Jeannette Marie Sleppy and John Milton Sleppy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-00443 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
10/01/2018
Employ (CM41)
35
10/01/2018
Declaration
36
10/01/2018
Employ
37
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
12/13/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
39
12/13/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
01/14/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
01/25/2019
Certificate of No Objection
41
01/30/2019
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
02/22/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
03/05/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
03/05/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
03/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.