Jayne Treva Isch
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00046 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Employ
05/23/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
40
06/05/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
41
11/21/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
42
12/07/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
43
12/07/2018
Certificate of Service
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/10/2019
Certificate of No Objection
45
01/14/2019
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.