Jeffrey Alvin Mize and Clara Janice Evans Mize
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2014-bk-03314 (alnb)

Trustee's Objection to Claim # 10 of Embrace Home Loans in the amount of $3009.60 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION Jeffrey Alvin Mize) SSN: ###-##-5878) Clara Janice Evans Mize) CASE NO.: 14-03314-TOM13 SSN: ###-##-3763) Debtors.) TRUSTEE'S OBJECTION TO CLAIM COMES NOW Bradford W. Caraway, Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, and hereby objects to the following claim filed: CLAIM NO. CLAIMANT AMOUNT 010B EMBRACE HOME LOANS $3,009.60 BaBasis for Objection Name of Debtor should be inserted. Debtor(s)' case number should be inserted. Form not signed by creditor/attorney/agent. Other: The creditor has returned funds to the Trustee office. The creditor needs to provide paid in full letter, claim transfer, or other documents for these returned funds. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 (205) 323-4631 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that I have served a copy of the foregoing objection on the following by electronic service or U.S. Mail; postage prepaid and properly addressed on January 23, 2018. Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.c. Attorney for Debtor ECFBIRMINGHAM@BONDNBOTES.COM Jeffrey Alvin Mize Debtor 113 Hillside Drive. Hueytown, Al 35023 Case 14-03314-TOM13 Doc 33 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 09:45:29 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 Clara Janice Evans Mize Joint Debtor 113 Hillside Drive Hueytown, Al 35023 Loancare Llc EMBRACE HOME LOANS, Creditor 3637 Sentara Way Virginia Beach, Va 23452 KC /s/ Bradford W. Caraway TRUSTEE Case 14-03314-TOM13 Doc 33 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 09:45:29 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s)[33] Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 3/1/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.

Van−002 [Notice of Hearing] (Rev. 05/14) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 14−03314−TOM13 Jeffrey Alvin Mize Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−5878 Clara Janice Evans Mize SSN: xxx−xx−3763 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING Notice is hereby given that a hearing will be held to consider and act upon the following: 33 − Trustee's Objection to Claim # 10 of Embrace Home Loans in the amount of $3009.60 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc) Date: Thursday, March 1, 2018 Time: 09:30 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 3, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attorneys should attend all scheduled hearings. If a conflict is known, the Court should be notified immediately. Continuances of non−evidentiary hearings may be granted if all parties consent. Evidentiary hearings will not be continued except for good cause shown. If there is a failure to attend a scheduled hearing, and the Court has not been notified of the reason for the failure, the Court may enter appropriate orders. Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: January 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court mwb Case 14-03314-TOM13 Doc 34 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 10:59:16 Desc Notice of Hearing Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/25/2014
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE, Clara Janice Evans Mize
3
08/25/2014
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE, Joint Debtor Clara Janice Evans Mize.
4
08/25/2014
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE, Joint Debtor Clara Janice Evans Mize.
08/25/2014
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(14-03314-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17014362. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/25/2014
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE, Joint Debtor Clara Janice Evans Mize.
6
08/25/2014
Appraisal Filed by Debtor JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE, Joint Debtor Clara Janice Evans Mize.
7
08/25/2014
Tax Documents for the Year for 2013 Filed by Debtor JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE, Joint Debtor Clara Janice Evans Mize.
8
08/26/2014
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
08/26/2014
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors JEFFREY ARVIN MIZE and Clara Janice Evans Mize Case Number 95-00422, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/20/1995, Standard Discharge on 02/12/2001; Case Number 95-00422, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/20/1995.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/26/2014
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/24/2014 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 11/24/2014.Proofs of Claims due by 12/23/2014.Government Proof of Claim due by 2/23/2015.Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/16/2014 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
10
08/28/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 08/28/2014.
11
08/28/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Jeffrey Alvin Mize, Joint Debtor Clara Janice Evans Mize). Notice Date 08/28/2014.
12
08/28/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/28/2014.
13
09/02/2014
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
14
09/25/2014
Meeting of Creditors Held 9/24/2014.
15
10/15/2014
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 10/16/2014 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
16
10/20/2014
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
17
11/03/2014
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 11/3/2014 (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13).
18
11/04/2014
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
19
11/05/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 11/05/2014.
20
11/20/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor LOANCARE, LLC.
21
03/23/2015
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor LOANCARE LLC, AS SERVICER FOR EMBRACE HOME LOANS
1
NOTE #
2
MORTGAGE #
3
LOAN MODIFICATION
3 Attachments
22
03/23/2015
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor LOANCARE LLC, AS SERVICER FOR EMBRACE HOME LOANS (RE: related document(s) 21 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176,).
03/23/2015
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(14-03314-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17803063. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 21) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/24/2015
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr. Attorney for Loancare LLC (RE: related document(s) 21 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LOANCARE LLC, AS SERVICER FOR EMBRACE HOME LOANS). Hearing scheduled 4/16/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
03/26/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 03/26/2015.
26
04/15/2015
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Tom Tutten to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #21; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr. Attorney for Loancare LLC as servicer for Embrace Home Loans, Inc.
27
04/17/2015
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay. The Debtors plan payments are hereby increased to $167.00 bi-weekly. The Creditors fixed payment on said claim of Loancare, LLC as Servicer for Embrace Home Loans, Inc. is $85.00 monthly to be paid at an interest rate of 4.5% (Related Doc # 21) Signed on 4/17/2015.
28
04/19/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 04/19/2015.
29
04/21/2015
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
30
04/28/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVCING CORPORATION.
31
06/08/2016
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: EMBRACE HOME LOANS, INC (Claim No. 7) To EMBRACE HOME LOANS, INC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor EMBRACE HOME LOANS, INC.
06/08/2016
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(14-03314-TOM13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19465890. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 31) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/11/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor EMBRACE HOME LOANS, INC). Notice Date 06/11/2016.
33
01/23/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 10 of Embrace Home Loans in the amount of $3009.60 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
34
01/23/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s)[33] Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 3/1/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.