 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.1 out of 10) 11:30a ­ 9:28p 7h 58m 3 left at $662.20 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.62 LAS, DFW plus an extra $6.62 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.1 out of 10) 7:10a ­ 5:14p 8h 4m $528.79 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $5.29 LAS, IAH plus an extra $5.29  Basic Economy United 5247 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select United 3621 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.1 out of 10) 11:55p ­ 10:01a +1 8h 6m $607.00 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.07 Ex. G 3h 32m in DFW plus an extra $6.07 Page 6 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 6/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 8 of 23 PageID #: 302 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.8 out of 10) 8:12a ­ 6:21p 8h 9m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.58 3h 44m in DEN  Basic Economy plus an extra $5.58 United 3614 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 6:15a ­ 4:24p 8h 9m 1 left at $747.06 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.47 2h 35m in MSP plus an extra $7.47 Delta 4667 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.8 out of 10) 11:05a ­ 9:28p 8h 23m $635.01 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.35 3h 48m in DFW plus an extra $6.35 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.8 out of 10) 12:13p ­ 10:37p 8h 24m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.58 3h 5m in SFO plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy United 5289 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.5 out of 10) 11:00a ­ 9:28p 8h 28m 2 left at $704.74 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $7.05 SMF, DFW plus an extra $7.05 American Airlines 6048 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.8 out of 10) 12:40p ­ 11:16p 8h 36m $639.11 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.39 AUS, DFW plus an extra $6.39 American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.8 out of 10) 12:40p ­ 11:16p 8h 36m $639.11 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.39 AUS, DFW plus an extra $6.39 American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Ex. G Page 7 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 7/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 9 of 23 PageID #: 303 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.8 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 5:39p 8h 39m 3 left at $736.51 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.37 4h 10m in DFW plus an extra $7.37 American Airlines 3624 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 6:30a ­ 5:14p 8h 44m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.58 3h 41m in IAH plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy United 3621 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 12:25a ­ 11:10a 8h 45m 5 left at $747.06 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.47 2h 54m in MSP plus an extra $7.47 Delta 5322 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.5 out of 10) 10:25p ­ 9:15a +1 8h 50m $747.06 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.47 2h 31m in ATL plus an extra $7.47 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 10:45p ­ 9:46a +1 9h 1m $713.21 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.13 2h 49m in CVG plus an extra $7.13 Delta 3555 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 8:25a ­ 7:29p 9h 4m 3 left at $800.61 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $8.01 IAH, DFW plus an extra $8.01 American Airlines 6065 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.5 out of 10) 12:45a ­ 11:50a 9h 5m 1 left at $707.24 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.07 4h 34m in DFW plus an extra $7.07 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) Ex. G Page 8 of 22 $557.70 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 8/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 10 of 23 PageID #: 304 11:20a ­ 10:37p 9h 17m $557.70 United LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.58 3h 57m in SFO plus an extra $5.58  Basic Economy United 5289 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 6:15a ­ 5:39p 9h 24m 3 left at $736.51 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.37 4h 53m in DFW plus an extra $7.37 American Airlines 3624 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.2 out of 10) 12:59a ­ 12:25p 9h 26m $790.21 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.90 3h 13m in ATL plus an extra $7.90 Delta 5469 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 8:20p ­ 8:01a +1 9h 41m 2 left at $618.94 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $6.19 SMF, DFW plus an extra $6.19 American Airlines 6058 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.1 out of 10) 11:55p ­ 11:50a +1 9h 55m 3 left at $687.06 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.87 5h 22m in DFW plus an extra $6.87 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.9 out of 10) 11:45p ­ 11:49a +1 10h 4m 1 left at $1,101.88 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.02 4h 4m in ORD plus an extra $11.02 American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 7:40p ­ 8:01a +1 10h 21m 5 left at $675.60 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.76 5h 56m in DFW plus an extra $6.76 American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 7:29p 10h 29m 3 left at $736.51 Ex. G roundtrip American Airlines LAX ­ XNA Page 9 of 22 1 stop Earn $7.37 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevill… 9/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 11 of 23 PageID #: 305 6h in DFW    Earn $7.37 plus an extra $7.37 American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 12:45a ­ 1:29p 10h 44m 4 left at $707.24 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.07 6h 14m in DFW plus an extra $7.07 American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 8:25a ­ 9:28p 11h 3m 3 left at $746.20 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $7.46 IAH, DFW plus an extra $7.46 American Airlines 6065 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 11:55p ­ 1:29p +1 11h 34m 3 left at $687.06 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.87 7h 2m in DFW plus an extra $6.87 American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 6:15p ­ 8:01a +1 11h 46m $687.06 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.87 7h 25m in DFW plus an extra $6.87 American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 7:40p ­ 10:01a +1 12h 21m 2 left at $687.06 American Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.87 7h 51m in DFW plus an extra $6.87 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 11:45p ­ 5:39p +1 15h 54m $1,492.56 Alaska Airlines LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.93 PDX, DFW plus an extra $14.93 Alaska Airlines 4645 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 4:59p ­ 12:25p +1 17h 26m 1 left at $670.97 Delta LAX ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.71 Ex. G DFW, ATL plus an extra $6.71 Page 10 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevi… 10/11 6/7/2017 LAX to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 12 of 23 PageID #: 306 Delta 5728 operated by Compass DBA Delta Connection Select Delta 5469 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS fayetteville.jetcos… ▼ $186 Fayetteville Flights Cheap Flights to Fayetteville Now. Compare Flights up to 80% Off! Low Cost Flights · Last Minute Flights · Flight Deals Types: Direct Flights, Last Minute Flights, International Flights trvl.deals ▼ $49 Fayetteville Flights (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Fare Sale to Fayetteville Prices Updated Every 20 Minutes. kayak.com ▼ Flights to Fayetteville (4.1) Save On Flights to Fayetteville. Compare 100s of Sites At Once. Cheap airline tickets · Set price alerts · Best price on airfares · Search flexible dates Services: Flights, Hotel Deals, Car Rental, Vacation Packages Ratings: Selection 10/10 ­ Fees 9.5/10 ­ Prices 9.5/10, Trip Planning Truly makes sure you find the best deal ­ PC Magazine ­ Website 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Service 9/10 flighthub.com ▼ $188 Fayetteville Flights $188 ­ Available Now (800) 711­1755 Wednesday Jun­7 (4.5) Cheapest FlightHub Flights To Fayetteville Starting@$188 + Book Now! No Hidden Costs · All Major Airlines · Rating: 9.5/10 Types: Economy, Business Class, First Class · Service Excellence "over 20 years of travel experience" ­ travelalerts.ca Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. G Page 11 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%2C%20United%20States%20(LAX)%2Cto%3AFayettevi… 11/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 13 of 23 PageID #: 307 1  Account My Scratchpad 7 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  XNA ­ LAX Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Los Angeles Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (2) $537 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (47) $520 Save up to $408 when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  2+ Stops (17) $556 Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: 3:50p ­ 5:28p 3h 38m $536.99 American $520 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Airlines (42) Nonstop   Earn $5.37 plus an extra $5.37 United (14) $556 American Airlines 6012 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Delta (9) $722 Select Alaska Airlines $705 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) (1) 3:50p ­ 5:28p 3h 38m $704.39 Departure time ­ Alaska Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Fayetteville Nonstop   Earn $7.04 Morning (5:00a ­ plus an extra $7.04 Alaska Airlines 4282 operated by Compass Airlines As American 11:59a) Eagle Select Afternoon (12:00p ­ 5:59p) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) Evening (6:00p ­ 11:59p) 9:35a ­ 12:46p 5h 11m $637.69 United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip ad Run this search to 1 stop    Earn $6.38 Los Angeles 35m in DEN plus an extra $6.38 Jul 10 ­ Jul 12  Basic Economy on these travel sites: United 5564 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) Save even more by collecting 1:30p ­ 4:55p 5h 25m $562.69 Expedia+ points United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.63 plus an extra $5.63 SPONSORED LISTINGS 45m in DEN  Basic Economy View today's best flight deals from XNA. Book now! United 5493 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.2 out of 10) 6:09p ­ 9:39p 5h 30m $519.58 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.20 45m in DFW plus an extra $5.20 American Airlines 3666 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) GO Ex. G Page 12 of 22 12:21p ­ 3:57p 5h 36m 1 left at $635.01 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 1/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 14 of 23 PageID #: 308 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX 1 left at $635.01 1 stop    roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ 1h 2m in DFW Earn $6.35 Portland ­ Los Angeles ­ plus an extra $6.35 One Way as low as $82. American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Always Get Our Lowest Fare. Select Book Your PDX to LAX Flight Today & Save! 20­Minute Bag Guarantee Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) Ratings: Service 10/10 · Free In­Flight Messaging #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 8:00a ­ 11:44a 5h 44m $732.61 Program ­ U.S. News & American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip World Report 1 stop    Earn $7.33 Alaska Air® Miles Card 57m in DFW plus an extra $7.33 Join ­ Mileage Plan™ Flight Deals American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) cheaptickets.com ▼ (877) 468­5247 (4.2) 6:40a ­ 10:30a 5h 50m $822.75 roundtrip Cheap Flight Tickets ­ United XNA ­ LAX Lowest Price 1 stop   Earn $8.23 Guaranteed 35m in IAH plus an extra $8.23 Compare rates from all the  Basic Economy top airlines. Save when you book today! United 3995 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Cheap Event Tickets Destinations: New York · Free Rewards Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 4:33p ­ 8:26p 5h 53m $635.01 travel sites in roundtrip 2017 ­ Top Ten American Airlines XNA ­ LAX Reviews 1 stop    Earn $6.35 plus an extra $6.35 Flight Deals Under $199 1h 13m in DFW Vacation Deals Under $500 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Up to 50% Off Hotels Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 7:54p ­ 11:48p 5h 54m $519.58 (4.6) American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip $83 Los Angeles Round 1 stop   Earn $5.20 Trip ­ Book Now, Fares 1h 9m in DFW plus an extra $5.20 May Change Cheap Flights To Los American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle ad Select Angeles From $83. Fly From Run this search to Las Vegas. Book Today! No Extra Charges Los Angeles Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) Destinations: US, Europe · Any Flight Combinations Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: "...Flights for those, Asia, Caribbean, Canada inspired to 10:32a ­ 2:28p 5h 56m $562.09 travel." ­ CrunchBase American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Round­Trip To Los Angeles 1 stop    Earn $5.62 One­Way To Los Angeles Save even more by collecting 1h 21m in DFW plus an extra $5.62 Expedia+ points Last Minute Los Angeles American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.2 out of 10) View today's best flight deals from XNA. Book now! 1:59p ­ 5:55p 5h 56m 4 left at $700.64 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.01 1h 19m in DFW plus an extra $7.01 American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 3:15p ­ 7:23p 6h 8m $562.69 GO United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Ex. G Earn $5.63 1 stop    Page 13 of 22 46m in IAH plus an extra $5.63 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 2/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 15 of 23 PageID #: 309 plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy United 4148 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.9 out of 10) 6:28a ­ 10:42a 6h 14m 1 left at $707.61 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.08 1h 18m in DFW plus an extra $7.08 American Airlines 3631 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.1 out of 10) Run XNA ­ LAX on Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: ad GO  Fayetteville ­ Los Angeles  Jul 10 ­ Jul 12  1 Traveler 6:09p ­ 10:26p 6h 17m $519.58 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.20 1h 30m in DFW plus an extra $5.20 American Airlines 3666 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 10:21a ­ 2:40p 6h 19m $721.59 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.22 40m in MSP plus an extra $7.22  Basic Economy Delta 4780 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees ad Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) Run this search to Los Angeles Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 11:45a ­ 4:15p 6h 30m $562.69 on these travel sites: roundtrip United XNA ­ LAX 1 stop   Earn $5.63 1h 8m in IAH plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy Save even more by collecting United 4354 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Expedia+ points Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) View today's best flight deals 6:57p ­ 11:33p 6h 36m $562.69 from XNA. Book now! United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.63 1h 15m in IAH plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy United 3617 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) 1:59p ­ 6:54p 6h 55m $789.46 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.89 GO 2h 19m in DFW plus an extra $7.89 Ex. G American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Page 14 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 3/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 16 of 23 PageID #: 310 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.7 out of 10) 10:32a ­ 3:37p 7h 5m 1 left at $704.74 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $7.05 DFW, SAT plus an extra $7.05 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select American Airlines 6027 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 8:56p 7h 6m $1,164.92 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.65 46m in ORD plus an extra $11.65 American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.8 out of 10) 12:23p ­ 5:33p 7h 10m $1,164.92 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.65 46m in ORD plus an extra $11.65 American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 4:33p ­ 9:45p 7h 12m 2 left at $639.11 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $6.39 DFW, PHX plus an extra $6.39 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) ad Run this search to Los Angeles 7:35a ­ 12:53p 7h 18m $562.69 Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 roundtrip United XNA ­ LAX on these travel sites: 1 stop   Earn $5.63 1h 24m in SFO plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy United 5550 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Save even more by collecting Expedia+ points Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 3:15p ­ 8:35p 7h 20m $562.69 View today's best flight deals United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip from XNA. Book now! 1 stop   Earn $5.63 1h 52m in IAH plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy United 4148 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 4:33p ­ 9:55p 7h 22m 1 left at $639.11 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.39 DFW, ABQ plus an extra $6.39 GO American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Ex. G Select American Airlines 6070 operated by Compass Airlines As Page 15 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 4/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 17 of 23 PageID #: 311 American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 10:32a ­ 3:57p 7h 25m $635.01 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.35 2h 51m in DFW plus an extra $6.35 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 11:25a 7h 25m $923.68 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $9.24 1h 8m in ATL plus an extra $9.24 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 11:45a ­ 5:12p 7h 27m $562.69 United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.63 2h 5m in IAH plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy United 4354 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 6:28a ­ 11:59a 7h 31m 5 left at $704.74 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $7.05 DFW, TUS plus an extra $7.05 American Airlines 3631 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select American Airlines 3015 operated by Skywest Airlines As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) Run this search to ad 10:32a ­ 4:05p 7h 33m $703.68 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Los Angeles Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 2 stops    Earn $7.04 on these travel sites: DFW, IAH plus an extra $7.04 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle American Airlines 6065 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle Save even more by collecting Expedia+ points Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 5:55p 7h 34m 5 left at $635.01 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip View today's best flight deals from XNA. Book now! 1 stop    Earn $6.35 2h 57m in DFW plus an extra $6.35 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.4 out of 10) 6:09p ­ 11:48p 7h 39m $519.58 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $5.20 2h 50m in DFW plus an extra $5.20 GO American Airlines 3666 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Ex. G Page 16 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 5/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 18 of 23 PageID #: 312 Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 4:33p ­ 10:13p 7h 40m $603.69 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.04 DFW, LAS plus an extra $6.04 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 11:50a 7h 50m 1 left at $692.59 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.93 1h 20m in ORD plus an extra $6.93 American Airlines 3318 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.3 out of 10) 4:33p ­ 10:26p 7h 53m 3 left at $545.59 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.46 3h 8m in DFW plus an extra $5.46 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.2 out of 10) 9:35a ­ 3:30p 7h 55m $562.69 United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.63 3h 25m in DEN  Basic Economy plus an extra $5.63 United 5564 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.1 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 6:19p 7h 58m $704.74 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip ad 2 stops   Earn $7.05 Run this search to DFW, PHX plus an extra $7.05 Los Angeles Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select on these travel sites: Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 1:59p ­ 8:01p 8h 2m $818.79 Save even more by collecting Expedia+ points American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $8.19 DFW, AUS plus an extra $8.19 American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle View today's best flight deals Select from XNA. Book now! Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 1:59p ­ 8:01p 8h 2m 4 left at $818.79 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $8.19 DFW, AUS plus an extra $8.19 American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) GO Ex. G 7:35a ­ 1:43p 8h 8m $562.69 Page 17 of 22 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 6/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 19 of 23 PageID #: 313 roundtrip United XNA ­ LAX Earn $5.63 1 stop   plus an extra $5.63 2h 21m in SFO  Basic Economy United 5550 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.9 out of 10) 10:21a ­ 4:35p 8h 14m $721.59 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.22 2h 29m in MSP  Basic Economy plus an extra $7.22 Delta 4780 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.1 out of 10) 3:25p ­ 9:40p 8h 15m $721.59 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.22 1h 38m in ATL plus an extra $7.22  Basic Economy Delta 3994 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.1 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 12:30p 8h 30m $923.68 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $9.24 2h 9m in ATL plus an extra $9.24 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.9 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 6:54p 8h 33m 2 left at $635.01 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $6.35 3h 57m in DFW plus an extra $6.35 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select ad Run this search to Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.9 out of 10) Los Angeles Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 4:33p ­ 11:10p 8h 37m 1 left at $639.11 on these travel sites: American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.39 DFW, SJC plus an extra $6.39 Save even more by collecting American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle American Airlines 6051 operated by Compass Airlines As Select Expedia+ points American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3 out of 10) View today's best flight deals from XNA. Book now! 3:15p ­ 10:00p 8h 45m $562.69 United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.63 3h 17m in IAH plus an extra $5.63  Basic Economy United 4148 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 12:47p 8h 47m $1,164.92 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip GO 1 stop    Earn $11.65 Ex. G 2h 25m in ORD plus an extra $11.65 Page 18 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 7/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 20 of 23 PageID #: 314 American Airlines 3318 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.8 out of 10) 4:33p ­ 11:48p 9h 15m $707.24 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $7.07 4h 28m in DFW plus an extra $7.07 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 7:35a ­ 2:51p 9h 16m $562.69 United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $5.63 3h 26m in SFO  Basic Economy plus an extra $5.63 United 5550 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.5 out of 10) 12:23p ­ 7:42p 9h 19m $1,164.92 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $11.65 2h 54m in ORD plus an extra $11.65 American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.5 out of 10) 10:32a ­ 5:55p 9h 23m $736.51 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.37 4h 46m in DFW plus an extra $7.37 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.5 out of 10) Run this search to ad 3:25p ­ 10:50p 9h 25m 5 left at $747.06 Los Angeles Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 1 stop    Earn $7.47 on these travel sites: 2h 49m in ATL plus an extra $7.47 Delta 3994 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Save even more by collecting Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) Expedia+ points 4:34p ­ 12:10a +1 9h 36m $721.59 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip View today's best flight deals 1 stop    Earn $7.22 from XNA. Book now! 3h 41m in MSP  Basic Economy plus an extra $7.22 Delta 5285 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 8:01p 9h 40m $648.71 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.49 DFW, AUS plus an extra $6.49 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle GO Select Ex. G Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.6 out of 10) Page 19 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 8/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 21 of 23 PageID #: 315 12:21p ­ 8:01p 9h 40m $648.71 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.49 DFW, AUS plus an extra $6.49 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.6 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 8:01p 9h 40m $648.71 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $6.49 DFW, AUS plus an extra $6.49 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.6 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 8:26p 10h 5m 5 left at $736.51 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.37 5h 27m in DFW plus an extra $7.37 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.2 out of 10) 10:32a ­ 6:54p 10h 22m $736.51 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.37 5h 46m in DFW plus an extra $7.37 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4 out of 10) 10:32a ­ 7:24p 10h 52m 2 left at $566.19 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $5.66 DFW, TUS plus an extra $5.66 ad American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Run this search to Select American Airlines 6037 operated by Compass Airlines As Los Angeles American Eagle Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.9 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 9:25p 11h 4m $648.71 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip Save even more by collecting Expedia+ points 2 stops   Earn $6.49 DFW, SAN plus an extra $6.49 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle American Airlines 6074 operated by Compass Airlines As Select View today's best flight deals American Eagle from XNA. Book now! Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.8 out of 10) 10:21a ­ 8:10p 11h 49m $763.77 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.64 5h 50m in MSP plus an extra $7.64 Delta 4780 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) GO Ex. G 10:32a ­ 8:26p 11h 54m 5 left at $736.51 Page 20 of 22 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angele… 9/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 22 of 23 PageID #: 316 roundtrip American Airlines XNA ­ LAX Earn $7.37 1 stop    plus an extra $7.37 7h 16m in DFW American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 10:26p 12h 5m $707.24 American Airlines XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $7.07 7h 22m in DFW plus an extra $7.07 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 9:50a ­ 8:00p 12h 10m 2 left at $744.10 Delta XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $7.44 ATL, DFW plus an extra $7.44 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Delta 5731 operated by Compass DBA Delta Connection Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.5 out of 10) 6:57p ­ 7:27a +1 14h 30m $555.79 United XNA ­ LAX roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $5.56 IAH, LAS plus an extra $5.56  Basic Economy United 3617 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) ad Run this search to SPONSORED LISTINGS Los Angeles Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: hipmunk.com ▼ Los Angeles Airfare ­ 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Los Angeles Airfare. Save up to 60% off Airfare. Top Brands · Search, Select & Save · Compare Prices · Best Selection Amenities: Inflight WiFi, Free Checked Bags, Inflight Meals Save even more by collecting Ratings: Website 8/10, Movies, TV and Sports Expedia+ points "Hipmunk is the new gold standard in hotel and flight searches" ­ Forbes View today's best flight deals from XNA. Book now! lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to LAX Airfare Sale On Now to Los Angeles. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! Amazing Deals on Flights · Get Cheap Flights Now onetravel.com ▼ $113 Los Angeles RoundTrip ­ Low Fare On Flights (888) 481­9454 Get Cheap Flights to Los Angeles & Save. Book Your Flight to (4.4) Los Angeles Now! Safe and Secure Booking · Buy with Confidence · Book Proudly and Save · Over 20 Years in Business Services: Use Coupons & Save More, Up To $15 Off on bkg Fee Low Fare Promise ­ Online­Travel­Sites­Review, Deals from 450+ Airlines, Free Cancellation GO farespotter.net ▼ $49 Los Angeles Flights Ex. G (855) 455­1172 Los Angeles Fare Sale On Now! Hurry, Deals End Soon. Page 21 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angel… 10/11 6/7/2017 XNA to LAX Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-9 Filed 06/13/17 Page 23 of 23 PageID #: 317 Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. ad Run this search to Los Angeles Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 on these travel sites: Save even more by collecting Expedia+ points View today's best flight deals from XNA. Book now! GO Ex. G Page 22 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3Afayetteville%2C%20ar%2Cto%3ALos%20Angeles%2C%20CA%20(LAX­Los%20Angel… 11/11

