Jennifer A Silva
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00105 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
23
06/14/2018
Rescission of Reaffirmation Agreement
24
06/19/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
25
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/06/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
27
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/09/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.