Jay Richard Rhymes and Karen Lesley Rhymes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00107 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
05/21/2018
QC Remark Re: Signature Required (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
05/23/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
05/31/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
07/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
48
07/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
49
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
07/26/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
51
07/27/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
07/27/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.