Jefferson C. Mitchell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00332 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/01/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/01/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/02/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10/02/2018
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
10/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
10/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10/17/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
10/17/2018
Extend Time
11
10/17/2018
Declaration
12
10/17/2018
Extend Time
13
10/17/2018
Extend Time
14
10/17/2018
Declaration
10/18/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/18/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
16
10/19/2018
Entry of Appearance
17
10/19/2018
Schedules A-J
18
10/19/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
19
10/19/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
20
10/19/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
21
10/19/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
22
10/19/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
10/22/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/22/2018
Extend Time
10/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/30/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
25
10/30/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
10/31/2018
Undeliverable Mail
10/31/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
11/16/2018
Entry of Appearance
28
11/16/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
29
11/27/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
30
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.