Jason D Perry and Joshua E Kindred
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81944 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
07/03/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
35
12/07/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
39
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
01/24/2019
Distribute Funds
42
01/25/2019
Response
01/25/2019
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
03/13/2019
Limit Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.