Jason Thomas Serrano
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00531 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
77
11/21/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
78
11/30/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
79
12/06/2018
Generic Motion / Application
80
12/06/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
81
12/06/2018
Certificate of Service
12/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
01/09/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
83
01/15/2019
Certificate of No Objection
84
01/15/2019
Certificate of Service
85
01/24/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
86
01/24/2019
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
87
01/31/2019
Generic Motion
88
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
89
02/05/2019
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
90
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/22/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.