Jason Anthony Murrell and Talia Carmel Ramirez Torres-Murrell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00177 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/11/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
06/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/11/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
6
06/11/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
06/12/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
9
06/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/14/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
07/09/2018
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor
07/09/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/29/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
16
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
09/05/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
09/11/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
20
09/11/2018
Defer Closing of Case
21
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
22
09/17/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
23
09/17/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
24
09/17/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
25
09/17/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
09/18/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/19/2018
Defer Closing of Case
27
10/19/2018
Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay (11 USC 362(k)) (CM32)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.