Exhibit H

EXHIBIT H 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 2 of 27 PageID #: 319 1  Account My Scratchpad 4 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  SHA ­ SEA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Seattle Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (4) $1,421 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (43) $1,098 Save $193* on average when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  2+ Stops (36) $903 Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: 1:40p ­ 9:35a 10h 55m $1,420.43 China Eastern $1,490 Hainan Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip Airlines (19) Nonstop    Earn $14.20 plus an extra $14.20 Hainan Airlines $1,421 (16) Select Delta (15) $1,518 Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.8 out of 10) Alaska Airlines $1,509 (10) 12:20p ­ 9:22a 12h 2m $1,489.56 Air Canada (8) $1,944 China Eastern Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip Air China (8) $1,682 Nonstop    Earn $14.90 plus an extra $14.90 American $1,440 China Eastern Airlines 8889 operated by Delta Air Lines Airlines (7) Select Show all Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) Departure time ­ Shanghai 12:20p ­ 9:22a 12h 2m $1,517.10 Delta PVG ­ SEA roundtrip Early Morning (12:00a Nonstop    Earn $15.17 ­ 4:59a) plus an extra $15.17 Morning (5:00a ­ 11:59a) Select Afternoon (12:00p ­ Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) 5:59p) Evening (6:00p ­ 12:20p ­ 9:22a 12h 2m $1,849.25 11:59p) China Southern Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $18.49 plus an extra $18.49 SPONSORED LISTINGS China Southern Airlines 1046 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) 3:55p ­ 1:50p 12h 55m $1,943.22 Air Canada PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $19.43 1h 35m in YVR plus an extra $19.43 Air Canada 8097 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.6 out of 10) Ex. H Page 1 of 26 8:05p ­ 7:50p 14h 45m $1,476.76 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 1/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 3 of 27 PageID #: 320 EVA Airways PVG ­ SEA $1,476.76 1 stop    roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ 1h 40m in TPE Earn $14.77 Redmond ­ Seattle ­ One plus an extra $14.77 Way as low as $74. Always Get Our Lowest Fare. Select Book Your RDM to SEA Flight Today & Save! Power at Your Seat Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) Ratings: Service 10/10 · Artisan Food & Drink #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 1:00p ­ 1:10p 15h 10m $1,097.16 Program ­ U.S. News & Asiana Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip World Report 1 stop   Earn $10.97 Alaska Air® Miles Card 2h 45m in ICN plus an extra $10.97 Plan & Book A Flight Flight Deals Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) tripadvisor.com ▼ (4.9) 11:15a ­ 11:35a 15h 20m $1,473.28 5 Cheap Flights to Hainan Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip Seattle, Washington from $119 1 stop   Earn $14.73 Cheap flights to all 2h 25m in PEK plus an extra $14.73 destinations Search on TripAdvisor for deals Ratings: Travel info 10/10 Select ­ Website 10/10 Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 12:15p ­ 12:35p 15h 20m $1,656.16 (4.6) Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip $119 Seattle RoundTrip 1 stop   Earn $16.56 Fares ­ Book By 3h in ICN plus an extra $16.56 Midnight, Fares Change Cheap Flights To Seattle Korean Air 5886 operated by China Eastern Airlines From $119. Fly From Select Houston. Book Today & Save! Service Excellence Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.2 out of 10) Types: Round­Trip, One­Way · Our Unbeatable Prices "...Flights for those, Multi­City, Domestic 10:55a ­ 11:35a 15h 40m $1,749.01 inspired to Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip travel." ­ CrunchBase 1 stop   Earn $17.49 Round­Trip To Seattle 2h 40m in PEK plus an extra $17.49 Last Minute Seattle Fares One­Way Deals To Seattle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 10:55a ­ 11:35a 15h 40m $2,881.22 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $28.81 2h 40m in PEK plus an extra $28.81 Shenzhen Airlines 1832 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 7:54a 15h 54m $1,956.68 Delta SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.57 2h in PEK plus an extra $19.57 Delta 6541 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 7:54a 15h 54m $2,020.27 China Eastern Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip Ex. H Earn $20.20 1 stop    Page 2 of 26 2h in PEK plus an extra $20.20 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 2/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 27 PageID #: 321 plus an extra $20.20 China Eastern Airlines 8885 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 12:10p ­ 1:17p 16h 7m $1,730.16 United PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.30 2h 28m in SFO plus an extra $17.30 Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 10:00a ­ 11:25a 16h 25m $3,850.03 All Nippon Airways PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $38.50 4h 15m in NRT plus an extra $38.50 All Nippon Airways 5712 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) 11:40a ­ 1:10p 16h 30m $1,097.16 Asiana Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $10.97 4h 10m in ICN plus an extra $10.97 Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 11:00a ­ 12:35p 16h 35m $1,378.65 Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $13.79 4h 15m in ICN plus an extra $13.79 Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 7:35p ­ 9:49p 17h 14m $1,562.60 Delta PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.63 2h 10m in LAX plus an extra $15.63 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 9:00a ­ 11:35a 17h 35m $1,927.78 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $19.28 4h 25m in PEK plus an extra $19.28 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) Ex. H 8:30a ­ 11:35a 18h 5m $1,927.78 Page 3 of 26 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip Earn $19.28 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 3/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 27 PageID #: 322 1 stop    Earn $19.28 5h 5m in PEK plus an extra $19.28 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 8:20a ­ 11:35a 18h 15m $1,473.28 Hainan Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $14.73 5h 15m in PEK plus an extra $14.73 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 4:21p 18h 21m $1,713.87 China Eastern Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.14 4h 39m in SFO plus an extra $17.14 China Eastern Airlines 4373 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 9:10a ­ 12:35p 18h 25m $1,656.16 Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $16.56 6h 25m in ICN plus an extra $16.56 Korean Air 5858 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 11:35a 18h 35m $2,025.75 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $20.26 5h 35m in PEK plus an extra $20.26 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 7:55a ­ 11:35a 18h 40m $1,859.10 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $18.59 5h 40m in PEK plus an extra $18.59 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 8:50a ­ 12:35p 18h 45m $1,378.65 Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $13.79 6h 30m in ICN plus an extra $13.79 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) Ex. H Page 4 of 26 7:35p ­ 11:39p 19h 4m $1,562.60 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 4/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 6 of 27 PageID #: 323 Delta PVG ­ SEA $1,562.60 1 stop    roundtrip 3h 56m in LAX Earn $15.63 plus an extra $15.63 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 8:30a ­ 12:35p 19h 5m $1,378.65 Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $13.79 7h 10m in ICN plus an extra $13.79 Korean Air 5808 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 10:30p 19h 5m $1,439.23 American Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.39 4h in LAX plus an extra $14.39 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 5:20p 19h 20m $1,662.85 China Eastern Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $16.63 4h 41m in LAX plus an extra $16.63 China Eastern Airlines 8024 operated by Virgin America Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 12:15p ­ 4:38p 19h 23m $1,333.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $13.33 ICN, SFO plus an extra $13.33 Shanghai Airlines 5033 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 11:35a 19h 35m $1,927.78 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $19.28 6h 30m in PEK plus an extra $19.28 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.1 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 4:49p 19h 59m $1,462.63 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.63 NRT, LAX plus an extra $14.63 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.2 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 4:49p 19h 59m $1,462.63 roundtrip Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA Earn $14.63 Ex. H 2 stops   Page 5 of 26  NRT, LAX plus an extra $14.63 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 5/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 7 of 27 PageID #: 324 American Airlines 8408 operated by Japan Airlines Intl Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 12:15p ­ 5:20p 20h 5m $1,333.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $13.33 ICN, SFO plus an extra $13.33 Shanghai Airlines 5033 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 12:50p ­ 6:22p 20h 32m $1,497.40 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.97 HND, SFO plus an extra $14.97 American Airlines 8401 operated by Japan Airlines Intl American Airlines 6795 operated by Alaska Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 1:10p ­ 7:50p 21h 40m $1,476.76 EVA Airways PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.77 8h 40m in TPE plus an extra $14.77 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5 out of 10) 8:40a ­ 3:48p 22h 8m $1,664.03 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.64 HND, LAX plus an extra $16.64 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.8 out of 10) 8:40a ­ 3:48p 22h 8m $1,664.03 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.64 HND, LAX plus an extra $16.64 China Eastern Airlines 9815 operated by Shanghai Airlines Co Select Ltd Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.8 out of 10) 12:30a ­ 7:45a 22h 15m $1,702.84 United PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.03 8h 30m in SFO plus an extra $17.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.7 out of 10) 9:00a ­ 6:35p 24h 35m $2,881.84 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $28.82 PEK, YVR plus an extra $28.82 Air Canada 8099 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Ex. H Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) Page 6 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 6/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 8 of 27 PageID #: 325 12:45a ­ 10:57a 25h 12m $2,445.76 KLM PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $24.46 3h 20m in AMS plus an extra $24.46 KLM 4814 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select KLM 6033 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 12:40a ­ 11:15a 25h 35m $3,497.36 British Airways PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $34.97 3h 10m in LHR plus an extra $34.97 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 9:15p ­ 7:54a +1 25h 39m $1,956.68 Delta PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.57 11h 40m in PEK plus an extra $19.57 Delta 6469 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 9:05a ­ 8:15p 26h 10m $1,666.63 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $16.67 NRT, LAX plus an extra $16.67 Select Flight details and baggage fees 8:40a ­ 8:15p 26h 35m $1,664.03 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.64 HND, LAX plus an extra $16.64 China Eastern Airlines 9815 operated by Shanghai Airlines Co Select Ltd Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 8:40a ­ 8:15p 26h 35m $1,664.03 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.64 HND, LAX plus an extra $16.64 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 12:05a ­ 11:40a 26h 35m $1,966.56 Air France PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.67 3h 40m in CDG plus an extra $19.67 Air France 5201 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Air France 3622 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 9:00a ­ 8:55p 26h 55m $2,881.84 Ex. H roundtrip Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA Page 7 of 26 Earn $28.82 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 7/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 9 of 27 PageID #: 326 2 stops   Earn $28.82 PEK, YVR plus an extra $28.82 Air Canada 8101 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:05a ­ 9:49p 27h 44m $1,666.63 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $16.67 NRT, LAX plus an extra $16.67 Select Flight details and baggage fees 12:05a ­ 12:55p 27h 50m $2,074.68 Emirates PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $20.75 4h 40m in DXB plus an extra $20.75 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 8:40a ­ 9:49p 28h 9m $1,664.03 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.64 HND, LAX plus an extra $16.64 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 8:40a ­ 9:49p 28h 9m $1,664.03 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.64 HND, LAX plus an extra $16.64 China Eastern Airlines 9815 operated by Shanghai Airlines Co Select Ltd Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 7:35p ­ 8:55a +1 28h 20m $1,914.94 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $19.15 LAX, SJC plus an extra $19.15 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 8:04a +1 28h 39m $1,500.66 American Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.01 LAX, SFO plus an extra $15.01 American Airlines 6039 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle American Airlines 6962 operated by Alaska Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 8:04a +1 28h 39m $1,500.66 American Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.01 Ex. H plus an extra $15.01 LAX, SFO Page 8 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 8/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 10 of 27 PageID #: 327 American Airlines 6055 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle American Airlines 6962 operated by Alaska Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 8:20a ­ 10:30p 29h 10m $1,508.63 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.09 PEK, SJC plus an extra $15.09 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:05a ­ 11:39p 29h 34m $1,666.63 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $16.67 NRT, LAX plus an extra $16.67 Select Flight details and baggage fees 8:55p ­ 11:35a +1 29h 40m $1,473.28 Hainan Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $14.73 16h 45m in PEK plus an extra $14.73 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 8:55p ­ 11:35a +1 29h 40m $1,473.28 Hainan Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.73 16h 30m in PEK plus an extra $14.73 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 7:45p ­ 11:35a +1 30h 50m $1,569.56 Hainan Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $15.70 XIY, PEK plus an extra $15.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 4:40p ­ 8:50a +1 31h 10m $1,681.86 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.82 PEK, LAX plus an extra $16.82 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 8:10p ­ 12:56p +1 31h 46m $1,714.97 United PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.15 16h 40m in LAX plus an extra $17.15 United 5608 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Ex. H Page 9 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 9/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 11 of 27 PageID #: 328 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 5:05p ­ 11:25a +1 33h 20m $2,918.96 All Nippon Airways PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $29.19 21h 5m in NRT plus an extra $29.19 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.8 out of 10) 9:00p ­ 3:48p +1 33h 48m $1,725.70 China Eastern Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.26 19h in LAX plus an extra $17.26 China Eastern Airlines 4394 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:40p ­ 12:35p +1 33h 55m $1,463.16 Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $14.63 21h 35m in ICN plus an extra $14.63 Korean Air 5880 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:00p ­ 12:35p +1 34h 35m $1,281.65 Korean Air PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $12.82 22h 15m in ICN plus an extra $12.82 Korean Air 5810 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:20p ­ 1:10p +1 35h 50m $1,097.16 Asiana Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $10.97 23h 25m in ICN plus an extra $10.97 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 10:55a ­ 8:50a +1 36h 55m $1,686.14 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.86 PEK, LAX plus an extra $16.86 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 10:35p ­ 9:49p +1 38h 14m $2,230.44 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $22.30 IST, YYZ plus an extra $22.30 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) Ex. H 8:20a ­ 8:55a +1 39h 35m $1,518.13 Page 10 of 26 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 10/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 12 of 27 PageID #: 329 roundtrip Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA Earn $15.18 2 stops    plus an extra $15.18 PEK, SJC Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:00a ­ 9:35a +1 39h 35m $2,881.84 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $28.82 PEK, YVR plus an extra $28.82 Air Canada 8089 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:00a ­ 9:35a +1 39h 35m Select to price Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA 2 stops   Select PEK, YVR Air Canada 8089 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:55p ­ 9:38p +1 40h 43m $1,771.49 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $17.71 PEK, LAX plus an extra $17.71 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 8:20a ­ 10:04a +1 40h 44m $1,518.13 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.18 PEK, SJC plus an extra $15.18 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 4:40p ­ 6:35p +1 40h 55m $3,035.63 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $30.36 PEK, YVR plus an extra $30.36 Shenzhen Airlines 1884 operated by Air China Limited Air Canada 8099 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 9:38p +1 41h 28m $1,771.49 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $17.71 PEK, LAX plus an extra $17.71 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 6:55p ­ 9:38p +1 41h 43m $1,771.49 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $17.71 plus an extra $17.71 PEK, LAX Ex. H Select Page 11 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 11/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 13 of 27 PageID #: 330 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 12:50p ­ 4:49p +1 42h 59m $1,471.73 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.72 HND, LAX plus an extra $14.72 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 4:40p ­ 8:55p +1 43h 15m $3,058.88 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $30.59 PEK, YVR plus an extra $30.59 Shenzhen Airlines 1884 operated by Air China Limited Air Canada 8101 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 4:40p ­ 9:38p +1 43h 58m $1,771.49 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $17.71 PEK, LAX plus an extra $17.71 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 7:15a ­ 12:55p +1 44h 40m $1,836.71 Emirates PVG ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $18.37 21h 30m in DXB plus an extra $18.37 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 10:05p ­ 10:25a +2 51h 20m $902.96 Xiamen Airlines SHA ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $9.03 FOC, SZX plus an extra $9.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS Ex. H Page 12 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 12/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 14 of 27 PageID #: 331 hipmunk.com ▼ Cheap Flight to Seattle ­ 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Flight to Seattle Today. Save up to 60% off Airfare. Top Brands · Best Selection · Search, Select & Save · Compare Prices Amenities: Inflight WiFi, Free Checked Bags, Inflight Meals Ratings: Website 8/10, Movies, TV and Sports "Hipmunk is the new gold standard in hotel and flight searches" ­ Forbes Flight Deals Email Sign­up Seattle Hotels Seattle Car Rentals Seattle Vacations Seattle Flights cheaptickets.com ▼ Flights ­ Cheap Flight Tickets (877) 468­5247 Lowest price guaranteed. Free cancellation. Save up to $537 with (4.2) bundle. Book! Cheap Car Rentals · 24/7 Customer Support · Hotels Under $50 Destinations: New York, Las Vegas, San Francisco, Maui · Free Rewards, Los Angeles, Rome, London, Chicago, Key West Ratings: Selection 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10, Barcelona ­ Fees 9/10 ­ Prices 9/10 One of the best online travel sites in 2017 ­ Top Ten ­ Service 9/10 ­ Website 9/10 lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle Airfare Sale On Now to Seattle. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! Get Cheap Flights Now · Amazing Deals on Flights onetravel.com ▼ $167 Cheap Seattle RoundTrip ­ Low Fare On Flights (888) 481­9454 Get Cheap Flights to Seattle & Save. Book Your Next Flight to (4.4) Seattle Now! Over 450 Airline Partners · Low Cost Airfares · Fast & Easy Booking Services: Extensive Offerings, Awesome Experience · 24 X 7 Customer Support Low Fare Promise ­ Online­Travel­Sites­Review, Deals change frequently, 24/7 Customer Service Give your feedback to help us make improvements. ** Average savings based on all vacation package bookings with Flight + Hotel on Orbitz.com from May 2015 through April 2016, as compared to the price of the same components booked separately. Savings will vary based on origin/destination, length of trip, stay dates and selected travel supplier(s). Savings not available on all packages. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. H Page 13 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 13/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 15 of 27 PageID #: 332 1  Account My Scratchpad 4 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  SHA ­ SEA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Your selected 1:40p ­ 9:35a 10h 55m from $1,420.43 departure Hainan Airlines PVG ­ SEA roundtrip Mon, Jul 10 Change Nonstop Select your return to Shanghai Wed, Jul 12 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (4) $1,456 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (58) $1,421 12:00p ­ 3:05p +1 12h 5m + $34.63 2+ Stops (26) $1,433 Hainan Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $14.55 plus an extra $14.55 Airlines included From: Alaska Airlines $1,421 Select (23) Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.8 out of 10) China Eastern $1,421 Airlines (16) 3:39p ­ 7:15p +1 12h 36m + $34.63 Korean Air (12) $1,500 Delta SEA ­ PVG roundtrip United (12) $1,460 Nonstop    Earn $14.55 plus an extra $14.55 Hainan Airlines $1,456 (11) Select Delta (8) $1,456 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) American $1,460 Airlines (7) 3:39p ­ 7:15p +1 12h 36m + $248.27 Show all China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $16.69 Departure time ­ Seattle plus an extra $16.69 China Eastern Airlines 8888 operated by Delta Air Lines Early Morning (12:00a ­ 4:59a) Select Morning (5:00a ­ Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) 11:59a) Afternoon (12:00p ­ 3:39p ­ 7:15p +1 12h 36m + $702.61 5:59p) China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Evening (6:00p ­ Nonstop    Earn $21.23 plus an extra $21.23 11:59p) China Southern Airlines 1047 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Airports From: Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS SHA $1,433 (Shanghai) (15) 9:05a ­ 2:10p +1 14h 5m + $29.58 PVG $1,421 roundtrip Air Canada SEA ­ PVG (Shanghai) (73) Earn $14.50 1 stop   1h 26m in YVR plus an extra $14.50 Air Canada 8090 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Ex. H Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.6 out of 10) Page 14 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 1/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 16 of 27 PageID #: 333 2:15p ­ 8:10p +1 14h 55m + $321.73 Korean Air SEA ­ PVG roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ 1 stop   Earn $17.42 Redmond ­ Seattle ­ One plus an extra $17.42 Way as low as $74. 1h 30m in ICN Always Get Our Lowest Fare. Book Your RDM to SEA Select Flight Today & Save! Award Winning Service Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.6 out of 10) Ratings: Service 10/10 · Power at Your Seat #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 Program ­ U.S. News & 2:40p ­ 8:55p +1 15h 15m + $299.51 World Report Asiana Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Flight Deals 1 stop   Earn $17.20 Plan & Book A Flight 2h in ICN plus an extra $17.20 Alaska Air® Miles Card Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.6 out of 10) tripadvisor.com ▼ (4.9) 5 Cheap Flights to 5:07p ­ 11:45p +1 15h 38m + $193.53 Seattle, Washington Delta SEA ­ SHA roundtrip from $119 1 stop    Earn $16.14 Cheap flights to all plus an extra $16.14 destinations Search on 1h 40m in PEK TripAdvisor for deals Ratings: Travel info 10/10 Delta 6568 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select ­ Website 10/10 Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 + $193.53 (4.6) 5:07p ­ 11:55p +1 15h 48m Delta SEA ­ SHA roundtrip $119 Seattle RoundTrip Fares ­ Our Lowest 1 stop    Earn $16.14 Prices Guaranteed. 1h 50m in PEK plus an extra $16.14 Cheap Flights To Seattle From $119. Fly From Delta 6540 operated by China Eastern Airlines Houston. Book Today & Select Save! No Extra Charges Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) Types: Round­Trip, One­Way · Our Unbeatable Prices "...Flights for those, Multi­City, Domestic inspired to 9:55a ­ 5:25p +1 16h 30m + $39.13 travel." ­ CrunchBase United SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.60 Round­Trip To Seattle plus an extra $14.60 Last Minute Seattle Fares 1h 25m in SFO One­Way Deals To Seattle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.2 out of 10) 1:20p ­ 8:55p +1 16h 35m + $1,077.66 All Nippon Airways SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $24.98 3h 5m in NRT plus an extra $24.98 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) 2:15p ­ 10:00p +1 16h 45m + $321.73 Korean Air SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $17.42 3h 30m in ICN plus an extra $17.42 Korean Air 5809 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.2 out of 10) 9:45a ­ 5:50p +1 17h 5m + $73.47 Delta SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Ex. H 1 stop    Earn $14.94 Page 15 of 26 plus an extra $14.94 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 2/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 17 of 27 PageID #: 334 55m in LAX plus an extra $14.94 Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 7:40a ­ 4:30p +1 17h 50m + $414.33 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $18.35 1h 54m in SFO plus an extra $18.35 China Eastern Airlines 4374 operated by SkyWest Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 1:20p ­ 10:10p +1 17h 50m + $1,162.50 All Nippon Airways SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $25.83 3h 50m in NRT plus an extra $25.83 All Nippon Airways 5715 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) 2:00p ­ 10:55p +1 17h 55m + $82.43 Hainan Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $15.03 3h 55m in PEK plus an extra $15.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 11:07a ­ 8:30p +1 18h 23m + $39.13 United SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.60 3h 7m in SFO plus an extra $14.60 Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 7:55a ­ 5:20p +1 18h 25m Select to price China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 1h 45m in LAX China Eastern Airlines 4336 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 8:25p ­ 6:00a +2 18h 35m + $253.74 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $16.74 1h 53m in LAX plus an extra $16.74 China Eastern Airlines 4335 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 7:48a ­ 5:25p +1 18h 37m Select to price Ex. H United SEA ­ PVG Page 16 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 3/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 18 of 27 PageID #: 335 1 stop    Select 3h 32m in SFO Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 2:10a ­ 12:05p +1 18h 55m + $320.53 EVA Airways SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.41 5h in TPE plus an extra $17.41 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 7:06a ­ 5:20p +1 19h 14m Select to price China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 2h 40m in LAX China Eastern Airlines 8054 operated by Virgin America Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 4:25p +1 19h 25m + $39.13 American Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.60 2h 52m in LAX plus an extra $14.60 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 9:45a ­ 8:10p +1 19h 25m + $79.33 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.00 YVR, ICN plus an extra $15.00 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.9 out of 10) 9:55a ­ 8:30p +1 19h 35m Select to price United SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 4h 20m in SFO Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 6:59p ­ 6:00a +2 20h 1m + $6.33 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.27 3h 10m in LAX plus an extra $14.27 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 6:56p ­ 6:00a +2 20h 4m + $253.74 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $16.74 3h 25m in LAX plus an extra $16.74 China Eastern Airlines 3871 operated by Virgin America Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) Ex. H 6:00a ­ 5:30p +1 20h 30m + $174.73 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Page 17 of 26 Earn $15.95 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 4/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 19 of 27 PageID #: 336 2 stops    Earn $15.95 LAX, ICN plus an extra $15.95 Korean Air 5885 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.5 out of 10) 6:30p ­ 6:00a +2 20h 30m + $501.71 Delta SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.22 3h 45m in LAX plus an extra $19.22 Delta 6475 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 5:43a ­ 5:25p +1 20h 42m Select to price United SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 5h 50m in SFO Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 8:05a ­ 8:10p +1 21h 5m + $84.73 Korean Air SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.05 LAX, ICN plus an extra $15.05 Korean Air 6025 operated by Alaska Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 8:05a ­ 8:10p +1 21h 5m Select to price Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select LAX, ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.6 out of 10) 7:48a ­ 8:30p +1 21h 42m Select to price United SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 6h 27m in SFO Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 11:15p ­ 1:05p +2 22h 50m + $3,508.52 United SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $49.29 4h 35m in ORD plus an extra $49.29 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 4:00p ­ 6:00a +2 23h 0m + $43.70 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.64 PDX, LAX plus an extra $14.64 Alaska Airlines 2127 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:00p ­ 6:00a +2 23h 0m + $43.70 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Ex. H 2 stops    Earn $14.64 Page 18 of 26 plus an extra $14.64 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 5/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 20 of 27 PageID #: 337 PDX, LAX plus an extra $14.64 Alaska Airlines 2127 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 11:59p ­ 2:00p +2 23h 1m + $89.63 American Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.10 4h 40m in ORD plus an extra $15.10 Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.5 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 8:10p +1 23h 10m Select to price Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select LAX, ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.9 out of 10) 8:30a ­ 10:55p +1 23h 25m + $91.98 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.12 SJC, PEK plus an extra $15.12 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 2:10a ­ 4:40p +1 23h 30m + $1,790.08 EVA Airways SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $32.11 9h 30m in TPE plus an extra $32.11 EVA Airways 2782 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.8 out of 10) 12:15a ­ 2:55p +1 23h 40m + $39.13 American Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.60 4h 52m in DFW plus an extra $14.60 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 5:43a ­ 8:30p +1 23h 47m Select to price United SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 8h 45m in SFO Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 5:00a ­ 8:10p +1 24h 10m Select to price Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select LAX, ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 9:25a +2 24h 35m + $5,671.32 Virgin Atlantic SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $70.92 Ex. H plus an extra $70.92 4h 25m in LHR Page 19 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 6/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 21 of 27 PageID #: 338 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 9:40a +2 24h 50m Select to price Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select SFO, ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 6:05p ­ 10:05a +2 25h 0m + $4,840.42 KLM SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $62.61 4h 20m in AMS plus an extra $62.61 KLM 6014 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 2:10a ­ 6:25p +1 25h 15m + $320.53 EVA Airways SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.41 11h 20m in TPE plus an extra $17.41 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:07p ­ 9:50a +2 25h 43m + $376.87 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.97 11h 50m in PEK plus an extra $17.97 China Eastern Airlines 8884 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 9:25p ­ 2:10p +2 25h 45m + $29.58 Air Canada SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $14.50 13h 6m in YVR plus an extra $14.50 Air Canada 8084 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 10:55p +1 25h 55m Select to price Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA 2 stops    Select SJC, PEK Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 6:00a +2 26h 0m + $43.70 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.64 PDX, LAX plus an extra $14.64 Alaska Airlines 2047 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 1:07p ­ 6:45a +2 26h 38m + $4,843.32 Air France SEA ­ PVG roundtrip Ex. H 1 stop    Earn $62.64 Page 20 of 26 plus an extra $62.64 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 7/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 22 of 27 PageID #: 339 5h 10m in CDG plus an extra $62.64 Air France 3653 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Air France 5200 operated by China Eastern Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:07p ­ 7:50a +2 27h 43m + $4,641.32 Air France SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $60.62 6h 25m in CDG plus an extra $60.62 Air France 3653 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 2:00p ­ 8:55a +2 27h 55m + $82.43 Hainan Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.03 14h 5m in PEK plus an extra $15.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:02p ­ 1:05p +2 28h 3m + $3,482.52 United SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $49.03 9h 31m in ORD plus an extra $49.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 8:50a +2 28h 25m + $11.63 Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops Earn $14.32 XMN plus an extra $14.32 Select Flight details and baggage fees 2:15p ­ 9:40a +2 28h 25m Select to price Korean Air SEA ­ PVG 1 stop   Select 15h in ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:15p ­ 9:45a +2 28h 30m Select to price Korean Air SEA ­ PVG 1 stop   Select 15h 20m in ICN Korean Air 5879 operated by China Eastern Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 8:25p ­ 4:25p +2 29h 0m + $103.07 American Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.24 12h 25m in LAX plus an extra $15.24 American Airlines 6031 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) Ex. H Page 21 of 26 + $185.12 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 8/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 23 of 27 PageID #: 340 9:40p ­ 5:50p +2 29h 10m + $185.12 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.06 OAK, LAX plus an extra $16.06 Delta 4889 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:25p ­ 5:50p +2 29h 25m + $191.40 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $16.12 13h 23m in LAX plus an extra $16.12 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:25p ­ 2:00p +2 29h 35m + $89.63 American Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.10 11h 7m in ORD plus an extra $15.10 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 5:45p ­ 2:55p +2 30h 10m + $89.63 American Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.10 11h 23m in DFW plus an extra $15.10 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 10:40a +2 30h 15m Select to price Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ SHA 2 stops Select XMN Flight details and baggage fees 8:25p ­ 5:50p +2 30h 25m + $140.90 Delta SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.61 14h 13m in LAX plus an extra $15.61 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:15p ­ 5:00p +2 30h 45m Select to price British Airways SEA ­ PVG 1 stop   Select 10h 10m in LHR Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:35p ­ 3:30p +2 30h 55m + $1,086.88 Emirates SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $25.07 7h 50m in DXB plus an extra $25.07 Select Ex. H Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) Page 22 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%20… 9/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 24 of 27 PageID #: 341 7:22p ­ 5:25p +2 31h 3m + $113.58 United SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.34 16h 10m in SFO plus an extra $15.34 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 2:15p ­ 12:25p +2 31h 10m Select to price Korean Air SEA ­ PVG 1 stop   Select 17h 50m in ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 5:07p ­ 3:20p +2 31h 13m + $376.87 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.97 17h 15m in PEK plus an extra $17.97 China Eastern Airlines 8884 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 11:45a +2 31h 20m Select to price Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ SHA 2 stops Select XMN Flight details and baggage fees 5:50p ­ 4:30p +2 31h 40m + $0.00 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.20 15h 55m in SFO plus an extra $14.20 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:02p ­ 5:45p +2 31h 43m Select to price United SEA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 15h 14m in LAX United 5191 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 10:00a ­ 8:55a +2 31h 55m + $150.56 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.71 SJC, PEK plus an extra $15.71 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 6:00a +2 33h 0m + $16.19 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.37 16h 13m in LAX plus an extra $14.37 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) Ex. H Page 23 of 26 Select to price https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 10/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 25 of 27 PageID #: 342 2:40p ­ 3:00p +2 33h 20m Select to price Asiana Airlines SEA ­ PVG 1 stop   Select 20h in ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 8:30a ­ 8:55a +2 33h 25m + $91.98 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.12 SJC, PEK plus an extra $15.12 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 5:00a ­ 6:00a +2 34h 0m + $16.19 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.37 17h 27m in LAX plus an extra $14.37 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 8:30a ­ 10:00a +2 34h 30m + $91.98 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.12 SJC, PEK plus an extra $15.12 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 5:07p ­ 7:25p +2 35h 18m + $376.87 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.97 21h 25m in PEK plus an extra $17.97 China Eastern Airlines 8884 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 8:30a ­ 11:00a +2 35h 30m + $91.98 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.12 SJC, PEK plus an extra $15.12 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 8:55a +2 35h 55m + $91.98 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.12 SJC, PEK plus an extra $15.12 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 10:00a +2 37h 0m Select to price Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA 2 stops    Select SJC, PEK Ex. H Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) Page 24 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 11/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 26 of 27 PageID #: 343 1:25p ­ 5:45p +2 37h 20m Select to price Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ SHA 2 stops Select XMN Flight details and baggage fees 5:35p ­ 10:20p +2 37h 45m + $854.97 Emirates SEA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.75 14h 40m in DXB plus an extra $22.75 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 11:30a +2 38h 30m + $162.53 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.83 LAX, HND plus an extra $15.83 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 5:43a ­ 12:20p +2 39h 37m + $2,365.82 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $37.86 SFO, HKG plus an extra $37.86 Cathay Pacific 5858 operated by Cathay Dragon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 8:45p +2 40h 20m Select to price Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ SHA 2 stops Select XMN Flight details and baggage fees SPONSORED LISTINGS Ex. H Page 25 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 12/13 6/7/2017 SHA to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-10 Filed 06/13/17 Page 27 of 27 PageID #: 344 cheaptickets.com ▼ Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Lowest Price Guaranteed (877) 468­5247 Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you book today! (4.2) Cheap Event Tickets · Up to $537 off Air+Hotel · 24/7 Customer Support · Cheap Car Rentals Destinations: New York, Las Vegas, San Francisco, Maui Ratings: Selection 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10, Los Angeles, Rome, London, Chicago, Key West ­ Prices 9/10, Barcelona One of the best online travel sites in 2017 ­ Service 9/10 ­ Website 9/10 ­ Top Ten Reviews Flight Deals Under $199 Vacation Deals Under $500 Up to 50% Off Hotels Deals on 275,000+ Hotels Secret Travel Bargains CheapCash hipmunk.com ▼ Cheap Airfare to Seattle ­ 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Airfare to Seattle Today. Compare Top Airline Brands Online. Search, Select & Save · Save Up to 60% · Find Today's Deals Amenities: Inflight WiFi, Free Checked Bags, Inflight Meals · Top Brands, Movies, TV and Sports Ratings: Website 8/10 "Hipmunk is the new gold standard in hotel and flight lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle Airfare Sale On Now to Seattle. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! Get Cheap Flights Now · Amazing Deals on Flights trvl.deals ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle ­ 24 Hour Sale Just Went Live (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Flight Sale to Seattle. Cheap Flights on Sale 24/7. Book Now & Save! Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. H Page 26 of 26 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2… 13/13

