Jason M Roach
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2017-bk-00379 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/04/2018
Withdraw Document / Motion
doc
06/04/2018
Generic Motion
06/05/2018
Unterminate Motion / Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
06/06/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 (BKCONV01)
06/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
06/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
32
06/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
33
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
34
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
06/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
36
06/08/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
37
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
38
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
39
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
40
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
43
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
06/19/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
46
06/19/2018
Certificate of Service
06/21/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
06/21/2018
Extend Time
48
06/22/2018
Extend Time
49
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/29/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
07/02/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
51
07/02/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/10/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
07/24/2018
Generic Motion / Application
53
07/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
54
07/24/2018
Certificate of Service
55
07/25/2018
Dismiss Case (Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
56
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
57
08/02/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
59
08/15/2018
Certificate of No Objection
60
08/17/2018
Generic Motion
08/17/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
09/04/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
63
09/13/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
09/19/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.