Jennifer Hansen Bendistis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00269 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/16/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/16/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
08/16/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/17/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
7
08/17/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
8
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
08/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
10/01/2018
Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice)
13
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse
10/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Statement of Declination (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/05/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
11/05/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
11/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
11/08/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
11/08/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.