Exhibit I

EXHIBIT I 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 2 of 16 PageID #: 346 1  Account My Scratchpad 3 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  SHA ­ XNA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Fayetteville Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) 1 Stop (6) $1,975 Show flexible dates 2+ Stops (52) $1,596 Save $193* on average when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: American $1,596 4:10p ­ 9:28p 18h 18m $1,974.16 Airlines (19) American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip United (18) $2,219 1 stop    Earn $19.74 3h 15m in DFW plus an extra $19.74 Delta (15) $2,463 American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American All Nippon $2,565 Select Eagle Airways (7) Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Japan Airlines $2,621 (7) 3:05p ­ 9:09p 19h 4m $2,353.59 Air China (5) $1,653 roundtrip United PVG ­ XNA China Eastern $2,629 1 stop    Earn $23.54 Airlines (3) 3h 15m in ORD plus an extra $23.54 Show all United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Departure time ­ Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Shanghai Early Morning (12:00a $2,358.09 12:10p ­ 6:21p 19h 11m ­ 4:59a) United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip Morning (5:00a ­ 2 stops    Earn $23.58 11:59a) SFO, DEN plus an extra $23.58 Afternoon (12:00p ­ United 3614 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select 5:59p) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) Evening (6:00p ­ 11:59p) 4:10p ­ 11:16p 20h 6m $1,974.16 American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.74 SPONSORED LISTINGS 5h 2m in DFW plus an extra $19.74 American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 7:29p 20h 39m $2,620.25 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.20 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.20 Japan Airlines 7012 operated by American Airlines American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Ex. I Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) Page 1 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 1/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 3 of 16 PageID #: 347 12:10p ­ 9:09p 21h 59m $2,358.09 justfly.com ▼ United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip (800) 717­5015 2 stops    Earn $23.58 $174 Fayetteville Round SFO, ORD plus an extra $23.58 Trip ­ Check It Out ­ Really Cheap United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Cheap Flights To Express Fayetteville From $174. Fly From Newark. Book Today! Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) No Booking Fees "...Flights for those · Service Excellence inspired to 12:10p ­ 9:09p 21h 59m $2,358.09 travel." ­ CrunchBase United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip RoundTrip To Fayetteville 2 stops    Earn $23.58 One­Way To Fayetteville SFO, ORD plus an extra $23.58 Coupon:FAYETTEVILLEJF United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) cheaptickets.com ▼ (877) 468­5247 (4.2) 11:55a ­ 9:09p 22h 14m $2,360.99 Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Multiple Airlines SHA ­ XNA roundtrip Lowest Price Earn $23.61 Guaranteed 2 stops    Compare rates from all the PEK, ORD plus an extra $23.61 top airlines. Save when you book today! United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Hotels Under $50 Express Destinations: New York · 24/7 Customer Support Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 travel sites in 12:20p ­ 9:45p 22h 25m $2,462.12 2017 ­ Top Ten Delta PVG ­ XNA roundtrip Reviews 2 stops    Earn $24.62 Flight Deals Under $199 SEA, ATL plus an extra $24.62 Vacation Deals Under $500 Up to 50% Off Hotels Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) onetravel.com ▼ (888) 481­9454 $2,462.12 (4.4) 12:20p ­ 9:45p 22h 25m Delta PVG ­ XNA roundtrip $264 Fayetteville RoundTrip ­ Absolutely 2 stops    Earn $24.62 Low Fare on Flights SEA, ATL plus an extra $24.62 Find Our Low Airfares to Fayetteville Flights. Book Select Your Flight & Save Today! Over 450 Airline Partners Destinations: Orlando, Miami · 24 X 7 Customer Support Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) Low Fare, Chicago, Denver, New York Promise ­ Online­ Travel­Sites­Review 12:20p ­ 9:45p 22h 25m $2,961.02 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip Military Flights Discount 2 stops    Earn $29.61 Last Minute Cheap Flights plus an extra $29.61 Round Trip Cheap Flights SEA, ATL China Southern Airlines 1046 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 12:20p ­ 9:45p 22h 25m $3,064.04 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.64 SEA, ATL plus an extra $30.64 China Southern Airlines 1046 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) 10:55a ­ 9:09p 23h 14m $2,360.99 Ex. I United SHA ­ XNA roundtrip Page 2 of 15 Earn $23.61 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 2/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 16 PageID #: 348 2 stops    Earn $23.61 PEK, ORD plus an extra $23.61 United 7440 operated by Air China Limited Select United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 12:10p ­ 10:37p 23h 27m $2,218.16 United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.18 8h 8m in SFO plus an extra $22.18 United 5289 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) 10:15a ­ 9:09p 23h 54m $2,669.77 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.70 NRT, ORD plus an extra $26.70 United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 10:15a ­ 9:09p 23h 54m $3,170.55 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.71 NRT, ORD plus an extra $31.71 All Nippon Airways 7006 operated by United Airlines Inc United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 10:15a ­ 9:09p 23h 54m $3,170.55 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.71 NRT, ORD plus an extra $31.71 United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 10:10a ­ 9:45p 24h 35m $2,520.30 Delta PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops Earn $25.20 ATL plus an extra $25.20 Select Flight details and baggage fees 12:30a ­ 1:00p 25h 30m $2,358.09 United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.58 SFO, DEN plus an extra $23.58 United 5542 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 1:45a ­ 2:21p 25h 36m $3,167.95 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip Ex. I 2 stops    Earn $31.68 Page 3 of 15 plus an extra $31.68 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 3/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 16 PageID #: 349 HND, ORD plus an extra $31.68 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 1:45a ­ 2:21p 25h 36m $4,410.30 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $44.10 HND, ORD plus an extra $44.10 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 8:10p ­ 9:04a +1 25h 54m $2,358.09 United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.58 LAX, ORD plus an extra $23.58 United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 8:10p ­ 9:04a +1 25h 54m $2,358.09 United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.58 LAX, ORD plus an extra $23.58 United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 8:10p ­ 9:04a +1 25h 54m $2,358.09 United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.58 LAX, ORD plus an extra $23.58 United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 8:01a +1 26h 36m $1,595.66 American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.96 LAX, DFW plus an extra $15.96 American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 8:01a +1 26h 36m $1,595.66 American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.96 LAX, DFW plus an extra $15.96 American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 8:01a +1 26h 36m $1,595.66 American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.96 LAX, DFW plus an extra $15.96 American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Ex. I Select Eagle Page 4 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 4/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 6 of 16 PageID #: 350 Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 7:35p ­ 9:15a +1 26h 40m $2,529.79 Delta PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $25.30 LAX, ATL plus an extra $25.30 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 7:35p ­ 9:15a +1 26h 40m $2,529.79 Delta PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $25.30 LAX, ATL plus an extra $25.30 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 12:40a ­ 3:10p 27h 30m $3,547.10 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $35.47 LHR, ORD plus an extra $35.47 British Airways 1525 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 12:45a ­ 4:24p 28h 39m $3,690.45 KLM PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $36.90 AMS, MSP plus an extra $36.90 KLM 4814 operated by China Eastern Airlines KLM 6065 operated by Delta Air Lines Select KLM 8184 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection For Delta A Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 12:45a ­ 4:24p 28h 39m $3,690.45 KLM PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $36.90 AMS, MSP plus an extra $36.90 KLM 4814 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select KLM 8184 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection For Delta A Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 12:05a ­ 4:29p 29h 24m $3,561.35 Air France PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $35.61 CDG, ATL plus an extra $35.61 Air France 5201 operated by China Eastern Airlines Air France 3620 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.1 out of 10) 11:20p ­ 4:29p +1 30h 9m $3,722.40 Air France PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $37.22 plus an extra $37.22 CDG, ATL Ex. I Air France 3620 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Page 5 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 5/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 7 of 16 PageID #: 351 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 11:50p ­ 6:41p +1 31h 51m $4,315.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $43.15 DOH, ORD plus an extra $43.15 American Airlines 3311 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 11:50p ­ 6:41p +1 31h 51m $4,317.35 Qatar Airways PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $43.17 DOH, ORD plus an extra $43.17 Qatar Airways 5256 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 2:50p +1 32h 40m $3,709.80 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $37.10 JFK, ATL plus an extra $37.10 Delta 3994 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 3:10p +1 33h 0m $1,652.05 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.52 PEK, ORD plus an extra $16.52 American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 9:15a +1 33h 15m $4,640.55 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $46.41 SFO, ATL plus an extra $46.41 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:25p ­ 3:09p +1 33h 44m $3,015.89 American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $30.16 18h 5m in LAX plus an extra $30.16 American Airlines 6026 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 5:40p ­ 3:10p +1 34h 30m $2,745.50 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $27.46 ICN, ORD plus an extra $27.46 Korean Air 5880 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Ex. I Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) Page 6 of 15 $2,645.35 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 6/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 8 of 16 PageID #: 352 2:05p ­ 11:50a +1 34h 45m $2,645.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.45 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.45 Japan Airlines 7014 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 2:05p ­ 11:50a +1 34h 45m $2,645.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.45 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.45 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.8 out of 10) 12:30a ­ 10:37p 35h 7m $2,225.49 United PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.25 19h 38m in SFO plus an extra $22.25 United 5289 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 10:01a +1 35h 11m $2,674.80 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.75 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.75 Japan Airlines 7012 operated by American Airlines American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 11:50a +1 37h 0m $2,645.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.45 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.45 Japan Airlines 7014 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 11:50a +1 37h 0m $2,645.35 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.45 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.45 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 11:50a ­ 11:50a +1 37h 0m $2,674.80 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.75 NRT, DFW plus an extra $26.75 Japan Airlines 7012 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Ex. I Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) Page 7 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 7/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 9 of 16 PageID #: 353 12:15p ­ 4:24p +1 41h 9m $3,694.55 KLM PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $36.95 AMS, MSP plus an extra $36.95 KLM 6065 operated by Delta Air Lines Select KLM 8184 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection For Delta A Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 11:45a ­ 3:59p +1 41h 14m $2,481.52 Delta PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops Earn $24.82 LGA plus an extra $24.82 Delta 5543 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 10:55a ­ 3:09p +1 41h 14m $3,223.10 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $32.23 PEK, LAX plus an extra $32.23 American Airlines 6026 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 10:55a ­ 3:09p +1 41h 14m $4,369.55 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $43.70 PEK, LAX plus an extra $43.70 American Airlines 6026 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 9:40a ­ 3:59p +1 43h 19m $2,628.94 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ XNA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $26.29 HND, LGA plus an extra $26.29 Delta 5543 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 9:40a ­ 3:59p +1 43h 19m $4,311.78 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ XNA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $43.12 HND, LGA plus an extra $43.12 Shanghai Airlines 537 operated by China Eastern Airlines Delta 5543 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 8:40a ­ 3:59p +1 44h 19m $2,605.29 Multiple Airlines SHA ­ XNA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $26.05 HND, LGA plus an extra $26.05 Delta 5543 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Ex. I 8:25a ­ 3:59p +1 44h 34m $2,564.79 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip Page 8 of 15 Earn $25.65 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 8/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 10 of 16 PageID #: 354 3 stops Earn $25.65 HND, LGA plus an extra $25.65 Delta 5543 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 1:45a ­ 3:59p +1 51h 14m $2,564.79 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $25.65 HND, LGA plus an extra $25.65 Delta 5543 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 7:10p ­ 10:32a +2 52h 22m $2,310.58 Multiple Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.11 PEK, EWR plus an extra $23.11 United 3602 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS trvl.deals ▼ $49 Fayetteville Flights (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Fare Sale to Fayetteville Prices Updated Every 20 Minutes. kayak.com ▼ Find Travel Deals: KAYAK (4.1) We Search 100s of Sites at Once. Compare Flight and Hotel Deals Now. Combine hotels+flights · Save time and money · Best prices online · Easy & fast booking Destinations: New York, Las Vegas, Miami, Orlando, Philadelphia Ratings: Selection 10/10 ­ Fees 9.5/10 ­ Prices 9.5/10, Chicago, Seattle, Atlanta Truly makes sure you find the best deal ­ PC Magazine ­ Website 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Service 9/10 fayetteville.jetcos… ▼ $186 Fayetteville Flights Cheap Flights to Fayetteville Now. Compare Flights up to 80% Off! Flight Deals · Last Minute Flights · Low Cost Flights Types: Direct Flights, Last Minute Flights, International Flights lowfares.com ▼ Fayetteville from $109* ­ Fare Sale on Now. Book (844) 311­2315 Today. Fayetteville Flight Rates Just Dropped! Book Now to Lock in the Give your feedback to help us make improvements. ** Average savings based on all vacation package bookings with Flight + Hotel on Orbitz.com from May 2015 through April 2016, as compared to the price of the same components booked separately. Savings will vary based on origin/destination, length of trip, stay dates and selected travel supplier(s). Savings not available on all packages. Ex. I Explore More  Page 9 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR… 9/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 11 of 16 PageID #: 355 Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. I Page 10 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20A… 10/10 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 12 of 16 PageID #: 356 1  Account My Scratchpad 3 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  SHA ­ XNA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Your selected 4:10p ­ 9:28p 18h 18m from $1,974.16 departure American Airlines PVG ­ XNA roundtrip Mon, Jul 10 Change 1 stop 3h 15m in DFW American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select your return to Shanghai Wed, Jul 12 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) 1 Stop (8) $1,975 Show flexible dates 2+ Stops (14) $1,979 8:32a ­ 2:55p +1 17h 23m + $0.00 American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip Airlines included From: 1 stop    Earn $19.74 1h 1m in DFW plus an extra $19.74 American $1,975 Airlines (11) American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select United (8) $3,896 Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Air China (3) $2,061 All Nippon Airways 8:00a ­ 2:55p +1 17h 55m + $0.00 (3) American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip Hainan Airlines $4,120 1 stop    Earn $19.74 (3) 1h 32m in DFW plus an extra $19.74 China Eastern American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Airlines (2) Eagle Delta (2) Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Show all 6:00a ­ 2:00p +1 19h 0m + $0.00 Departure time ­ American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip Fayetteville 1 stop    Earn $19.74 2h 40m in ORD plus an extra $19.74 Morning (5:00a ­ 11:59a) American Airlines 3318 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Afternoon (12:00p ­ 5:59p) Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Evening (6:00p ­ 11:59p) 6:28a ­ 2:55p +1 19h 27m + $0.00 American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip Airports From: 1 stop    Earn $19.74 3h 8m in DFW plus an extra $19.74 SHA $4,104 American Airlines 3631 operated by Envoy Air As American (Shanghai) (2) Eagle Select SPONSORED LISTINGS PVG $1,975 Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) (Shanghai) (20) 7:35a ­ 5:25p +1 20h 50m Select to price United XNA ­ PVG Ex. I Select 1 stop    Page 11 of 15 3h 56m in SFO https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%… 1/5 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 13 of 16 PageID #: 357 United 5550 operated by Skywest DBA United Express justfly.com ▼ Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) (800) 717­5015 $174 Fayetteville Round + $30.39 Trip ­ Our Cheapest 10:32a ­ 9:45p +1 22h 13m Flights. Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip Cheap Flights To 2 stops    Earn $20.05 Fayetteville From $174. Fly plus an extra $20.05 From Newark. Book Today! DFW, NRT No Hidden Costs American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American "...Flights for those · Service Excellence Eagle Select inspired to travel." ­ CrunchBase Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) Last Minute Fayetteville One­Way To Fayetteville 7:35a ­ 8:30p +1 23h 55m Select to price Non­Stop To Fayetteville United XNA ­ PVG 1 stop    Select 6h 51m in SFO cheaptickets.com ▼ (877) 468­5247 United 5550 operated by Skywest DBA United Express (4.2) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8 out of 10) Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Lowest Price Guaranteed 11:10a ­ 12:35a +2 24h 25m Select to price Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG book today! 2 stops    Select 24/7 Customer Support ORD, HND Destinations: New York · Cheap Car Rentals Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco United 3663 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 travel sites in Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) 2017 ­ Top Ten Reviews 6:20a ­ 8:55p +1 25h 35m Select to price Flight Deals Under $199 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG Vacation Deals Under $500 2 stops    Select Up to 50% Off Hotels ORD, NRT United 4040 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express All Nippon Airways 7009 operated by United Airlines Inc onetravel.com ▼ (888) 481­9454 Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) (4.4) $264 Fayetteville RoundTrip ­ Absolutely 3:50p ­ 9:40a +2 28h 50m + $2,129.79 Low Fare on Flights Multiple Airlines XNA ­ SHA roundtrip Find Our Low Airfares to 2 stops    Earn $41.04 Fayetteville Flights. Book Your Flight & Save Today! LAX, PEK plus an extra $41.04 Fast & Easy Booking American Airlines 6012 operated by Compass Airlines As Services: Extensive Offerings · Low Cost Airfares American Eagle Select Low Fare, Awesome Experience Promise ­ Online­ Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) Travel­Sites­Review One Way Flights Specials Military Flights Discount 7:54p ­ 2:00p +2 29h 6m + $4.50 Round Trip Cheap Flights American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $19.79 DFW, ORD plus an extra $19.79 American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 7:54p ­ 2:00p +2 29h 6m + $4.50 American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $19.79 DFW, ORD plus an extra $19.79 American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) Ex. I Page 12 of 15 Select to price https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%… 2/5 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 14 of 16 PageID #: 358 6:20a ­ 12:35a +2 29h 15m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select ORD, HND United 4040 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 7:54p ­ 2:55p +2 30h 1m + $4.56 American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.79 13h 44m in DFW plus an extra $19.79 American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.2 out of 10) 5:21p ­ 2:00p +2 31h 39m + $11.90 American Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.86 15h 13m in ORD plus an extra $19.86 American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) 12:23p ­ 10:15a +2 32h 52m + $86.39 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $20.61 ORD, PEK plus an extra $20.61 American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 4:55a +2 33h 55m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select ATL, JFK Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 4:55a +2 33h 55m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select ATL, JFK Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 10:55p +2 39h 45m + $2,145.29 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ SHA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $41.19 ORD, PEK plus an extra $41.19 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 8:55a +3 49h 45m + $2,145.29 Ex. I Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip Page 13 of 15 Earn $41.19 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%… 3/5 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 15 of 16 PageID #: 359 2 stops    Earn $41.19 ORD, PEK plus an extra $41.19 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 10:15a +3 51h 25m + $1,921.62 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $38.96 EWR, PEK plus an extra $38.96 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 3:05p +3 58h 15m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PVG 2 stops    Select ORD, SEA Alaska Airlines 4006 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS trvl.deals ▼ $49 Fayetteville Flights (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Fare Sale to Fayetteville Prices Updated Every 20 Minutes. kayak.com ▼ Flights to Fayetteville (4.1) Save On Flights to Fayetteville. Compare 100s of Sites At Once. Set price alerts · Best price on airfares · Cheap airline tickets · Search flexible dates Destinations: New York, Las Vegas, Los Angeles, Orlando, Miami Ratings: Selection 10/10 ­ Fees 9.5/10 ­ Prices 9.5/10, San Francisco Truly makes sure you find the best deal ­ PC Magazine ­ Website 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Service 9/10 flighthub.com ▼ $52+ Flight $52+ ­ Available Now Wednesday Jun­7 (800) 711­1755 Cheapest FlightHub Deeply Discounted Flights, Cheap! Available (4.5) Today Jun­7 Book with Confidence · 24/7 Customer Support · Service Excellence · All Major Airlines Types: Economy, Business Class, First Class "over 20 years of travel experience" ­ travelalerts.ca lowfares.com ▼ Fayetteville from $109* ­ Fare Sale on Now. Book (844) 311­2315 Today. Fayetteville Flight Rates Just Dropped! Book Now to Lock in the Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Ex. I Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Page 14 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%… 4/5 6/7/2017 SHA to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-11 Filed 06/13/17 Page 16 of 16 PageID #: 360 Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. I Page 15 of 15 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3AShanghai%2C%20China%20(SHA­All%20Airports)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%… 5/5

