Jason Dewayne Rachels and Niki Kimberly Rachels
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04700 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[15] Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04700-DSC Jason Dewayne Rachels Chapter 7 Niki Kimberly Rachels Debtors CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: acurvin Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: 318 Total Noticed: 35 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db/jdb +Jason Dewayne Rachels, Niki Kimberly Rachels, 1020 Bethpage Lane, Calera, AL 35040-4010 cr +CarMax Auto Finance, 225 Chastain Meadows Court, Kennesaw, GA 30144-5897 9543675 +America's First Federal Credit Union, Member Services Department, Po Box 11349, Birmingham, AL 35202-1349 9543676 +American General Financial/Springleaf Fi, 2709 Pelham Pkwy Ste C, Pelham, AL 35124-1704 9543669 +Carmax Auto Finance, Attn: Bankruptcy Department, Po Box 440609, Kennesaw, GA 30160-9511 9543681 +Citibank/The Home Depot, Citicorp Cr Srvs/Centralized Bankruptcy, Po Box 790040, St Louis, MO 63179-0040 9543682 +Citicards Cbna, Citicorp Credit Svc/Centralized Bankrupt, Po Box 790040, Saint Louis, MO 63179-0040 9543683 Citimortgage Inc, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 6423, Sioux Falls, SD 57117 9543670 +Interlinc Mtg/dovenmue, 1 Corporate Dr Ste 360, Lake Zurich, IL 60047-8945 9543673 +Internal Revenue Service TCS BHAM, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6426 9543671 M&T Credit Services, 1100 Worley Drive, Consumer Asset Management 2nd Floor/Attn, Williamsville, NY 14221 9543687 +NTB/CBSD, CitiCards Private Label Centralized Bank, Po Box 790040, Saint Louis, MO 63179-0040 9543674 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. tr EDI: QAMTOFFEL.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Andre' M Toffel, Andre' M Toffel, PC, 450A Century Park South, Suite #206A, Birmingham, AL 35226 smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 01:29:20 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 cr +EDI: GMACFS.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Ally Bank, P.O. Box 130424, Roseville, MN 55113-0004 9543668 +EDI: GMACFS.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Ally Financial, 200 Renaissance Ctr, Detroit, MI 48243-1300 9543677 +EDI: AGFINANCE.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 American General Financial/Springleaf Fi, Attention: Bankruptcy, Po Box 3251, Evansville, IN 47731-3251 9543678 +EDI: TSYS2.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Barclays Bank Delaware, 100 S West St, Wilmington, DE 19801-5015 9543680 +EDI: CAPITALONE.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Capital One, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9543684 +EDI: WFNNB.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Comenity Bank/Lane Bryant, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 182125, Columbus, OH 43218-2125 9543685 EDI: FORD.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Ford Motor Credit, National Bankruptcy Service Center, Po Box 62180, Colorado Springs, CO 80962 9543672 EDI: IRS.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Internal Revenue Service, CIO: Bankruptcy, POB 7346, Philadelphia, PA 19101-7346 9543686 +E-mail/Text: bk@lendingclub.com Feb 13 2018 01:30:23 Lending Club Corp, 71 Stevenson St, Suite 300, San Francisco, CA 94105-2985 9543688 +EDI: AGFINANCE.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Onemain Financial, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 3251, Evansville, IN 47731-3251 9543689 +E-mail/Text: jennifer.chacon@spservicing.com Feb 13 2018 01:31:11 Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc, Po Box 65250, Salt Lake City, UT 84165-0250 9543690 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Syncb/Rooms To Go, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9543691 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/ JC Penneys, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9543692 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/ Old Navy, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9543693 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/Care Credit, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9543694 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/Walmart, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9543695 +EDI: WTRRNBANK.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Target, C/O Financial & Retail Srvs, Mailstopn BT POB 9475, Minneapolis, MN 55440-9475 9543696 +EDI: WFFC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 19657, Irvine, CA 92623-9657 9543697 +EDI: WFFC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Wells Fargo Financial Natl Bank, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 5943, Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5943 9543698 +EDI: WFFC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Wellsfargo, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 9210, Des Moines, IA 50306-9210 TOTAL: 22 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9543679 Cap1/bstby TOTALS: 1, * 0, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Case 17-04700-DSC7 Doc 16 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: acurvin Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: 318 Total Noticed: 35 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (continued) ***** Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 12, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Andre' M Toffel trustee@toffelpc.com, jcraft@toffelpc.com;atoffel@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Jason Dewayne Rachels brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Joint Debtor Niki Kimberly Rachels brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 3 Case 17-04700-DSC7 Doc 16 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 Information