Jarred E Milliron and Jennifer B Milliron
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00358 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/22/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/22/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
10/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
10/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
10/22/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
10/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/23/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
10/23/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
10/23/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
10/24/2018
Entry of Appearance
11
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
11/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
16
11/28/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
11/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
11/28/2018
Interim Report and Resignation of Trustee
18
11/28/2018
Interim Report and Resignation of Trustee
11/29/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/29/2018
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (With BNC Service)
20
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
12/14/2018
Entry of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.