Exhibit J

EXHIBIT J 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 2 of 26 PageID #: 362 1  Account My Scratchpad 5 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  PEK ­ SEA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Seattle Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (4) $1,401 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (49) $1,098 Save $193* on average when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  2+ Stops (25) $903 Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: 3:50p ­ 11:35a 10h 45m $1,400.65 Alaska Airlines $1,469 Hainan Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip (18) Nonstop   Earn $14.01 plus an extra $14.01 Hainan Airlines $1,375 (13) Select Asiana Airlines $1,098 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) (10) Korean Air (8) $1,311 11:20a ­ 7:54a 11h 34m $1,703.56 United (8) $1,368 China Eastern Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip Air Canada (7) $1,891 Nonstop    Earn $17.04 plus an extra $17.04 American $1,271 China Eastern Airlines 8885 operated by Delta Air Lines Airlines (7) Select Show all Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) Departure time ­ Beijing Early Morning (12:00a 11:20a ­ 7:54a 11h 34m $1,790.41 Delta PEK ­ SEA roundtrip ­ 4:59a) Nonstop    Earn $17.90 Morning (5:00a ­ plus an extra $17.90 11:59a) Afternoon (12:00p ­ Select 5:59p) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) Evening (6:00p ­ 11:59p) $1,853.09 11:20a ­ 7:54a 11h 34m China Southern Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $18.53 plus an extra $18.53 SPONSORED LISTINGS China Southern Airlines 1155 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) 4:05p ­ 1:50p 12h 45m $1,890.95 Air Canada PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $18.91 1h 30m in YVR plus an extra $18.91 Air Canada 8097 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) Ex. J  5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Page 1 of 25 1:20p ­ 12:35p 14h 15m $1,420.16 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 1/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 3 of 26 PageID #: 363 Korean Air PEK ­ SEA $1,420.16 1 stop   roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ 1h 55m in ICN Earn $14.20 Redmond ­ Seattle ­ One plus an extra $14.20 Way as low as $74. Always Get Our Lowest Fare. Select Book Your RDM to SEA Flight Today & Save! 20­Minute Bag Guarantee Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) Ratings: Service 10/10 · Power at Your Seat #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 1:25p ­ 1:10p 14h 45m $2,126.32 Program ­ U.S. News & Asiana Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip World Report 1 stop   Earn $21.26 Flight Deals 2h 5m in ICN plus an extra $21.26 Alaska Air® Miles Card Join ­ Mileage Plan™ Asiana Airlines 6804 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.2 out of 10) tripadvisor.com ▼ (4.9) 3:40p ­ 4:38p 15h 58m $1,706.05 5 Cheap Flights to Air China PEK ­ SEA roundtrip Seattle, Washington from $119 1 stop    Earn $17.06 Cheap flights to all 2h 7m in SFO plus an extra $17.06 destinations Search on TripAdvisor for deals Air China 7336 operated by United Airlines Inc Ratings: Travel info 10/10 Select ­ Website 10/10 Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 12:00p ­ 1:17p 16h 17m $1,367.86 (4.6) United PEK ­ SEA roundtrip $119 Seattle RoundTrip 1 stop    Earn $13.68 Fares ­ Our Lowest 2h 13m in SFO plus an extra $13.68 Prices Guaranteed. Cheap Flights To Seattle From $119. Fly From Select Houston. Book Today & Save! 24/7 Customer Care Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) Types: E conomy · Last Minute Travel "...Flights for those, Premium­Economy, Elite 9:50a ­ 11:25a 16h 35m $2,945.56 inspired to All Nippon Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip travel." ­ CrunchBase 1 stop    Earn $29.46 Round­Trip To Seattle 3h 45m in NRT plus an extra $29.46 Last Minute Seattle Fares One­Way Deals To Seattle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 9:50a ­ 11:25a 16h 35m $3,983.15 All Nippon Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $39.83 3h 45m in NRT plus an extra $39.83 Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.9 out of 10) 3:40p ­ 5:20p 16h 40m $1,706.05 Air China PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.06 2h 50m in SFO plus an extra $17.06 Air China 7337 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 7:40a ­ 9:22a 16h 42m $1,884.73 China Eastern Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip Ex. J Earn $18.85  1 stop    5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Page 2 of 25 2h 30m in PVG plus an extra $18.85 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 2/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 26 PageID #: 364 plus an extra $18.85 China Eastern Airlines 8889 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 7:40a ­ 9:22a 16h 42m $1,950.32 Delta PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.50 2h 30m in PVG plus an extra $19.50 Delta 6471 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 7:40a ­ 9:35a 16h 55m $1,535.70 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.36 3h 50m in PVG plus an extra $15.36 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 9:25a ­ 11:25a 17h 0m $4,164.15 All Nippon Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $41.64 4h 10m in NRT plus an extra $41.64 All Nippon Airways 5702 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 10:40a ­ 1:10p 17h 30m $1,097.16 Asiana Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $10.97 4h 50m in ICN plus an extra $10.97 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 4:05p ­ 6:35p 17h 30m $1,890.95 Air Canada PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $18.91 6h 15m in YVR plus an extra $18.91 Air Canada 8099 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.1 out of 10) 3:00p ­ 5:42p 17h 42m $2,088.36 Air China PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $20.88 2h 55m in LAX plus an extra $20.88 Air China 7219 operated by SkyWest Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) Ex. J 6:40a ­ 9:35a 17h 55m $1,374.05  5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today roundtrip Page 3 of 25 Hainan Airlines PEK ­ SEA Earn $13.74 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 3/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 26 PageID #: 365 1 stop    Earn $13.74 4h 45m in PVG plus an extra $13.74 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 2:45p ­ 6:09p 18h 24m $1,585.87 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.86 3h 31m in LAS plus an extra $15.86 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 12:00p ­ 4:38p 19h 38m $1,367.86 United PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $13.68 5h 32m in SFO plus an extra $13.68 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 4:05p ­ 8:55p 19h 50m $1,890.95 Air Canada PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $18.91 8h 35m in YVR plus an extra $18.91 Air Canada 8101 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.6 out of 10) 4:25p ­ 9:18p 19h 53m $1,455.86 American Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.56 2h in DFW plus an extra $14.56 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.1 out of 10) 12:00p ­ 5:42p 20h 42m $2,088.36 Air China PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $20.88 5h 55m in LAX plus an extra $20.88 Air China 7219 operated by SkyWest Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5 out of 10) 2:05p ­ 7:50p 20h 45m $1,929.81 EVA Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.30 6h 30m in TPE plus an extra $19.30 EVA Airways 2765 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.7 out of 10) 10:40a ­ 4:38p 20h 58m $1,451.42 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.51 ICN, SFO plus an extra $14.51 Ex. J  5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Select Page 4 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 4/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 6 of 26 PageID #: 366 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (2.7 out of 10) 10:10a ­ 4:26p 21h 16m $2,464.08 American Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $24.64 3h 51m in ORD plus an extra $24.64 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.4 out of 10) 4:25p ­ 10:53p 21h 28m $1,270.26 American Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $12.70 3h 40m in DFW plus an extra $12.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 10:40a ­ 5:20p 21h 40m $1,451.42 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.51 ICN, SFO plus an extra $14.51 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.9 out of 10) 2:50p ­ 9:59p 22h 9m $1,506.54 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.07 SJC, PDX plus an extra $15.07 Alaska Airlines 2054 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 2:50p ­ 10:19p 22h 29m $1,506.54 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.07 SJC, PDX plus an extra $15.07 Alaska Airlines 2112 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 2:50p ­ 10:30p 22h 40m $1,468.71 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.69 8h 55m in SJC plus an extra $14.69 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 10:40a ­ 6:27p 22h 47m $1,451.42 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.51 ICN, SFO plus an extra $14.51 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) Ex. J  2:50p ­ 10:44p 5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today 22h 54m $1,506.54 Page 5 of 25 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 5/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 7 of 26 PageID #: 367 roundtrip Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA Earn $15.07 2 stops    plus an extra $15.07 SJC, PDX Alaska Airlines 2024 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 4:25p ­ 12:35a +1 23h 10m $1,455.86 American Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.56 5h 20m in DFW plus an extra $14.56 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:30a ­ 11:50a 24h 20m $3,091.66 Lufthansa PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $30.92 3h 55m in FRA plus an extra $30.92 Lufthansa 7323 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 10:10a ­ 7:33p 24h 23m $1,270.26 American Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $12.70 7h in ORD plus an extra $12.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 12:30a ­ 10:57a 25h 27m $2,757.76 KLM PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $27.58 4h 45m in AMS plus an extra $27.58 KLM 4302 operated by China Southern Airlines Select KLM 6033 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:00a ­ 11:40a 25h 40m $2,793.56 Air France PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $27.94 4h 15m in CDG plus an extra $27.94 Air France 3622 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 8:35a ­ 7:50p 26h 15m $1,929.81 EVA Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.30 11h 55m in TPE plus an extra $19.30 EVA Airways 2761 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 12:40a ­ 12:55p 27h 15m $1,839.15 Emirates PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $18.39 Ex. J  4h 35m in DXB plus an extra $18.39  5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Page 6 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 6/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 8 of 26 PageID #: 368 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 10:10a ­ 10:42p 27h 32m $1,455.86 American Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.56 10h 10m in ORD plus an extra $14.56 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 7:15p ­ 9:22a +1 29h 7m $1,950.32 Delta PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.50 14h 45m in PVG plus an extra $19.50 Delta 6514 operated by China Eastern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 9:15p ­ 12:35p +1 30h 20m $1,310.16 Korean Air PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $13.10 18h in ICN plus an extra $13.10 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 4:05p ­ 8:55a +1 31h 50m $1,976.80 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $19.77 YVR, SJC plus an extra $19.77 Air Canada 8120 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 12:35p +1 32h 25m $1,310.16 Korean Air PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $13.10 20h 10m in ICN plus an extra $13.10 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:05p ­ 10:04a +1 32h 59m $1,976.80 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $19.77 YVR, SJC plus an extra $19.77 Air Canada 8120 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 2:50p ­ 8:55a +1 33h 5m $1,475.59 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.76 19h 15m in SJC plus an extra $14.76 Select Ex. J Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10)  5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Page 7 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 7/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 9 of 26 PageID #: 369 2:45p ­ 9:02a +1 33h 17m $1,581.79 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.82 18h 15m in LAS plus an extra $15.82 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:50p ­ 10:04a +1 34h 14m $1,475.59 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.76 20h 25m in SJC plus an extra $14.76 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 9:26p 34h 36m $2,174.94 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $21.75 DOH, JFK plus an extra $21.75 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 9:33p 34h 43m $2,386.03 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.86 DOH, DFW plus an extra $23.86 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 5:10p ­ 1:10p +1 35h 0m $1,097.16 Asiana Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $10.97 22h 30m in ICN plus an extra $10.97 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:45p ­ 10:46a +1 35h 1m $1,595.90 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.96 20h 5m in LAS plus an extra $15.96 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 9:57p 35h 7m $1,655.80 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.56 DOH, ORD plus an extra $16.56 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 10:19p 35h 29m $2,274.93 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip Ex. J 2 stops Earn $22.75    5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Page 8 of 25  DOH, BOS plus an extra $22.75 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 8/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 10 of 26 PageID #: 370 plus an extra $22.75 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:00p ­ 5:42p +1 35h 42m $2,248.00 Air China PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.48 20h 55m in LAX plus an extra $22.48 Air China 7219 operated by SkyWest Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 4:36p +1 36h 26m $1,539.30 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.39 ICN, SFO plus an extra $15.39 Asiana Airlines 6306 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 4:36p +1 36h 26m $1,671.37 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.71 ICN, SFO plus an extra $16.71 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 12:10a ­ 9:49p 36h 39m $1,938.69 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $19.39 IST, YYZ plus an extra $19.39 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:15p ­ 7:05p +1 36h 50m Select to price Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA 2 stops    Select ICN, LAX Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 5:20p +1 37h 10m $1,671.37 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.71 ICN, SFO plus an extra $16.71 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 6:27p +1 38h 17m $1,671.37 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.71 ICN, SFO plus an extra $16.71 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) Ex. J  5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today Page 9 of 25 $1,646.00 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 9/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 11 of 26 PageID #: 371 8:30p ­ 7:50p +1 38h 20m $1,646.00 EVA Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $16.46 24h in TPE plus an extra $16.46 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:10p ­ 4:36p +1 38h 26m $1,557.58 Asiana Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.58 ICN, SFO plus an extra $15.58 Asiana Airlines 6306 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 2:45p ­ 2:21p +1 38h 36m $1,595.90 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.96 23h 45m in LAS plus an extra $15.96 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 8:25a ­ 8:23a +1 38h 58m $1,541.18 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.41 22h 25m in HKG plus an extra $15.41 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 10:55a ­ 10:57a +1 39h 2m $2,757.76 KLM PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $27.58 18h 35m in AMS plus an extra $27.58 KLM 6033 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:10p ­ 5:20p +1 39h 10m $1,557.58 Asiana Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.58 ICN, SFO plus an extra $15.58 Asiana Airlines 6310 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 8:20p ­ 10:30p +1 41h 10m $1,360.19 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $13.60 PVG, LAX plus an extra $13.60 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 4:05p ­ 6:33p +1 41h 28m $1,976.80 roundtrip Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA Earn $19.77 Ex. J 2 stops   5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz today  Page 10 of 25  YVR, SJC plus an extra $19.77 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C… 10/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 12 of 26 PageID #: 372 Air Canada 8112 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 8:55a ­ 11:40a +1 41h 45m $3,664.95 Air France PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $36.65 20h 20m in CDG plus an extra $36.65 Air France 3622 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:10p ­ 8:14p +1 42h 4m $1,557.58 Asiana Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.58 ICN, SFO plus an extra $15.58 Asiana Airlines 6302 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 7:25a ­ 12:55p +1 44h 30m $1,840.55 Emirates PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $18.41 22h in DXB plus an extra $18.41 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 1:20p ­ 7:05p +1 44h 45m Select to price Multiple Airlines PEK ­ SEA 2 stops    Select ICN, LAX Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 11:15a ­ 5:10p +1 44h 55m $4,497.36 British Airways PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $44.97 24h in LHR plus an extra $44.97 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 9:25p ­ 10:25a +2 52h 0m $902.96 Xiamen Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $9.03 FOC, SZX plus an extra $9.03 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS Ex. J 5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz todayPage  11 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 11/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 13 of 26 PageID #: 373 cheaptickets.com ▼ Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Lowest Price Guaranteed (877) 468­5247 Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you book today! (4.2) Cheap Car Rentals · Up to $537 off Air+Hotel · Free Rewards · Cheap Event Tickets, Las Vegas, San Francisco, Maui Destinations: New York Ratings: Selection 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10, Los Angeles, Rome, London, Chicago, Key West ­ Prices 9/10, Barcelona One of the best online travel sites in 2017 ­ Service 9/10 ­ Website 9/10 ­ Top Ten Reviews Flight Deals Under $199 Vacation Deals Under $500 Up to 50% Off Hotels Deals on 275,000+ Hotels CheapCash Secret Travel Bargains hipmunk.com ▼ Cheap Airfare to Seattle ­ 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Airfare to Seattle Today. Compare Top Airline Brands Online. Top Brands · Best Selection · Save Up to 60% Amenities: Inflight WiFi, Free Checked Bags, Inflight Meals · Search, Select & Save, Movies, TV and Sports Ratings: Website 8/10 "Hipmunk is the new gold standard in hotel and flight lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle Airfare Sale On Now to Seattle. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! Get Cheap Flights Now · Amazing Deals on Flights trvl.deals ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle ­ 24 Hour Sale Just Went Live (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Flight Sale to Seattle. Cheap Flights on Sale 24/7. Book Now & Save! Give your feedback to help us make improvements. ** Average savings based on all vacation package bookings with Flight + Hotel on Orbitz.com from May 2015 through April 2016, as compared to the price of the same components booked separately. Savings will vary based on origin/destination, length of trip, stay dates and selected travel supplier(s). Savings not available on all packages. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. J 5026 people booked a flight to SEA on Orbitz todayPage  12 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C… 12/12 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 14 of 26 PageID #: 374 1  Account My Scratchpad 5 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  PEK ­ SEA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Your selected 3:50p ­ 11:35a 10h 45m from $1,400.65 departure Hainan Airlines PEK ­ SEA roundtrip Mon, Jul 10 Change Nonstop Select your return to Beijing Wed, Jul 12 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) Nonstop (5) $1,541 Show flexible dates 1 Stop (54) $1,401 2:00p ­ 4:35p +1 11h 35m + $140.26 2+ Stops (23) $1,474 Hainan Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Nonstop   Earn $15.41 plus an extra $15.41 Airlines included From: Alaska Airlines $1,411 Select (14) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) China Eastern $1,474 Airlines (12) 2:00p ­ 4:35p +1 11h 35m + $261.46 United (12) $1,552 American Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Hainan Airlines $1,401 Nonstop   Earn $16.62 (10) plus an extra $16.62 American Airlines 7220 operated by Hainan Airlines China $1,773 Select Southern Airlines (9) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) American $1,546 Airlines (6) 5:07p ­ 7:50p +1 11h 43m + $140.26 Delta SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Korean Air (6) $1,552 Nonstop    Earn $15.41 Show all plus an extra $15.41 Departure time ­ Seattle Select Early Morning (12:00a Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) ­ 4:59a) Morning (5:00a ­ + $252.90 5:07p ­ 7:50p +1 11h 43m 11:59a) China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Afternoon (12:00p ­ Nonstop    Earn $16.54 5:59p) plus an extra $16.54 China Eastern Airlines 8884 operated by Delta Air Lines Evening (6:00p ­ Select 11:59p) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS 5:07p ­ 7:50p +1 11h 43m + $2,768.80 China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Nonstop    Earn $41.69 plus an extra $41.69 China Southern Airlines 1156 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Ex. J Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (9.7 out of 10) Page 13 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 1/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 15 of 26 PageID #: 375 9:05a ­ 2:10p +1 14h 5m + $275.60 Air Canada SEA ­ PEK roundtrip alaskaair.com ▼ 1 stop   Earn $16.76 Portland ­ Seattle ­ One plus an extra $16.76 Way as low as $88. 2h 21m in YVR Always Get Our Lowest Fare. Air Canada 8090 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Book Your PDX to SEA Select Flight Today & Save! Artisan Food & Drink Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) Ratings: Service 10/10 · Free In­Flight Messaging #1 Airline Rewards ­ Ease of booking 10/10 Program ­ U.S. News & 2:15p ­ 8:05p +1 14h 50m + $150.96 World Report Korean Air SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Flight Deals 1 stop   Earn $15.52 Alaska Air® Miles Card 1h 25m in ICN plus an extra $15.52 Join ­ Mileage Plan™ Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 (4.6) 11:07a ­ 5:55p +1 15h 48m + $384.76 $119 Seattle RoundTrip Air China SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Fares ­ Our Lowest 1 stop    Earn $17.85 Prices Guaranteed. plus an extra $17.85 Cheap Flights To Seattle 1h 22m in SFO From $119. Fly From Houston. Book Today & Air China 7305 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Save! No Hidden Costs Types: E conomy · Our Cheapest Flights Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7 out of 10) "...Flights for those, Premium­Economy, Elite inspired to 7:48a ­ 2:40p +1 15h 52m + $150.36 travel." ­ CrunchBase United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Round­Trip To Seattle 1 stop    Earn $15.51 Last Minute Seattle Fares 1h 22m in SFO plus an extra $15.51 One­Way Deals To Seattle Select cheaptickets.com ▼ Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) (877) 468­5247 (4.2) 10:00a ­ 5:10p +1 16h 10m + $29.00 Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Lowest Price Guaranteed 1 stop    Earn $14.30 Compare rates from all the 1h 18m in SJC plus an extra $14.30 top airlines. Save when you book today! Hotels Under $50 Select Destinations: New York · 24/7 Customer Support Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 travel sites in 2017 ­ Top Ten 9:55a ­ 5:55p +1 17h 0m + $384.76 Reviews Air China SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.85 Flight Deals Under $199 plus an extra $17.85 Vacation Deals Under $500 2h 35m in SFO CheapCash Air China 7306 operated by United Airlines Inc Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 1:20p ­ 9:20p +1 17h 0m Select to price All Nippon Airways SEA ­ PEK 1 stop    Select 2h 40m in NRT Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 3:39p ­ 11:40p +1 17h 1m + $299.16 Delta SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.00 2h in PVG plus an extra $17.00 Ex. J Delta 6469 operated by China Eastern Airlines Page 14 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 2/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 16 of 26 PageID #: 376 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 3:39p ­ 11:40p +1 17h 1m + $502.70 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $19.03 2h in PVG plus an extra $19.03 China Eastern Airlines 8888 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 8:30a ­ 5:10p +1 17h 40m + $10.00 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.11 2h 54m in SJC plus an extra $14.11 Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 7:20p ­ 5:15a +2 18h 55m + $84.16 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.85 3h 18m in LAS plus an extra $14.85 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 7:02p ­ 5:20a +2 19h 18m + $698.41 Air China SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $20.99 3h 34m in LAX plus an extra $20.99 Air China 7220 operated by SkyWest Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 7:02p ­ 5:20a +2 19h 18m + $3,247.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $46.48 3h 34m in LAX plus an extra $46.48 United 5191 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select United 7617 operated by Air China Limited Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 2:10a ­ 12:30p +1 19h 20m + $385.76 EVA Airways SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.86 4h 5m in TPE plus an extra $17.86 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 9:52a ­ 8:20p +1 19h 28m + $150.36 Ex. J American Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Page 15 of 25 Earn $15.51 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 3/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 17 of 26 PageID #: 377 1 stop    Earn $15.51 2h in ORD plus an extra $15.51 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 2:15p ­ 1:05a +2 19h 50m Select to price Korean Air SEA ­ PEK 1 stop   Select 6h 20m in ICN Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 7:25a ­ 6:25p +1 20h 0m + $3,494.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $48.95 1h 3m in IAD plus an extra $48.95 United 7609 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.2 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 5:10p +1 20h 10m + $10.00 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.11 5h 27m in SJC plus an extra $14.11 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.5 out of 10) 12:00p ­ 11:20p +1 20h 20m + $107.26 Hainan Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.08 5h 50m in PVG plus an extra $15.08 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.6 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 12:45a +2 20h 20m + $372.25 China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $17.73 3h 20m in SZX plus an extra $17.73 China Southern Airlines 4022 operated by Xiamen Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 7:05p +1 21h 5m + $126.00 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.27 1h 52m in BOS plus an extra $15.27 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.3 out of 10) 6:05p ­ 6:15a +2 21h 10m + $4,905.20 Ex. J KLM SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Page 16 of 25 1 stop Earn $63.06 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 4/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 18 of 26 PageID #: 378 1h 50m in AMS    Earn $63.06 plus an extra $63.06 KLM 6014 operated by Delta Air Lines KLM 4303 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 11:10p ­ 11:25a +2 21h 15m + $77.87 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.79 YVR, PVG plus an extra $14.79 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 7:00a ­ 8:20p +1 22h 20m + $150.36 American Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.51 4h 59m in ORD plus an extra $15.51 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 7:40p ­ 9:15a +2 22h 35m + $189.46 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.90 SFO, ICN plus an extra $15.90 Korean Air 5803 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:40p ­ 9:15a +2 22h 35m + $189.46 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.90 SFO, ICN plus an extra $15.90 Alaska Airlines 1759 operated by Virgin America Select Korean Air 5803 operated by China Southern Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 11:44p ­ 1:35p +2 22h 51m + $3,595.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $49.96 3h 55m in EWR plus an extra $49.96 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 12:15a ­ 2:15p +1 23h 0m + $144.76 American Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.45 5h 22m in DFW plus an extra $15.45 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 9:25p ­ 11:25a +2 23h 0m + $194.02 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $15.95 plus an extra $15.95 YVR, PVG Ex. J Air Canada 8084 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Page 17 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 5/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 19 of 26 PageID #: 379 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 7:15p ­ 9:30a +2 23h 15m + $2,977.10 British Airways SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $43.78 3h 55m in LHR plus an extra $43.78 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 2:10a ­ 4:40p +1 23h 30m + $2,048.80 EVA Airways SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $34.49 7h 50m in TPE plus an extra $34.49 EVA Airways 2762 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 6:05p ­ 8:55a +2 23h 50m + $4,905.20 KLM SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $63.06 4h 25m in AMS plus an extra $63.06 KLM 6014 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 8:25p ­ 11:25a +2 24h 0m + $322.37 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $17.23 LAX, PVG plus an extra $17.23 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 8:25p ­ 11:25a +2 24h 0m + $326.37 China Eastern Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $17.27 LAX, PVG plus an extra $17.27 China Eastern Airlines 4335 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 2:08p ­ 5:20a +2 24h 12m + $3,247.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops Earn $46.48 LAX plus an extra $46.48 United 7617 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees 2:00p ­ 5:15a +2 24h 15m + $4,950.20 Lufthansa SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $63.51 5h 10m in FRA plus an extra $63.51 Lufthansa 7322 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) Ex. J 1:35p ­ 5:20a +2 24h 45m + $3,247.30 Page 18 of 25 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 6/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 20 of 26 PageID #: 380 roundtrip United SEA ­ PEK Earn $46.48 1 stop    plus an extra $46.48 9h in LAX United 5384 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select United 7617 operated by Air China Limited Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 10:17p ­ 2:20p +2 25h 3m + $3,494.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $48.95 6h 21m in IAD plus an extra $48.95 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:55a ­ 12:15a +2 25h 20m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1194 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 11:10p ­ 3:35p +2 25h 25m + $77.87 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.79 YVR, PVG plus an extra $14.79 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 9:05p ­ 1:35p +2 25h 30m + $3,595.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $49.96 6h 34m in EWR plus an extra $49.96 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:44p ­ 6:15a +2 25h 31m + $4,905.20 KLM SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $63.06 6h 5m in AMS plus an extra $63.06 KLM 6032 operated by Delta Air Lines KLM 4303 operated by China Southern Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:30p ­ 11:10a +2 25h 40m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1195 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 9:25p ­ 2:10p +2 25h 45m + $275.60 Air Canada SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $16.76 plus an extra $16.76 14h 1m in YVR Ex. J Air Canada 8084 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Page 19 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 7/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 21 of 26 PageID #: 381 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 1:07p ­ 5:55a +2 25h 48m + $4,908.10 Air France SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $63.09 5h 40m in CDG plus an extra $63.09 Air France 3653 operated by Delta Air Lines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:06a ­ 12:15a +2 26h 9m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1939 operated by Virgin America Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:55a ­ 1:10a +2 26h 15m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1194 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 9:05p ­ 2:30p +2 26h 25m + $3,595.30 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $49.96 7h 29m in EWR plus an extra $49.96 United 7584 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 11:40p +1 26h 40m + $282.52 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.83 LAX, PVG plus an extra $16.83 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 6:30p ­ 12:15p +2 26h 45m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1195 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 7:06a ­ 1:10a +2 27h 4m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1939 operated by Virgin America Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 11:10p ­ 5:20p +2 27h 10m + $77.87 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Ex. J 2 stops   Earn $14.79 Page 20 of 25  YVR, PVG plus an extra $14.79 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 8/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 22 of 26 PageID #: 382 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) 2:00p ­ 8:30a +2 27h 30m Select to price Lufthansa SEA ­ PEK 1 stop    Select 8h 25m in FRA Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 9:50p ­ 4:30p +2 27h 40m + $69.07 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.70 14h 37m in YYC plus an extra $14.70 Alaska Airlines 2126 operated by Horizon Air As Alaskahorizon Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 6:30p ­ 1:15p +2 27h 45m Select to price China Southern Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select LAX, CAN China Southern Airlines 1195 operated by Delta Air Lines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 2:40p ­ 9:40a +2 28h 0m + $364.74 Asiana Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $17.65 14h 20m in ICN plus an extra $17.65 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:15p ­ 9:15a +2 28h 0m Select to price Korean Air SEA ­ PEK 1 stop   Select 14h 35m in ICN Korean Air 5803 operated by China Southern Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:05p ­ 2:10p +2 28h 5m + $275.60 Air Canada SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $16.76 16h 21m in YVR plus an extra $16.76 Air Canada 8098 operated by Air Canada Express ­ Jazz Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 11:59p ­ 7:05p +2 28h 6m + $0.00 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.01 8h 52m in BOS plus an extra $14.01 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 7:22p ­ 2:40p +2 28h 18m + $157.39 Ex. J United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip Page 21 of 25 1 stop Earn $15.58 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 9/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 23 of 26 PageID #: 383 14h in SFO    Earn $15.58 plus an extra $15.58 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 3:39p ­ 11:25a +2 28h 46m Select to price Delta SEA ­ PEK 1 stop    Select 13h 45m in PVG Delta 6470 operated by China Eastern Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 2:10a ­ 10:05p +1 28h 55m + $2,048.80 EVA Airways SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $34.49 13h 15m in TPE plus an extra $34.49 EVA Airways 2766 operated by Air China Limited Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 7:02p ­ 3:10p +2 29h 8m + $712.64 Air China SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $21.13 13h 24m in LAX plus an extra $21.13 Air China 7220 operated by SkyWest Airlines Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 11:59p ­ 8:20p +2 29h 21m + $160.39 American Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.61 12h 10m in ORD plus an extra $15.61 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 9:50a +2 29h 25m + $76.86 Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops Earn $14.78 XMN plus an extra $14.78 Select Flight details and baggage fees 6:15p ­ 2:40p +2 29h 25m + $157.39 United SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.58 15h 5m in SFO plus an extra $15.58 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:45p ­ 2:15p +2 29h 30m + $144.76 American Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $15.45 11h 53m in DFW plus an extra $15.45 Ex. J Select Page 22 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C… 10/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 24 of 26 PageID #: 384 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 5:32p ­ 2:40p +2 30h 8m Select to price United SEA ­ PEK 1 stop    Select 15h 47m in SFO Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:35p ­ 3:25p +2 30h 50m + $1,118.78 Emirates SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $25.19 8h 55m in DXB plus an extra $25.19 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:15p ­ 12:10p +2 30h 55m Select to price Korean Air SEA ­ PEK 1 stop   Select 17h 25m in ICN Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 1:25p ­ 11:50a +2 31h 25m Select to price Xiamen Airlines SEA ­ PEK 2 stops Select XMN Flight details and baggage fees 2:40p ­ 2:00p +2 32h 20m + $364.74 Asiana Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop   Earn $17.65 19h in ICN plus an extra $17.65 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 9:25p ­ 11:40p +2 35h 15m + $290.82 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.91 LAX, PVG plus an extra $16.91 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 5:35p ­ 10:20p +2 37h 45m + $886.87 Emirates SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.88 15h 50m in DXB plus an extra $22.88 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 11:25a +2 38h 25m + $88.82 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.89 LAX, PVG plus an extra $14.89 Select Ex. J Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) Page 23 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C%… 11/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 25 of 26 PageID #: 385 5:50p ­ 11:40p +2 38h 50m + $72.63 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.73 SFO, PVG plus an extra $14.73 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.6 out of 10) 11:10p ­ 5:10p +3 51h 0m + $207.64 Multiple Airlines SEA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.08 PDX, SJC plus an extra $16.08 Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (1.7 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS hipmunk.com ▼ Cheap Seattle Airfare ­ 60% off Roundtrip Fares Find Deals on Seattle Airfare Today. Compare Top Airline Brands Online. Compare Prices · Top Brands · Find Today's Deals · Search, Select & Save Amenities: Inflight WiFi, Free Checked Bags, Inflight Meals Ratings: Website 8/10, Movies, TV and Sports "Hipmunk is the new gold standard in hotel and flight searches" ­ Forbes lowfares.com ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle Airfare Sale On Now to Seattle. Book Now to Lock in the Best Deals! trvl.deals ▼ $49 Flights to Seattle ­ 24 Hour Sale Just Went Live (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Flight Sale to Seattle. Cheap Flights on Sale 24/7. Book Now & Save! seattle‑flights.one… ▼ $167 Seattle RoundTrip (888) 481­9454 Airfares for Seattle Just Dropped. Book Your Flights Today & Save! (4.4) Over 450 Airline Partners · 24 X 7 Customer Support · Low Cost Airfares · Fast & Easy Booking Destinations: Orlando, Miami, Chicago, Denver, New York Low Fare Promise ­ Online­Travel­Sites­Review, Las Vegas, Atlanta, Manila, Mexico city, Phoenix Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Ex. J Mobile Vacations by Interest Page 24 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C… 12/13 6/7/2017 PEK to SEA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-12 Filed 06/13/17 Page 26 of 26 PageID #: 386 ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. J Page 25 of 25 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK­Capital%20Intl.)%2Cto%3ASeattle%2C%20WA%2C… 13/13