to identify the case: Debtor 1 Jason Dewayne Rachels Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−8114 First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ Debtor 2 Niki Kimberly Rachels Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−2835 (Spouse, if filing) First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION Case number: 17−04700−DSC7 (12/15) Order of Discharge IT IS ORDERED: A discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 727 is granted to: Jason Dewayne Rachels Niki Kimberly Rachels 2/12/18 By the court: D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge Explanation of Bankruptcy Discharge in a Chapter 7 Case This order does not close or dismiss the case, This order does not prevent debtors from paying and it does not determine how much money, if any debt voluntarily or from paying reaffirmed any, the trustee will pay creditors. debts according to the reaffirmation agreement. 11 U.S.C. § 524(c), (f). Creditors cannot collect discharged debts This order means that no one may make any Most debts are discharged attempt to collect a discharged debt from the Most debts are covered by the discharge, but not debtors personally. For example, creditors all. Generally, a discharge removes the debtors' cannot sue, garnish wages, assert a deficiency, personal liability for debts owed before the or otherwise try to collect from the debtors debtors' bankruptcy case was filed. personally on discharged debts. Creditors cannot contact the debtors by mail, phone, or otherwise Also, if this case began under a different chapter in any attempt to collect the debt personally. of the Bankruptcy Code and was later converted Creditors who violate this order can be required to chapter 7, debts owed before the conversion to pay debtors damages and attorney's fees. are discharged. However, a creditor with a lien may enforce a In a case involving community property: Special claim against the debtors' property subject to that rules protect certain community property owned lien unless the lien was avoided or eliminated. by the debtor's spouse, even if that spouse did For example, a creditor may have the right to not file a bankruptcy case. foreclose a home mortgage or repossess an automobile. For more information, see page 2 > ATTENTION DEBTOR: IMPORTANT DOCUMENT! PLEASE KEEP FOR YOUR RECORDS! Official Form 318 Order of Discharge page 1 Case 17-04700-DSC7 Doc 16 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 Some debts are not discharged Also, debts covered by a valid reaffirmation Examples of debts that are not discharged are: agreement are not discharged. ♦ debts that are domestic support In addition, this discharge does not stop obligations; creditors from collecting from anyone else who is also liable on the debt, such as an insurance company or a person who cosigned or ♦ debts for most student loans; guaranteed a loan. ♦ debts for most taxes; This information is only a general summary ♦ debts that the bankruptcy court has of the bankruptcy discharge; some decided or will decide are not discharged exceptions exist. Because the law is in this bankruptcy case; complicated, you should consult an attorney to determine the exact effect of the discharge in this case. ♦ debts for most fines, penalties, forfeitures, or criminal restitution obligations; ♦ some debts which the debtors did not properly list; ♦ debts for certain types of loans owed to pension, profit sharing, stock bonus, or retirement plans; and ♦ debts for death or personal injury caused by operating a vehicle while intoxicated. Official Form 318 Order of Discharge page 2 Case 17-04700-DSC7 Doc 16 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/01/2017
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jason Dewayne Rachels, Niki Kimberly Rachels
3
11/01/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Jason Dewayne Rachels, Joint Debtor Niki Kimberly Rachels.
4
11/01/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jason Dewayne Rachels, Joint Debtor Niki Kimberly Rachels.
11/01/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(17-04700-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21347609. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/01/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2017 at 01:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 02/09/2018.
6
11/02/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11/02/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Jason Dewayne Rachels and Niki Kimberly Rachels Case Number 05-09614, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/2005; Case Number 05-09614, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/2005, Standard Discharge on 12/29/2005.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/02/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 11/2/2017.
8
11/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 11/03/2017.
9
11/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/04/2017.
10
11/27/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
11
11/27/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Joint Debtor
12
12/12/2017
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Andre' M Toffel, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 211000.00, Assets Exempt: $ 31925.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 328398.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 328398.00. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared. (Toffel, Andre')
13
12/22/2017
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and CarMax Auto Finance Filed by Creditor CarMax Auto Finance.
14
01/03/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and Ally Bank Filed by Creditor Ally Bank.
15
02/12/2018
Order Discharging Both Debtors Signed on 2/12/2018.
16
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[15] Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.