Exhibit K

EXHIBIT K 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 2 of 23 PageID #: 388 1  Account My Scratchpad 6 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  PEK ­ XNA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Select your departure to Fayetteville Mon, Jul 10 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) 1 Stop (12) $1,477 Show flexible dates 2+ Stops (50) $1,472 Save up to $108 when you book your Flight and Hotel together.  Shop Flight + Hotel  Airlines included From: United (23) $2,297 4:10p ­ 9:09p 17h 59m $2,298.76 American $1,472 United PEK ­ XNA roundtrip Airlines (21) 1 stop    Earn $22.99 2h 50m in ORD plus an extra $22.99 Delta (12) $2,449 United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Hainan Airlines $2,836 Select Express (12) Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) Alaska Airlines $2,892 (5) 10:10a ­ 3:10p 18h 0m $1,476.76 Korean Air (5) $2,650 roundtrip American Airlines PEK ­ XNA Qatar Airways $1,627 1 stop    Earn $14.77 (5) 3h 29m in ORD plus an extra $14.77 Show all American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Departure time ­ Beijing Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Early Morning (12:00a ­ 4:59a) 4:25p ­ 9:28p 18h 3m $1,476.76 Morning (5:00a ­ American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 11:59a) 1 stop    Earn $14.77 3h 15m in DFW plus an extra $14.77 Afternoon (12:00p ­ 5:59p) American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Evening (6:00p ­ 11:59p) Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) 10:10a ­ 4:02p 18h 52m $2,713.57 American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $27.14 SPONSORED LISTINGS ORD, DFW plus an extra $27.14 American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) 12:00p ­ 6:21p 19h 21m $2,363.10 United PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.63 SFO, DEN plus an extra $23.63 United 3614 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) Ex. K Page 1 of 22 $1,476.76 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 1/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 3 of 23 PageID #: 389 10:10a ­ 4:53p 19h 43m $1,476.76 American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip justfly.com ▼ 1 stop    Earn $14.77 (800) 717­5015 5h 5m in ORD plus an extra $14.77 $174 Fayetteville Round Trip ­ Check It Out ­ American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Really Cheap Eagle Cheap Flights To Fayetteville From $174. Fly Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.3 out of 10) From Newark. Book Today! No Extra Charges "...Flights for those · Rating: 9.5/10 4:25p ­ 11:16p 19h 51m $1,476.76 inspired to American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip travel." ­ CrunchBase 1 stop    Earn $14.77 RoundTrip To Fayetteville 5h 2m in DFW plus an extra $14.77 One­Way To Fayetteville American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Non­Stop To Fayetteville Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.4 out of 10) cheaptickets.com ▼ (877) 468­5247 10:10a ­ 6:41p 21h 31m $1,476.76 (4.2) American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Lowest Price 1 stop    Earn $14.77 Guaranteed 6h 55m in ORD plus an extra $14.77 Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you American Airlines 3311 operated by Envoy Air As American Select book today! Eagle 24/7 Customer Support Destinations: New York · Hotels Under $50 Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.1 out of 10) Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 $2,498.10 travel sites in 10:45a ­ 7:29p 21h 44m roundtrip 2017 ­ Top Ten Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA Reviews 2 stops    Earn $24.98 plus an extra $24.98 Flight Deals Under $199 NRT, DFW Vacation Deals Under $500 Japan Airlines 7012 operated by American Airlines American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Up to 50% Off Hotels Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) onetravel.com ▼ (888) 481­9454 (4.4) 11:20a ­ 9:45p 23h 25m $2,492.38 $264 Fayetteville Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip RoundTrip ­ Absolutely 2 stops    Earn $24.92 Low Fare on Flights SEA, ATL plus an extra $24.92 Find Our Low Airfares to Fayetteville Flights. Book Your Flight & Save Today! Select Low Cost Airfares Services: · Over 450 Airline Partners Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) Low Fare Use Coupons & Save More Promise ­ Online­ Travel­Sites­Review 11:20a ­ 9:45p 23h 25m $2,694.38 Last Minute Cheap Flights Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip One Way Flights Specials 2 stops    Earn $26.94 Military Flights Discount SEA, ATL plus an extra $26.94 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 11:20a ­ 9:45p 23h 25m $2,694.38 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.94 SEA, ATL plus an extra $26.94 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) Ex. K 12:00p ­ 10:37p 23h 37m $2,339.76 United PEK ­ XNA roundtrip Page 2 of 22 Earn $23.40 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 2/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 4 of 23 PageID #: 390 1 stop    Earn $23.40 7h 53m in SFO plus an extra $23.40 United 5289 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) 10:45a ­ 9:28p 23h 43m $2,498.10 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.98 NRT, DFW plus an extra $24.98 Japan Airlines 7012 operated by American Airlines American Airlines 3613 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 10:45a ­ 9:46p 24h 1m $1,471.05 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $14.71 NRT, ORD plus an extra $14.71 Japan Airlines 7010 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3812 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 9:50a ­ 9:09p 24h 19m $3,056.15 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.56 NRT, ORD plus an extra $30.56 All Nippon Airways 7006 operated by United Airlines Inc United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 9:50a ­ 9:09p 24h 19m $3,056.15 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.56 NRT, ORD plus an extra $30.56 United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 10:10a ­ 9:46p 24h 36m $1,476.76 American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $14.77 10h 5m in ORD plus an extra $14.77 American Airlines 3812 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.6 out of 10) 10:45a ­ 11:16p 25h 31m $2,498.10 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.98 NRT, DFW plus an extra $24.98 Japan Airlines 7012 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3340 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.4 out of 10) Ex. K 3:50p ­ 8:01a +1 29h 11m Page 3 of 22 $2,891.82 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 3/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 5 of 23 PageID #: 391 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA $2,891.82 2 stops    roundtrip SEA, DFW Earn $28.92 plus an extra $28.92 Alaska Airlines 4373 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Fair Flight (5.9 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 9:15a +1 29h 45m $2,448.49 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.48 DTW, ATL plus an extra $24.48 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 9:15a +1 29h 45m $2,448.49 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.48 DTW, ATL plus an extra $24.48 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 6:41p 29h 51m $1,626.16 Qatar Airways PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.26 DOH, ORD plus an extra $16.26 Qatar Airways 5256 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 6:41p 29h 51m $1,629.15 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.29 DOH, ORD plus an extra $16.29 American Airlines 3311 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 4:10p ­ 9:04a +1 29h 54m $2,296.76 United PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.97 14h 45m in ORD plus an extra $22.97 United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 9:46a +1 30h 16m $2,448.49 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.48 DTW, CVG plus an extra $24.48 Delta 3493 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Delta 3555 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 9:46a +1 30h 16m $2,456.69 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip Ex. K 2 stops    Earn $24.57 Page 4 of 22 plus an extra $24.57 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 4/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 6 of 23 PageID #: 392 DTW, CVG plus an extra $24.57 Delta 4501 and 3555 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Select Connection Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:25p ­ 10:01a +1 30h 36m $2,717.78 American Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $27.18 15h 45m in DFW plus an extra $27.18 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 9:15p ­ 3:10p +1 30h 55m $2,649.61 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.50 ICN, ORD plus an extra $26.50 American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 11:10a +1 31h 40m $2,456.69 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.57 DTW, MSP plus an extra $24.57 Delta 5322 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 11:10a +1 31h 40m $2,456.69 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.57 DTW, MSP plus an extra $24.57 Delta 5322 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 9:15p ­ 4:53p +1 32h 38m $2,649.61 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $26.50 ICN, ORD plus an extra $26.50 American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 12:25p +1 32h 55m $2,462.29 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.62 DTW, ATL plus an extra $24.62 Delta 5469 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 12:25p +1 32h 55m $2,462.29 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $24.62 DTW, ATL plus an extra $24.62 Ex. K Delta 5469 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Page 5 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 5/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 7 of 23 PageID #: 393 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 9:46p 32h 56m $1,629.15 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.29 DOH, ORD plus an extra $16.29 American Airlines 3812 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 11:49a +1 32h 59m $2,958.68 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $29.59 SEA, ORD plus an extra $29.59 Alaska Airlines 4165 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 3:10p +1 33h 0m $2,649.61 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.50 ICN, ORD plus an extra $26.50 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Select American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:05p ­ 2:21p +1 33h 16m $2,998.39 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $29.98 YYZ, ORD plus an extra $29.98 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 6:05p ­ 2:21p +1 33h 16m $4,121.05 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $41.21 YYZ, ORD plus an extra $41.21 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 8:00p ­ 5:40p +1 34h 40m $2,554.37 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $25.54 HKG, ORD plus an extra $25.54 United 4729 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 4:53p +1 34h 43m $2,649.61 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $26.50 ICN, ORD plus an extra $26.50 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Select American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Ex. K Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) Page 6 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 6/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 8 of 23 PageID #: 394 4:30p ­ 2:21p +1 34h 51m $4,218.95 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $42.19 DTW, ORD plus an extra $42.19 China Southern Airlines 1020 operated by Delta Air Lines Select United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:30p ­ 2:21p +1 34h 51m $4,456.85 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $44.57 DTW, ORD plus an extra $44.57 China Eastern Airlines 8887 operated by Delta Air Lines United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 11:20a ­ 9:15a +1 34h 55m $2,699.98 Delta PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 3 stops Earn $27.00 LAX, ATL plus an extra $27.00 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 4:10p ­ 2:21p +1 35h 11m $2,296.76 United PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $22.97 20h 2m in ORD plus an extra $22.97 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.2 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 2:21p +1 35h 31m $4,716.30 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $47.16 SEA, ORD plus an extra $47.16 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 3:35p ­ 2:21p +1 35h 46m $3,028.25 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.28 HND, ORD plus an extra $30.28 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 9:50a ­ 9:04a +1 36h 14m $3,062.43 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.62 NRT, ORD plus an extra $30.62 All Nippon Airways 7006 operated by United Airlines Inc Select United 5789 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 3:09p +1 36h 19m $2,964.28 Ex. K roundtrip Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA Page 7 of 22 Earn $29.64 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 7/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 9 of 23 PageID #: 395 2 stops    Earn $29.64 SEA, LAX plus an extra $29.64 Alaska Airlines 4662 operated by Compass Airlines As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 2:25p ­ 2:21p +1 36h 56m $2,835.72 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $28.36 YYZ, ORD plus an extra $28.36 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 2:25p ­ 2:21p +1 36h 56m $2,835.72 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $28.36 YYZ, ORD plus an extra $28.36 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 2:25p ­ 2:21p +1 36h 56m $3,958.05 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $39.58 YYZ, ORD plus an extra $39.58 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 4:02p +1 37h 12m $2,964.28 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $29.64 SEA, DFW plus an extra $29.64 Alaska Airlines 4744 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 7:10p ­ 7:29p +1 37h 19m $2,653.71 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.54 ICN, DFW plus an extra $26.54 Korean Air 5804 operated by China Southern Airlines Korean Air 5031 operated by American Airlines Select American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 9:20a ­ 10:32a +1 38h 12m $2,382.34 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $23.82 21h 35m in EWR plus an extra $23.82 United 3602 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 5:39p +1 38h 49m $2,964.28 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip Ex. K 2 stops   Earn $29.64 Page 8 of 22  SEA, DFW plus an extra $29.64 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 8/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 10 of 23 PageID #: 396 Alaska Airlines 4645 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 5:40p +1 38h 50m $3,066.27 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.66 SEA, ORD plus an extra $30.66 United 4729 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 5:40p +1 38h 50m $4,716.30 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $47.16 SEA, ORD plus an extra $47.16 United 4729 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 2:25p ­ 5:40p +1 40h 15m $3,958.05 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $39.58 YYZ, ORD plus an extra $39.58 United 4729 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 9:20a ­ 2:21p +1 42h 1m $3,618.13 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $36.18 EWR, ORD plus an extra $36.18 United 5314 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 11:49a +1 46h 59m $1,648.55 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops   Earn $16.49 DOH, ORD plus an extra $16.49 American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 1:50a ­ 3:10p +1 50h 20m $1,648.55 Multiple Airlines PEK ­ XNA roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $16.49 DOH, ORD plus an extra $16.49 American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) Ex. K Page 9 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 9/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 11 of 23 PageID #: 397 SPONSORED LISTINGS trvl.deals ▼ $49 Fayetteville Flights (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Fare Sale to Fayetteville Prices Updated Every 20 Minutes. kayak.com ▼ Find Travel Deals: KAYAK (4.1) We Search 100s of Sites at Once. Compare Flight and Hotel Deals Now. Combine hotels+flights · Best prices online · Save time and money · Set price alerts Services: Hotel Deals, Flights, Car Rentals, Vacation Packages Ratings: Selection 10/10 ­ Fees 9.5/10 ­ Prices 9.5/10 Truly makes sure you find the best deal ­ PC Magazine ­ Website 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Service 9/10 fayetteville.jetcos… ▼ $186 Fayetteville Flights Cheap Flights to Fayetteville Now. Compare Flights up to 80% Off! Low Cost Flights · Flight Deals · Last Minute Flights Services: Cheap Flights Comparison, Hotel Price Comparison, Compare Cheap Car Rental lowfares.com ▼ Fayetteville from $109* ­ Fare Sale on Now. Book (844) 311­2315 Today. Fayetteville Flight Rates Just Dropped! Book Now to Lock in the Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. K Page 10 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 10/10 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 12 of 23 PageID #: 398 1  Account My Scratchpad 6 My Trips Support Español  Join Rewards  Home Hotels Flights Packages Cars Vacation Rentals Cruises Deals Activities Discover Mobile Rewards  PEK ­ XNA Jul 10 ­ Jul 12 Change search  Your selected 4:10p ­ 9:09p 17h 59m from $2,298.76 departure United PEK ­ XNA roundtrip Mon, Jul 10 Change 1 stop 2h 50m in ORD United 3864 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select your return to Beijing Wed, Jul 12 Prices are roundtrip per person, include all taxes and fees, but do not include baggage fees. Stops From: Duration (Shortest) 1 Stop (14) $2,299 Show flexible dates 2+ Stops (63) $2,359 8:32a ­ 2:15p +1 16h 43m + $65.44 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Airlines included From: 1 stop    Earn $23.64 1h 31m in DFW plus an extra $23.64 American $2,359 American Airlines 3290 operated by Envoy Air As American Where are Flea Airlines (34) Select Eagle and Tick United (24) $2,299 Populations the… Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Worst? (petMD.com) Delta (16) $2,370 Japan Airlines $2,382 8:00a ­ 2:15p +1 17h 15m + $65.44 (8) American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Air China (4) $2,638 1 stop    Earn $23.64 2h 2m in DFW plus an extra $23.64 Etihad Airways $2,812 (4) American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Qatar Airways $3,110 16 Child Stars (4) Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) Who Grew Up To Show all Be Super… 7:35a ­ 2:40p +1 18h 5m + $0.00 Attractive! (Parent Society) Departure time ­ United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Fayetteville 1 stop    Earn $22.99 1h 46m in SFO plus an extra $22.99 Morning (5:00a ­ 11:59a) United 5550 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Afternoon (12:00p ­ Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 5:59p) Evening (6:00p ­ + $65.44 Who Is Xavier 6:28a ­ 2:15p +1 18h 47m 11:59p) American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Emmanuel Earn $23.64 Serrano Rosad… 1 stop   The Orlando  plus an extra $23.64 (Romper) 3h 38m in DFW American Airlines 3631 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select SPONSORED LISTINGS Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.6 out of 10) 12:23p ­ 8:20p +1 18h 57m + $59.84 roundtrip American Airlines XNA ­ PEK Ex. K 1 stop   Earn $23.59 Page 11 of 22  3h 46m in ORD plus an extra $23.59 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 1/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 13 of 23 PageID #: 399 American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle justfly.com ▼ (800) 717­5015 Flight details and baggage fees Excellent Flight (8.5 out of 10) $174 Fayetteville Round Trip ­ Check It Out ­ Really Cheap 12:21p ­ 8:20p +1 18h 59m + $59.84 Cheap Flights To American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Fayetteville From $174. Fly 2 stops    Earn $23.59 From Newark. Book Today! Our Unbeatable Prices DFW, ORD plus an extra $23.59 "...Flights for those · Service Excellence American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American inspired to Select Eagle travel." ­ CrunchBase RoundTrip To Fayetteville Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.8 out of 10) One­Way To Fayetteville Non­Stop To Fayetteville 6:20a ­ 3:15p +1 19h 55m + $65.44 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $23.64 cheaptickets.com ▼ 4h 25m in ORD plus an extra $23.64 (877) 468­5247 (4.2) United 4040 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Select Cheap Flight Tickets ­ Express Lowest Price Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) Guaranteed Compare rates from all the top airlines. Save when you book today! 10:21a ­ 7:50p +1 20h 29m + $70.95 Up to $537 off Air+Hotel Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Destinations: New York · 24/7 Customer Support 2 stops    Earn $23.70 Ratings: Selection 9.5/10, Las Vegas, San Francisco MSP, SEA plus an extra $23.70 One of the best online ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Fees 9/10 travel sites in Delta 4780 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select 2017 ­ Top Ten Reviews Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) Flight Deals Under $199 Vacation Deals Under $500 10:32a ­ 8:20p +1 20h 48m + $59.84 Deals on 275,000+ Hotels American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.59 DFW, ORD plus an extra $23.59 onetravel.com ▼ (888) 481­9454 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American (4.4) Select Eagle $264 Fayetteville RoundTrip ­ Absolutely Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.7 out of 10) Low Fare on Flights Find Our Low Airfares to Fayetteville Flights. Book 10:32a ­ 8:20p +1 20h 48m + $59.84 Your Flight & Save Today! American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Low Cost Airfares 2 stops    Earn $23.59 Destinations: Orlando, Miami · 24 X 7 Customer Support plus an extra $23.59 Low Fare, Chicago, Denver, New York DFW, ORD Promise ­ Online­ American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Travel­Sites­Review Eagle Select Last Minute Cheap Flights Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.6 out of 10) One Way Flights Specials Military Flights Discount 9:50a ­ 7:50p +1 21h 0m + $70.95 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.70 ATL, SEA plus an extra $23.70 Delta 3623 operated by Endeavor Air DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 6:20p +1 21h 20m + $4,316.79 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops Earn $66.16 DFW, JFK plus an extra $66.16 American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Ex. K Select Eagle Page 12 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 2/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 14 of 23 PageID #: 400 Flight details and baggage fees 9:54a ­ 8:20p +1 21h 26m + $90.14 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.89 LGA, ORD plus an extra $23.89 American Airlines 4683 operated by Republic Airlines As Where are Flea Select and Tick American Eagle Populations the… Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.5 out of 10) Worst? (petMD.com) 10:32a ­ 9:15p +1 21h 43m + $83.24 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.82 DFW, NRT plus an extra $23.82 American Airlines 3708 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 16 Child Stars Who Grew Up To Be Super… 9:20a ­ 8:05p +1 21h 45m + $799.13 Attractive! (Parent Society) Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $30.98 ORD, ICN plus an extra $30.98 American Airlines 3583 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.4 out of 10) Who Is Xavier 9:20a ­ 8:20p +1 22h 0m + $59.84 Emmanuel American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip Serrano Rosad… 1 stop    Earn $23.59 The Orlando (Romper) 6h 53m in ORD plus an extra $23.59 American Airlines 3583 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (8.2 out of 10) 9:20a ­ 9:15p +1 22h 55m + $83.24 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.82 ORD, NRT plus an extra $23.82 American Airlines 3583 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 9:20a ­ 9:15p +1 22h 55m + $822.79 Japan Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.22 ORD, NRT plus an extra $31.22 Japan Airlines 7443 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle For Aa Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 9:20a ­ 9:15p +1 22h 55m + $822.79 Japan Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.22 ORD, NRT plus an extra $31.22 Japan Airlines 7443 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select For Aa Japan Airlines 7009 operated by American Airlines Ex. K Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) Page 13 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 3/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 15 of 23 PageID #: 401 9:20a ­ 9:15p +1 22h 55m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select ORD, NRT American Airlines 3583 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle American Airlines 8404 operated by Japan Airlines Intl Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 8:20p +1 23h 20m + $59.84 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.59 DFW, ORD plus an extra $23.59 American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 8:20p +1 23h 20m + $59.84 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.59 DFW, ORD plus an extra $23.59 American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 8:20p +1 23h 20m + $59.84 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.59 DFW, ORD plus an extra $23.59 American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.3 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 9:15p +1 24h 15m + $83.24 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.82 DFW, NRT plus an extra $23.82 American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 8:00a ­ 9:15p +1 24h 15m + $83.24 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.82 DFW, NRT plus an extra $23.82 American Airlines 3336 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 7:50p +1 24h 50m + $70.95 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.70 ATL, SEA plus an extra $23.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) Ex. K 6:00a ­ 7:50p +1 24h 50m + $70.95 Page 14 of 22 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 4/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 16 of 23 PageID #: 402 roundtrip Delta XNA ­ PEK Earn $23.70 2 stops    plus an extra $23.70 ATL, SEA Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 7:50p +1 24h 50m + $70.95 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.70 ATL, SEA plus an extra $23.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 7:50p +1 24h 50m + $70.95 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.70 ATL, SEA plus an extra $23.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.8 out of 10) 6:00a ­ 7:50p +1 24h 50m + $70.95 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 3 stops Earn $23.70 ATL, LAX plus an extra $23.70 Select Flight details and baggage fees 6:00a ­ 8:20p +1 25h 20m + $59.84 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $23.59 10h 10m in ORD plus an extra $23.59 American Airlines 3318 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Very Good Flight (7.7 out of 10) 6:20a ­ 9:20p +1 26h 0m + $1,206.69 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $35.05 ORD, NRT plus an extra $35.05 United 4040 operated by Expressjet Airlines DBA United Express Select All Nippon Airways 7009 operated by United Airlines Inc Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 7:54p ­ 2:15p +2 29h 21m + $69.54 American Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $23.68 14h 14m in DFW plus an extra $23.68 American Airlines 3363 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Good Flight (7.1 out of 10) 1:59p ­ 8:45a +2 29h 46m + $992.25 roundtrip Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK Ex. K 2 stops   Earn $32.91 Page 15 of 22  DFW, AUH plus an extra $32.91 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 5/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 17 of 23 PageID #: 403 American Airlines 3639 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.2 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 1:35p +2 30h 25m + $3,309.79 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.09 ORD, EWR plus an extra $56.09 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 1:35p +2 30h 25m + $3,365.39 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.64 ORD, EWR plus an extra $56.64 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 1:35p +2 30h 25m + $3,365.39 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.64 ORD, EWR plus an extra $56.64 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 1:35p +2 30h 45m + $3,334.27 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $56.33 13h 53m in EWR plus an extra $56.33 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.7 out of 10) 6:09p ­ 2:15p +2 31h 6m Select to price American Airlines XNA ­ PEK 1 stop    Select 15h 55m in DFW American Airlines 3666 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Satisfactory Flight (6.9 out of 10) 6:35p ­ 2:45p +2 31h 10m + $76.55 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.75 ATL, DTW plus an extra $23.75 Delta 4617 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:35p ­ 2:45p +2 31h 10m + $76.55 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.75 ATL, DTW plus an extra $23.75 Delta 4617 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Ex. K Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) Page 16 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 6/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 18 of 23 PageID #: 404 6:35p ­ 2:45p +2 31h 10m + $91.70 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.90 ATL, DTW plus an extra $23.90 Delta 4617 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:57p ­ 3:10p +2 31h 13m + $339.15 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $26.38 IAH, LAX plus an extra $26.38 United 3617 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select American Airlines 6071 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 12:21p ­ 8:45a +2 31h 24m + $512.50 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $28.11 DFW, AUH plus an extra $28.11 American Airlines 3599 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 2:40p +2 31h 30m + $65.44 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.64 ORD, SFO plus an extra $23.64 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 2:40p +2 31h 30m + $65.44 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.64 ORD, SFO plus an extra $23.64 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 2:40p +2 31h 30m + $65.44 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.64 ORD, SFO plus an extra $23.64 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.4 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 2:40p +2 31h 30m + $65.44 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.64 ORD, SFO plus an extra $23.64 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) Ex. K 5:50p ­ 2:30p +2 31h 40m + $350.38 Page 17 of 22 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 7/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 19 of 23 PageID #: 405 roundtrip Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK Earn $26.49 1 stop    plus an extra $26.49 14h 48m in EWR United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 5:21p ­ 2:15p +2 31h 54m Select to price American Airlines XNA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select ORD, DFW American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 5:21p ­ 2:15p +2 31h 54m Select to price American Airlines XNA ­ PEK 2 stops    Select ORD, DFW American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.6 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 3:15p +2 32h 5m + $72.92 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 1 stop    Earn $23.72 16h 35m in ORD plus an extra $23.72 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.1 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 3:15p +2 32h 25m + $3,315.39 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.14 EWR, ORD plus an extra $56.14 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 3:15p +2 32h 25m + $3,315.39 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.14 EWR, ORD plus an extra $56.14 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 3:15p +2 32h 25m + $3,315.39 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.14 EWR, ORD plus an extra $56.14 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 3:15p +2 32h 25m + $3,344.74 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.44 EWR, ORD plus an extra $56.44 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Ex. K Select Page 18 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 8/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 20 of 23 PageID #: 406 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:05p ­ 2:45p +2 32h 40m + $76.55 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $23.75 LGA, DTW plus an extra $23.75 Delta 5590 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 4:33p ­ 2:15p +2 32h 42m Select to price American Airlines XNA ­ PEK 1 stop    Select 17h 33m in DFW American Airlines 3684 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (4.3 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 2:15p +2 33h 25m + $4,316.79 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops Earn $66.16 LAX, JFK plus an extra $66.16 American Airlines 6012 operated by Compass Airlines As Select American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees 2:57p ­ 1:35p +2 33h 38m + $3,332.77 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.32 ORD, EWR plus an extra $56.32 United 5268 operated by Skywest DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 2:55p +2 34h 5m + $810.59 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.09 ORD, DOH plus an extra $31.09 American Airlines 3638 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 2:55p +2 34h 5m + $812.59 Qatar Airways XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.11 ORD, DOH plus an extra $31.11 Qatar Airways 5325 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 9:20a ­ 8:45a +2 34h 25m + $512.50 Etihad Airways XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $28.11 ORD, AUH plus an extra $28.11 Etihad Airways 3262 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) Ex. K 11:10a ­ 12:20p +2 36h 10m + $1,245.79 Page 19 of 22 roundtrip https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 9/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 21 of 23 PageID #: 407 roundtrip Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK Earn $35.45 2 stops    plus an extra $35.45 ORD, HND United 3663 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.7 out of 10) 6:35p ­ 7:50p +2 36h 15m + $70.95 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 3 stops Earn $23.70 ATL, LAX plus an extra $23.70 Delta 4617 operated by Skywest DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 12:23p ­ 2:55p +2 37h 32m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK 2 stops   Select ORD, DOH American Airlines 3826 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 3:50p ­ 7:45p +2 38h 55m + $829.89 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $31.29 LAX, HND plus an extra $31.29 American Airlines 6012 operated by Compass Airlines As American Eagle Select Japan Airlines 7017 operated by American Airlines Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 3:25p ­ 7:50p +2 39h 25m + $89.28 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 3 stops Earn $23.88 ATL, LAX plus an extra $23.88 Delta 5549 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 3:25p ­ 7:50p +2 39h 25m + $89.28 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 3 stops Earn $23.88 ATL, LAX plus an extra $23.88 Delta 5549 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 3:25p ­ 7:50p +2 39h 25m + $89.28 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 3 stops Earn $23.88 ATL, LAX plus an extra $23.88 Delta 5549 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 9:20a ­ 2:55p +2 40h 35m Select to price Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK 2 stops Select    Ex. K ORD, DOH American Airlines 3583 operated by Envoy Air As American Eagle Page 20 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 10/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 22 of 23 PageID #: 408 Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.3 out of 10) 1:00p ­ 7:50p +2 41h 50m + $89.28 Delta XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 3 stops Earn $23.88 ATL, LAX plus an extra $23.88 Delta 5469 operated by ExpressJet DBA Delta Connection Select Flight details and baggage fees 5:21p ­ 8:50a +3 50h 29m + $532.33 Multiple Airlines XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $28.31 ORD, AUH plus an extra $28.31 American Airlines 3476 operated by Envoy Air As American Select Eagle Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 1:35p +3 54h 25m + $3,392.12 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.91 ORD, EWR plus an extra $56.91 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 6:10p ­ 1:35p +3 54h 25m + $3,392.12 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.91 ORD, EWR plus an extra $56.91 United 4732 operated by Trans States Airlines DBA United Select Express Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 3:15p +3 56h 25m + $3,344.74 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.44 EWR, ORD plus an extra $56.44 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) 5:50p ­ 3:15p +3 56h 25m + $3,344.74 United XNA ­ PEK roundtrip 2 stops    Earn $56.44 EWR, ORD plus an extra $56.44 United 3612 operated by Republic Airlines DBA United Express Select Flight details and baggage fees Poor Flight (3.5 out of 10) SPONSORED LISTINGS Ex. K Page 21 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 11/12 6/7/2017 PEK to XNA Flights Orbitz Case 5:16-cv-05302-PKH Document 42-13 Filed 06/13/17 Page 23 of 23 PageID #: 409 trvl.deals ▼ $49 Fayetteville Flights (855) 258­5310 24 Hour Fare Sale to Fayetteville Prices Updated Every 20 Minutes. smartfares.com ▼ Find Cheap Airfares ­ Great Discounts on All Flights (877) 247­4062 Book with SmartFares® & Save (4.5) More Savings with Coupons · Our Best Price Guarantee · 24/7 Customer Support · Free Cancellation Destinations: USA, Canada, Caribbean, Europe, Oceania, South America, Asia, Africa fayetteville.jetcos… ▼ $186 Fayetteville Flights Cheap Flights to Fayetteville Now. Compare Flights up to 80% Off! Flight Deals · Low Cost Flights · Last Minute Flights Destinations: Miami, Los Angeles, Orlando, Chicago, Washington kayak.com ▼ Cheap Airfares: KAYAK® (4.1) Compare Options On Many Airlines. Compare 100s Of Flights For No Fee. Set price alerts · Best price on airfares · Search flexible dates · Cheap travel deals Services: Flights, Hotel Deals, Car Rental, Vacation Packages Ratings: Selection 10/10 ­ Fees 9.5/10 ­ Prices 9.5/10, Trip Planning Truly makes sure you find the best deal ­ PC Magazine ­ Website 9.5/10 ­ Travel info 9/10 ­ Service 9/10 Give your feedback to help us make improvements. Explore More  Orbitz About Orbitz Investor Relations Jobs Media Room Advertising Become an Affiliate Add a Hotel Add an Activity Orbitz for Business Orbitz for Agents Terms of Use Privacy Policy Orbitz Rewards Orbitz Rewards VIP Hotels Visa Card Benefits Promotions Other Links Vacation Packages Car Rental Cruises Travel Blog Customer Support Price Guarantee Travel Deals Mobile Vacations by Interest ©2017 Orbitz, LLC. All rights reserved. Orbitz, Orbitz.com, and the Orbitz logo are either registered trademarks or trademarks of Orbitz, LLC in the U.S. and/or other countries. Other logos or product and company names mentioned herein may be the property of their respective owners. Ex. K Page 22 of 22 https://www.orbitz.com/Flights­Search?trip=roundtrip&leg1=from%3ABeijing%2C%20China%20(PEK)%2Cto%3AFayetteville%2C%20AR%20(XNA­Northw… 12/12

MOTION for Attorney Kathleen M. Stafford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 5006339) by CT Discount Store, Inc.

.. Case 5: 16-cv-05302-PKH Document 43 Filed 06/15/17 Page 1 of 3 PageID #: 410 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION US DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DIST ARKANSAS FILED JUN 15 2017 DOUGLAS F. YOUNG, Clerk By Deputy Clerk HUGH JARRATT and JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC, A------Plaintiffs, Civil Action No.: 5: 16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.-----Defendants. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Pursuant to Local Rule 83. 5 (d), the undersigned, an attorney duly admitted to the courts of the State of New York and the United States District Courts for the Eastern District of New York, the Southern District of New York, and the Supreme Court of the United States, moves this Honorable Court for her own admission to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case and representing the interests of defendant, CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. Your undersigned practices as an associate with the law firm of Chesney & Nicholas, LLP, 485 Underhill Blvd., Suite 308, Syosset, New York 11791; phone: (516) 378-1700, Ext. 210; email: k. stafford@chesneynicholas.com. Your undersigned is a member of the bar admitted to practice in the state courts of New York, the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, and the Supreme Court of the United States. Your undersigned hereby affirms that she has not been the subject of any disbarment or MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PAGE 1.. Case 5: 16-CV-05302-PKH Document 43 Filed 06/15/17 Page 2 of 3 PageID #: 411 disciplinary proceeding, and further affirms that she has never been disciplined, suspended, disbarred, or resigned from the practice of law nor denied the privilege of practicing before any court. Moreover, your undersigned has never had any charges filed against her, arrests or convictions for criminal offenses. Your undersigned has read and will comply with the Local Rules of this Court, and agrees to be subject to all rules of the courts of Arkansas, as well as consents to the jurisdiction of this Court in matters of discipline. Further, your undersigned fully understands that, if granted, she is being admitted for the limited purpose of appearing in this action as counsel for the defendant, CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. WHEREFORE, your undersigned prays that this Honorable Court grant this motion and admit him, pro hac vice, to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case and representing the interests of defendant, CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. Dated: Syosset, New York June 13, 2017 Respectfully Submitted, ہے CHESNEY & NICHOLAS, LLP By: KATHLEEN M. STAFFORD, ESQ. Attorneys for Defendant CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. 485 Underhill Blvd. Suite 308 Syosset, NY 11791 (516) 378-1700 ATTORNEY'S AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE BY OVERNIGHT EXPRESS MAIL MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PAGE 2 • v Case 5: 16-CV-05302-PKH Document 43 Filed 06/15/17 Page 3 of 3 PageID #: 412 State of New York) s. s.: County of Nassau KATHLEEN M. STAFFORD, an attorney duly admitted to the practice of law in the State of New York, affirms upon the penalties for perjury that on the 13th day of June, 2017, she served a true copy of the foregoing: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, by dispatching the papers to all attorneys listed below by overnight express mail addressed to the attorneys' regular place of business in an envelope, said envelope properly addressed to the plaintiff and delivered into the custody of the overnight delivery via the United States Postal Service for overnight delivery prior to the latest time designated by the overnight delivery service for overnight delivery: SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC Attorneys for Plaintiffs Office & P. 0. Address 1000 East Matthews, Suite C. Jonesboro, AR 72401 HALTOM & DOAN Attorneys for Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC. 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Dated: June 13, 2017 U KATHLEEN M. STAFFORD MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PAGE 3

Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, {{38}} Order to Show Cause by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) JARRATT, JARRATT INDUSTRIES, AND CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.’S JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER (DOC. NO. 38) Plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC ("the Jarratts") and Defendant CT Discount Store, Inc. ("CT") file this joint motion requesting an extension of time to respond to the Court’s Show Cause Order (Doc. No. 38) dated May 30, 2017, state: 1. The Court entered a Show Cause Order (Doc. No. 38) on May 30, 2017 for the Jarratts to show cause by June 13th, 2017. 2. The Jarratts and CT filed a joint motion to extend the deadline to respond to June 27th, 2017 (Doc. No. 40). 3. The Court granted the Motion to Extend setting the deadline to respond to June 27th, 2017. 4. The Jarratts and CT have executed a written settlement agreement that resolves this matter and will require this action to be dismissed with prejudice against CT. 5. The Jarratts and CT must perform certain tasks pursuant to the settlement agreement before the Jarratts dismiss this action against CT with prejudice. 6. The Jarratts and CT believe that these tasks can be performed and that the Jarratts can dismiss this matter with prejudice against CT within two weeks. 7. Counsel for the Jarratts has requested from counsel for Defendant CT, an extension of time up to and including July 11, 2017, for the Jarratts to show cause to the Court. 8. The Jarratts and CT respectfully request that the Court extend the time period to show cause by two weeks to extend the deadline to July 11, 2017. WHEREFORE, The Jarratts and CT pray that this Court grant their joint motion for extension of time and extend the time in which the Jarratts have to respond to the Show Cause Order to July 11, 2017. Respectfully submitted, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC, Plaintiffs ___6-27-2017___ By:/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Date Stephen D. Schrantz, AR Bar No. 2006215 Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 Telephone: (870) 275-7838 schrantzlaw@gmail.com By: __/s/Kathleen M. Stafford_____ Kathleen M. Stafford NY Bar No. 3983616; admitted AR Pro Hac Vice Chesney & Nicholas, LLP Attorneys for Defendant CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC. 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) k.stafford@chesneynicholas.com CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on June 27, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan Catherine Maness HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Kathleen M. Stafford Henry Nelkin John Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) j.gherlone@chesneynicholas.com Robert T. Cruzen KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com

RESPONSE in Opposition re [41] MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) JARRATT’S AND JARRATT INDUSTRIES’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. Plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC ("the Jarratts") file this response opposing Amazon.com, Inc.’s Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue of Amazon.com, Inc. The Jarratts respectfully contend that venue is more convenient in this District and that Amazon has not met its burden to transfer this case. The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court maintain this action within this district and deny Amazon’s Motion to transfer this case to the Western District of Washington. Requirements for Transfer Defendant requests the transfer of this action to the Western District of Washington under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1404. Section 1404(a) provides: "[f]or the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought." 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). In order to show that transfer is proper, the defendant must establish that (1) venue is proper in the transferor court; (2) venue is proper in the transferee court; and (3) the transfer is for the convenience of the parties and witnesses and promotes the interests of justice. Dugan v. M. & W. Dozing & Trucking, Inc., 727 F.Supp. 417–18 (N.D.Ill.1989). The Jarratts contend that venue is not proper in the Western District of Washington. The Jarratts also contend that transfer to the Western District of Washington will not be for the convenience of the parties and will not promote the interests of justice. For these reasons, the Jarratts respectfully request that this action continue forward in the Western District of Arkansas and that the Court deny Amazon’s motion to transfer. Venue is not Proper in the Western District of Washington Amazon has not proven that venue is proper in the Western District of Washington. Amazon contends that venue is proper in the Western District of Washington stating that Amazon is alleged to have committed acts of infringement there. However, Amazon never admits to key components of infringement. Amazon never admits to selling, offering for sell, or exposing for sell the allegedly infringing taco plates within the Western District of Washington. The patent venue statute specifically states that "[a]ny civil action for patent infringement may be brought in the judicial district where the defendant resides, or where the defendant has committed acts of infringement and has a regular and established place of business." 28 U.S.C. § 1400. Amazon is a Delaware corporation that resides in Delaware. See Complaint (Doc. No. 1) ¶3, Amazon’s Answer (Doc. No. 32) ¶3, and TC Heartland LLC, v. Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, 581 U.S. ___(2017). Amazon, therefore, relies on the second part of the patent venue statute requiring that Amazon committed acts of infringement and has a regular and established place of business in 2 Seattle, Washington. Infringement requires selling, offering for sell, or exposing for sell the allegedly infringing taco plates. 35 U.S.C. §§ 271, 289. Amazon never admits to selling, offering for sell, or exposing for sell the allegedly infringing taco plates in the Western District of Washington. Without admitting to selling, offering for sell, or otherwise exposing for sell the allegedly infringing taco plates within the Western District of Washington, Amazon has not met its burden of proving that venue is proper in the Western District of Washington. Therefore, the Jarratts request denial of Amazon’s motion as venue is not proper in the Western District of Washington. The Jarratts’ Choice of the Western District of Arkansas is Given Great Weight and Should Rarely be Disturbed. Amazon has not met the burden of proving that the Western District of Washington is a more convenient forum. Defendant bears the burden of proving the alternate forum is more convenient than the one chosen by the plaintiffs. Van Dusen v. Barrack, 376 U.S. 612, 646, 84 S.Ct. 805, 824, 11 L.Ed.2d 945 (1964). In doing so, defendants must overcome the general principle that the plaintiffs’ choice of forum should be disturbed only if the balance of convenience strongly favors the defendant. Gulf Oil Corp. v. Gilbert, 330 U.S. 501, 508, 67 S.Ct. 839, 843, 91 L.Ed. 1055 (1947). See also 15 Charles A. Wright, Arthur A. Miller & Edward H. Cooper, Federal Practice and Procedure § 3848 (2d ed. 1986). The Jarratts’ choice of forum is given "great weight" and should rarely be disturbed. Houk v. Kimberly–Clark Corp., 613 F.Supp. 923, 927 (W.D.Mo.1985); Arkansas–Best Freight System, Inc. v. Youngblood, 359 F.Supp. 1125, 1129 (W.D.Ark.1973). This is especially true where the plaintiffs are residents of the district in which they brought suit. Houk, 613 F.Supp. at 927. 3 In the current case, the plaintiffs are Hugh Jarratt, an Arkansas resident residing in Fayetteville, Arkansas, and Jarratt Industries, LLC, an Arkansas limited liability company with its principal place of business in Fayetteville, Arkansas. Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶¶ 2, 5. The Jarratts filed this action in this district in which Jarratt resides and in which Jarratt Industries’ principal place of business is located. In view of the fact that venue is a procedural rule of convenience, the convenience of the aggrieved party should be first accommodated. Gardner Engineering Corp. v. Page Engineering Co., 484 F.2d 27 (8th Cir.1973). Because the Jarratts are the aggrieved parties residing in Arkansas, the Jarratts request that the Court deny Amazon’s Motion to Transfer. The Western District of Arkansas is a more Convenient Forum that the Western District of Washington. In analyzing a motion to transfer under section 1404(a), the Court employs a three factor balancing test considering "(1) the convenience of the parties, (2) the convenience of the witnesses, and (3) the interests of justice." Terra Int’l. Inc. v. Miss. Chem. Corp., 119 F.3d 688, 691 (8th Cir.1997). However, the Court is not limited to only these three factors in determining whether a transfer is proper; instead, the Court must "weigh in the balance a number of case-specific factors." Stewart Organization, Inc. v. Ricoh Corp., 487 U.S. 22, 28, 108 S.Ct. 2239, 2244, 101 L.Ed.2d 22 (1988). Convenience of the Parties The convenience factors weigh towards maintaining this action in the Western District of Arkansas. It is more convenient for Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries to continue in the Western District of Arkansas as Hugh Jarratt is an Arkansas resident residing in Fayetteville, Arkansas and 4 Jarratt Industries is an Arkansas company with its principal place of business at Jarratt’s home in Fayetteville, Arkansas. Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶¶ 2, 5. Mr. Jarratt works for Lindsey Management Co., Inc. at which he spends approximately fifty (50) hours per week. Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶ 4. Mr. Jarratt works for Jarratt Industries, LLC in his spare time while not working at Lindsey Management Co., Inc. Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶ 8 Any travel to Washington would inconvenience Mr. Jarratt as he would be required to take off work from Lindsey Management Co., Inc. and expend additional time and finances travelling to Washington to pursue this action. Amazon contends that it would be more convenient to proceed in Washington. Merely shifting the inconvenience from one party to the other is not a permissible justification for a change of venue. Id. at 696–97; R & R. Packaging, Inc. v. GAP Roofing, Inc., No. 06–5175, 2007 WL 162730, at *3 (W.D.Ark. Jan.18, 2007). Convenience of the Witnesses The convenience of the witnesses factors weighs in favor of the Jarratts. Potential witnesses for the Jarratts include: 1. Wal-Mart, an Arkansas company located in Bentonville, Arkansas. Wal-Mart purchased many of the taco plates at issue in this litigation. Wal-Mart’s Made in America campaign exposed the Jarratt Industries mark throughout the country on national news. Wal-Mart has information concerning the exposure that Jarratt Industries and the taco plate have throughout the country. See Doc. Nos. 1-2 and 1-3 and Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶ 10. 2. Polytech Molding Inc., an Arkansas corporation located in Prairie Grove, Arkansas. Polytech manufactures and packages the taco plates in the United States. Polytech has information concerning the manufacturing of the plates, the quality of the plates, the marking of the plates with 5 US Patent No. D574,187, the packaging showing that the plates were made in the USA, and Wal-Mart’s order of the plates. See Doc. No. 1-2 Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶ 11. 3. Employees of Jarratt Industries. Jarratt Industries’ employees have information concerning the Jarratt Industries mark, trademark damage caused by use of the Jarratt Industries’ mark, sales of the plates, and the harm caused by the infringing plates being made in China. Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶ 12 4. CT Discount Store, a New York defendant with which the Jarratts have entered a settlement agreement. CT has information concerning the taco plates at issue in this litigation and Amazon’s involvement concerning the taco plates. Amazon identifies employees of Amazon as having information concerning this litigation. Defendant’s Brief (Doc. No. 42) and the Declaration of Gianmarco Vairo (Doc. No. 42-1 ¶¶ 2, 7, 9-11). The convenience of witnesses who are employed by parties is not an important consideration in analyzing a motion to transfer venue for the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, because their participation in a suit will be obtained as part of their employment, rather than by their own willingness or the court's subpoena power, and their compensation and expenses will be paid by their employers. Caterpillar, Inc. v. ESCO Corp., C.D.Ill.2012, 909 F.Supp.2d 1026. Defendant's motion to transfer venue may be denied when witnesses are employees of defendant and their presence can be obtained by defendant. Ashmore v. Northeast Petroleum Div. of Cargill, Inc., D.Me.1996, 925 F.Supp. 36. Amazon also identifies two additional non-party witnesses, an inventor with an address in California in 1995 when US Patent No. D363,413 issued and unknown Chinese witness(es). See Doc. No. 42, page 18. Amazon does not provide the current whereabouts of the inventor identified in US Patent No. D363,413 and does not identify the Chinese witnesses. The Western District of 6 Washington cannot compel the attendance of these witnesses if they are unwilling. These non-party witnesses with no current contact information or known identify identified by Amazon do not support transfer. The Jarratts identify witnesses and multiple non-party witnesses for which this Court can compel attendance if the witnesses are unwilling. The Jarratts also have employees who may be witnesses in this location. Because this Court has power to compel attendance of unwilling witnesses, the convenience of witnesses factor favors maintaining this action in this Court. Location of the Documents The location of documents does not favor transfer. The Jarratts’ documents are located within Fayetteville, Arkansas. Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 1 ¶ 13. Such documents include use of the Jarratt Industries trademark, development of the plate, sales information concerning the plate, marking of the plate, and manufacturing of the plate. Id. Amazon states that its documents are located within Washington. Merely shifting the inconvenience from one party to the other is not a permissible justification for a change of venue. Id. at 696–97; R & R. Packaging, Inc. v. GAP Roofing, Inc., No. 06–5175, 2007 WL 162730, at *3 (W.D.Ark. Jan.18, 2007). The location of the documents does not favor transfer. Interests of Justice This action involves claims of Patent Infringement (Count 1, Doc. No. 1, page 8,), Unfair Trade Practices (Count 2, id. at page 9), Common Law Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, and False Designation of Origin or Description (Count 3, id. at page 10), Violation of the Arkansas Law under Deceptive Trade Practices Act (Ark. Code Ann. § 4-88-101, et seq.) (Count 4, id. at page 12), and Tortious Interference with Prospective Business Relations (Count 5, id. at page 13). 7 Three of the Jarratts’ claims involve Arkansas law. See Counts 3-5. The interests of justice are best served by having the case decided by federal court in state whose laws govern interests at stake. Kafack v. Primerica Life Ins. Co., D.D.C.1996, 934 F.Supp. 3. This Court is in a better position to rule on matters involving Arkansas law than the Western District of Washington. In addition, this action involves claims of trademark infringement. See Count 3. Jarratt Industries is an Arkansas company with its principal place of business within Fayetteville, Arkansas. Any harm suffered as a result of the trademark infringement was suffered within Fayetteville. See Endless Pools, Inc. v. Wave Tec Pools, Inc., E.D.Pa.2005, 362 F.Supp.2d 578 (finding that transfer from trademark infringement plaintiff’s home state was not warranted as harm was occurring within the home state and that plaintiff’s choice of forum was entitled to deference). Because the harms of trademark infringement were suffered within this district, the interests of justice favor not transferring this action. Dismissal of the Jarratts’ Claims Against Amazon is Improper Amazon requests dismissal of the claims under the patent venue statute, 28 U.S.C. § 1400. This action involves more than only claims of patent infringement. Venue is proper under 28 U.S.C. § 1391 for the Jarratts’ claims of Unfair Trade Practices; Common Law Trademark Infringement; Unfair Competition, and False Designation of Origin or Description; Violation of the Arkansas Law under Deceptive Trade Practices Act (Ark. Code Ann. § 4-88-101, et seq.); and Tortious Interference with Prospective Business Relations. The Jarratts also contend that venue is proper under 28 U.S.C. § 1400. To further demonstrate that venue is proper, Amazon is currently purchasing Whole Foods. See Exhibit 2. Whole Foods has a location within Fayetteville, Arkansas. See Exhibit 3. Amazon will have a location within this district further demonstrating that venue is proper. 8 Amazon has requested that this Court dismiss this action for improper venue. The Jarratts respectfully contend that transfer would be more appropriate than dismissing this action. This Court has previously held that transfer, rather than dismissal, is the approach favored by a number of district courts in the Eighth Circuit when litigation is required to take place in another jurisdiction. Bright Harvest Sweet Potato Company, Inc. v. H.J. Heinz Company, L.P., 2013 WL 2458685, *5 (W.D. Ark. 2013) (transferring the case due to a forum selection clause). Should the Court determine that dismissal is proper, the Jarratts respectfully request that the Court transfer Mr. Jarratt’s patent claims in the alternative. Request to Amend the Complaint, in the Alternative While the Jarratts contend that venue is proper within the Western District of Arkansas and that venue is more convenient in Arkansas, the Jarratts request an opportunity to amend the complaint to address any venue issues concerning Mr. Jarratt’s patent claims against Amazon should the Court determine to transfer or dismiss this action. Conclusion The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court maintain this action within the Western District of Arkansas and deny Amazon’s Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. The Jarratts have brought suit in the Western District of Arkansas where the Jarratts reside, where the Jarratts’ documents are located, and where non-party witnesses are located. The convenience factors and the interests of justice favor proceeding with this action in the Western District of Arkansas. The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court deny Amazon’s Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. 9 Respectfully submitted, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC, Plaintiffs ___6-27-2017___ By:/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Date Stephen D. Schrantz, AR Bar No. 2006215 Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 Telephone: (870) 275-7838 schrantzlaw@gmail.com 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on June 27, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan Catherine Maness HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Kathleen M. Stafford Henry Nelkin John Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) j.gherlone@chesneynicholas.com Robert T. Cruzen KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com 11

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jarratt

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-0532-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) DECLARATION OF HUGH JARRATT FOR JARRATT AND JARRATT INDUSTRIES’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO OPPOSITION TO AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. Comes now the declarant, and states as follows: 1. My name is Hugh Jarratt; I am above the age of majority; I am competent to testify as to the facts set forth in this declaration; and I make this declaration under oath and under penalty of perjury. 2. I am an Arkansas resident residing in Fayetteville, Arkansas. 3. I am a full time employee with Lindsey Management Co., Inc. in Fayetteville, Arkansas. 4. I work for Lindsey Management Co., Inc. at which I spend approximately fifty (50) hours per week. 5. I started Jarratt Industries, LLC as an Arkansas limited liability company with its principal place of business out of my home in Fayetteville, Arkansas. 1 Exhibit 1 6. I am Manager of Jarratt Industries, LLC. 7. I spend more time working with Lindsey Management Co., Inc. than I spend working for Jarratt Industries, LLC. 8. I work for Jarratt Industries, LLC in my spare time while not working at Lindsey Management Co., Inc. 9. My wife, Nicole Jarratt, and I work for Jarratt Industries, LLC in our spare time while raising two children. 10. I have sold taco plates to Wal-Mart, an Arkansas company located in Bentonville, Arkansas. Wal-Mart purchased many of the taco plates at issue in this litigation. Wal-Mart’s Made in America campaign exposed the Jarratt Industries mark throughout the country on national news. Wal-Mart has information concerning the exposure that Jarratt Industries and the taco plate have throughout the country. 11. Polytech Molding Inc., an Arkansas corporation located in Prairie Grove, Arkansas manufactures and packages the taco plates at issue in this litigation. Polytech has information concerning the manufacturing of the plates in the United States, the quality of the plates, the marking of the plates with US Patent No. D574,187, the packaging showing that the plates were made in the USA, and Wal-Mart’s order of the plates. 12. Jarratt Industries’ employees have information concerning the Jarratt Industries mark, trademark damage caused by use of the Jarratt Industries’ mark, sales of the plates, and the harm caused by the infringing plates being made in China. 13. My documents and Jarratt Industries’ documents are located within Fayetteville, Arkansas. Such documents include use of the Jarratt Industries trademark, development of the plate, sales information concerning the plate, marking of the plate, and manufacturing of the plate. 2 I declare under penalty of perjury that the foregoing is true and correct. Executed on June 27, 2017 ____/s/Hugh Jarratt________________ Hugh Jarratt 3

Exhibit 2 - Article Amazon to buy Whole Foods

6/27 2017 Case 5: 16-cv-05 122PRAIWhpeefFireA349 on wigTired 2pricPeugeotaDFPyieID #: 430 WATCH LIVE: Deputy Press Sec ary S. h Sand the Whi EDITION: UNITED STATES REUTERS Business Markets World Politics Tech Commentary Breakingviews Nearly half of marketers lack confidence in their data LET'S Ssas CHANGE THAT READ REPORT > TECHNOLOGY NEWS 17, 2017: 09. EDT Amazon to buy Whole Foods for $ 13. 7 billion, wielding online might in brick-and-mortar world RS TN herd Schools using Hero have fewer tardies & more positive campus climates. $ 2. 50 IND OUT WHY? FOODS (N TRENDING STORIES O O in O Ransomware virus hits computer servers across the globe By Lauren Hirsch and Jeffrey Dastin Facing revolt on healthcare bill, Senate Republicans delay vote Amazon.com Inc said on Friday it would buy Whole Foods Market Inc for $ 13. 7 billion, in an embrace of brick-and-mortar stores that could turn the high-end grocer into a mass market merchant and upend the already struggling U. S. retail industry. Maersk says global IT breakdown caused by cyber attack Amazon used aggressive pricing to become an e-commerce retail juggernaut and has recently been experimenting with brick-and-mortar outlets. It will take over a natural and organic grocer pioneer with 456 stores, a mecca for young, high-end shoppers, that has been struggling to rein in prices and integrate technology U. S. says it saw preparations for another Syrian chemical attack California to list herbicide as cancer causing; Monsanto vows fight ADVERTISING Exhibit 2 The deal represents a dramatic turn in strategy for Amazon, which has offered food https://www.reuters.com/article/us-whole-foods--a-amazon-idUSKBN 1971QJ 1/5 6/27 2017 Case 5: 16-cv-05 122PRAIWhpeefFire A349 on wigTired. 2pricPugeogaOFPByieD #: 431 WATCH LIVE: Deputy Pr $ 700 billion grocery market ary S. h Sand the Whi The ramifications for all of retail are seismic not jus retailers that sell grocery, but fo everyone, " Gordon Haskett analyst Chuck Grom said. For graphic-Whole Foods at a glance-click: tmsnrt. rs/2skJDSv Shares of dozens of supermarkets, food producers, payment processors and shopping malls collectively lost at least $ 35 billion in U. S. market value on Friday as the news reverberated across financial markets Shares of grocer Kroger Co swooned 9. 2 percent, while Wal-Mart Stores Inc fell 4. 7 percent, signaling fears that Amazon could broaden Whole Foods' product mix and cut prices Amazon's shares rose 2. 4 percent to $ 987. 71, adding $ 1 billion to its market capitalization, which in one sense makes the acquis ion nearly free for Amazon shareholders' Supermarkets wi now have to contend with not only compe ion with each other and non-traditional grocers like Wal Mart Stores Inc and Target Corp, but with a retailer like Amazon which has the financial capacity to price aggressively, " said Mickey Chadha, vice president and senior credit officer at Moody's Investors Service. Amazon agreed to pay $ 42 per share in cash for Whole Foods, a 27 percent premium on the Austin, Texas-based grocer's closing share price on Thursday. But in a sign that investors believe a rival bid is likely, Whole Foods shares rose above the offer price to close at $ 42. 68. NO VALUE IN STATUS QUO RELATED COVERAGE VIDEO Amazon to buy Whole Foods for $ 13. 7 billion VIDEO Breakingviews TV: Amazon's shopping spree A former grocery expert at Amazon predicted that the chain, nicknamed " Whole Paycheck ", would add a selection of discounted food and build out non grocery areas within stores, particularly for pharmacy and Amazon devices' There's no value in Amazon keeping the status quo at For Foods, fears Whole Foods Whole workers. Whole Foods was losing market share to of robots, drones and culture Kroger " said Brittain Ladd, who until earlier this year clash was a senior manager working to roll out Amazon Fresh globally. ' s pharmacy. ' s having the ability to put stores that are similar to Apple stores inside Whole Foods, " he said Amazon has been looking at shop layouts that could allow traditional in-store purchase, online ordering with on-site pickup, and home delivery, using store warehouse space as a distribution point Ladd said PICTURES Despite Amazon's reputation for harnessing technology a prototype store inside its corporate office in Seattle, called Amazon Go, which uses sensors and tech-savvy cameras to detect shoppers' selections and then charge their Amazon accounts, has rolled out more slowly than planned, a person familiar with the matter said REUTERS FOODSMA MARKE Photos of the day https://www reuters.com/article/us-whole-foods-m-a-amazon-idUSKBN 1971QJ 2/5 6/27 2017 Case 5: 16-cv-05 122PRAIWhpeefFire A349 on wigTired. 2pricPagegaDFPByieD #: 432 WATCH LIVE: Deputy Pr ary S. h Sand the Whi Schools using Hero have fewer tardies & more positive campus climates. FIND OUT WHY? A Who Foods Mark the Manh 1gh York City, N York, U. S. 2017. REUTERS/C SPONSORED TOPICS And while some analysts expect Amazon to bring vast buying power to Whole Foods, Amazon's heft in the food market is far smaller than in other areas, and high demand for organic products gives farmers unusual bargaining power Amazon spokesman Drew Herdener said plans do not include reducing jobs as the resu of the deal and that the company does not plan to automate Whole Foods cashiers jobs with Amazon Go technology DID YOU KNOW? WHOLE FOODS WAS UNDER PRESSURE In 2003, Queen Elizabeth Il knighted the father of the world wide web, Tim Berners. The deal unfolded after Jeff Bezos, Amazon's chief executive officer, approached Whole Lee, for his pioneering invention ed By C Foods CEO John Mackey about a month ago and received an eage response from < PREVIOUS NEXT > Mackey, two people familiar with the matter said. The grocer wi continue to operate stores under the Whole Foods Market brand, and Mackey will remain CEO, the companies said. RELATED COVERAGE Seattle love, dread of activist investor help clinch Amazon Whole Foods has posted seven straight quarterly sales declines at established stores and recently overhauled its board of directors in the face of pressure from activist hedge fund Jana Partners LLC. M & A roles Jana, which disclosed an 8. 3 percent stake in Whole Foods in April and is the company s second biggest Amazon-Whole Foods deal hits shareholder, stands to make roughly $ 300 million shares across the food chain from the sale to Amazon Amazon's pounce on Whole Foods ripples across Europe The deal is for $ 13. 4 billion in cash and the remainder Short-sellers lose as Amazon in debt. The acquisition price implies a trailing 12. month price-to-earnings multiple for Whole Foods of 31 times, versus a 14. 4 average for the S & P 500 Food acquires Whole Foods Retail index. Amazon and Whole Foods expect to close the deal during the second half of 2017. EYES ON GROCERY SHOPPERS Amazon, started in Sea le in 1994 by Bezos, a former hedge fund manager, has grown into the world's biggest diversified online retailer with a market capitalization of nearly $ 500 billion. has expanded from a book seller into a merchant of nearly all consumer products, as well as producing videos Both Amazon and Whole Foods cater to younger consumers including millennials as well as the affluent' Amazon could bring technology to all Whole Foods locations, or could absorb Whole Foods into Amazon Fresh. Either way, it's good for consumers like mysel said Di Wu, a New York resident in her early 30s who is a member of Amazon's Prime fast-shipping club and who shops at Whole Foods at least twice a week. https:/www reuters.com/article/us-whole-foods-m-a-amazon idUSKBN 1971QJ 3/5 6/27 2017 Case 5: 16-cv-05 122PRAIWhpeefFire A349 on wigTired. 2pricPageafroFPByieD #: 433 WATCH LIVE: Deputy Press ary S. h Sand the Whi efficient, " Wu said. Goldman Sachs Group Inc advised Amazon on the deal and provided bridge financing. Bank of America Corp also provided financing to Amazon, while Evercore Partners Inc advised Whole Foods. (Reporting by Lauren Hirsch in New York and Jeffrey Dastin in San Francisco; Additional reporting by Anya George Tharakan in Bangalore, Angela Moon in New York, Lisa Baertlein in Los Angeles, Noel Randewich in San Francisco, Richa Naidu in Chicago; Writing by Peter Henderson and Greg Roumeliotis; Editing by Leslie Adler and Sam Holmes) REUTERS Our S1 dards: The Tho gon Re NEXT IN TECHNOLOGY NEWS > Ransomware virus hits computer servers across the globe MOSCOW/KIEV A ransomware attack hit computers across the world on Tuesday, taking bigg pany, pting op Ukr banks sh ing down computers at mul ina ona shipping and advertising firms MORE FROM REUTERS SPONSORED CONTENT Trump high court pick Gorsuch shows conservative credentials This industry poised to soar under Trump administration Invictusnews com Seoul Semi says new' Sun-like' LEDs could " Total Conviction' Stock Looks a lot like generate $ 400 million in sales by 2021 Amazon in 1997 The Motley Fool Germany demands costly recall of 12 million Runaway stock baffles analysts diesel cars: sources Speculate. cor Is Hong Kong heading for biggest property Google faces years of EU oversight on top of crash since 1997? th Chi 1g Po: record antitrust fine How 1 Man Turned $ 50, 000 into $ 5. 3 Million BRIEF-AIG entered into fourth amended Investing Daily and restated credit agreement Promoted by Di FROM AROUND THE WEB 2d by R 1Cup of This (Before Bed) The Shopping Site That Lets Video: U. S. Heart Surgeon will' Destroy " Your Nail Women Choose Their Price Reveals 3 Foods To Cut From Your Diet Fungus Toe Nail Fungus Code Tophatter Vital Reds https://www.reuters.com/article/us-whole-foods--a-amazon-idUSKBN 1971QJ 4/5 6 27 2017 Case 5: 16-cv-05320 PRWhoGeetafe it34 SUBn wipedro8 2bpricPageOFOFPByieID #: 434 WATCH LIVE: Deputy Pr ary S. h Sand the Whi We Can Guess Your Presidents Ranked By 1Q, Your Chance to Invest in Education level with Only You' ll Never Guess Who Was " The New Gasoline " 10 Questions First Topi Definition Stock. Report Follow Reuters: уf o in a D Subscribe: Feeds Newsletters Podcasts Apps Reuters Plus Reuters News Agency Brand Attribution Guidelines Careers Reuters is the news and media division of Thomson Reuters. Thomson Reuters is the world's largest international multimedia news agency, providing investing news world news, business news, technology news, headline news, small business news, news alerts, personal finance, stock market, and mutual funds information available on Reuters.com, video, mobile, and interactive television platforms. Learn more about Thomson Reuters products; EIKON ELEKTRON WORLD-CHECK WESTLAW ONESOURCE CHECKPOINT Everything you need to empower your workflow and enhance your exclusive news on financial markets-The most comprehensive The industry leader for online information for ta delivered in an intuitive Build the strongest argument relying on authoritative content, attorney-editor expertise, and industry defining individual and entities globally to help uncover hidden risks in business relationships and human desktop and mobile accounting and finance enterprise data management your complex and ever expanding tax and compliance needs All quotes delayed a minimum of 15 minutes. See here for a complete list of exchanges and delays. © 2017 Reuters. All Rights Reserved. I Site Feedback Corrections Advertising Guidelines Cookies Terms of Use Privacy Policy https://www.reuters.com/article/us-whole-foods--a-amazon-idUSKBN 1971QJ 5/5

Exhibit 3 - Location of Whole Foods in Fayetteville, Arkansas

Case 5: 16-cv-05302-PKH Document 45-3 Filed 06/27/17 Page 1 of 2 PagelD #: 435 $. 99 EA CHICKEN BREASTH KABOBS ANIMAL WELFARE RATED SALE SEE MORE SALES VALID 6/21-6/27/17 WHILE SUPPLIES LAST EXCLUDES COOKED. NO RAIN CHECKS. U. S. ON (http://siteintercept qualtrics.com/WRSitelnterceptEngine/? Q CID = CR 5oLFCWxDyanHQEZ & Q Redirect = http% 3A% 2F% 2Fwww.wholefoodsmar flver & Q SRT = 9 Th82wa9Sv8Gс8rlekRQta% 3D% 3D & Q SIID = SI 1Hvixu4LnKJZiM5 & Q ASID = AS 79547507 & Q LOC = http% 3A% 2F% 2Fwww.W Fayetteville MAKE THIS M Selecting MAK 3425 N. College Avenue STORE: 8am-10pm seven days a P: 479-695-5561 you to see local site such as stor Fayetteville, AR 72703 week; TAPROOM: 3pm-10pm F: 479-695-5574 product lists and Map & Directions (/store locations/# store/394272D) Events (events? store = 199753 CONNECT WITH THE FAYETTEVILLE STORE Looking for savings? See what's on sale U] TH Want the latest on local events, sales and more? Subscribe to our newsletter. Ever Sale Glut ABOUT THE STORE Glut List We are so excited to be a of the Northwest Arkansas community! part Non Want to find out more about Whole Foods Market Fayetteville? Follow us on Facebook, Instagram, and Twitter and sign up Prod for our e-mail newsletter here. # fay fresh OrgE List Interested in learning more about becoming a 5% Community Giving Day? Email our store Marketing Team Leader for Pren details! (Allison. Chilcote@wholefoods.com) CONTACT YOUR LOCAL STORE Exhibit 3 D] Bak You may enas or 1iract BizPKHenmanshu EmaratuAbad is woiked QShahalt the age (get ahid436 Bee emails may not be answered immediately. Bull Che, Cof Please use the dropdown below to help us direct your question or comment appropriately. After choosing a topic you will be Flov directed to our comment form. GroC Mea CHOOSE TOPIC * Pets Select Prep Prod SEND COMMENT Seaf Whc Win TE Stor Stua Asso Wes Mar Allis

MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Amazon.Com, Inc.

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER TO A MORE CONVENIENT VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY – Page 1 Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") respectfully requests that it be permitted to file a reply brief in support of its Motion to Transfer to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue (D.I. 41) ("Motion"). Good cause exists for this request. Amazon seeks leave to respond to arguments plaintiffs presented in their Opposition (D.I. 45) to Amazon’s Motion that Amazon did not address in the Motion and that Amazon could not have anticipated plaintiffs would present. Specifically, plain-tiffs’ Opposition (1) argues incorrectly that Amazon cannot show that venue is proper in the West-ern District of Washington unless it admits to have infringed in that district, (2) argues incorrectly that Amazon’s contemplated purchase of Whole Foods announced June 15, 2017 (after Amazon’s Motion was filed) renders venue appropriate in this district, (3) purports to identify allegedly rel-evant witnesses and evidence located in this district, none of which plaintiffs identified pursuant to their mandatory disclosure obligations, which required that they identify all relevant witnesses and evidence on which they may rely in this case, and (4) relies on out-of-circuit case law applying different transfer tests and other inapposite or abrogated authorities while omitting any discussion of several factors required by the 8th Circuit’s venue test. Amazon’s proposed Reply is submitted herewith. For the foregoing reasons, Amazon re-spectfully requests the Court’s permission to file that Reply. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY – Page 1 Respectfully submitted,/s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compli-ance with Local Rule CV-5.2 on this 29th day of June, 2017./s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY – Page 2

Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Dismiss

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER I. VENUE IS PROPER IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON Plaintiffs contend that venue would be improper in Washington, arguing only that Amazon has not admitted "offering for sell, or otherwise exposing for sell [sic] the allegedly infringing taco plates within the Western District of Washington." (D.I. 45 (Opp.) at 3.) But Amazon submitted a declaration establishing that if the complained-of conduct occurred anywhere, it occurred in Se-attle. (D.I. at 42 (Brief) at 12-13; D.I. 42-1 (Vairo Declaration) at ¶¶5-7.) Plaintiffs do not dispute those facts. Nor could they plausibly do so, given that Plaintiffs’ complaint alleges that Amazon offered to sell and sold the accused products throughout the United States. (D.I. 1 at ¶23.) To be sure, Amazon denies that it infringes. The law is clear, however, that a defendant need not admit to infringement in order to show that transfer is appropriate. In re Cordis Corp., 769 F.2d 733, 737 (Fed. Cir. 1985) ("The issue of infringement is not reached on the merits in considering venue requirements."). Given plaintiffs’ own allegations and the uncontradicted facts, venue is proper in the Western District of Washington. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 1 II. PLAINTIFFS’ ARGUMENTS THAT CONTRADICT THEIR OWN MANDATORY DISCLOSURES SHOULD BE DISREGARDED Plaintiffs were obligated to disclose by June 5, 2017, the names of any witnesses that they "may use" to support claims or defenses in this action. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A)(i). (D.I. 37 (parties to serve disclosures by June 5, 2017).) Plaintiffs identified a single witness. (D.I. 42-4 (Cruzen Decl. Ex. B (Initial Disclosures)) at 1.) Plaintiffs were also obligated to identify all doc-uments they would use to support their claims or defenses. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A)(ii). Besides the defendants’ documents, plaintiffs identified only the exhibits to the complaint. (D.I. 42-4 at 2.) Plaintiffs’ opposition disputes none of this. Nevertheless, plaintiffs now purport to identify new witnesses that they omitted from their mandatory disclosures: unnamed employees, Wal-Mart, and Polytech Molding. (D.I. 45 (Opp.) at 5-6.) Any connection between Wal-Mart or Polytech and allegedly infringing taco plates rele-vant here remains a mystery. Plaintiffs argue that soon-to-be dismissed defendant CT Discount Store has relevant information, but fail to explain what that information might be or why this dis-trict is more convenient for CT. Plaintiffs now also argue that they possess previously undisclosed documents here. (D.I. 45 at 7.) None of these witnesses or documents are alleged to be newly discovered, and plaintiffs offer no excuse for their decision not to identify any of them previously. Plaintiffs’ tactics should not be rewarded, and the Court should disregard Plaintiffs’ attempt to manipulate venue through belated and conclusory disclosures. III. PLAINTIFFS’ CITATION OF OUT-OF-CIRCUIT AND ABROGATED AUTHORITIES SHOULD BE DISREGARDED Plaintiffs have not distinguished even one holding of the eight cases from the 8th Circuit cited in the Motion. Instead, they rely on out-of-circuit cases applying different venue tests and on a case that is no longer good law for the cited proposition. For example, Plaintiffs cite Illinois and Maine authority to argue that the location of party witnesses can be disregarded (D.I. 45 at 6) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 2 but ignore Crabb and Miller decided by this Court and cited in the Motion for the contrary propo-sition. (D.I. 42 at 11-12.) Plaintiffs cite D.C. case law to argue that state law claims weigh against transfer (D.I. 45 at 8), yet ignore this Court’s decision in Crabb holding that factor neutral because federal district courts are adept at applying other states’ laws. (D.I. 42 at 17.) And Plaintiffs cite (D.I. 45 at 4) Gardner Eng’g Corp. v. Page Eng’g Co., 484 F.2d 27, 33 (8th Cir. 1973), for the proposition that the "aggrieved party" should be accommodated in a venue analysis, but Gardner (1) was deciding a contract-specific venue issue under 28 U.S.C. § 1391, which does not apply to this Motion filed under § 1404, (2) has long since been recognized as abrogated on that point,1 and (3) specifically noted that the court was "open to" (and thus not presently considering) a motion to transfer based on convenience under § 1404. Id. Plaintiffs’ reliance on these irrelevant (or abrogated) authorities is misplaced and arguments dependent upon them should be disregarded. IV. PLAINTIFFS IGNORE NUMEROUS 8TH CIR. VENUE FACTORS Amazon’s Motion established that the relevant factors in the 8th Circuit venue analysis strongly favor transfer. Plaintiffs dispute none of the evidence in the Motion, and indeed entirely fail to address numerous factors required under the 8th Circuit’s test and analyzed in the Motion:  Location of Complained-of Conduct. Plaintiffs ignore this required factor and do not dispute that the complained-of conduct occurred in Seattle, or that this Court held in Biometics and other cases that this factor weighs in favor of transfer to a defendant’s venue when the alleged acts occurred there. (D.I. 42 at 11-13.)  Judicial Economy. Plaintiffs ignore this required factor, and do not dispute that it favors transfer in light of the operative facts at issue in the case and relative time to trial and disposition as between the two districts. (D.I. 42 at 18-19.) 1 See Critzas Indus., Inc. v. Waterway-Creve Coeur, Inc., 652 F. Supp. 56, 59 (E.D. Mo. 1986) (describing Gardner as "clearly dated since [it] rests on the principle that the plaintiff’s convenience is the key consideration when a court construes a venue statute [but] [i]n Leroy, the Supreme Court specifically states that the plaintiff’s convenience is irrelevant to venue consideration."); see also Fairless v. CJH, LLC, No. 2:09CV02065 SWW, 2010 WL 2134225, at *2, n.2 (W.D. Ark. May 27, 2010). REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 3  Comparative Costs of Litigating. Plaintiffs ignore this required factor and do not dispute that litigating in Seattle, where the complained-of conduct allegedly oc-curred, will be cheaper under this Court’s case law. (D.I. 42 at 20-21.) Plaintiffs’ ignore this Court’s case law and the evidence even as to factors they do address:  Plaintiffs’ Forum Shopping. Plaintiffs do not deny that they have filed suit on the same patent asserted in this case in other districts previously, and are entirely silent as to why they have engaged in forum-shopping in this manner. Plaintiffs do not deny that this Court has held that less deference must be given to a plain-tiffs’ choice of venue when the underlying facts occurred elsewhere. (D.I. 42 at 19-20.)  Location of Witnesses. Plaintiffs do not dispute that the witnesses engaged in allegedly wrongful acts are located in Seattle, Washington, or that Crabb and Miller held that this factor weighs in favor of transfer. (D.I. 42 at 11-13.)  Location of Documents. Plaintiffs do not dispute that, in patent suits, the Federal Circuit has held that the alleged infringer’s location is where the bulk of relevant evidence will be located. (D.I. 42 at 14-15.)  Local Interest. Though they rely on out-of-circuit authority and ignore this Court’s cases to argue that state-law claims weigh against transfer, plaintiffs do not dispute that the Western District of Washington has a strong local interest under this Court’s holding in Miller and Federal Circuit law. (D.I. 42 at 23.) On balance, the 8th Circuit factors, including those plaintiffs ignore, weigh in favor of transfer. V. AMAZON’S POTENTIAL ACQUISITION OF WHOLE FOODS IS LEGALLY AND FACTUALLY IRRELEVANT Plaintiffs argue that Amazon’s contemplated purchase of Whole Foods, announced June 15, 2017, supports venue in this district. Plaintiffs are wrong for at least three reasons. First, "[m]otions to transfer venue are to be decided based on'the situation which existed when suit was instituted.’" In re EMC Corp., 501 F. App’x 973, 976 (Fed. Cir. 2013) (quoting Hoffman v. Blaski, 363 U.S. 335, 343 (1960)); 5 ANN. PAT. DIGEST § 36:165.25 ("[A] district court, generally, must evaluate the factors relating to transfer as they existed when the suit was first-filed without giving weight to subsequent developments."). Second, Amazon has not yet purchased Whole Foods. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 4 Plaintiffs cannot support venue based on speculation as to what may happen in the future.2 Third, plaintiffs fail to show how Whole Foods has any relevance to the conduct at issue, and cite no authority for the prospect that a distinct subsidiary’s location can be attributed to a parent company. VI. LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHOULD BE DENIED Plaintiffs make no attempt to explain how their requested amendment of the complaint (see D.I. 45 at 9) could cure the venue deficiencies of their patent claims or overcome the uncontra-dicted evidence weighing in favor of transfer. Because amendment would merely delay transfer, plaintiffs’ request to amend should be denied. Respectfully submitted,/s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. 2 See https://www.sec.gov/Archives/edgar/data/1018724/000119312517205287/d352949d8k.htm (SEC Form 8-K listing risks that may delay or prevent transaction). REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compli-ance with Local Rule CV-5.2 on this 29th day of June, 2017./s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 6

REPLY to Response to Motion re [41] MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER I. VENUE IS PROPER IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON Plaintiffs contend that venue would be improper in Washington, arguing only that Ama-zon has not admitted "offering for sell, or otherwise exposing for sell [sic] the allegedly infring-ing taco plates within the Western District of Washington." (D.I. 45 (Opp.) at 3.) But Amazon submitted a declaration establishing that if the complained-of conduct occurred anywhere, it oc-curred in Seattle. (D.I. at 42 (Brief) at 12-13; D.I. 42-1 (Vairo Declaration) at ¶¶5-7.) Plaintiffs do not dispute those facts. Nor could they plausibly do so, given that Plaintiffs’ complaint alleg-es that Amazon offered to sell and sold the accused products throughout the United States. (D.I. 1 at ¶23.) To be sure, Amazon denies that it infringes. The law is clear, however, that a defendant need not admit to infringement in order to show that transfer is appropriate. In re Cordis Corp., 769 F.2d 733, 737 (Fed. Cir. 1985) ("The issue of infringement is not reached on the merits in REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 1 considering venue requirements."). Given plaintiffs’ own allegations and the uncontradicted facts, venue is proper in the Western District of Washington. II. PLAINTIFFS’ ARGUMENTS THAT CONTRADICT THEIR OWN MANDATORY DISCLOSURES SHOULD BE DISREGARDED Plaintiffs were obligated to disclose by June 5, 2017, the names of any witnesses that they "may use" to support claims or defenses in this action. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A)(i). (D.I. 37 (parties to serve disclosures by June 5, 2017).) Plaintiffs identified a single witness. (D.I. 42-4 (Cruzen Decl. Ex. B (Initial Disclosures)) at 1.) Plaintiffs were also obligated to identify all documents they would use to support their claims or defenses. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A)(ii). Besides the defendants’ documents, plaintiffs identified only the exhibits to the complaint. (D.I. 42-4 at 2.) Plaintiffs’ opposition disputes none of this. Nevertheless, plaintiffs now purport to identify new witnesses that they omitted from their mandatory disclosures: unnamed employees, Wal-Mart, and Polytech Molding. (D.I. 45 (Opp.) at 5-6.) Any connection between Wal-Mart or Polytech and allegedly infringing taco plates relevant here remains a mystery. Plaintiffs argue that soon-to-be dismissed defendant CT Discount Store has relevant information, but fail to explain what that information might be or why this district is more convenient for CT. Plaintiffs now also argue that they possess previous-ly undisclosed documents here. (D.I. 45 at 7.) None of these witnesses or documents are alleged to be newly discovered, and plaintiffs offer no excuse for their decision not to identify any of them previously. Plaintiffs’ tactics should not be rewarded, and the Court should disregard Plaintiffs’ at-tempt to manipulate venue through belated and conclusory disclosures. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 2 III. PLAINTIFFS’ CITATION OF OUT-OF-CIRCUIT AND ABROGATED AUTHORITIES SHOULD BE DISREGARDED Plaintiffs have not distinguished even one holding of the eight cases from the 8th Circuit cited in the Motion. Instead, they rely on out-of-circuit cases applying different venue tests and on a case that is no longer good law for the cited proposition. For example, Plaintiffs cite Illinois and Maine authority to argue that the location of party witnesses can be disregarded (D.I. 45 at 6) but ignore Crabb and Miller decided by this Court and cited in the Motion for the contrary prop-osition. (D.I. 42 at 11-12.) Plaintiffs cite D.C. case law to argue that state law claims weigh against transfer (D.I. 45 at 8), yet ignore this Court’s decision in Crabb holding that factor neu-tral because federal district courts are adept at applying other states’ laws. (D.I. 42 at 17.) And Plaintiffs cite (D.I. 45 at 4) Gardner Eng’g Corp. v. Page Eng’g Co., 484 F.2d 27, 33 (8th Cir. 1973), for the proposition that the "aggrieved party" should be accommodated in a venue analy-sis, but Gardner (1) was deciding a contract-specific venue issue under 28 U.S.C. § 1391, which does not apply to this Motion filed under § 1404, (2) has long since been recognized as abrogated on that point,1 and (3) specifically noted that the court was "open to" (and thus not presently con-sidering) a motion to transfer based on convenience under § 1404. Id. Plaintiffs’ reliance on these irrelevant (or abrogated) authorities is misplaced and arguments dependent upon them should be disregarded. IV. PLAINTIFFS IGNORE NUMEROUS 8TH CIR. VENUE FACTORS 1 See Critzas Indus., Inc. v. Waterway-Creve Coeur, Inc., 652 F. Supp. 56, 59 (E.D. Mo. 1986) (describing Gardner as "clearly dated since [it] rests on the principle that the plaintiff’s convenience is the key consideration when a court construes a venue statute [but] [i]n Leroy, the Supreme Court specifically states that the plaintiff’s convenience is irrelevant to venue consideration."); see also Fairless v. CJH, LLC, No. 2:09CV02065 SWW, 2010 WL 2134225, at *2, n.2 (W.D. Ark. May 27, 2010). REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 3 Amazon’s Motion established that the relevant factors in the 8th Circuit venue analysis strongly favor transfer. Plaintiffs dispute none of the evidence in the Motion, and indeed entirely fail to address numerous factors required under the 8th Circuit’s test and analyzed in the Motion:  Location of Complained-of Conduct. Plaintiffs ignore this required factor and do not dispute that the complained-of conduct occurred in Seattle, or that this Court held in Biometics and other cases that this factor weighs in favor of trans-fer to a defendant’s venue when the alleged acts occurred there. (D.I. 42 at 11-13.)  Judicial Economy. Plaintiffs ignore this required factor, and do not dispute that it favors transfer in light of the operative facts at issue in the case and relative time to trial and disposition as between the two districts. (D.I. 42 at 18-19.)  Comparative Costs of Litigating. Plaintiffs ignore this required factor and do not dispute that litigating in Seattle, where the complained-of conduct allegedly occurred, will be cheaper under this Court’s case law. (D.I. 42 at 20-21.) Plaintiffs’ ignore this Court’s case law and the evidence even as to factors they do address:  Plaintiffs’ Forum Shopping. Plaintiffs do not deny that they have filed suit on the same patent asserted in this case in other districts previously, and are entire-ly silent as to why they have engaged in forum-shopping in this manner. Plain-tiffs do not deny that this Court has held that less deference must be given to a plaintiffs’ choice of venue when the underlying facts occurred elsewhere. (D.I. 42 at 19-20.)  Location of Witnesses. Plaintiffs do not dispute that the witnesses engaged in allegedly wrongful acts are located in Seattle, Washington, or that Crabb and Miller held that this factor weighs in favor of transfer. (D.I. 42 at 11-13.)  Location of Documents. Plaintiffs do not dispute that, in patent suits, the Fed-eral Circuit has held that the alleged infringer’s location is where the bulk of relevant evidence will be located. (D.I. 42 at 14-15.)  Local Interest. Though they rely on out-of-circuit authority and ignore this Court’s cases to argue that state-law claims weigh against transfer, plaintiffs do not dispute that the Western District of Washington has a strong local interest under this Court’s holding in Miller and Federal Circuit law. (D.I. 42 at 23.) On balance, the 8th Circuit factors, including those plaintiffs ignore, weigh in favor of transfer. V. AMAZON’S POTENTIAL ACQUISITION OF WHOLE FOODS IS LEGALLY AND FACTUALLY IRRELEVANT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 4 Plaintiffs argue that Amazon’s contemplated purchase of Whole Foods, announced June 15, 2017, supports venue in this district. Plaintiffs are wrong for at least three reasons. First, "[m]otions to transfer venue are to be decided based on'the situation which existed when suit was instituted.’" In re EMC Corp., 501 F. App’x 973, 976 (Fed. Cir. 2013) (quoting Hoffman v. Blaski, 363 U.S. 335, 343 (1960)); 5 ANN. PAT. DIGEST § 36:165.25 ("[A] district court, general-ly, must evaluate the factors relating to transfer as they existed when the suit was first-filed with-out giving weight to subsequent developments."). Second, Amazon has not yet purchased Whole Foods. Plaintiffs cannot support venue based on speculation as to what may happen in the fu-ture.2 Third, plaintiffs fail to show how Whole Foods has any relevance to the conduct at issue, and cite no authority for the prospect that a distinct subsidiary’s location can be attributed to a parent company. VI. LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHOULD BE DENIED Plaintiffs make no attempt to explain how their requested amendment of the complaint (see D.I. 45 at 9) could cure the venue deficiencies of their patent claims or overcome the uncon-tradicted evidence weighing in favor of transfer. Because amendment would merely delay trans-fer, plaintiffs’ request to amend should be denied. Respectfully submitted,/s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com 2 See https://www.sec.gov/Archives/edgar/data/1018724/000119312517205287/d352949d8k.htm (SEC Form 8-K listing risks that may delay or prevent transaction). REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 5 Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compli-ance with Local Rule CV-5.2 on this 30th day of June, 2017./s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER – Page 6

MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) JARRATT’S AND JARRATT INDUSTRIES’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY TO AMAZON.COM, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. Plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC ("the Jarratts") respectfully request that they be permitted to file a surreply to Amazon.com, Inc.’s Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue (D.I. 41) ("Motion"). Good cause exists for this request. The Jarratts seek leave to respond to arguments Amazon presented in its Reply. Specifically, the Jarratts request the opportunity to reply to 1) Amazon’s attempt to limit the Jarratts to documents and witnesses to only those listed in the initial disclosures and 2) Amazon’s allegations of forum shopping. The Jarratts also request the opportunity to clarify that this Court continues to consider the plaintiff’s convenience and the plaintiff’s choice of venue when considering a motion to transfer venue as indicated by Crabb and to clarify Jarratt’s positions concerning the transfer factors identified by Amazon. For the foregoing reasons, the Jarratts respectfully request the Court’s permission to file the proposed Surreply Respectfully submitted, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC, Plaintiffs ___7-7-2017___ By:/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Date Stephen D. Schrantz, AR Bar No. 2006215 Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 Telephone: (870) 275-7838 schrantzlaw@gmail.com 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on July 7, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan Catherine Maness HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Kathleen M. Stafford Henry Nelkin John Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) k.stafford@chesneynicholas.com Robert T. Cruzen KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com 3

Supplement Surreply

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) JARRATT’S AND JARRATT INDUSTRIES’ SURREPLY TO AMAZON.COM, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. Plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC ("the Jarratts") file this surreply to Amazon.com, Inc.’s Reply in Support of Amazon.com, Inc.’s Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue of Amazon.com, Inc. The Jarratts respectfully contend that venue is more convenient in this District and that Amazon has not met its burden to transfer this case. "Change of venue... should not be freely granted," since courts "are in the business of deciding cases, not playing procedural hockey among available districts at the whim of dissatisfied parties." In Re Nine Mile Limited, 692 F.2d 56, 61 (8th Cir. 1982). The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court maintain this action within this district and deny Amazon’s Motion to transfer this case to the Western District of Washington. Initial Disclosures Amazon attempts to limit the Jarratts to rely upon only those witnesses and documents identified in the initial disclosures for the purposes of the motion to transfer. Amazon cannot reasonably expect that the Jarratts’ witnesses and documents for this matter will be limited to only those identified in the initial disclosures and that none of the Jarratts’ documents are located within the Western District of Arkansas. Amazon’s own initial disclosures indicate that more information may be discovered than originally disclosed in Amazon’s initial disclosures. Amazon specifically states that: Amazon makes these initial disclosures based on information currently and reasonably available to it.... Amazon has not yet conducted discovery in this matter, and Amazon’s investigation is ongoing. As a result of the foregoing, it is impossible to determine fully which particular features of Amazon’s services, products, or listings (if any) are accused and, consequently, who may have information that could support its claims or defenses. Consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(e)(1), Amazon will further supplement and/or amend these disclosures as appropriate, based on additional evidence and information that becomes available." The Jarratts first identified Wal-Mart and Polytech Molding in the original complaint filed on October 25, 2016. See Doc. No. 1, ¶¶ 36-37 and Doc. Nos. 1-2 and 1-3. The Jarratts did not first raise the possibility of Wal-Mart and Polytech Molding as witnesses in their response to Amazon’s Motion to Transfer (Doc. No. 41). The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court considers the fact that the Jarratts have identified nonparty witnesses located within the jurisdiction of this Court and that the Jarratts have documents located within the Western District of Arkansas when considering the transfer factors. Forum Shopping 2 Hugh Jarratt has filed three patent infringement actions enforcing US Patent No. D574,187. See Declaration of Jarratt, Exhibit 2 at ¶ 3. These actions include two within the Western District of Arkansas, this action and Hugh Jarratt v. Publishers Clearing House LLC et al., Case Number: 5:13-cv-05206-TLB. Id. Hugh Jarratt has also filed a single action within the Eastern District of Texas, Hugh Jarratt v. Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co., et al. Case No. 5:14-cv-159-RWS-CMC. Id. at ¶ 4. Jarratt filed the action against Arrow in Texas as the infringing plates at issue in the litigation were sold at a Bed Bath & Beyond brick and mortar store in Texarkana, TX such that jurisdiction was proper within the Eastern District of Texas. Id. at ¶ 5. Jarratt would have preferred to file the patent infringement in this Court. Id. Jarratt attempted to find evidence of Arrow offering the infringing plate for sell online through Bed Bath & Beyond online store or within the Bed Bath & Beyond brick and mortar store within Fayetteville, Arkansas or the Western District of Arkansas. Id. at ¶ 6. Jarratt was unable to find any offer for sell of the infringing plate online through Bed Bath & Beyond or within the Bed Bath & Beyond brick and mortar store within the Western District of Arkansas. Id. at ¶ 7. Furthermore, Hugh Jarratt’s wife, Nicole is originally from Texarkana, Arkansas and was born and raised in Texarkana. Jarratt has family that currently lives in Texarkana, Arkansas as Nicole’s parents continue to live there. Id. Jarratt’s decision to file in Texarkana was not forum shopping as Arrow could not challenge jurisdiction within Texas and Jarratt had family in Texarkana. The Factors This Court has previously held that federal courts give considerable deference to a plaintiff’s choice of forum. Crabb v. goDaddy.com, Inc., No. 07-CV-572, 2013 WL 890484, at *3 3 (W.D. Ark. Mar. 29, 2010). However, this choice is given less deference when the plaintiffs do not reside in the selected forum, or when the transaction or underlying facts did not occur there. Id. The plaintiff’s choice of venue is also given less deference when the case is brought as a nationwide class action. Id. The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court give considerable deference to the Jarratts’ choice of forum as this action does not involve an out of state resident or nationwide class action. The Jarratts contend that the factors do not favor transfer as indicated in their Response. Amazon states that the Jarratts ignore factors identified by Crabb v. goDaddy.com, Inc., No. 07-CV-572, 2013 WL 890484 (W.D. Ark. Mar. 29, 2010) and Miller v. Christus St. Michael Health Sys., No. 4:16-CV-4077, 2017 WL 2266887 (W.D. Ark. May 23, 2017). In Crabb, Texas residents subject to a forum selection clause in which the Plaintiffs of Crabb agreed to litigate in Arizona brought a class action lawsuit within Arkansas. Crabb, 2013 WL 890484, at *1 and *4. Miller is directed to Arkansas residents who travelled to Texas for medical treatment. Miller then brought a negligence claim against Christus in Arkansas for the treatment received in Texas. Miller, 2017 WL 2266887, *1 and *4. In both Crabb and Miller, the court transferred venue. The Jarratts’ claims can be distinguished from Crabb and Miller as the Jarratts are residents of Arkansas and the operative facts occurred within Arkansas. The Jarratts are not Texas residents who agreed to a forum selection clause similar to Crabb. Furthermore, the Jarratts did not travel to Washington similar to the travel of Miller for treatment. Instead, Amazon provided its services into Arkansas and harmed Jarratt within Arkansas. Location of Complained of Conduct: Amazon sold, offered for sell, and exposed for sell the infringing plates within Arkansas. Amazon also harmed Jarratt Industries’ trademark in 4 Arkansas and caused harm in this district. Both the conduct and harm occurred in Arkansas such that this factor favors proceeding with this action in Arkansas. Judicial Economy: Jurisdiction and Venue are proper within Arkansas. Judicial economy favors applying Arkansas law within this Court over applying Arkansas law in Washington such that this factor favors proceeding with this action in Arkansas. Comparative costs of litigating: The Jarratts costs for litigation will obviously be less within Arkansas compared to ligating in Washington. Other courts have considered the financial means of the parties. Where a disparity exists between the means of the parties, such as in the case of an individual suing a large corporation, the court may consider the relative means of the parties in determining whether to transfer venue. Andrews v. A.C. Roman & Associates, Inc., N.D.N.Y.2012, 914 F.Supp.2d 230. However, a party arguing for or against a transfer because of inadequate means must offer documentation to show that transfer (or lack thereof) would be unduly burdensome to his finances. Andrews v. A.C. Roman & Associates, Inc., N.D.N.Y.2012, 914 F.Supp.2d 230. Amazon has not provided such documentation that litigation in Arkansas would be unduly burdensome. The Jarratts contend that this factor is neutral or weighs in favor of the Jarratts. Location of Witnesses: Amazon has indicated that its party witnesses are in Washington. The Jarratts have indicated that their party witnesses and nonparty witnesses are in Arkansas. This factor weighs in favor of the Jarratts as the Jarratts’ nonparty witnesses are here and this Court can compel attendance of the Jarratts’ nonparty witnesses. Location of Documents: Amazon’s documents are located in Washington. The Jarratts’ documents are located within this district. This factor is neutral. 5 Local Interest: The Jarratts are local. This Court has an interest in interpreting Arkansas law as indicated in Miller. Miller, 2017 WL 2266887, *4. Furthermore, this Court has an interest in deciding a case involving the Jarratts, Arkansas plaintiffs, who do business with Arkansas businesses. Conclusion The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court maintain this action within the Western District of Arkansas and deny Amazon’s Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. The Jarratts have brought suit in the Western District of Arkansas where the Jarratts reside, where the Jarratts’ documents are located, and where non-party witnesses are located. The convenience factors and the interests of justice favor proceeding with this action in the Western District of Arkansas. The Jarratts respectfully request that the Court deny Amazon’s Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. Respectfully submitted, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC, Plaintiffs ___7-7-2017___ By:/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Date Stephen D. Schrantz, AR Bar No. 2006215 Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 Telephone: (870) 275-7838 schrantzlaw@gmail.com 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on July 7, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan Catherine Maness HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Kathleen M. Stafford Henry Nelkin John Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) k.stafford@chesneynicholas.com Robert T. Cruzen KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com/s/Stephen D. Schrantz Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com 7

Exhibit 1 - Amazon&#039;s Initial Disclosure

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.) INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. Exhibit 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), defendant Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") makes these initial disclosures based on information currently and reasonably available to it. Amazon makes these disclosures without waiving any objections, including, but not limited to, the right to object to any discovery request relating to the subject matter of these disclosures. Amazon has not yet conducted discovery in this matter, and Amazon’s investigation is ongoing. As a result of the foregoing, it is impossible to determine fully which particular features of Amazon’s services, prod-ucts, or listings (if any) are accused and, consequently, who may have information that could sup-port its claims or defenses. Consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(e)(1), Amazon will further supplement and/or amend these disclosures as appropriate, based on additional evi-dence and information that becomes available. I. FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1)(A)(I): INDIVIDUALS LIKELY TO HAVE DISCOVERABLE INFORMATION Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A)(i), and subject to its objections, Amazon identifies the below individuals, or categories of individuals, who are likely to have discoverable information that Amazon may use to support its claims or defenses. Amazon will disclose testifying expert witnesses pursuant to the case schedule and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attribution of particular knowledge to each individual is not necessarily all-inclusive, and each individual may have relevant information in other areas as well. Amazon reserves the right to identify additional individuals once formal discovery has been completed, and at such time that any additional relevant information may become reasonably available. INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF AMAZON.COM, INC. – Page 1 A. Patent Invalidity and Unenforceability, and Plaintiffs’ Other Claims At least the following individual has some information concerning U.S. Design Patent No. D574,187 (the "’187 patent" or "patent in suit"): Name/Location Title Area of Knowledge Hugh Jarratt Alleged inventor of the'187 Purported invention, dates of 1649 N. Viewpoint Dr. patent alleged conception, reduction Fayetteville, AR 72701 to practice, sales or offers for USA sale or use of the alleged in-ventions claimed in the patent in suit, and the prosecution, ownership and licensing of the'187 patent Amazon further incorporates by reference the identity of any individual identified in the Patent Office file history of the patent in suit and the identity of the authors, named inventors, and other individuals reflected or referenced in the publications and patents that are listed as prior art in the patent in suit and any related applications and/or file histories, as being a potential source of discoverable information relevant to said patent in suit. Such individuals include at least Bette E. Smith, last known address West Hills, California, named inventor of U.S. Patent No. D363,413. Amazon believes that the individuals identified above may further have knowledge regard-ing Plaintiffs’ other asserted claims. B. Amazon At least each of the following Amazon employees have information concerning the cate-gory of accused products: Name Area of Knowledge Category Manager, Corporate representative Knowledge regarding the accused products listed on Amazon’s site by third parties Knowledge regarding Amazon’s contractual relationship with third party sellers accused of infringing Plaintiff’s intellectual property INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF AMAZON.COM, INC. – Page 2 Knowledgeable regarding content of listings, and how third party allegedly false representa-tions come to appear in third party listings (in-cluding Amazon’s lack of responsibility for such representations) 2021 7th Avenue, Seattle, WA 98121 Third Party Seller Account Manager, Corpo-Knowledge regarding Amazon’s dealings with rate representative specific third parties accused of selling infring-ing productions in this case 2021 7th Avenue, Seattle, WA 98121 Pre-Suit Notice and Take-Down Manager, Knowledge regarding patent or other intellec-Corporate representative tual property rights holders’ efforts to contact Amazon in advance of suing Amazon regard-ing allegedly infringing products listed by third parties on the www.amazon.com website, and of plaintiffs’ failure to contact Amazon in this case prior to suing Amazon 2021 7th Avenue, Seattle, WA 98121 Finance Personnel, Corporate representative Knowledgeable regarding Amazon’s contribu-tion profit derived from third party sellers’ sales of products accused in this action 2021 7th Avenue, Seattle, WA 98121 Amazon employees may be contacted in this action only through Amazon’s counsel. C. Third Party Manufacturers Amazon suspects that third party manufacturers accused by Plaintiffs of creating products listed by third parties on www.amazon.com that allegedly infringe Plaintiffs’ intellectual property rights further have knowledge regarding the merits of Plaintiffs’ claims. After Plaintiffs identify such third parties in its infringement contentions, Amazon may amend these disclosures to include their names. To date, Plaintiffs have indicated only that these manufacturers are located in China and they are attempting to identify the companies involved. It is therefore anticipated that both Plaintiffs and Amazon will take discovery of these Chinese entities. INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF AMAZON.COM, INC. – Page 3 II. FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1)(A)(II): CATEGORY AND LOCATION OF ALL DOCUMENTS, ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION, AND TANGIBLE THINGS Subject to its objections, and based upon presently available information, Amazon may use relevant documents, electronically stored information, or tangible things (hereinafter "docu-ments") from the following categories to support its claims or defenses. 1. Documents related to the patent in suit. 2. Documents evidencing that the patent in suit is invalid and/or unenforceable. 3. Documents evidencing prior art related to the subject matter of the patent in suit. 4. Documents evidencing that Amazon does not infringe the patent in suit, including that Amazon has itself not infringed and is not responsible for any alleged acts of infringement committed by third parties. 5. Products sold by third parties that constitute prior art to the patent-in-suit is invalid. 6. Any other documents related to the subject matter of the litigation. On information and belief, some of the documents identified in these initial disclosures are within the possession, custody or control of Plaintiffs or various third parties, but the remainder are located in Seattle, Washington. Amazon reserves the right to identify additional categories of documents as discovery progresses. As discussed above, Amazon’s review of this matter to date is necessarily incomplete and ongoing. Therefore, Amazon expects to identify additional witnesses and documents as discovery proceeds. Amazon further reserves the right to withhold any documents and information that are cov-ered by the attorney client privilege or work product immunity. INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF AMAZON.COM, INC. – Page 4 III. FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1)(A)(III): DAMAGES Amazon cannot determine at this point what damages, costs, and attorneys’ fees it will incur in defending this action. IV. FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1)(A)(IV): INSURANCE Amazon is not aware of any insurance agreement under which any insurance business may be liable to satisfy part or all of a possible judgment in this action or to indemnify or reimburse for payments made to satisfy such a judgment for damages that Amazon expects Plaintiffs to seek. June 5, 2017 By:/s/Robert T. Cruzen Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 Catherine M. Maness Ark. State Bar No. 2016085 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: 903-255-1000 Facsimile: 903-255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Email: cmaness@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF AMAZON.COM, INC. – Page 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned hereby certifies that on June 5, 2017, a true and correct copy of the fore-going pleading is being served upon the following named counsel by email and U.S. mail: Stephen D. Schrantz (schrantzlaw@gmail.com) Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 Counsel for Plaintiffs HOUGH JARRATT and JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC/s/Robert T. Cruzen Robert T. Cruzen INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF AMAZON.COM, INC. – Page 6

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jarratt

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-0532-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) DECLARATION OF HUGH JARRATT FOR JARRATT AND JARRATT INDUSTRIES’ REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO OPPOSITION TO AMAZON.COM, INC.’S MOTION TO TRANSFER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OF AMAZON.COM, INC. Comes now the declarant, and states as follows: 1. My name is Hugh Jarratt; I am above the age of majority; I am competent to testify as to the facts set forth in this declaration; and I make this declaration under oath and under penalty of perjury. 2. I am an Arkansas resident residing in Fayetteville, Arkansas. 3. I filed three patent infringement actions enforcing US Patent No. D574,187. These actions include two within the Western District of Arkansas, this action and Hugh Jarratt v. Publishers Clearing House LLC et al., Case Number: 5:13-cv-05206-TLB. 4. I have also filed a single action within the Eastern District of Texas, Hugh Jarratt v. Arrow Plastic Manufacturing Co., et al. Case No. 5:14-cv-159-RWS-CMC. 1 Exhibit 2 5. I filed the action against Arrow in Texas as the infringing plates at issue in the litigation were sold at a Bed Bath & Beyond brick and mortar store in Texarkana, TX. I would have preferred to file the patent infringement in this Court. 6. I attempted to find evidence of Arrow offering the infringing plate for sell online through Bed Bath & Beyond online store or within the Bed Bath & Beyond brick and mortar store within Fayetteville, Arkansas or the Western District of Arkansas. 7. I was unable to find any offer for sell of the infringing plate online through Bed Bath & Beyond or within the Bed Bath & Beyond brick and mortar store within the Western District of Arkansas. 8. My wife, Nicole is originally from Texarkana, Arkansas and was born and raised in Texarkana. Nicole’s parents continue to live in Texarkana. I declare under penalty of perjury that the foregoing is true and correct. Executed on July 7, 2017 ____/s/Hugh Jarratt________________ Hugh Jarratt 2

RESPONSE in Opposition re {{48}} MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) v. No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.)) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. ("Amazon") respectfully opposes plaintiffs’ Motion For Leave To File A Surreply. (D.I. 48.) While plaintiffs argue the Court should grant leave "to re-spond to arguments Amazon presented in its Reply" (id.) plaintiffs’ proposed sur reply does not cite Amazon’s reply brief even once. All of the arguments presented in the proposed sur reply (D.I. 48-1) attempt to further address Amazon’s opening brief. These new arguments could have been made in plaintiffs’ opposition briefing (which the Court ordered plaintiffs to file by June 27, 2017 (D.I. 38)). Nothing justifies raising them belatedly now, and the Court should decline to consider them. See, e.g., Jones v. Aetna Life Ins. Co., 856 F.3d 541, 549 (8th Cir. 2017); Percefull v. Claybaker, No. 04-CV-1022, 2005 WL 3805975, at *1, n.1 (W.D. Ark. Oct. 24, 2005). First, plaintiffs say that they are justified in presenting new witnesses not identified in their initial disclosures because Amazon’s initial disclosures reserved the right to amend in the future, OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY – Page 1 and because newly identified Wal-Mart and Polytech Molding were mentioned in the complaint.1. (D.I. 48-1, at 2.) But Amazon’s opening brief in support of transfer noted that plaintiffs had failed to name any witness other than Mr. Jarratt in their initial disclosures. (D.I. 42, at 13.) Plaintiffs’ opposition brief offered no excuse for that failure. Amazon’s disclosures were served weeks be-fore plaintiffs’ opposition was due, and the complaint was filed months ago. Plaintiffs simply chose not to make these points and instead raise them now. The Court should disregard them. Second, plaintiffs’ proposed sur reply presents a new argument purportedly supported by an entirely new declaration to explain their past forum shopping. (D.I. 48-1, at 3.) Plaintiffs’ forum shopping was noted in Amazon’s opening brief (D.I. 42, at 20), but plaintiffs chose not to respond. Plaintiffs provide no explanation why new argument and evidence are presented now on sur reply. The Court should disregard the argument and decline to consider new evidence. Third, plaintiffs attempt (D.I. 48-1, at 3-6) to refute case law and the 8th Circuit factors that Amazon addressed at length in its opening brief. (D.I. 42, at 9-23.) Plaintiffs chose not to distin-guish this case law and to apply these 8th Circuit factors in their responsive brief. No explanation is offered for plaintiffs’ tactical decision to ignore these points. Finally, relying solely on out-of-circuit case law, plaintiffs argue for the first time that the Court should consider the relative financial means of the parties. (D.I. 48-1, at 5.) Again, plaintiffs fail to explain why they have chosen to unfairly raise this new argument for the first time in a proposed sur reply brief, and it should be disregarded. For the reasons discussed above, Amazon respectfully requests that the Court deny Plain-tiffs’ motion for leave to file a sur-reply. 1 The argument is belied by the fact that Hugh Jarratt was named as the sole witness in the disclosures but he, too, is mentioned repeatedly in the complaint. Mentioning a party in the com-plaint is hardly fair warning plaintiffs intended to rely upon that party as a witness. OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY – Page 2 Respectfully submitted,/s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan Ark. State Bar No. 96064 HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Robert T. Cruzen (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Oregon State Bar No. 080167 KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Telephone: (503) 595-5300 Facsimile: (503) 595-5301 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that the foregoing document was filed electronically in compli-ance with Local Rule CV-5.2 on this 10th day of July, 2017./s/Darby V. Doan Darby V. Doan OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY – Page 3

STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION) HUGH JARRATT and) JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC,)) Plaintiffs,)) Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-05302-PKH v.)) AMAZON.COM, INC., and) CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC.,)) Defendants.))) JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC, by and through their attorney, and Defendant, CT Discount Store, Inc., by and through its attorney, and Amazon.com, Inc., by and through its attorney, hereby stipulate to the dismissal of CT Discount Store, Inc. from this action with prejudice and without costs to either Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC, and CT Discount Store, Inc. This matter as it pertains to CT Discount Store, Inc. has been resolved by agreement of Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC and CT Discount Store, Inc. Respectfully submitted, Attorney for Defendant Attorney for Plaintiffs CT Discount Store, Inc. Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC By:/s/Kathleen M. Stafford By: __/s/Stephen D. Schrantz_____ Kathleen M. Stafford Stephen D. Schrantz NY Bar No. 3983616; admitted AR Pro Hac Arkansas Bar No. 2006215 Vice Schrantz Law Firm, PLLC Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 1000 East Matthews, Suite C 485 Underhill Boulevard Jonesboro, AR 72401 Suite 308 (870) 275-7838 – Telephone Syosset, New York 11791 schrantzlaw@gmail.com (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) k.stafford@chesneynicholas.com Attorney for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. By: _/s/Robert Cruzen_____ Robert T. Cruzen Admitted AR Pro Hac Vice KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on July 11, 2017, I electronically filed the foregoing with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF System which will send notification of such filing to the following: Darby V. Doan Catherine Maness HALTOM & DOAN 6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100 Texarkana, TX 75503 Telephone: (903) 255-1000 Facsimile: (903) 255-0800 Email: ddoan@haltomdoan.com Kathleen M. Stafford Henry Nelkin John Gherlone Chesney & Nicholas, LLP 485 Underhill Boulevard Suite 308 Syosset, New York 11791 (516) 378-1700 (516) 378-7633 (Fax) k.stafford@chesneynicholas.com Robert T. Cruzen KLARQUIST SPARKMAN, LLP 121 S.W. Salmon Street, Suite 1600 Portland, Oregon 97204 Email: rob.cruzen@klarquist.com __/s/Stephen D. Schrantz____________ Stephen D. Schrantz Ark. Bar. #2006215 Attorney for Plaintiffs SCHRANTZ LAW FIRM, PLLC 1000 East Matthews, Suite C Jonesboro, AR 72401 (870) 275-7838 Schrantzlaw@gmail.com

CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case/Party: re [50] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jarratt Industries, LLC, Hugh Jarratt Party CT Discount Store, Inc. (A New York Corporation) dismissed with prejudice.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION HUGH JARRATT and PLAINTIFF JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC NO. 5:16-CV-5302-PKH AMAZON.COM, INC., and DEFENDANT CT DISCOUNT STORE, INC., CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL On this 12th day of July, 2017, the parties hereto having filed a stipulation for dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 (a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, IT IS ORDERED that defendant CT Discount Store, Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action. AT THE DIRECTION OF THE COURT DOUGLAS F. YOUNG, CLERK BY:/s/Deputy Clerk

OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part {{41}} Motion to Transfer Case; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE immediately to the Western District of Washington. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 10, 2017.

IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS FAYETTEVILLE DIVISION HUGH JARRATT and JARRATT INDUSTRIES, LLC PLAINTIFFS v. No. 5:16-CV-05302 AMAZON.COM, INC. DEFENDANT OPINION AND ORDER Before the Court is Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.’s ("Amazon") motion (Doc. 41) to transfer venue to the Western District of Washington, or in the alternative to dismiss for improper venue. Amazon has filed a brief (Doc. 42) in support. Plaintiffs Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC (collectively, "Jarratt") 1 have filed a response (Doc. 45) in opposition. Amazon filed a reply (Doc. 47) with leave of Court, and the Court denied Jarratt’s motion to file a surreply. Amazon filed its motion in response to the Court’s May 30, 2017 order (Doc. 38), entered following the decision of the Supreme Court in TC Heartland, LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC,--U.S.--, 137 S.Ct. 1514 (2017). The motion will be granted as to transfer and denied as to dismissal. As the Court noted in its show cause order, Amazon has waived the defense of improper venue. (Doc. 38, p. 3). Amazon argues that because TC Heartland is an intervening decision that presents new case law on the issue of proper venue, Amazon should have an opportunity to raise a defense that was not previously available to it. This Court agrees with the analysis of this issue in Reebok International Ltd. v. TRB Acquisitions LLC, Case No. 3:16-CV-1618, 2017 WL 3016034 (D. Or. July 14, 2017) which directly addresses whether this defense would have been available prior to the holding in TC Heartland. Under this analysis, Amazon’s argument fails 1 Hugh Jarratt founded Jarratt Industries, LLC, and operates it out of his home in his spare time. (Doc. 45-1, ¶¶ 1–9). 1 because the defense of improper venue was available to it. The TC Heartland decision merely reiterates Supreme Court precedent from Fourco Glass Co. v. Transmirra Products Corp., 353 U.S. 222 (1957), which was erroneously rejected by the Federal Circuit. Amazon has waived the defense of improper venue, and its motion to dismiss will be denied. While dismissal is inappropriate, the motion to transfer will be granted. Venue may be transferred to a more convenient forum under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). As a threshold matter, the new venue must be a district or division where the action originally "might have been brought." 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). A patent infringement action "may be brought in the judicial district where the defendant resides, or where the defendant has committed acts of infringement and has a regular and established place of business." 28 U.S.C. § 1400(b). Amazon resides in the State of Delaware because it is incorporated there. (Doc. 1, ¶ 3); TC Heartland, LLC, 137 S.Ct. at 1521 ("As applied to domestic corporations,'reside[nce]’ in § 1400(b) refers only to the State of incorporation."). Amazon’s principal place of business is its corporate headquarters in the Western District of Washington, so it inarguably has a regular and established place of business in that district. Amazon’s alleged acts of infringement 2 are the selling, offering for sale, or exposing for sale through its website of products that infringe Jarratt’s patent. (Doc. 1, ¶¶ 18, 19). Amazon’s "retail and marketplace website operations" are coordinated from its corporate headquarters in the Western District of Washington. (Doc. 42-1, ¶ 7). Its alleged acts of infringement occurred there, as much as they occurred anywhere. This action could originally have been brought in the Western District of Washington. Because the Western District of Washington is an acceptable venue for transfer, the Court 2 Whether any act of infringement has occurred is reserved for trial—allegations of infringement are sufficient for a venue determination. In re Cordis Corp., 769 F.2d 733, 737 (Fed. Cir. 1985). 2 must determine whether "the convenience of parties and witnesses... [and] the interest of justice" weigh in favor of transfer of venue. 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). This is typically a two-prong analysis. Under the "convenience" prong, the Court considers: (1) the convenience of the parties, (2) the convenience of the witnesses—including the willingness of witnesses to appear, the ability to subpoena witnesses, and the adequacy of deposition testimony, (3) the accessibility to records and documents, (4) the location where the conduct complained of occurred, and (5) the applicability of each forum state’s substantive law. Terra Int’l, Inc. v. Miss. Chem. Corp., 119 F.3d 688, 696 (8th Cir. 1997). Under the "interest of justice" prong, the Court considers: (1) judicial economy, (2) the plaintiff’s choice of forum, (3) the comparative costs to the parties of litigating in each forum, (4) each party’s ability to enforce a judgment, (5) obstacles to a fair trial, (6) conflict of law issues, and (7) the advantages of having a local court determine questions of local law. Id. The deference typically given to a plaintiff’s choice of forum means that Amazon bears the burden of persuasion. Id. at 695. The convenience prong weighs in favor of transfer. Under this prong, many Courts consider the convenience of witnesses to be the most important factor. See 15 Wright, Miller & Cooper, Fed. Practice and Procedure § 3851, n.1 (4th ed.) (collecting cases). In response to Amazon’s motion, Jarratt identifies witnesses 3 other than himself who are located or have a presence in this district. Jarratt represents that these witnesses have knowledge related to damages and to the marking and manufacture of Jarratt’s product. (Doc. 45-1, ¶¶ 10–12). Amazon identifies witnesses whose testimony is likely to be relevant to Amazon’s allegedly-infringing conduct, and who are likely to be located in the Western District of Washington. In this case, 3 Amazon argues that the convenience of these witnesses should not be considered because Jarratt has not disclosed them in discovery. Because this factor favors Amazon even if the Court considers Jarratt’s witnesses, resolving this dispute is unnecessary. 3 testimony of liability witnesses is likely to be more substantial than testimony of damages witnesses. Additionally, travel to the Western District of Washington will be more convenient than travel to this district for any foreign witnesses associated with Chinese manufacturers of accused products, and for any witnesses from now-dismissed CT Discount Store, which is located in New York. This factor weighs in favor of transfer. The remaining convenience prong factors are split, but weigh in favor of transfer. With respect to the parties, each party’s preferred district is inarguably more convenient to it, and it appears equally inconvenient for each to litigate in the other district. Hugh Jarratt operates Jarratt Industries, LLC in his spare time, and he spends more time at a separate full-time job. Amazon is headquartered in Seattle, Washington, and most of its relevant party witnesses are likely to be located there. This factor is neutral. Accessibility to records and documents favors transfer because "[i]n patent infringement cases, the bulk of the relevant evidence usually comes from the accused infringer. Consequently, the place where the defendant’s documents are kept weighs in favor of transfer to that location." In re Genetech, 566 F.3d 1338, 1345 (Fed. Cir. 2009) (quotation omitted). The conduct complained of in this case is Amazon’s decision to sell allegedly-infringing products. This conduct occurred primarily in the Western District of Washington. The only conduct that appears to have occurred in this district is that Amazon allowed access to its website where the accused products were offered for sale, but this conduct happens equally in every district where the website is accessible—including the Western District of Washington. Finally, while Arkansas substantive law applies to some of the claims at issue, applying state law from a different forum presents no special concern for federal courts, and the central claims in this suit are federal. This factor is neutral. The interest of justice prong weighs in favor of transfer. Judicial economy is typically 4 served by allowing a case to proceed in the district that is "the locus of operative facts." 15 Wright, Miller & Cooper, Fed. Practice and Procedure § 3854, n.29 (4th ed.) (collecting cases). In a patent infringement case, that is the location of the allegedly-infringing conduct—here, the Western District of Washington. See, e.g., LG Electronics, Inc. v. First Int’l Computer, Inc., 138 F.Supp.2d 574, 590 (D.N.J. 2001) ("The district court ought to be as close as possible to the infringing device and the hub of activity centered around its production.... Also relevant is the place where marketing and sales decisions were made, rather than where the limited sales activity has occurred."). Jarratt’s choice of forum is owed more than minimal deference because Jarratt is headquartered here and so has some relevant contact with this district, but because Amazon’s conduct occurred primarily in the Western District of Washington and the conduct in this jurisdiction (the offering for sale of the accused product through its website) occurred equally nationwide, this deference is not as substantial as Jarratt argues it must be. Cf. In re Apple, Inc., 602 F.3d 909, 913 (8th Cir. 2010) (identifying a party’s headquarters in a district as a relevant factor that would warrant something more than minimal deference to a plaintiff’s choice of forum, but noting that "[t]his'general’ practice of according deference... is based on an assumption that the plaintiff’s choice will be a convenient one."). The comparative cost to the parties favors transfer, as Amazon is likely to bear the burden of producing most of the documents and testimony in this case. The remaining factors are neutral, as there will be no substantial barrier to enforcement of a judgment, no conceivable obstacle to a fair trial, no substantive conflict of law issues in either district, and any advantage to having this Court determine any questions of Arkansas law is de minimis. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.’s motion (Doc. 41) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks 5 dismissal for improper venue. The motion to transfer venue is otherwise GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States Court for the Western District of Washington. IT IS SO ORDERED this 10th day of August, 2017./s/P. K. Holmes, III P.K. HOLMES, III CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE 6

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 517 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/25/2016
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amazon.Com, Inc., CT Discount Store, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5005865), filed by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02911575153" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02911575153','50269','8','','2','1','',''}};">8</a> Exhibit 8)
8 Attachments
2
10/25/2016
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
3
10/25/2016
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc., CT Discount Store, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service.
4
10/25/2016
Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished.
5
10/25/2016
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jarratt Industries, LLC.
6
10/25/2016
Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
7
10/25/2016
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
8
10/25/2016
INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A PATENT ACTION for a case initiated by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC, with the filing of 1 Complaint.
9
01/23/2017
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Brief in Support, filed by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC. CT Discount Store, Inc. served on 1/17/2017, answer due 2/7/2017.
10
01/24/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 1/20/2017, answer due 2/10/2017.
11
02/01/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Darby Vincent Doan on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.
12
02/01/2017
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amazon.Com, Inc.
02/01/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file a responsive pleading to the 1 complaint and a response to the 6 motion for preliminary injunction is extended to March 13, 2017. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 1, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
02/07/2017
STIPULATION extending time to answer by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
14
02/08/2017
CLERK'S ORDER re 13 Stipulation filed by Jarratt Industries, LLC, Hugh Jarratt extending time to answer. CT Discount Store, Inc. answer due 3/9/2017.
15
02/13/2017
MOTION for Attorney JOHN GHERLONE to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 5006103) by CT Discount Store, Inc. (tg) Corrected attorney name on 2/14/2017
02/14/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John Gherlone is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. The requirement to designate local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d) is waived for the limited purposes of this pending litigation. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 14, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/24/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Gherlone on behalf of CT Discount Store, Inc.
17
03/03/2017
MOTION to Withdraw 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1 - terms proposed by Amazon
1 Attachment
03/06/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw Motion. Plaintiff's 6 motion for preliminary injunction is withdrawn against Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. and remains pending against Defendant CT Discount Store, Inc. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 6, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
03/07/2017
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Second Unopposed Motion) by Amazon.Com, Inc.
03/07/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.'s deadline to file a responsive pleading to the 1 complaint is extended to April 12, 2017. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 7, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
03/09/2017
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 7 Memorandum Brief in Support, 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CT Discount Store, Inc.
03/09/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CT Discount Store, Inc.'s deadline to file a responsive pleading to the 1 complaint and a response to the 6 motion for preliminary injunction is extended to April 10, 2017. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 9, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
04/07/2017
MOTION for Attorney Robert T. Cruzen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1497889) by Amazon.Com, Inc.
04/07/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert T. Cruzen is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. The requirement to designate local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d) is waived for the limited purposes of this pending litigation. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 7, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
04/10/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CT Discount Store, Inc.
22
04/10/2017
**PLEASE DISREGARD** NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiffs, Hugh Jarratt and Jarratt Industries, LLC on June 19, 2017 at John Paul Hammerschmidt Federal Building, 35 East Mountain Street, Room 510, Fayetteville, Arkansas 72701-5354 Modified on 4/11/2017 to add text
23
04/10/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Cruzen on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.
24
04/11/2017
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY directed to CT Discount Store, Inc.: A/An 22 Notice to Take Deposition, was filed with the Court and appears to contain one or more deficiencies. The document appears to be deficient as follows: Document part of discovery according to guidelines. You are advised that the filing, while on the record, will not be considered unless and until all deficiencies are remedied.
1
https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02911654887" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02911654887','50269','83','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Guidelines)
1 Attachment
25
04/12/2017
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Third Unopposed Motion) by Amazon.Com, Inc.
26
04/13/2017
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Clerk is directed to enter default against Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 13, 2017.
27
04/13/2017
***SET ASIDE PER 30 ORDER*** CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Amazon.Com, Inc.
28
04/13/2017
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Amazon.Com, Inc.
1
Exhibit A (Proposed Answer)
2
Affidavit of Robert T. Cruzen
2 Attachments
29
04/13/2017
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 28 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Amazon.Com, Inc.
30
04/14/2017
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 14, 2017.
31
04/14/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Maness on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.
32
04/14/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Amazon.Com, Inc.
33
04/14/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.Com, Inc.
34
04/14/2017
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/22/2017. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 14, 2017.
35
04/14/2017
ORDER terminating without prejudice to its refiling 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 14, 2017.
36
04/20/2017
First MOTION for Attorney Henry D. Nelkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1504778) by CT Discount Store, Inc.
04/21/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Henry D. Nelkin is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 21, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
05/22/2017
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
1
Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order
1 Attachment
38
05/30/2017
SHOW CAUSE ORDER- Show Cause Response due by 6/13/2017. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 30, 2017.
39
05/31/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Nelkin on behalf of CT Discount Store, Inc.
40
06/12/2017
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 Order to Show Cause by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
06/12/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs' response to the 38 order to show cause is due by June 27, 2017. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 12, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
06/13/2017
MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Amazon.Com, Inc.
42
06/13/2017
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of [41] MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Amazon.Com, Inc.
1
Vairo Declaration
2
R. Cruzen Declaration
3
Exhibit A
4
Exhibit B
5
Exhibit C
6
Exhibit D
7
Exhibit E
8
Exhibit F
9
Exhibit G
10
Exhibit H
11
Exhibit I
12
Exhibit J
13
Exhibit K
13 Attachments
43
06/15/2017
MOTION for Attorney Kathleen M. Stafford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 5006339) by CT Discount Store, Inc.
06/16/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kathleen M. Stafford is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if she has not already done so and enter her appearance in this matter.The requirement to designate local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d) is waived for the limited purposes of this pending litigation. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 16, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
06/27/2017
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 38 Order to Show Cause by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
06/27/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs' response to the 38 show cause order is due by July 11, 2017. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 27, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
06/27/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re [41] MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jarratt
2
Exhibit 2 - Article Amazon to buy Whole Foods
3
Exhibit 3 - Location of Whole Foods in Fayetteville, Arkansas
3 Attachments
46
06/29/2017
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Amazon.Com, Inc.
1
Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Dismiss
1 Attachment
06/30/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave. Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. is directed to immediately file the reply attached as an exhibit to its motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 30, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
06/30/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re [41] MOTION to Transfer Case to a More Convenient Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.
48
07/07/2017
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
1
Supplement Surreply
2
Exhibit 1 - Amazon&#039;s Initial Disclosure
3
Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jarratt
3 Attachments
49
07/10/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.
07/10/2017
TEXT ONLY ORDER denying 48 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 10, 2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
07/11/2017
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hugh Jarratt, Jarratt Industries, LLC.
51
07/12/2017
CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case/Party: re [50] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jarratt Industries, LLC, Hugh Jarratt Party CT Discount Store, Inc. (A New York Corporation) dismissed with prejudice.
52
08/10/2017
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Transfer Case; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE immediately to the Western District of Washington. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 10, 2017.
08/10/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Civil Case Transferred from the Western District of Arkansas has been opened in the Western District of Washington as case 2:17-cv-01216 on 08/10/2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.